MCCAFFREY, et al v. SUN PACIFIC, INC., et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Pennsylvania Western District Court, Case No. 2:00-cv-00842-RJC-KJB

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo BRIAN ZAGORAC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Clapp, Desjardins & Ely, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas P. Desjardins +1 202 638 5300 +1 202 393 1725 dpd@cdelaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by rjslegal.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard J. Schubert +1 412 434 7790 rschubert@rjslegal.com
No Logo CHERYL ZAGORAC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Clapp, Desjardins & Ely, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas P. Desjardins +1 202 638 5300 +1 202 393 1725 dpd@cdelaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by rjslegal.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard J. Schubert +1 412 434 7790 rschubert@rjslegal.com
No Logo CHILD EMBRAUGH, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Clapp, Desjardins & Ely, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas P. Desjardins +1 202 638 5300 +1 202 393 1725 dpd@cdelaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by rjslegal.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard J. Schubert +1 412 434 7790 rschubert@rjslegal.com
No Logo DINA PORTERFIELD, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Clapp, Desjardins & Ely, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas P. Desjardins +1 202 638 5300 +1 202 393 1725 dpd@cdelaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by rjslegal.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard J. Schubert +1 412 434 7790 rschubert@rjslegal.com
No Logo GREG GONGAWARE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Clapp, Desjardins & Ely, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas P. Desjardins +1 202 638 5300 +1 202 393 1725 dpd@cdelaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by rjslegal.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard J. Schubert +1 412 434 7790 rschubert@rjslegal.com
No Logo JAMES SANDERS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Clapp, Desjardins & Ely, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas P. Desjardins +1 202 638 5300 +1 202 393 1725 dpd@cdelaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by rjslegal.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard J. Schubert +1 412 434 7790 rschubert@rjslegal.com
No Logo JEANNE MARAVICH, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Clapp, Desjardins & Ely, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas P. Desjardins +1 202 638 5300 +1 202 393 1725 dpd@cdelaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by rjslegal.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard J. Schubert +1 412 434 7790 rschubert@rjslegal.com
No Logo JODY MCCAFFREY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Clapp, Desjardins & Ely, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas P. Desjardins +1 202 638 5300 +1 202 393 1725 dpd@cdelaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by rjslegal.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard J. Schubert +1 412 434 7790 rschubert@rjslegal.com
No Logo MARTIN PESCE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Clapp, Desjardins & Ely, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas P. Desjardins +1 202 638 5300 +1 202 393 1725 dpd@cdelaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by rjslegal.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard J. Schubert +1 412 434 7790 rschubert@rjslegal.com
No Logo PEARJEAN SANDERS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Clapp, Desjardins & Ely, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas P. Desjardins +1 202 638 5300 +1 202 393 1725 dpd@cdelaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by rjslegal.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard J. Schubert +1 412 434 7790 rschubert@rjslegal.com
No Logo PETE MARAVICH, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Clapp, Desjardins & Ely, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas P. Desjardins +1 202 638 5300 +1 202 393 1725 dpd@cdelaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by rjslegal.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard J. Schubert +1 412 434 7790 rschubert@rjslegal.com
No Logo RANDY PORTERFIELD, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Clapp, Desjardins & Ely, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas P. Desjardins +1 202 638 5300 +1 202 393 1725 dpd@cdelaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by rjslegal.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard J. Schubert +1 412 434 7790 rschubert@rjslegal.com
No Logo RON EMBAUGH, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Clapp, Desjardins & Ely, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas P. Desjardins +1 202 638 5300 +1 202 393 1725 dpd@cdelaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by rjslegal.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard J. Schubert +1 412 434 7790 rschubert@rjslegal.com
No Logo TOM MCCAFFREY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Clapp, Desjardins & Ely, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas P. Desjardins +1 202 638 5300 +1 202 393 1725 dpd@cdelaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by rjslegal.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard J. Schubert +1 412 434 7790 rschubert@rjslegal.com
v.
