USA v. BORAM
Criminal Case Pennsylvania Western District Court, Case No. 2:00-cr-00086-WLS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Margaret E. Picking +1 412 644 3500 margaret.picking@usdoj.gov

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Pittsburgh
Filed 5/4/2000
County Allegheny
Terminated 2/13/2002
Reopened
Magistrate Case
299-mj-00195
Citation
Offense Level
18871(a) Knowingly and willfully make threats to the President of the United States of America [ 299-m -195 ]
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 871.F
Offense Level 4
18871 THREATS AGAINST PRESIDENT
Count 2
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 844E.F
Offense Level 4
18844 (e) WILLFULLY MAKING A THREAT
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (84) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 3/29/2005, Entered: 3/29/2005 Remark
RECEIPT of receiving probation form 22 papers on 3/24/05 as to TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM (plh)
    LREF
    Blank 54 Filed: 3/21/2005, Entered: 3/21/2005 Transfer Out/Probationer
    PROBATION JURISDICTION TRANSFERRED OUT as to TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM. Transmitted to Northern District of WV Transfer of Jurisdiction form, with certified copies of indictment, judgment and docket sheet. (plh)
      LREF
      Blank 53 Filed: 9/15/2003, Entered: 9/15/2003 Satisfaction of Judgment
      Satisfaction of Judgment as to Fine and Special Assessment by TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM (plh)
        LREF
        Blank 52 Filed: 2/13/2002, Entered: 2/13/2002 Judgment*Court Filing
        JUDGMENT TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM (1) count(s) 2. PROBATION for a term of 60 months; Fine to the United States of America in the sum of $500.00; Special Assessment in the sum of $100.00 , TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM (1) count(s) 1. DISMISSED on the motion of the United States (signed by Judge William L. Standish on 2/13/02) (plh) Modified on 02/15/2002
          LREF
          Blank 51 Filed: 2/13/2002, Entered: 2/13/2002 SentencingCourt Filing
          Sentencing Hearing held on 2/13/02 before Judge William L. Standish [ Reporter: Michael Powers ] re: TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM (1) count(s) 1, 2 (plh)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 2/13/2002, Entered: 2/13/2002 Special Assessment Paid
            Special Assessment paid by defendant TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM in the amount of $ 100.00 Receipt # 2404 (plh)
              LREF
              Blank 50 Filed: 2/6/2002, Entered: 2/6/2002, Terminated: 2/13/2002 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
              MOTION by TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM for Downward Departure and Memorandum In Aid of Sentencing with Proposed Order. (plh)
                LREF
                Blank 49 Filed: 1/24/2002, Entered: 1/25/2002 Position with respect to sentencing factors
                Position by USA with respect to sentencing factors as to TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM (crw)
                  LREF
                  Blank 48 Filed: 1/22/2002, Entered: 1/23/2002 Position with respect to sentencing factors
                  Position by TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM with respect to sentencing factors (crw)
                    LREF
                    Blank 47 Filed: 11/27/2001, Entered: 11/27/2001 SentencingCourt Filing
                    Sentencing Hearing set for 9:30 2/13/02 for TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM before Judge William L. Standish , TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM (1) count(s) 1, 2 (plh)
                      LREF
                      Blank 46 Filed: 11/27/2001, Entered: 11/27/2001 Change of Plea HearingCourt Filing
                      Change of Plea Hearing as to TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM held on 11/26/01 before Judge William L. Standish [ Reporter: Michael Powers ] with Plea Agreement (plh)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 11/27/2001, Entered: 11/27/2001 Change of Plea Hearing
                        CHANGE OF PLEA from Not Guilty to Guilty: TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM (1) count(s) 2 Terminated motions on 11/26/01 before Judge William L. Standish with 18 (plh)
                          LREF
                          Blank 45 Filed: 11/2/2001, Entered: 11/2/2001, Terminated: 11/2/2001 Motion to Continue
                          MOTION by TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM to continue Pretrial Motion Hearing with Proposed Order. (plh)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 11/2/2001, Entered: 11/2/2001 Order
                            ORDER upon motion granting [45-1] motion to continue Pretrial Motion Hearing as to TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM (1), Motion Hearing, set for 10:00 11/26/01 as to: TIMOTHY BORAM, re: (43-1), (37-1), (36-1), (35-1), (15-1) (signed by Judge William L. Standish on 11/2/01) CM all parties of record. (plh)
                              LREF
                              Blank 44 Filed: 9/14/2001, Entered: 9/14/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER as to TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM, Motion Hearing, set for 9:30 11/9/01 as to: TIMOTHY BORAM, re: (43-1), (37-1), (36-1), (35-1), (15-1) . (signed by Judge William L. Standish on 9/12/01) CM all parties of record. (plh)
                                LREF
                                Blank 43 Filed: 9/11/2001, Entered: 9/11/2001, Terminated: 2/13/2002 Motion to Continue
                                MOTION by TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM to continue Pretrial Motion Hearing with Proposed Order. (plh)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 42 Filed: 8/13/2001, Entered: 8/14/2001 Brief in Opposition
                                  BRIEF by USA as to TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM in opposition to [37-1] motion to Produce Evidence which the Government intends to use under FRCP 404 (b) and 609 with Citation of Authority, [36-1] motion to Suppress Statements, [35-1] motion to Dismiss Indictment (plh)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 7/19/2001, Entered: 7/19/2001 Order
