RIDER, et al v. SUN PACIFIC, INC., et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Pennsylvania Western District Court, Case No. 2:00-cv-00843-RJC-KJB

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ALLISON RIDER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Clapp, Desjardins & Ely, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas P. Desjardins +1 202 638 5300 +1 202 393 1725 dpd@cdelaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by rjslegal.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard J. Schubert +1 412 434 7790 rschubert@rjslegal.com
No Logo J. DANIEL RIDER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Clapp, Desjardins & Ely, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas P. Desjardins +1 202 638 5300 +1 202 393 1725 dpd@cdelaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by rjslegal.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard J. Schubert +1 412 434 7790 rschubert@rjslegal.com
No Logo LISA RIDER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Clapp, Desjardins & Ely, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas P. Desjardins +1 202 638 5300 +1 202 393 1725 dpd@cdelaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by rjslegal.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard J. Schubert +1 412 434 7790 rschubert@rjslegal.com
No Logo RYAN RIDER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Clapp, Desjardins & Ely, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas P. Desjardins +1 202 638 5300 +1 202 393 1725 dpd@cdelaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by rjslegal.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard J. Schubert +1 412 434 7790 rschubert@rjslegal.com
v.
No Logo CORDELL C. SMITH, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John G Butler, Jr. +1 256 534 1321 +1 256 534 8117 jgbutlerjr@bellsouth.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Dombroff & Gilmore

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark A. Dombroff +1 703 336 8700 +1 202 625 3150 mdombroff@dglitigators.com
No Logo ROLANDO VELASCO, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John G Butler, Jr. +1 256 534 1321 +1 256 534 8117 jgbutlerjr@bellsouth.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Dombroff & Gilmore

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark A. Dombroff +1 703 336 8700 +1 202 625 3150 mdombroff@dglitigators.com
No Logo SUN PACIFIC, INC., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John G Butler, Jr. +1 256 534 1321 +1 256 534 8117 jgbutlerjr@bellsouth.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Dombroff & Gilmore