No Logo CORDELL C. SMITH, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space G. Adrian Barrett +1 212 612 9550
Space John G Butler, Jr. +1 256 534 1321 +1 256 534 8117 jgbutlerjr@bellsouth.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Dombroff & Gilmore

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark A. Dombroff +1 703 336 8700 +1 202 625 3150 mdombroff@dglitigators.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nixon Peabody LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Raymond L. Mariani +1 516 832 7500
No Logo ROLANDO VELASCO, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space G. Adrian Barrett +1 212 612 9550
Space John G Butler, Jr. +1 256 534 1321 +1 256 534 8117 jgbutlerjr@bellsouth.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Dombroff & Gilmore

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark A. Dombroff +1 703 336 8700 +1 202 625 3150 mdombroff@dglitigators.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nixon Peabody LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Raymond L. Mariani +1 516 832 7500
No Logo SUN PACIFIC, INC., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space G. Adrian Barrett +1 212 612 9550
Space John G Butler, Jr. +1 256 534 1321 +1 256 534 8117 jgbutlerjr@bellsouth.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Dombroff & Gilmore

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark A. Dombroff +1 703 336 8700 +1 202 625 3150 mdombroff@dglitigators.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nixon Peabody LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Raymond L. Mariani +1 516 832 7500
No Logo ALYSS KOVATCH, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Clapp, Desjardins & Ely, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas P. Desjardins +1 202 638 5300 +1 202 393 1725 dpd@cdelaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by rjslegal.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard J. Schubert +1 412 434 7790 rschubert@rjslegal.com
No Logo ANDREW SHEVITZ, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Clapp, Desjardins & Ely, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas P. Desjardins +1 202 638 5300 +1 202 393 1725 dpd@cdelaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by rjslegal.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard J. Schubert +1 412 434 7790 rschubert@rjslegal.com
No Logo ANDY SHEVITZ, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Clapp, Desjardins & Ely, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas P. Desjardins +1 202 638 5300 +1 202 393 1725 dpd@cdelaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by rjslegal.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard J. Schubert +1 412 434 7790 rschubert@rjslegal.com
No Logo ELLEN KATZ, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Clapp, Desjardins & Ely, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas P. Desjardins +1 202 638 5300 +1 202 393 1725 dpd@cdelaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by rjslegal.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard J. Schubert +1 412 434 7790 rschubert@rjslegal.com
No Logo ETHEL FRENCH, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Clapp, Desjardins & Ely, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas P. Desjardins +1 202 638 5300 +1 202 393 1725 dpd@cdelaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by rjslegal.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard J. Schubert +1 412 434 7790 rschubert@rjslegal.com
No Logo J. DANIEL RIDER, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Clapp, Desjardins & Ely, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas P. Desjardins +1 202 638 5300 +1 202 393 1725 dpd@cdelaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by rjslegal.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard J. Schubert +1 412 434 7790 rschubert@rjslegal.com
No Logo KIM SHEVITZ, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Clapp, Desjardins & Ely, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas P. Desjardins +1 202 638 5300 +1 202 393 1725 dpd@cdelaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by rjslegal.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard J. Schubert +1 412 434 7790 rschubert@rjslegal.com
No Logo LISA RIDER, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Clapp, Desjardins & Ely, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas P. Desjardins +1 202 638 5300 +1 202 393 1725 dpd@cdelaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by rjslegal.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard J. Schubert +1 412 434 7790 rschubert@rjslegal.com
No Logo MARY ELLEN SHEVITZ, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Clapp, Desjardins & Ely, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas P. Desjardins +1 202 638 5300 +1 202 393 1725 dpd@cdelaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by rjslegal.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard J. Schubert +1 412 434 7790 rschubert@rjslegal.com
No Logo MAURY KATZ, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Clapp, Desjardins & Ely, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas P. Desjardins +1 202 638 5300 +1 202 393 1725 dpd@cdelaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by rjslegal.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard J. Schubert +1 412 434 7790 rschubert@rjslegal.com
No Logo WILLIAM MCKINNEY, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Clapp, Desjardins & Ely, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas P. Desjardins +1 202 638 5300 +1 202 393 1725 dpd@cdelaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by rjslegal.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard J. Schubert +1 412 434 7790 rschubert@rjslegal.com
Office Pittsburgh
Filed 5/2/2000
Jury Demand Both
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 310 - Personal Injury: Airplane
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Notice of Removal-Personal Injury
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Allegheny
Terminated 12/18/2001
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Cases GD99-9170[Allegheny County], RELto CA 00-843[USDC W. of Pa.], RELto CA 00-844[USDC W. Dist of Pa.]
