ADAMS v. CITY OF ERIE, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Pennsylvania Western District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-00332-SJM

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo MARLENE ADAMS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John C. Melaragno, Esquire

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John C. Melaragno, Esquire +1 814 459 5557 +1 814 459 6778 johnm@mplegal.com
Space Gene P. Placidi +1 814 459 5557 genep@mplegal.com
v.
No Logo City of Erie, Pennsylvania, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of Erie, Pennsylvania

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert C. Brabender +1 814 870 1230

Toggle Switch Represented by eriepalawyers.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A. Karle +1 814 453 4651 +1 814 453 4651 gakarle@eriepalawyers.com
No Logo EDWARD LIEBEL, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of Erie, Pennsylvania

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert C. Brabender +1 814 870 1230

Toggle Switch Represented by eriepalawyers.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A. Karle +1 814 453 4651 +1 814 453 4651 gakarle@eriepalawyers.com
No Logo Jane Doe, Defendant
No Logo JOE DOE, Defendant
No Logo JOHN POPOVICH, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of Erie, Pennsylvania

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert C. Brabender +1 814 870 1230

Toggle Switch Represented by eriepalawyers.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A. Karle +1 814 453 4651 +1 814 453 4651 gakarle@eriepalawyers.com
No Logo MARIA MOE, Defendant
No Logo MATTHEW WILLIAMS, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of Erie, Pennsylvania

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert C. Brabender +1 814 870 1230

Toggle Switch Represented by eriepalawyers.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A. Karle +1 814 453 4651 +1 814 453 4651 gakarle@eriepalawyers.com
No Logo PAUL DEDIONISIO, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of Erie, Pennsylvania

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert C. Brabender +1 814 870 1230

Toggle Switch Represented by eriepalawyers.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A. Karle +1 814 453 4651 +1 814 453 4651 gakarle@eriepalawyers.com
No Logo REGER, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of Erie, Pennsylvania

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert C. Brabender +1 814 870 1230

Toggle Switch Represented by eriepalawyers.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A. Karle +1 814 453 4651 +1 814 453 4651 gakarle@eriepalawyers.com
No Logo Richard Roe, Defendant
No Logo Victory 2000 Indiana, Defendant
Officially listed as "VICTORY"

Toggle Switch Represented by City of Erie, Pennsylvania

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert C. Brabender +1 814 870 1230