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark A. Dombroff +1 703 336 8700 +1 202 625 3150 mdombroff@dglitigators.com
Office Pittsburgh
Filed 5/2/2000
Jury Demand Both
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 310 - Personal Injury: Airplane
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Notice of Removal-Personal Injury
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Statistical Closing
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated 10/5/2000
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Cases 2:00-cc-00844[Related], 2:00-cv-00842[Consolidated], GD99-9172[Allegheny County]
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, MAG
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 14 Filed: 10/5/2000, Entered: 10/5/2000 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER denying [9-1] motion to Remand, denying [9-2] motion In Opposition to Consolidation, granting [0-1] motion to Consolidate Cases CA 00-842 and CA 00-844, adopting [13-1] report and recommendations and this case is Consolidated with CA 00-842 and this case CA 00-843 is closed. ( signed by Judge Robert J. Cindrich on 10/2/00 ) CM all parties of record. (aen)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 10/5/2000, Entered: 10/5/2000 Consolidated Member Case Flag
    Consolidated Member Case . Lead Case Number: 2cv00 842 (aen)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 10/5/2000, Entered: 10/5/2000 Terminated Case
      Case closed (aen)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 9/13/2000, Entered: 9/13/2000 Objections to Report and Recommendation
        OBJECTION by SUN PACIFIC, INC., CORDELL C. SMITH, ROLANDO VELASCO to [13-1] report and recommendations ( Filed at CA 00-842 ) (aen)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 8/29/2000, Entered: 8/29/2000 Objections to Report and Recommendation
          OBJECTIONS by LISA RIDER, J. DANIEL RIDER, RYAN RIDER, ALLISON RIDER to [13-1] report and recommendation. (filed at 2:00-cv-842) (tt)
            LREF
            Blank 13 Filed: 8/10/2000, Entered: 8/10/2000 Report and RecommendationCourt Filing
            REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of Mag. Judge Kenneth J. Benson signed on 8/10/00 Recommending that [9-1] motion to Remand be denied ; The parties have 10 days from the date of service to file objections to this Report and Recommendation. (ces)
              LREF
              Blank 12 Filed: 6/15/2000, Entered: 6/15/2000 Brief in Opposition to Motion
              BRIEF by SUN PACIFIC, INC., CORDELL C. SMITH, ROLANDO VELASCO in opposition to [9-1] motion to Remand by ALLISON RIDER, RYAN RIDER, J. DANIEL RIDER, LISA RIDER, [9-2] motion In Opposition to Consolidation by ALLISON RIDER, RYAN RIDER, J. DANIEL RIDER, LISA RIDER (ces)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 6/15/2000, Entered: 6/16/2000 Order
                ORDER upon motion granting [11-1] motion for Mark A. Dombroff, Esq. and John G. Butler, III, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee $ 240.00 Receipt # 00006919 ( signed by Judge Robert J. Cindrich on 6/15/00 ) CM all parties of record. (plh)
                  LREF
                  Blank 11 Filed: 6/12/2000, Entered: 6/12/2000, Terminated: 6/15/2000 motion to appear pro hac vice
                  MOTION by SUN PACIFIC, INC., CORDELL C. SMITH, ROLANDO VELASCO for Mark A. Dombroff, Esq. and John G. Butler, III, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee $ 240.00 Receipt # 00006919 with Proposed Order. (ces)
                    LREF
                    Blank 10 Filed: 6/12/2000, Entered: 6/12/2000 Disclosure Statement
                    DISCLOSURE statement by SUN PACIFIC, INC., CORDELL C. SMITH, ROLANDO VELASCO (ces)
                      LREF
                      Blank 9 Filed: 5/31/2000, Entered: 6/1/2000, Terminated: 10/5/2000 Motion to Remand
                      MOTION with Brief in Support by LISA RIDER, J. DANIEL RIDER, RYAN RIDER, ALLISON RIDER to Remand , and In Opposition to Consolidation with proposed order (ces)
                        LREF
                        Blank 8 Filed: 5/31/2000, Entered: 6/1/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for LISA RIDER, J. DANIEL RIDER, RYAN RIDER, ALLISON RIDER by Richard J. Schubert (ces)
                          LREF
                          Blank 7 Filed: 5/18/2000, Entered: 5/18/2000 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                          NOTICE: Response to Motion set to 5/31/00 for [0-1] Motion to Consolidate Cases CA 00-842 and CA 00-844 (emc)
                            LREF
                            Blank 6 Filed: 5/12/2000, Entered: 5/12/2000 Notice of Removal
                            AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SUN PACIFIC, INC., CORDELL C. SMITH, ROLANDO VELASCO from Court of Common Pleas of Allegheny County with copies of Praecipe for Writ of Summons and Complaint attached. (ces)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 5/10/2000, Entered: 5/10/2000 Brief in Support of Motion
                              BRIEF by SUN PACIFIC, INC., CORDELL C. SMITH, ROLANDO VELASCO in support of [0-1] motion to Consolidate Cases CA 00-842 and CA 00-844 by ROLANDO VELASCO, CORDELL C. SMITH, SUN PACIFIC, INC. ( filed at CA 00-842 ) (aen)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 5/10/2000, Entered: 5/10/2000, Terminated: 10/5/2000 Motion to Consolidate Cases
                                MOTION by SUN PACIFIC, INC., CORDELL C. SMITH, ROLANDO VELASCO to Consolidate Cases CA 00-842 and CA 00-844 with Proposed Order. ( Filed at CA 00-842 ) (aen)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 5 Filed: 5/8/2000, Entered: 5/9/2000 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                  ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mag. Judge Kenneth J. Benson for all pretrial proceedings. ( signed by Judge Robert J. Cindrich on 5/8/00 ) CM all parties of record. (aen)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 4 Filed: 5/4/2000, Entered: 5/4/2000 Answer
                                    ANSWER to Complaint by SUN PACIFIC, INC. (ces)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 3 Filed: 5/4/2000, Entered: 5/4/2000 Answer
                                      ANSWER to Complaint by CORDELL C. SMITH (ces)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 2 Filed: 5/4/2000, Entered: 5/4/2000 Answer
                                        ANSWER to Complaint by ROLANDO VELASCO (ces)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 1 Filed: 5/2/2000, Entered: 5/3/2000 Notice of Removal
                                          NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SUN PACIFIC, INC., CORDELL C. SMITH, ROLANDO VELASCO from Court of Common Pleas of Allegheny County; jury demand with copies of Praecipe for Writ of Summons and Complaint attached. FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 5879 (ces)
                                            LREF

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 84 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?