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, LEAD, MOTREF
  Entries (69) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 12/18/2001, Entered: 12/19/2001 Terminated Case
Case closed (aen)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 12/18/2001, Entered: 12/19/2001 Order
    ORDER upon motion granting [49-1] stipulation Dismissing case With Prejudice and with each party agreeing to pay for its own costs ( signed by Judge Robert J. Cindrich on 12/17/01 ) CM all parties of record. (aen)
      LREF
      Blank 49 Filed: 12/17/2001, Entered: 12/17/2001, Terminated: 12/18/2001 Stipulation of Dismissal
      Stipulation by TOM MCCAFFREY, JODY MCCAFFREY, JODY MCCAFFREY, JODY MCCAFFREY, JODY MCCAFFREY, MARTIN PESCE, CHILD EMBRAUGH, RON EMBAUGH, JEANNE MARAVICH, PETE MARAVICH, PETE MARAVICH, RANDY PORTERFIELD, DINA PORTERFIELD, GREG GONGAWARE, BRIAN ZAGORAC, CHERYL ZAGORAC, JAMES SANDERS, PEARJEAN SANDERS, SUN PACIFIC, INC., CORDELL C. SMITH, ROLANDO VELASCO, LISA RIDER, J. DANIEL RIDER, ANDY SHEVITZ, ANDREW SHEVITZ, KIM SHEVITZ, WILLIAM MCKINNEY, LORI MCKINNEY, ALYSS KOVATCH, MAURY KATZ, ELLEN KATZ, ETHEL FRENCH Dismissing case With Prejudice and with each party agreeing to pay for its own costs with proposed order. (aen)
        LREF
        Blank 48 Filed: 12/5/2001, Entered: 12/6/2001 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER denying [44-1] motion for Hearing to Enforce Settlement ( signed by Judge Robert J. Cindrich on 12/5/01 ) CM all parties of record. (aen)
          LREF
          Blank 47 Filed: 11/23/2001, Entered: 11/23/2001 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER, Motion Hearing set for 10:30 12/4/01 for [44-1] motion for Hearing to Enforce Settlement, set for 10:30 12/4/01 for [41-1] motion to Enforce Settlement ( signed by Mag. Judge Kenneth J. Benson on 11/23/01 ) CM all parties of record. (aen)
            LREF
            Blank 46 Filed: 11/23/2001, Entered: 11/23/2001, Terminated: 12/18/2001 Response to Motion
            RESPONSE by SUN PACIFIC, INC., CORDELL C. SMITH, ROLANDO VELASCO to [44-1] motion for Hearing to Enforce Settlement by TOM MCCAFFREY (aen)
              LREF
              Blank 45 Filed: 11/19/2001, Entered: 11/19/2001 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER referring motion to enforce settlement agreement to the Magistrate/.Judge Benson. ( signed by Judge Robert J. Cindrich on 11/16/01 ) CM all parties of record. (aen)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 11/19/2001, Entered: 11/19/2001 Motions Referred
                Motion(s) referred to Mag. Judge Kenneth J. Benson : [44-1] motion for Hearing to Enforce Settlement, [41-1] motion to Enforce Settlement (aen)
                  LREF
                  Blank 44 Filed: 11/16/2001, Entered: 11/16/2001, Terminated: 12/5/2001 Motion for Hearing
                  MOTION by Pltfs TOM MCCAFFREY etal for Hearing to Enforce Settlement (aen)
                    LREF
                    Blank 43 Filed: 10/5/2001, Entered: 10/5/2001, Terminated: 12/18/2001 Response to Motion
                    RESPONSE by SUN PACIFIC, INC., CORDELL C. SMITH, ROLANDO VELASCO in opposition to [41-1] motion to Enforce Settlement (jsp)
                      LREF
                      Blank 42 Filed: 9/27/2001, Entered: 9/27/2001 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                      Minute entry:, Response to Motion set to 10/5/01 for [41-1] motion to Enforce Settlement (aen)
                        LREF
                        Blank 41 Filed: 9/21/2001, Entered: 9/21/2001, Terminated: 12/18/2001 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                        PLTFS MOTION to Enforce Settlement with Proposed Order. (aen)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 8/22/2001, Entered: 8/23/2001 Order
                          ORDER upon motion granting [36-1] motion for Settlement and Dismissal on behalf of Derek Gongaware. The Court awards fees and expenses to R. Jack Clapp and Associates Co., L.P.A. in the amount of $382.06 and orders the balance of the fund ($617.94) to be paid to Greg Gongaware. ( signed by Judge Robert J. Cindrich on 8/20/01 ) CM all parties of record. (tt) Modified on 08/27/2001