                                    ORDER upon motion granting [41-1] motion to Extend Time to file Pretrial Motions as to TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM (1), reset Motion Filing deadline to 8/13/01 for TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM (signed by Judge William L. Standish on 7/19/01) CM all parties of record. (plh)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 41 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: 7/16/2001 Motion for Extension of Time
                                      MOTION by USA as to TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM to Extend Time to file Pretrial Motions with Proposed Order. (plh)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 40 Filed: 6/28/2001, Entered: 6/28/2001 Notice of Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                        Motion Hearing, set for 10:30 9/14/01 as to: TIMOTHY BORAM, re: (37-1), (36-1), (35-1) before Judge William L. Standish (plh)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 39 Filed: 6/25/2001, Entered: 6/26/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER as to TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM, Response to Motion set to 7/13/01 for TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM for [37-1] motion to Produce Evidence which the Government intends to use under FRCP 404 (b) and 609 with Citation of Authority, set to 7/13/01 for TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM for [36-1] motion to Suppress Statements, set to 7/13/01 for TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM for [35-1] motion to Dismiss Indictment , Motion Hearing, set for 9:30 9/7/01 as to: TIMOTHY BORAM, re: (37-1), (36-1), (35-1) (signed by Judge William L. Standish on 6/25/01) CM all parties of record. (plh)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 38 Filed: 6/20/2001, Entered: 6/21/2001 ~Notice (other)
                                            NOTICE of Insanity Defense and Expert Witness pursuant to FRCP 12.2 by TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM (plh)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 37 Filed: 6/20/2001, Entered: 6/21/2001 Motion to Produce
                                              MOTION by TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM to Produce Evidence which the Government intends to use under FRCP 404 (b) and 609 with Citation of Authority with Proposed Order. (plh)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 36 Filed: 6/20/2001, Entered: 6/21/2001 Motion to Suppress
                                                MOTION by TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM to Suppress Statements with Proposed Order. (plh)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 35 Filed: 6/20/2001, Entered: 6/21/2001 Motion to Dismiss
                                                  MOTION by TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM to Dismiss Indictment with Proposed Order. (plh)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 5/22/2001, Entered: 5/23/2001 Order
                                                    ORDER upon motion granting [34-1] motion to Extend Time for filing Pretrial Motions as to TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM (1), reset Motion Filing deadline to 6/20/01 for TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM (signed by Judge William L. Standish on 5/22/01) CM all parties of record. (plh)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 34 Filed: 5/21/2001, Entered: 5/22/2001 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                      MOTION by TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM to Extend Time for filing Pretrial Motions with Proposed Order. (plh)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 4/20/2001, Entered: 4/20/2001 Order
                                                        ORDER upon motion granting [33-1] motion to Extend Time for filing pretrial motions as to TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM (1), reset Motion Filing deadline to 5/21/01 for TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM (signed by Judge William L. Standish on 4/20/01) CM all parties of record. (plh)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 33 Filed: 4/19/2001, Entered: 4/19/2001, Terminated: 4/20/2001 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                          MOTION by TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM to Extend Time for filing pretrial motions with Proposed Order. (aen)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 3/20/2001, Entered: 3/20/2001 Order
                                                            ORDER upon motion granting [32-1] motion to Extend Time for filing Pretrial Motions as to TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM (1), reset Motion Filing deadline to 4/18/01 for TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM . (signed by Judge William L. Standish on 3/20/01) CM all parties of record. (plh)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 32 Filed: 3/19/2001, Entered: 3/19/2001, Terminated: 3/20/2001 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                              MOTION by TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM to Extend Time for filing Pretrial Motions with Proposed Order. (plh)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 2/16/2001, Entered: 2/16/2001 Order
                                                                ORDER upon motion granting [31-1] motion to Extend Time for filing Pretrial Motions as to TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM (1), reset Motion Filing deadline to 3/19/01 for TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM . (signed by Judge William L. Standish on 2/15/01) CM all parties of record. (plh)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 31 Filed: 2/15/2001, Entered: 2/15/2001, Terminated: 2/16/2001 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                  MOTION by TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM to Extend Time for filing Pretrial Motions with Proposed Order. (plh)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/18/2001, Entered: 1/18/2001 Order