Toggle Switch Represented by eriepalawyers.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A. Karle +1 814 453 4651 +1 814 453 4651 gakarle@eriepalawyers.com
Office Erie
Filed 10/10/2001
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Erie
Terminated 1/24/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 23 Filed: 1/24/2003, Entered: 1/24/2003, Terminated: 1/24/2003 ~Motion for Settlement
MOTION by MARLENE ADAMS for Settlement and Discontinuance with Proposed Order. (mad)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 1/24/2003, Entered: 1/24/2003 Terminated Case
    Case closed (mad)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 1/24/2003, Entered: 1/24/2003 Order
      ORDER upon motion granting [23-1] motion for Settlement and Discontinuance ( signed by Judge Sean J. McLaughlin on 1/24/03 ) CM all parties of record. (mad)
        LREF
        Blank 22 Filed: 12/13/2002, Entered: 12/16/2002 Notice of Hearing.
        Jury Trial Set for term beginning on 1/21/03 . (nk) Modified on 01/14/2003
          LREF
          Blank 21 Filed: 12/10/2002, Entered: 12/10/2002 Pretrial Conference - InterimCourt Filing
          Pre-Trial/Settlement Conference set for 9:30 a.m. on 12/23/02 before the Honorable Judge Sean J. McLaughlin, in Room 240, U.S. Courthouse and Post Office, Erie, PA. (nk)
            LREF
            Blank 20 Filed: 12/9/2002, Entered: 12/9/2002 Pretrial Statement
            PRETRIAL STATEMENT by CITY OF ERIE, MATTHEW WILLIAMS, EDWARD LIEBEL, JOHN POPOVICH, REGER, VICTORY, JOE DOE, JANE DOE, MARIA MOE, RICHARD ROE, PAUL DEDIONISIO (nk)
              LREF
              Blank 19 Filed: 11/25/2002, Entered: 11/25/2002 Pretrial Statement
              PRETRIAL STATEMENT by MARLENE ADAMS (nk)
                LREF
                Blank 18 Filed: 11/8/2002, Entered: 11/12/2002 Settlement ConferenceCourt Filing
                Settlement Conference held on 11/8/02 2:50 p.m. before Judge Sean J. McLaughlin [ Reporter: Ron Bench ] Case did not settle. Plaintiff's Pretrial Narrative due 11/24/02, Defendant's Pretrial Narrative due 12/16/02. (nk)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 10/18/2002, Entered: 10/18/2002 Order
                  ORDER upon motion granting [17-1] motion for Settlement Conference, Motion Hearing deadline set to 11/8/02 at 3:00 p.m. ( signed by Judge Sean J. McLaughlin on 10/18/02 ) CM all parties of record. (nk)
                    LREF
                    Blank 17 Filed: 10/17/2002, Entered: 10/17/2002, Terminated: 10/18/2002 Motion for Hearing
                    MOTION by MARLENE ADAMS for Settlement Conference with Proposed Order. (mad)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 8/2/2002, Entered: 8/2/2002 Order
                      ORDER upon motion granting [16-1] joint motion for Discovery, reset Pretrial Order Deadlines: Discovery cutoff on 9/17/02 ; Pretrial Statements for Plaintiffs due 11/17/02 ; Pretrial Statements for Defendants due 12/8/02 ; Motion Filing deadline due 10/7/02 ; Response to motions due 10/28/02 ; ( signed by Judge Sean J. McLaughlin on 8/2/02 ) CM all parties of record. (mad)
                        LREF
                        Blank 16 Filed: 7/31/2002, Entered: 7/31/2002, Terminated: 8/2/2002 Motion for Discovery
                        JOINT MOTION by MARLENE ADAMS, CITY OF ERIE, MATTHEW WILLIAMS, EDWARD LIEBEL, JOHN POPOVICH, REGER, VICTORY, PAUL DEDIONISIO for Discovery with Proposed Order. (mad)
                          LREF
                          Blank 15 Filed: 6/19/2002, Entered: 6/19/2002, Terminated: 6/19/2002 Motion to Extend Time
                          JOINT MOTION by MARLENE ADAMS, CITY OF ERIE, MATTHEW WILLIAMS, EDWARD LIEBEL, JOHN POPOVICH, REGER, VICTORY, JOE DOE, JANE DOE, MARIA MOE, RICHARD ROE, PAUL DEDIONISIO to Extend Time Discovery with Proposed Order. (mad)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 6/19/2002, Entered: 6/21/2002 Order
                            ORDER upon motion granting [15-1] joint motion to Extend Time Discovery, reset Pretrial Order Deadlines: Discovery cutoff on 8/3/02 ; Pretrial Statements for Plaintiffs due 10/3/02 ; Pretrial Statements for Defendants due 10/24/02 ; Motion Filing deadline due 8/23/02 ; Response to motions due 9/13/02 ; ( signed by Judge Sean J. McLaughlin on 6/19/02 ) CM all parties of record. (mad)
                              LREF
                              Blank 14 Filed: 2/21/2002, Entered: 2/21/2002 Case Management OrderCourt Filing
                              CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER setting Discovery cutoff on 6/22/02 ; Pretrial Statements for Plaintiffs due 8/22/02 ; Pretrial Statements for Defendants due 9/12/02 ; Motion Filing deadline due 7/12/02 ; Response to motions due 8/2/02 ; ( signed by Judge Sean J. McLaughlin on 2/21/02 ) CM all parties of record. (mad)
                                LREF
                                Blank 13 Filed: 2/21/2002, Entered: 2/21/2002 Case Management ConferenceCourt Filing
                                Case Management Conference held 2/21/02 @ 9:00 a.m. before Judge Sean J. McLaughlin [ Reporter: Ron Bench ] Case Management Order to be entered. (mad)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 2/21/2002, Entered: 2/21/2002 Track Designation
                                  CASE DESIGNATED to Track 1. (mad)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 12 Filed: 2/14/2002, Entered: 2/14/2002 Proposed Discovery Plan
                                    PROPOSED DISCOVERY PLAN pursuant to Rule 26(f) by CITY OF ERIE, MATTHEW WILLIAMS, EDWARD LIEBEL, JOHN POPOVICH, REGER, VICTORY, PAUL DEDIONISIO (mad)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 11 Filed: 1/15/2002, Entered: 1/15/2002 Summons/Returned Returned Executed
                                      RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to REGER 12/27/01 Answer due on 1/16/02 for REGER (mad)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 10 Filed: 1/15/2002, Entered: 1/15/2002 Summons/Returned Returned Executed
                                        RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to EDWARD LIEBEL 12/27/01 Answer due on 1/16/02 for EDWARD LIEBEL (mad)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 9 Filed: 1/3/2002, Entered: 1/3/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                          PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER, set Case Management Conference for 9:00 2/20/02 signed by Judge Sean J. McLaughlin on 1/2/02 ) CM all parties of record. (mad)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 8 Filed: 12/21/2001, Entered: 12/21/2001 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                            ANSWER by CITY OF ERIE, MATTHEW WILLIAMS, EDWARD LIEBEL, JOHN POPOVICH, REGER, VICTORY, PAUL DEDIONISIO (Attorney Gregory A. Karle) to amended complaint (mad)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 12/20/2001, Entered: 12/20/2001 Summons Issued
                                              SUMMONS(ES) issued for EDWARD LIEBEL, REGER (mad)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 7 Filed: 12/10/2001, Entered: 12/11/2001 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to PAUL DEDIONISIO on 11/12/01 Answer due on 1/11/02 for PAUL DEDIONISIO (mad)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 11/13/2001, Entered: 11/13/2001 Amended Complaint
                                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT by MARLENE ADAMS (Answer due 11/27/01 for RICHARD ROE, for MARIA MOE, for JANE DOE, for JOE DOE, for VICTORY, for REGER, for JOHN POPOVICH, for EDWARD LIEBEL, for MATTHEW WILLIAMS, for CITY OF ERIE ) amending [1-1] complaint added defendant PAUL DEDIONISIO (mad)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 11/5/2001, Entered: 11/5/2001 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                    WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to VICTORY on 10/11/01 Answer due on 12/10/01 for VICTORY (mad)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 10/29/2001, Entered: 10/29/2001 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                      WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to MATTHEW WILLIAMS on 10/11/01 Answer due on 12/10/01 for MATTHEW WILLIAMS (mad)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 10/29/2001, Entered: 10/29/2001 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                        WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to JOHN POPOVICH on 10/11/01 Answer due on 12/10/01 for JOHN POPOVICH (mad)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 10/17/2001, Entered: 10/17/2001 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                          WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to CITY OF ERIE on 10/11/01 Answer due on 12/10/01 for CITY OF ERIE (mad)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 10/10/2001, Entered: 10/10/2001 Complaint
                                                            COMPLAINT ; jury demand Filing Fee $ 150.00 Receipt # 02-0019 (sdp)
                                                              LREF

                                                              Statistics

                                                              This case has been viewed 219 times.

                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                              Space
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                               
                                                              PlainSite
                                                              Sign Up
                                                              Need Password Help?