MURRAY v. ALLIED VAN LINES,
Federal Civil Lawsuit Pennsylvania Western District Court, Case No. 1:95-cv-00201-MBC

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo VONALEE E. MURRAY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by crfwlaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew J. Conner +1 814 453 3343 +1 814 454 6713 aconner@crfwlaw.com
v.
No Logo Allied Van Lines, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Terence M. Healy +1 202 551 4640

Toggle Switch Represented by Dombroff & Gilmore

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark A. Dombroff +1 703 336 8700 +1 202 625 3150 mdombroff@dglitigators.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Knox McLaughlin Gornall & Sennett, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joanna K. Budde +1 814 459 2800 +1 814 453 4530 jbudde@kmgslaw.com
Office Erie
Filed 8/3/1995
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 380 - Personal Property: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County Erie
Terminated 2/17/1998
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (50) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 41 Filed: 2/17/1998, Entered: 2/18/1998 Stipulation of Dismissal
Stipulation by VONALEE E. MURRAY, ALLIED VAN LINES, Dismissing with prejudice with proposed order. (mad)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 2/17/1998, Entered: 2/18/1998 Terminated Case
    Case closed (mad)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 2/17/1998, Entered: 2/18/1998 Order
      ORDER upon motion granting [41-1] stipulation Dismissing with prejudice ( signed by Judge Maurice B. Cohill Jr. on 2/17/98 ) CM all parties of record. (mad)
        LREF
        Blank 40 Filed: 12/4/1997, Entered: 12/5/1997 Pretrial Conference - InterimCourt Filing
        Pre-Trial Conference held 12/4/97 @ 9:00 am before Judge Maurice B. Cohill Jr. [ Reporter: Ron Bench ] Case settles: Judge will sign stipulation upon notification from parties. Pltf's motion for production of documents (doc.32) is DENIED as Moot. (mad) Modified on 12/08/1997
          LREF
          Blank 39 Filed: 10/22/1997, Entered: 10/27/1997 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER, set Pretrial Conference for 9:00 12/4/97 ( signed by Judge Maurice B. Cohill Jr. on 10/22/97 ) CM all parties of record. (mad)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 5/2/1997, Entered: 5/5/1997 Order
            ORDER upon motion granting [37-1] motion for entry of a Protective Order ( signed by Judge Maurice B. Cohill Jr. on 5/2/97 ) CM all parties of record. (mad)
              LREF
              Blank 38 Filed: 4/29/1997, Entered: 4/29/1997 Supplement
              SUPPLEMENT RESPONSE by ALLIED VAN LINES, to [34-1] motion response by ALLIED VAN LINES, (mad)
                LREF
                Blank 37 Filed: 4/29/1997, Entered: 4/29/1997, Terminated: 5/2/1997 Motion for Protective Order
                MOTION by ALLIED VAN LINES, for entry of a Protective Order with Proposed Order. (mad) Modified on 01/14/1999
                  LREF
                  Blank 36 Filed: 4/11/1997, Entered: 4/11/1997 Pretrial Statement
                  PRETRIAL STATEMENT by ALLIED VAN LINES, (nk)
                    LREF
                    Blank 35 Filed: 4/11/1997, Entered: 4/11/1997 Objections
                    OBJECTIONS to [31-1] pre-trial statement and Defendant's Motion To Compel Full Compliance with Local Rule 16.1.4 by ALLIED VAN LINES, (nk)
                      LREF
                      Blank 34 Filed: 4/8/1997, Entered: 4/9/1997 Response to Motion
                      RESPONSE by ALLIED VAN LINES, to [32-1] motion for production of document per R. 34 of the F.R. of C.P. by VONALEE E. MURRAY (mad)
                        LREF
                        Blank 33 Filed: 3/24/1997, Entered: 3/31/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER, that the party file responsive set Brief deadline to 4/8/97 ( signed by Judge Maurice B. Cohill Jr. on 3/24/97 ) CM all parties of record. (mad)
                          LREF
                          Blank 32 Filed: 3/21/1997, Entered: 3/21/1997, Terminated: 12/4/1997 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                          MOTION by VONALEE E. MURRAY for production of document per R. 34 of the F.R. of C.P. with Proposed Order. (mad)
                            LREF
                            Blank 31 Filed: 3/21/1997, Entered: 3/21/1997 Pretrial Statement
                            PRETRIAL STATEMENT by VONALEE E. MURRAY (mad)
                              LREF
                              Blank 30 Filed: 2/28/1997, Entered: 3/3/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER denying [17-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment, reset Pretrial Order Deadlines: Pretrial Statements for Plaintiffs due 3/21/97 ; Pretrial Statements for Defendants due 4/1/97 ; Pretrial Conference set for 12:00 5/1/97 ; ( signed by Judge Maurice B. Cohill Jr. on 2/28/97 ) CM all parties of record. (mad)
                                LREF
                                Blank 29 Filed: 12/9/1996, Entered: 12/10/1996 Brief in Support of Motion
                                SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF by ALLIED VAN LINES, in support of [17-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment by ALLIED VAN LINES, (mad)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 28 Filed: 10/28/1996, Entered: 10/28/1996 Appendix