                                                                    ORDER upon motion granting [30-1] motion to Extend Time for filing pretrial motions as to TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM (1), reset Motion Filing deadline to 2/15/01 for TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM (signed by Judge William L. Standish on 2/17/01) CM all parties of record. (aen)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 30 Filed: 1/16/2001, Entered: 1/17/2001 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                      MOTION by TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM to Extend Time for filing pretrial motions with Proposed Order. (crw)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 12/15/2000, Entered: 12/15/2000 Order
                                                                        ORDER upon motion granting [29-1] motion to Extend Time for filing Pretrial Motions as to TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM (1), reset Motion Filing deadline to 1/16/01 for TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM . (signed by Judge William L. Standish on 1/15/00) CM all parties of record. (plh)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 29 Filed: 12/13/2000, Entered: 12/14/2000 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                          MOTION by TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM to Extend Time for filing Pretrial Motions with Proposed Order. (plh)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 11/14/2000, Entered: 11/14/2000 Order
                                                                            ORDER upon motion granting [28-1] motion to Extend Time for filing Pretrial Motions as to TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM (1), reset Motion Filing deadline to 12/14/00 for TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM (signed by Judge William L. Standish on 11/13/00) CM all parties of record. (plh)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 28 Filed: 11/13/2000, Entered: 11/13/2000, Terminated: 11/14/2000 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                              MOTION by TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM to Extend Time for filing Pretrial Motions with Proposed Order. (plh)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 10/31/2000, Entered: 11/1/2000 Order
                                                                                ORDER upon motion granting [27-1] motion to Extend Time for filing Pretrial Motions as to TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM (1), reset Motion Filing deadline to 11/14/00 for TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM . (signed by Judge William L. Standish on 10/31/00) CM all parties of record. (plh)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 27 Filed: 10/30/2000, Entered: 10/31/2000 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                  MOTION by TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM to Extend Time for filing Pretrial Motions with Proposed Order. (plh)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 10/2/2000, Entered: 10/2/2000 Order
                                                                                    ORDER upon motion granting [26-1] motion to Extend Time for Filing Pretrial Motions as to TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM (1), reset Motion Filing deadline to 10/30/00 for TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM (signed by Judge William L. Standish on 10/2/00) CM all parties of record. (plh)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 26 Filed: 9/29/2000, Entered: 10/2/2000 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                      MOTION by TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM to Extend Time for Filing Pretrial Motions with Proposed Order. (plh)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 25 Filed: 8/18/2000, Entered: 8/18/2000, Terminated: 8/18/2000 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                        MOTION by TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM to Extend Time for filing Pretrial Motions with Proposed Order. (plh)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 8/18/2000, Entered: 8/18/2000 Order
                                                                                          ORDER upon motion granting [25-1] motion to Extend Time for filing Pretrial Motions as to TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM (1), reset Motion Filing deadline to 9/29/00 for TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM (signed by Judge William L. Standish on 8/17/00) CM all parties of record. (plh)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 7/31/2000, Entered: 8/1/2000 Order
                                                                                            ORDER upon motion granting [24-1] motion to Extend Time for filing Pretrial Motions as to TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM (1), reset Motion Filing deadline to 8/30/00 for TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM . (signed by Judge William L. Standish on 7/31/00) CM all parties of record. (plh)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 7/31/2000, Entered: 8/1/2000 Order
                                                                                              ORDER upon motion granting [23-1] motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM (1); that Mr. Boram's house arrest conditions of his release be modified to permit him to leave his home between the hours of 12 noon and 6 p.m. each day; Mr. Boram shall also be required to report every doctor appointment to Pretrial Services; all other conditions of release shall remain in full force and effect. (signed by Judge William L. Standish on 7/31/00) CM all parties of record. (plh)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 24 Filed: 7/28/2000, Entered: 7/31/2000 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                MOTION by TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM to Extend Time for filing Pretrial Motions with Proposed Order. (plh)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 23 Filed: 7/28/2000, Entered: 7/31/2000 Motion to Modify
                                                                                                  MOTION by TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM to Modify Conditions of Release with Proposed Order. (plh)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 6/15/2000, Entered: 6/15/2000 Order