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 8/22/2001, Entered: 8/23/2001 Order
                            ORDER upon motion granting [35-1] motion for Settlement and Dismissal on behalf of Rachel, Ryan and Robert Porterfield. The Court awards fees and expenses to R. Jack Clapp and Associates Co., L.P.A. in the amount of $1,146.19 and orders the balance of the fund ($1,853.81) be paid to Randy and Dina Porterfield. ( signed by Judge Robert J. Cindrich on 8/20/01 ) CM all parties of record. (tt)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 8/22/2001, Entered: 8/23/2001 Order
                              ORDER upon motion granting [34-1] motion for Settlement and Dismissal on behalf of Luke, Michael and Casey McCaffrey. The Court awards fees and expenses to R. Jack Clapp and Associates Co., L.P.A. in the amount of $1,146.19 and orders the balance of the fund ($1,853.81) be paid to Tom and Jody McCaffrey. ( signed by Judge Robert J. Cindrich on 8/20/01 ) CM all parties of record. (tt)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 8/22/2001, Entered: 8/23/2001 Order
                                ORDER upon motion granting [33-1] motion for Settlement and Dismissal on behalf of Alyssa, Brian Jr., and Austin Zagorac. The Court awards fees and expenses to R. Jack Clapp and Associates Co., L.P.A. in the amount of $1,146.19 and orders the balance of the fund ($1,853.81) be paid to Brian and Cheryl Zagorac. ( signed by Judge Robert J. Cindrich on 8/20/01 ) CM all parties of record. (tt)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 8/22/2001, Entered: 8/23/2001 Order
                                  ORDER upon motion granting [32-1] motion for Settlement and Dismissal on behalf of Drew, Zoe and Tara Shevitz. The Court awards fees and expenses to R. Jack Clapp and Associates Co., L.P.A. in the amount of $1,146.19 and order the balance of the fund ($1,853.81) be paid to Any and Mary Ellen Shevitz. ( signed by Judge Robert J. Cindrich on 8/20/01 ) CM all parties of record. (tt)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 8/22/2001, Entered: 8/23/2001 Order
                                    ORDER upon motion granting [31-1] motion for Settlement and Dismissal on behalf of Sheena and Portia Maravich. The Court awards fees and expenses to R. Jack Clapp and Associates Co., L.P.A. in the amount of $764.12 and order the balance of the fund ($1,235.88) to be paid to Pete and Jeanne Maravich. ( signed by Judge Robert J. Cindrich on 8/20/01 ) CM all parties of record. (tt)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 8/22/2001, Entered: 8/23/2001 Order
                                      ORDER upon motion granting [30-1] motion for Settlement and Dismissal on behalf of Paul and Jonathan Katz. The Court awards fees and expenses to R. Jack Clapp and Associates Co., L.P.A. in the amount of $764.12 and orders the balance of the fund ($1,235.88) be paid to Ellen and Maury Katz. ( signed by Judge Robert J. Cindrich on 8/20/01 ) CM all parties of record. (tt)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 8/22/2001, Entered: 8/22/2001 Order
                                        ORDER upon motion granting [40-1] motion for Settlement and Dismissal as to Lori McKinney. ( signed by Judge Robert J. Cindrich on 8/20/01 ) CM all parties of record. (aen)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 8/22/2001, Entered: 8/22/2001 Order
                                          ORDER upon motion granting [39-1] motion for Settlement and Dismissal as to Ron Embaugh, Jr. ( signed by Judge Robert J. Cindrich on 8/20/01 ) CM all parties of record. (aen)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 8/22/2001, Entered: 8/22/2001 Order
                                            ORDER upon motion granting [38-1] motion for Settlement and Dismissal on behalf of Ryan and Alison Rider. ( signed by Judge Robert J. Cindrich on 8/20/01 ) CM all parties of record. (aen)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 8/22/2001, Entered: 8/22/2001 Order
                                              ORDER upon motion granting [37-1] motion for Settlement and Dismissal as to James Roccio ( signed by Judge Robert J. Cindrich on 8/20/01 ) CM all parties of record. (aen)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 40 Filed: 8/16/2001, Entered: 8/17/2001 ~Motion for Settlement
