Elf Transportation v. Carolina Casualty
Federal Civil Lawsuit Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:01-cv-01002-EHC
District Judge Earl H. Carroll, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Elf Transportation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Richard A Dillenburg PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Anthony Dillenburg +1 480 668 1924 +1 480 831 7438 rich@dillenburglaw.com
v.
No Logo Carolina Casualty Insurance Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Schneider & Onofry PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cody Maryl Hall +1 602 200 1289 +1 602 230 8985 minute-entries@soarizonalaw.com
Office Phoenix Division
Filed 6/6/2001
Jury Demand Both
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 110 - Contract - Insurance
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Maricopa
Terminated 3/11/2002
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case CV2001-090202[Sup Ct Maricopa]
Def Custody Status
Flags STD, TERMED
  Entries (28) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 27 Filed: 3/11/2002, Entered: 3/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER by Judge Earl H. Carroll granting stipulation by all parties to dismiss case with prejudice (cc: all counsel) (former emp)
    LREF
    Blank 26 Filed: 3/7/2002, Entered: 3/8/2002 Stipulation
    STIPULATION by all parties to dismiss case with prejudice (former emp)
      LREF
      Blank 25 Filed: 11/19/2001, Entered: 11/20/2001 Other Notice
      NOTICE of service of initial disclosure statement pursuant to FRCivP 26(a) by pla Elf Transportation (former emp)
        LREF
        Blank 24 Filed: 10/22/2001, Entered: 10/22/2001 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER by Judge Earl H. Carroll denying motion to remand this matter to the Maricopa County Superior Court by pla Elf Transportation [8-1] (cc: all counsel) (former emp)
          LREF
          Blank 23 Filed: 10/22/2001, Entered: 10/22/2001 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER by Judge Earl H. Carroll ; jury trial set for 9:00 5/21/02 ; Pretrial conference set for 9:00 5/13/02 ; PTO set for 5/6/02 ; discovery ddl set for 2/28/02 (cc: all counsel) (former emp)
            LREF
            Blank 20 Filed: 10/15/2001, Entered: 10/15/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
            MINUTE ENTRY before Judge Earl H. Carroll . Crt Rptr: BBrittan. Scheduling conference held. Parties submit pla's motion to remand [8] on the pleadings. The Court suggests the parties consider participating in a settlement conference. ] [20-2] (BAH)
              LREF
              Blank 22 Filed: 10/12/2001, Entered: 10/15/2001 Other Notice
              NOTICE by dft Carolina Casualty of non-party at fault, The Leavitt Group, Great Way-Leavitt Ins Agency, 2505 S State Street, PO Box 65602, Salt Lake City, Utah 84115, 801-488-0097 (former emp)
                LREF
                Blank 19 Filed: 10/12/2001, Entered: 10/12/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER by Judge Earl H. Carroll ; show cause hearing set for 10/29/01 is vacated (cc: all counsel) (DMT)
                  LREF
                  Blank 21 Filed: 10/11/2001, Entered: 10/15/2001 Report re: Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
                  JOINT CASE MGT REPORT: joint pretrial order ddl 10/1/02; discovery cutoff 7/15/02; dispositive motions filing ddl is 8/15/02 (former emp)
                    LREF
                    Blank 18 Filed: 9/21/2001, Entered: 9/21/2001 Minute Order - Miscellaneous
                    MINUTE ORDER In light of the parties failure to appear at the Pretrial Conference on September 10, 2001, and their failure to file a Pretrial Statement as set forth in the Scheduling Order of January 30, 2001, IT IS ORDERED that an Order to Show Cause Hearing as to why this matter should not be dismissed or sanctions imposed is scheduled for Monday, October 29, 2001 at 1:30 p.m. (cc: all counsel) [18-2] (TCA)
                      LREF
                      Blank 17 Filed: 9/18/2001, Entered: 9/19/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                      REPLY by pla Elf Transportation to response to motion to remand this matter to the Maricopa County Superior Court by pla Elf Transportation [8-1] (former emp)
                        LREF
                        Blank 16 Filed: 9/17/2001, Entered: 9/17/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER by Judge Earl H. Carroll: granting stipulation to extend time until 9/10/01 for filing dft's response to motion to remand by dft Carolina Casualty (cc: all counsel) (former emp)
                          LREF
                          Blank 14 Filed: 9/12/2001, Entered: 9/13/2001 Stipulation
