BROWN v. LUTHER, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Pennsylvania Western District Court, Case No. 1:95-cv-00001-SJM-SPB

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo MARCUS ANDREW BROWN, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo CAMMON, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ryan R. Kennedy +1 412 644 4631 +1 412 644 3500
No Logo DENNIS LUTHER, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ryan R. Kennedy +1 412 644 4631 +1 412 644 3500
No Logo FUNDERBUNK, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ryan R. Kennedy +1 412 644 4631 +1 412 644 3500
No Logo G. JONES, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ryan R. Kennedy +1 412 644 4631 +1 412 644 3500
Office Erie
Filed 1/3/1995
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983pr Prisoner Civil Rights
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Other
County McKean
Terminated 12/19/1995
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 16 Filed: 12/19/1995, Entered: 12/19/1995 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER denying as moot [10-1] motion to Dismiss, granting [10-2] motion for Summary Judgment, adoptrr. adopting [15-1] report and recommendations ( signed by Judge Sean J. McLaughlin on 12/19/95 ) CM all parties of record. (mad)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 12/19/1995, Entered: 12/19/1995 Terminated Case
    Case closed (mad)
      LREF
      Blank 15 Filed: 11/20/1995, Entered: 11/21/1995 Report and RecommendationCourt Filing
      REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of Magistrate Judge Susan P. Baxter signed on 11/20/95 Recommending that [10-2] motion for Summary Judgment be granted ; The parties have 10 days from the date of service to file objections to this Report and Recommendation. (lrw)
        LREF
        Blank 14 Filed: 11/14/1995, Entered: 11/15/1995 Supplement
        SUPPLEMENT by DENNIS LUTHER, CAMMON, FUNDERBUNK, G. JONES to [10-1] motion to Dismiss by G. JONES, FUNDERBUNK, CAMMON, DENNIS LUTHER, [10-2] motion for Summary Judgment by G. JONES, FUNDERBUNK, CAMMON, DENNIS LUTHER (mad)
          LREF
          Blank 13 Filed: 9/14/1995, Entered: 9/14/1995 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER, Response to Motion set to 9/27/95 for [10-1] motion to Dismiss, set to 9/27/95 for [10-2] motion for Summary Judgment ( signed by Magistrate Judge Susan P. Baxter on 9/13/95 ) CM all parties of record. (lrw)
            LREF
            Blank 12 Filed: 8/14/1995, Entered: 8/14/1995, Terminated: 8/14/1995 Motion to Extend Time
            MOTION by MARCUS ANDREW BROWN to Extend Time with Proposed Order. (lrw)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 8/14/1995, Entered: 8/14/1995 Order
              ORDER upon motion granting [12-1] motion to Extend Time, reset Answer deadline to 9/5/95 for MARCUS ANDREW BROWN ( signed by Magistrate Judge Susan P. Baxter on 8/14/95 ) CM all parties of record. (lrw)
                LREF
                Blank 11 Filed: 7/25/1995, Entered: 7/25/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER, set Answer deadline to 8/7/95 for MARCUS ANDREW BROWN ( signed by Magistrate Judge Susan P. Baxter on 7/24/95 ) CM all parties of record. (lrw)
                  LREF
                  Blank 10 Filed: 5/10/1995, Entered: 5/15/1995, Terminated: 12/19/1995 Motion to Dismiss
                  MOTION by DENNIS LUTHER, CAMMON, FUNDERBUNK, G. JONES to Dismiss , for Summary Judgment . (lrw)
                    LREF
                    Blank 9 Filed: 4/17/1995, Entered: 4/25/1995 Answer
                    ANSWER to Complaint by DENNIS LUTHER, CAMMON, FUNDERBUNK, G. JONES (Attorney Ryan R. Kennedy) (mad)
                      LREF
                      Blank 8 Filed: 3/3/1995, Entered: 3/6/1995 Summons/Returned Returned Executed
                      RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to CAMMON 3/1/95 (sdp)
                        LREF
                        Blank 7 Filed: 3/3/1995, Entered: 3/6/1995 Summons/Returned Returned Executed
                        RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to G. JONES 2/14/95 (sdp)
                          LREF
                          Blank 6 Filed: 3/3/1995, Entered: 3/6/1995 Summons/Returned Returned Executed
                          RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to FUNDERBUNK 2/14/95 (sdp)
                            LREF
                            Blank 5 Filed: 3/3/1995, Entered: 3/6/1995 Summons/Returned Returned Executed
                            RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to DENNIS LUTHER; as to Attorney General on 2-16-95; as to U.S. Atty on 2-14-95. (sdp)
                              LREF
                              Blank 4 Filed: 3/3/1995, Entered: 3/6/1995 Summons/Returned Returned Executed
                              RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to DENNIS LUTHER 2/14/95 (sdp)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 2/7/1995, Entered: 2/7/1995 Case Referred to Magistrate Judge
                                CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Susan P. Baxter (rvb)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/9/1995, Entered: 1/9/1995 Remark
                                  Mailed service copies to US Marshal Office 1/9/95. (mad) Modified on 07/09/1998
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 3 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/6/1995 Complaint
                                    COMPLAINT with summons issued (mad) Modified on 07/09/1998
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 2 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/6/1995 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                                      MOTION by MARCUS ANDREW BROWN to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Proposed Order. (mad)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 1 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/6/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                        ORDER that pltf's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is granted and the Clerk is directed to file the complaint. It is further ordered that the US Marshal is directed to serve a copy of the complaint, summons, and this order upon each deft as directed by pltf. All costs of service shall be advanced by the US. ( signed by Magistrate Judge Francis X. Caiazza on 1/3/95 ) CM all parties of record. (mad) Modified on 07/09/1998
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/6/1995 Utility - Miscellaneous
                                          Miscellaneous Case # 94-183 Erie transferred to civil docket. (mad)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 12/27/1994, Entered: 12/28/1994 Case Referred to Magistrate Judge
                                            CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Francis X. Caiazza (mad)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 12/27/1994, Entered: 12/28/1994 Remark
                                              CIVIL RIGHT COMPLAINT with motion to proceed ifp RECEIVED. (mad)
                                                LREF

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 87 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?