                                                MOTION by LORI MCKINNEY for Settlement and Dismissal with Proposed Order. (aen)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 39 Filed: 8/16/2001, Entered: 8/17/2001 ~Motion for Settlement
                                                  MOTION by RON EMBAUGH for Settlement and Dismissal with Proposed Order. (aen)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 38 Filed: 8/16/2001, Entered: 8/17/2001 ~Motion for Settlement
                                                    MOTION by RYAN RIDER, ALLISON RIDER for Settlement and Dismissal with Proposed Order. (aen)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 37 Filed: 8/16/2001, Entered: 8/17/2001 ~Motion for Settlement
                                                      MOTION by JAMES ROCCIO for Settlement and Dismissal with Proposed Order. (aen)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 36 Filed: 8/16/2001, Entered: 8/17/2001 ~Motion for Settlement
                                                        MOTION by DEREK GONGAWARE for Settlement and Dismissal with Proposed Order. (aen)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 35 Filed: 8/16/2001, Entered: 8/17/2001 ~Motion for Settlement
                                                          MOTION by RACHAEL PORTERFIELD, ROBERT PORTERFIELD, RYAN PORTERFIELD for Settlement and Dismissal with Proposed Order. (aen)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 34 Filed: 8/16/2001, Entered: 8/17/2001 ~Motion for Settlement
                                                            MOTION by LUKE MCCAFFREY, MICHAEL MCCAFFREY, CASEY MCCAFFREY for Settlement and Dismissal with Proposed Order. (aen)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 33 Filed: 8/16/2001, Entered: 8/17/2001 ~Motion for Settlement
                                                              MOTION by ALYSSA ZAGORAC, BRIAN ZAGORAC JR., AUSTIN ZAGORAC for Settlement and Dismissal with Proposed Order. (aen)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 32 Filed: 8/16/2001, Entered: 8/17/2001 ~Motion for Settlement
                                                                MOTION by DREW SHEVITZ, ZOE SHEVITZ, TARA SHEVITZ for Settlement and Dismissal with Proposed Order. (aen)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 31 Filed: 8/16/2001, Entered: 8/17/2001 ~Motion for Settlement
                                                                  MOTION by SHEENA MARAVICH, PORTIA MARAVICH for Settlement and Dismissal with Proposed Order. (aen)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 30 Filed: 8/16/2001, Entered: 8/17/2001 ~Motion for Settlement
                                                                    MOTION by PAUL KATZ, JONATHAN KATZ for Settlement and Dismissal with Proposed Order. (aen)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 29 Filed: 6/11/2001, Entered: 6/11/2001 Settlement ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                      Settlement Conference held on 6/8/01 before Mag. Judge Kenneth J. Benson [ Reporter: None ] (aen)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 28 Filed: 5/11/2001, Entered: 5/14/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER, set Settlement Conference for 10:00 6/8/01 formal discovery is Stayed pending further order of Court ( signed by Mag. Judge Kenneth J. Benson on 5/11/01 ) CM all parties of record. (aen)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 27 Filed: 5/11/2001, Entered: 5/14/2001 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                          Status Conference held on 5/4/01 before Mag. Judge Kenneth J. Benson [ Reporter: None ] (aen)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 4/24/2001, Entered: 4/24/2001 Order