                                                                                                    ORDER upon motion granting [22-1] motion to Extend Time for filing pretrial motions as to TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM (1), reset Motion Filing deadline to 7/31/00 for TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM (signed by Judge William L. Standish on 6/15/00) CM all parties of record. (aen)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 22 Filed: 6/14/2000, Entered: 6/15/2000 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                      MOTION by TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM to Extend Time for filing pretrial motions with Proposed Order. (aen)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 6/1/2000, Entered: 6/1/2000 Arraignment
                                                                                                        Arraignment as to TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM held on 6/1/00 before Magistrate Judge Francis X. Caiazza [ Reporter: none ] Defendant pleads not guilty. ( with Document # 18 ) (plh)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 21 Filed: 5/16/2000, Entered: 5/17/2000 ArraignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                          Arraignment as to TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM reset for 9:30 6/1/00 for TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM before Magistrate Judge Francis Caiazza (plh)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 20 Filed: 5/4/2000, Entered: 5/5/2000 ArraignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                            Arraignment as to TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM set for 9:30 5/25/00 for TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM before Mag. Judge Robert C. Mitchell (plh)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 19 Filed: 5/4/2000, Entered: 5/5/2000 Indictment Memorandum
                                                                                                              Indictment Memorandum as to TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM (plh)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 18 Filed: 5/4/2000, Entered: 5/5/2000 Indictment
                                                                                                                INDICTMENT as to TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM (1) count(s) 1, 2 (plh)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 17 Filed: 4/4/2000, Entered: 4/4/2000, Terminated: 4/4/2000 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                  MOTION by TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM to Extend Time for Indictment with Proposed Order. [ 2:99-m -195 ] (jhi)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 4/4/2000, Entered: 4/4/2000 Order
                                                                                                                    ORDER upon motion granting [17-1] motion to Extend Time for Indictment as to TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM (1) (signed by Magistrate Judge Francis X. Caiazza on 4/4/00) CM all parties of record. [ 2:99-m -195 ] (jhi)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/2/2000, Entered: 3/2/2000 Order
                                                                                                                      ORDER upon motion granting [16-1] motion to Extend Time for Indictment as to TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM (1) (signed by Magistrate Judge Francis X. Caiazza on 3/2/00) CM all parties of record. [ 2:99-m -195 ] (jhi)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 16 Filed: 3/1/2000, Entered: 3/2/2000 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                        MOTION by TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM to Extend Time for Indictment with Proposed Order. [ 2:99-m -195 ] (jhi)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 2/1/2000, Entered: 2/1/2000 Order
                                                                                                                          ORDER upon motion granting [1-1] complaint as to TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM (1) (signed by Magistrate Judge Francis X. Caiazza on 2/1/00) CM all parties of record. [ 2:99-m -195 ] (jhi)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 15 Filed: 1/31/2000, Entered: 2/1/2000 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                            MOTION by TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM to Extend Time with Proposed Order. [ 2:99-m -195 ] (jhi)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 12/29/1999, Entered: 12/29/1999 Order
                                                                                                                              ORDER upon motion granting [14-1] motion to Extend Time as to TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM (1) (signed by Magistrate Judge Francis X. Caiazza on 12/29/99) CM all parties of record. [ 2:99-m -195 ] (jhi)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 14 Filed: 12/28/1999, Entered: 12/29/1999 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                MOTION by TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM to Extend Time with Proposed Order. [ 2:99-m -195 ] (jhi)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 13 Filed: 11/30/1999, Entered: 11/30/1999, Terminated: 11/30/1999 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                  MOTION by TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM to Extend Time for Indictment with Proposed Order. [ 2:99-m -195 ] (sealed)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 11/30/1999, Entered: 11/30/1999 Order
                                                                                                                                    ORDER upon motion granting [13-1] motion to Extend Time for Indictment as to TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM (1) (signed by Magistrate Judge Francis X. Caiazza on 11/30/99) CM all parties of record. [ 2:99-m -195 ] (jhi)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 11/2/1999, Entered: 11/5/1999 Order