                                  JOINT EVIDENTIARY APPENDIX regarding deft's Motion for summary judgment. (mad) Modified on 01/14/1999
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 9/25/1996, Entered: 9/26/1996 Order
                                    ORDER upon motion granting [27-1] joint motion to enlarge record to include the May 31 and August 20 1996 Deposition Testimony, per Rule 54 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure ( signed by Judge Maurice B. Cohill Jr. on 9/25/96 ) CM all parties of record. (mad)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 27 Filed: 9/24/1996, Entered: 9/24/1996, Terminated: 9/25/1996 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                      JOINT MOTION by VONALEE E. MURRAY, ALLIED VAN LINES, to enlarge record to include the May 31 and August 20 1996 Deposition Testimony, per Rule 54 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure with Proposed Order. (mad)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 8/19/1996, Entered: 8/20/1996 Order
                                        ORDER upon motion granting [26-1] motion to continue Trial date. Further ordered that the trial of this action is continued until a decision on the dispositive motions has been made. ( signed by Judge Maurice B. Cohill Jr. on 8/19/96 ) CM all parties of record. (mad)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 26 Filed: 8/16/1996, Entered: 8/16/1996, Terminated: 8/19/1996 Motion to Continue
                                          MOTION by ALLIED VAN LINES, to continue Trial date with Proposed Order. (mad)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 25 Filed: 7/17/1996, Entered: 7/18/1996 Deposition
                                            DEPOSITION of David Whitcomb (nk)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 24 Filed: 6/21/1996, Entered: 6/24/1996 ~Notice (other)
                                              NOTICE of Serving Responses to defts' First Requests for production of documents to pltf by VONALEE E. MURRAY (mad) Modified on 01/14/1999
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 23 Filed: 6/21/1996, Entered: 6/24/1996 ~Notice (other)
                                                NOTICE of Serving Answers to defts' First set of interrogatories to pltf by VONALEE E. MURRAY (mad) Modified on 01/14/1999
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 22 Filed: 5/24/1996, Entered: 5/24/1996 Affidavit
                                                  AFFIDAVIT in opposition by VONALEE E. MURRAY Vonalee E. Murray Re: [17-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment and/or motion to dismiss by ALLIED VAN LINES, (mad)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 21 Filed: 5/24/1996, Entered: 5/24/1996 Brief in Opposition to Motion
                                                    BRIEF by VONALEE E. MURRAY in opposition to [17-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment by ALLIED VAN LINES, (mad)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 20 Filed: 5/22/1996, Entered: 5/23/1996 ~Notice (other)
                                                      NOTICE of Rescheduled Deposition by VONALEE E. MURRAY That the depositions of Jack Harmon and Robert Smith shall be taken in the matter on 5/31/96 commencing at 1:30 pm at the Offices of Conner & Riley, 17 W. 10th St., Erie, PA before an official court reporter for purposes of discovery and use at trial. (mad) Modified on 01/14/1999
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 18 Filed: 5/1/1996, Entered: 5/1/1996 Deposition
                                                        NOTICE OF DEPOSITION of Jack Harmon & Robert Smith (mad)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 19 Filed: 4/29/1996, Entered: 5/2/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER, set Reply Brief deadline to 5/24/96 ( signed by Judge Maurice B. Cohill Jr. on 4/29/96 ) CM all parties of record. (mad)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 17 Filed: 4/25/1996, Entered: 4/26/1996, Terminated: 2/28/1997 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                            MOTION with Brief in Support by ALLIED VAN LINES, for Partial Summary Judgment (mad)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 16 Filed: 12/12/1995, Entered: 12/13/1995 Case Management OrderCourt Filing
                                                              CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER setting Discovery cutoff on 6/28/96 ; Pretrial Statements for Plaintiffs due 7/19/96 ; Pretrial Statements for Defendants due 8/9/96 ; Pretrial Conference set for 9:00 10/15/96 ; Joining of parties amending of pleadings by 1/2/96 ; Motion Filing deadline due 8/9/96 ; Jury Trial set for 10/28/96 ; ( signed by Judge Maurice B. Cohill Jr. on 112/12/95 ) CM all parties of record. (mad)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 15 Filed: 12/12/1995, Entered: 12/13/1995 Case Management ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                Case Management Conference held 12/12/95 @ 4:35 pm before Judge Maurice B. Cohill Jr. [ Reporter: Janis Ferguson ] (mad)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 12/12/1995, Entered: 12/13/1995 Track Designation