                                                                            ORDER upon motion granting [26-1] motion for Raymond L. Mariani, G. Adrian Barrett to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee $ 80.00 Receipt # 3062 ( signed by Judge Robert J. Cindrich on 4/24/01 ) CM all parties of record. (aen)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 26 Filed: 4/20/2001, Entered: 4/20/2001, Terminated: 4/24/2001 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                              MOTION by SUN PACIFIC, INC., CORDELL C. SMITH, ROLANDO VELASCO for Raymond L. Mariani, G. Adrian Barrett to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee $ 80.00 Receipt # 3062 with Proposed Order. (aen)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 25 Filed: 4/17/2001, Entered: 4/17/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER, set Status Conference for 10:00 5/4/01 ( signed by Mag. Judge Kenneth J. Benson on 4/17/01 ) CM all parties of record. (aen)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 24 Filed: 4/17/2001, Entered: 4/17/2001 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                  Status Conference held on 4/17/01 before Mag. Judge Kenneth J. Benson [ Reporter: None ] (aen)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 23 Filed: 4/5/2001, Entered: 4/5/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER, set Status Conference for 9:30 4/17/01 ( signed by Mag. Judge Kenneth J. Benson on 4/5/01 ) CM all parties of record. (aen)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 4/5/2001, Entered: 4/5/2001 Order
                                                                                      ORDER upon motion granting [22-1] motion to Extend Time, reset Discovery deadline to 6/1/01 ( signed by Mag. Judge Kenneth J. Benson on 4/4/01 ) CM all parties of record. (aen)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 22 Filed: 3/27/2001, Entered: 3/27/2001, Terminated: 4/5/2001 Motion to Extend Time
                                                                                        MOTION by SUN PACIFIC, INC., CORDELL C. SMITH, ROLANDO VELASCO to Extend Time with Proposed Order. (aen)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 21 Filed: 12/4/2000, Entered: 12/4/2000 Order Referring Case to ArbitrationCourt Filing
                                                                                          ORDER referring case to arbitration. Discovery Closes and Arbitrator Selection Form Due on 4/2/01 Plaintiffs Pretrial Statement due 4/12/01 . Defendants Pretrial Statement due 4/23/01 . ( signed by Mag. Judge Kenneth J. Benson on 12/4/00 ) CM all parties of record. (aen)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 20 Filed: 10/5/2000, Entered: 10/5/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER denying [11-1] motion to Remand, granting [6-1] motion to Consolidate Cases CA 00-843 and 00-844 CA, adopting [17-1] report and recommendations and this case is the lead case all pleadings are to be filed at this case,and Close 00-843 and 00-844. ( signed by Judge Robert J. Cindrich on 10/2/00 ) CM all parties of record. (aen) Modified on 10/10/2000
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 10/5/2000, Entered: 10/5/2000 Consolidated Member Case Flag
                                                                                              Consolidated Lead Case (aen)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 19 Filed: 9/13/2000, Entered: 9/13/2000 Objections to Report and Recommendation
                                                                                                OBJECTION by SUN PACIFIC, INC., CORDELL C. SMITH, ROLANDO VELASCO to [17-1] report and recommendations (aen)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 18 Filed: 8/29/2000, Entered: 8/29/2000 Objections to Report and Recommendation
                                                                                                  OBJECTIONS by TOM MCCAFFREY, JODY MCCAFFREY, LUKE MCCAFFREY, JODY MCCAFFREY, MICHAEL MCCAFFREY, JODY MCCAFFREY, CASEY MCCAFFREY, JODY MCCAFFREY, MARTIN PESCE, RON EMBAUGH, CHILD EMBRAUGH, RON EMBAUGH, PETE MARAVICH, JEANNE MARAVICH, SHEENA MARAVICH, PETE MARAVICH, PORTIA MARAVICH, RANDY PORTERFIELD, DINA PORTERFIELD, RACHAEL PORTERFIELD, ROBERT PORTERFIELD, RYAN PORTERFIELD, GREG GONGAWARE, DEREK GONGAWARE, BRIAN ZAGORAC, CHERYL ZAGORAC, ALYSSA ZAGORAC, BRIAN ZAGORAC JR., AUSTIN ZAGORAC, JAMES SANDERS, PEARJEAN SANDERS, JAMES ROCCIO to [17-1] report and recommendation (tt)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 17 Filed: 8/10/2000, Entered: 8/10/2000 Report and RecommendationCourt Filing