                                                                                                                                      ORDER upon motion granting [12-1] motion to continue time for indictument as to TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM (1) (signed by Mag. Judge Ila J. Sensenich on 11/2/99) CM all parties of record. [ 2:99-m -195 ] (dgg)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 12 Filed: 10/27/1999, Entered: 11/5/1999 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                        MOTION by TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM to continue with Proposed Order. [ 2:99-m -195 ] (dgg)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 11 Filed: 9/28/1999, Entered: 9/28/1999, Terminated: 9/28/1999 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                          MOTION by TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM to Extend Time to file Indictment with Proposed Order. [ 2:99-m -195 ] (jhi)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 9/28/1999, Entered: 9/28/1999 Order
                                                                                                                                            ORDER upon motion granting [11-1] motion to Extend Time to file Indictment as to TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM (1) (signed by Magistrate Judge Francis X. Caiazza on 9/28/99) CM all parties of record. [ 2:99-m -195 ] (jhi)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 8/31/1999, Entered: 8/31/1999 Order
                                                                                                                                              ORDER upon motion granting [10-1] motion to Extend Time as to TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM (1) (signed by Magistrate Judge Francis X. Caiazza on 8/31/99) CM all parties of record. [ 2:99-m -195 ] (jhi)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 10 Filed: 8/30/1999, Entered: 8/31/1999 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                MOTION by TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM to Extend Time with Proposed Order. [ 2:99-m -195 ] (jhi)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 8/4/1999, Entered: 8/4/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER as to TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM, Appointing Federal Public Defender Jay Finkelstein (signed by Magistrate Judge Francis X. Caiazza on 8/4/99) CM all parties of record. [ 2:99-m -195 ] (jhi)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 8/4/1999, Entered: 8/4/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER as to TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM, following a preliminary examination, probable cause is found that the charged crime has been committed ant that the accused has committed the offense. (signed by Magistrate Judge Francis X. Caiazza on 8/4/99) CM all parties of record. [ 2:99-m -195 ] (jhi)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 7 Filed: 8/3/1999, Entered: 8/3/1999, Terminated: 8/3/1999 Motion to Unseal Document
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA as to TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM to Unseal with Proposed Order. [ 2:99-m -195 ] (sealed)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 6 Filed: 8/3/1999, Entered: 8/3/1999 Preliminary ExaminationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        Preliminary Examination as to TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM held on 8/3/99 before Magistrate Judge Francis X. Caiazza [ Reporter: none ] [ 2:99-m -195 ] (sealed)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 5 Filed: 8/3/1999, Entered: 8/3/1999 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM Bond set to $5,000 for TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM. (signed by Magistrate Judge Francis X. Caiazza on 8/2/99) CM all parties of record. [ 2:99-m -195 ] (sealed)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document -- Filed: 8/3/1999, Entered: 8/3/1999 Order
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER upon motion granting [7-1] motion to Unseal as to TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM (1) (signed by Magistrate Judge Francis X. Caiazza on 8/3/99) CM all parties of record. [ 2:99-m -195 ] (sealed)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 4 Filed: 8/2/1999, Entered: 8/3/1999 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23
                                                                                                                                                              CJA 23 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM [ 2:99-m -195 ] (sealed)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 3 Filed: 8/2/1999, Entered: 8/3/1999 Initial AppearanceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                Initial appearance as to TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM held on 8/2/99 before Magistrate Judge Francis X. Caiazza [ Reporter: none ] ;Preliminary Examination set for 2:15 8/3/99 for TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM (Defendant informed of rights.) [ 2:99-m -195 ] (sealed)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 2 Filed: 8/2/1999, Entered: 8/2/1999, Terminated: 8/2/1999 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA as to TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM to Seal with Proposed Order. [ 2:99-m -195 ] (sealed)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/2/1999, Entered: 8/2/1999, Terminated: 2/1/2000 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT [ 2:99-m -195 ] (sealed)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document -- Filed: 8/2/1999, Entered: 8/3/1999 Bond
                                                                                                                                                                      O.R. BOND entered by TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM in the amount of $5,000 [ 2:99-m -195 ] (sealed)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document -- Filed: 8/2/1999, Entered: 8/2/1999 Order
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER upon motion granting [2-1] motion to Seal as to TIMOTHY ELDON BORAM (1) (signed by Magistrate Judge Francis X. Caiazza on 8/2/99) CM all parties of record. [ 2:99-m -195 ] (sealed)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 138 times.

                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?