                                                                  CASE DESIGNATED to Track 1. (mad)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 12/4/1995, Entered: 12/4/1995 Order
                                                                    ORDER upon motion granting [14-1] motion for Terence M. Healy to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( signed by Judge Maurice B. Cohill Jr. on 12/4/95 ) CM all parties of record. (mad)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 14 Filed: 12/1/1995, Entered: 12/1/1995, Terminated: 12/4/1995 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                      MOTION by ALLIED VAN LINES, for Terence M. Healy to Appear Pro Hac Vice with Proposed Order. (mad)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 13 Filed: 11/7/1995, Entered: 11/8/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER, set Case Management Conference for 9:00 12/12/95 ( signed by Judge Maurice B. Cohill Jr. on 11/7/95 ) CM all parties of record. (mad)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 12 Filed: 11/6/1995, Entered: 11/6/1995 Order on Motion for RecusalCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER OF RECUSAL and the Clerk is directed to reassign this case to Cohill, J. for all further proceeding. ( signed by Judge Sean J. McLaughlin on 11/6/95 ) CM all parties of record. (mad)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 11/6/1995, Entered: 11/6/1995 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                            CASE reassigned to Judge Maurice B. Cohill Jr. (mad)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 11 Filed: 11/2/1995, Entered: 11/2/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for ALLIED VAN LINES, by Joanna K. Budde (mad)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 10 Filed: 10/24/1995, Entered: 10/29/1995 Answer
                                                                                ANSWER to Complaint by ALLIED VAN LINES, (Attorney Mark A. Dombroff) (mad)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 10/19/1995, Entered: 10/20/1995 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OPINION granting [2-1] motion to Dismiss as to Counts I, II, and III of Pltf's Amended Complaint. ( signed by Judge Sean J. McLaughlin on 10/19/95 ) CM all parties of record. (mad)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 10/3/1995, Entered: 10/3/1995 Amended Complaint
                                                                                    AMENDED COMPLAINT by VONALEE E. MURRAY (Answer due 10/17/95 for ALLIED VAN LINES, ) amending [1-1] complaint (sdp)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 9/29/1995, Entered: 9/29/1995 Order
                                                                                      ORDER upon motion granting [6-1] motion to Amend [1-1] complaint within 20 days of the entry of this order. ( signed by Judge Sean J. McLaughlin on 9/29/95 ) CM all parties of record. (mad)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 9/26/1995, Entered: 9/26/1995 Brief in Support of Motion
                                                                                        BRIEF by VONALEE E. MURRAY in support of [6-1] motion to Amend [1-1] complaint by VONALEE E. MURRAY (mad)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 9/26/1995, Entered: 9/26/1995, Terminated: 9/29/1995 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                          MOTION by VONALEE E. MURRAY to Amend [1-1] complaint with Proposed Order. (mad)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 9/26/1995, Entered: 9/26/1995 Brief in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                            BRIEF by VONALEE E. MURRAY in opposition to [2-1] motion to Dismiss by ALLIED VAN LINES, (mad)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 9/6/1995, Entered: 9/7/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER, Brief in Opposition set to 9/26/95 for [2-1] motion to Dismiss ( signed by Judge Sean J. McLaughlin on 9/6/95 ) CM all parties of record. (mad)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 8/28/1995, Entered: 8/30/1995 Brief in Support of Motion
                                                                                                BRIEF by ALLIED VAN LINES, in support of [2-1] motion to Dismiss by ALLIED VAN LINES, (mad)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 8/28/1995, Entered: 8/30/1995 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                  MOTION by ALLIED VAN LINES, to Dismiss with Proposed Order. (mad)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 8/3/1995, Entered: 8/3/1995 Complaint
                                                                                                    COMPLAINT with summons issued; jury demand Filing Fee $ 120.00 Receipt # 77741 (mad)
                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                      Space Space

                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 60 times.

                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                       
                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                      Need Password Help?