                                                                                                    REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of Mag. Judge Kenneth J. Benson signed on 8/10/00 Recommending that [11-1] motion to Remand be denied, [6-1] motion to Consolidate Cases CA 00-843 and 00-844 CA be granted ; The parties have 10 days from the date of service to file objections to this Report and Recommendation. (aen)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 16 Filed: 6/15/2000, Entered: 6/15/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER on motion practice ( signed by Judge Robert J. Cindrich on 6/14/00 ) CM all parties of record. (aen)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 15 Filed: 6/15/2000, Entered: 6/15/2000, Terminated: 12/18/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                        RESPONSE by SUN PACIFIC, INC., CORDELL C. SMITH, ROLANDO VELASCO to [11-1] motion to Remand by JAMES ROCCIO, PEARJEAN SANDERS, JAMES SANDERS, AUSTIN ZAGORAC, BRIAN ZAGORAC JR., ALYSSA ZAGORAC, CHERYL ZAGORAC, BRIAN ZAGORAC, DEREK GONGAWARE, GREG GONGAWARE, RYAN PORTERFIELD, ROBERT PORTERFIELD, RACHAEL PORTERFIELD, DINA PORTERFIELD, RANDY PORTERFIELD, PORTIA MARAVICH, PETE MARAVICH, SHEENA MARAVICH, JEANNE MARAVICH, PETE MARAVICH, RON EMBAUGH, CHILD EMBRAUGH, RON EMBAUGH, MARTIN PESCE, JODY MCCAFFREY, CASEY MCCAFFREY, JODY MCCAFFREY, MICHAEL MCCAFFREY, JODY MCCAFFREY, LUKE MCCAFFREY, JODY MCCAFFREY, TOM MCCAFFREY (aen)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 6/15/2000, Entered: 6/15/2000 Order
                                                                                                          ORDER upon motion granting [13-1] motion for John G. Butler III and Mark A. Dombroff, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee $ 80.00 Receipt # 6919 ( signed by Judge Robert J. Cindrich on 6/15/00 ) CM all parties of record. (aen)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 6/15/2000, Entered: 6/15/2000, Terminated: 12/18/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                            RESPONSE by SUN PACIFIC, INC., CORDELL C. SMITH, ROLANDO VELASCO in opposition to [6-1] motion to Consolidate Cases CA 00-843 and 00-844 CA by ROLANDO VELASCO, CORDELL C. SMITH, SUN PACIFIC, INC. ( With Doc # 15 ) (aen)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 14 Filed: 6/14/2000, Entered: 6/14/2000 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                              NOTICE of Change of Address filed by Douglas P. Desjardins, Esq. (aen)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 13 Filed: 6/12/2000, Entered: 6/12/2000, Terminated: 6/15/2000 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                MOTION by SUN PACIFIC, INC., CORDELL C. SMITH, ROLANDO VELASCO for John G. Butler III and Mark A. Dombroff, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee $ 80.00 Receipt # 6919 with Proposed Order. (aen)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 12 Filed: 6/12/2000, Entered: 6/12/2000 Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                  DISCLOSURE statement by SUN PACIFIC, INC., CORDELL C. SMITH, ROLANDO VELASCO (aen)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 11 Filed: 5/31/2000, Entered: 5/31/2000, Terminated: 10/5/2000 Motion to Remand
                                                                                                                    MOTION with Brief in Support by TOM MCCAFFREY, JODY MCCAFFREY, LUKE MCCAFFREY, JODY MCCAFFREY, MICHAEL MCCAFFREY, JODY MCCAFFREY, CASEY MCCAFFREY, JODY MCCAFFREY, MARTIN PESCE, RON EMBAUGH, CHILD EMBRAUGH, RON EMBAUGH, PETE MARAVICH, JEANNE MARAVICH, SHEENA MARAVICH, PETE MARAVICH, PORTIA MARAVICH, RANDY PORTERFIELD, DINA PORTERFIELD, RACHAEL PORTERFIELD, ROBERT PORTERFIELD, RYAN PORTERFIELD, GREG GONGAWARE, DEREK GONGAWARE, BRIAN ZAGORAC, CHERYL ZAGORAC, ALYSSA ZAGORAC, BRIAN ZAGORAC JR., AUSTIN ZAGORAC, JAMES SANDERS, PEARJEAN SANDERS, JAMES ROCCIO to Remand (aen)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 10 Filed: 5/31/2000, Entered: 5/31/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for TOM MCCAFFREY, JODY MCCAFFREY, LUKE