                          STIPULATION to extend time until 9/10/01 for filing dft's response to pla's motion to remand by dft Carolina Casualty (document not attached) (former emp) Modified on 09/13/2001
                            LREF
                            Blank 15 Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: 9/13/2001 Other Notice
                            NOTICE of service of discovery by dft Carolina Casualty . (former emp)
                              LREF
                              Blank 13 Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: 9/13/2001 Response to Motion
                              RESPONSE by dft Carolina Casualty to motion to remand this matter to the Maricopa County Superior Court by pla Elf Transportation [8-1] (former emp)
                                LREF
                                Blank 12 Filed: 8/24/2001, Entered: 8/27/2001 Other Notice
                                NOTICE by pla Elf Transportation of service of offer of judgment (former emp)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 11 Filed: 8/24/2001, Entered: 8/27/2001 Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment
                                  OFFER OF JUDGMENT of $65,000 plus costs accrued to date of acceptance of this offer, plus and additional sum of $9,500 for attorneys's fees filed by pla Elf Transportation (former emp)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 10 Filed: 7/23/2001, Entered: 7/24/2001 Other Notice
                                    NOTICE by pla Elf Transportation of issuance of subpoena duces tecum being issued to Burns and Wilcox requesting production of documents (former emp)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 9 Filed: 7/5/2001, Entered: 7/5/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER by Judge Earl H. Carroll ; prel scheduling conf set for 9:30 10/15/01 ; parties to meet at least 14 days before the conference in accordance with Rule 26(f) Fed.R.Civ.P. (cc: all counsel) (former emp)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 8 Filed: 7/3/2001, Entered: 7/5/2001, Terminated: 10/22/2001 Motion to Remand
                                        MOTION to remand this matter to the Maricopa County Superior Court by pla Elf Transportation [8-1] (former emp)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 7 Filed: 6/27/2001, Entered: 6/28/2001 Other Notice
                                          NOTICE of service of discovery by dft Carolina Casualty . (former emp)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 6 Filed: 6/26/2001, Entered: 6/26/2001 Minute Order - Miscellaneous
                                            MINUTE ORDER a notice of withdrawal from arbitration having been received, counsel/parties are advised that this case is returned to the regular civil docket of the Hon. Earl H. Carroll for all further proceedings. (cc: all counsel/EHC/BH) [6-1] re: order (minute) [6-1] (MAP)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 6/22/2001, Entered: 6/26/2001 Miscellaneous Document
                                              NOTICE of removal from Arbitration (MAP)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 5 Filed: 6/14/2001, Entered: 6/14/2001 ADR-Miscellaneous
                                                NOTICE: this case referred to Arbitration; removal from arbitration due 7/5/01 (cc: all counsel/EHC/BH) (MAP)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 6/11/2001, Entered: 6/12/2001 Jury Demand
                                                  DEMAND for jury trial by pla Elf Transportation (former emp)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 6/7/2001, Entered: 6/7/2001 Answer
                                                    ANSWER to [1-2] by dft Carolina Casualty; jury demand (LSP)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 6/6/2001, Entered: 6/7/2001 Jury Demand
                                                      DEMAND for jury trial by dft Carolina Casualty (former emp)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 6/6/2001, Entered: 6/7/2001 ADR-Miscellaneous
                                                        NOTICE of removal from Maricopa County Superior Court; Court Number: CV2001-090202. Considered for possible arbitration. (Summons/Complaint) (LSP)
                                                          LREF

                                                          Statistics

                                                          This case has been viewed 75 times.

                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                          Space
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                           
                                                          PlainSite
                                                          Sign Up
                                                          Need Password Help?