MCCAFFREY, JODY MCCAFFREY, MICHAEL MCCAFFREY, JODY MCCAFFREY, CASEY MCCAFFREY, JODY MCCAFFREY, MARTIN PESCE, RON EMBAUGH, CHILD EMBRAUGH, RON EMBAUGH, PETE MARAVICH, JEANNE MARAVICH, SHEENA MARAVICH, PETE MARAVICH, PORTIA MARAVICH, RANDY PORTERFIELD, DINA PORTERFIELD, RACHAEL PORTERFIELD, ROBERT PORTERFIELD, RYAN PORTERFIELD, GREG GONGAWARE, DEREK GONGAWARE, BRIAN ZAGORAC, CHERYL ZAGORAC, ALYSSA ZAGORAC, BRIAN ZAGORAC JR., AUSTIN ZAGORAC, JAMES SANDERS, PEARJEAN SANDERS, JAMES ROCCIO by Richard J. Schubert (aen)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 5/31/2000, Entered: 5/31/2000, Terminated: 12/18/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by TOM MCCAFFREY, JODY MCCAFFREY, LUKE MCCAFFREY, JODY MCCAFFREY, MICHAEL MCCAFFREY, JODY MCCAFFREY, CASEY MCCAFFREY, JODY MCCAFFREY, MARTIN PESCE, RON EMBAUGH, CHILD EMBRAUGH, RON EMBAUGH, PETE MARAVICH, JEANNE MARAVICH, SHEENA MARAVICH, PETE MARAVICH, PORTIA MARAVICH, RANDY PORTERFIELD, DINA PORTERFIELD, RACHAEL PORTERFIELD, ROBERT PORTERFIELD, RYAN PORTERFIELD, GREG GONGAWARE, DEREK GONGAWARE, BRIAN ZAGORAC, CHERYL ZAGORAC, ALYSSA ZAGORAC, BRIAN ZAGORAC JR., AUSTIN ZAGORAC, JAMES SANDERS, PEARJEAN SANDERS, JAMES ROCCIO in opposition to [6-1] motion to Consolidate Cases CA 00-843 and 00-844 CA by ROLANDO VELASCO, CORDELL C. SMITH, SUN PACIFIC, INC. ( With Doc # 11 ) (aen)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 9 Filed: 5/18/2000, Entered: 5/18/2000 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                          Minute entry:, Response to Motion set to 5/31/00 for [6-1] motion to Consolidate Cases CA 00-843 and 00-844 CA (aen)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 8 Filed: 5/12/2000, Entered: 5/12/2000 Notice of Removal
                                                                                                                            AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SUN PACIFIC, INC., CORDELL C. SMITH, ROLANDO VELASCO from Court of Common Pleas of County with copy of complaint and exhibits (aen)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 7 Filed: 5/10/2000, Entered: 5/10/2000 Brief in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                              BRIEF by SUN PACIFIC, INC., CORDELL C. SMITH, ROLANDO VELASCO in support of [6-1] motion to Consolidate Cases CA 00-843 and 00-844 CA by ROLANDO VELASCO, CORDELL C. SMITH, SUN PACIFIC, INC. ( Filed this Number ) (aen)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 6 Filed: 5/10/2000, Entered: 5/10/2000, Terminated: 10/5/2000 Motion to Consolidate Cases
                                                                                                                                MOTION by SUN PACIFIC, INC., CORDELL C. SMITH, ROLANDO VELASCO to Consolidate Cases CA 00-843 and 00-844 CA with Proposed Order. ( Filed this Number ) (aen)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 5/8/2000, Entered: 5/9/2000 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mag. Judge Kenneth J. Benson for pretrial procedures. ( signed by Judge Robert J. Cindrich on 5/8/00 ) CM all parties of record. (aen)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 5/4/2000, Entered: 5/4/2000 Answer
                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to Complaint by ROLANDO VELASCO (aen)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 5/4/2000, Entered: 5/4/2000 Answer
                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint by CORDELL C. SMITH (aen)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 5/4/2000, Entered: 5/4/2000 Answer
                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Complaint by SUN PACIFIC, INC. Jury demand (aen)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 5/2/2000, Entered: 5/2/2000 Notice of Removal
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SUN PACIFIC, INC., CORDELL C. SMITH, ROLANDO VELASCO from Court of Common Pleas of Allegheny County; jury demand with copy of Complaint attached. FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 5878 (aen)
                                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 224 times.

                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?