SHELLEBY v. MCDONNELL DOUGLAS CO, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Pennsylvania Western District Court, Case No. 2:00-cv-01654-DEZ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo JAMES SHELLEBY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by crfwlaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven E. Riley, Jr. +1 814 453 3343 +1 814 455 1572 triley@crfwlaw.com
v.
No Logo Bae Systems Plc, Defendant
Unknown Role, Bae Systems, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Knight, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Randal Robert Craft +1 212 513 3200
Space DAVID J. HARRINGTON +1 212 513 3200 +1 212 385 9010 david.harrington@hklaw.com
The Boeing Company, Inc. The Boeing Company, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "BOEING COMPANY"

Toggle Switch Represented by Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edwin L. Klett +3922 392 392 2178 edwin.klett@bipc.com
Space W. Gregory Rhodes +1 412 392 2000 gregory.rhodes@bipc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard C. Coyle +1 206 583 8888
Space G. Josiah Silvernale, III +1 206 583 8888
Space Eric C. Strain +1 206 583 8888
No Logo British Aerospace Plc, Defendant
No Logo DOES 1-100, Defendant
No Logo Hughes Training, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Meyer, Darragh, Buckler, Bebenek & Eck, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eric N. Anderson +1 412 261 6600 +1 412 471 2754 eanderson@mdbbe.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Meyer, Unkovic & Scott

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anthony DiTommaso +1 412 456 2800
Space Michael Yablonski +1 412 456 2894 +1 412 456 2864 my@muslaw.com
No Logo L-3 Communications Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Wile +1 412 391 3434

Toggle Switch Represented by Hughes Hubbard & Reed LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ned Henry Bassen +1 212 837 6000 +1 212 299 6090 bassen@hugheshubbard.com
Space Charles W. Cohen +1 212 837 6000 +1 212 299 6856 cohen@hugheshubbard.com
Space Robb W. Patryk +1 212 837 6000 +1 212 422 4726 patryk@hugheshubbard.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles I. Cohen +1 202 887 0855
No Logo L-3 COMMUNICATIONS HOLDING, INC., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Wile +1 412 391 3434

Toggle Switch Represented by Hughes Hubbard & Reed LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ned Henry Bassen +1 212 837 6000 +1 212 299 6090 bassen@hugheshubbard.com
Space Charles W. Cohen +1 212 837 6000 +1 212 299 6856 cohen@hugheshubbard.com
Space Robb W. Patryk +1 212 837 6000 +1 212 422 4726 patryk@hugheshubbard.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles I. Cohen +1 202 887 0855
No Logo McDonnell Douglas Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edwin L. Klett +3922 392 392 2178 edwin.klett@bipc.com
Space W. Gregory Rhodes +1 412 392 2000 gregory.rhodes@bipc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard C. Coyle +1 206 583 8888
Space G. Josiah Silvernale, III +1 206 583 8888
Space Eric C. Strain +1 206 583 8888
Raytheon Company Raytheon Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "RAYTHEON TRAINING, INC."

Toggle Switch Represented by Meyer, Darragh, Buckler, Bebenek & Eck, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eric N. Anderson +1 412 261 6600 +1 412 471 2754 eanderson@mdbbe.com
Space Eric N. Anderson +1 412 261 6600 +1 412 471 2754 eanderson@mdbbe.com
No Logo Raytheon Systems Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Meyer, Darragh, Buckler, Bebenek & Eck, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eric N. Anderson +1 412 261 6600 +1 412 471 2754 eanderson@mdbbe.com
Office Pittsburgh
Filed 8/18/2000
Jury Demand Both
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 365 - Personal Injury: Product Liability
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Butler
Terminated 10/3/2001
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (46) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 39 Filed: 1/25/2002, Entered: 1/28/2002 Stipulation of Dismissal
Stipulation by JAMES SHELLEBY, BOEING COMPANY, BAE SYSTEMS PLC, L-3 COMMUNICATIONS CORP. for dismissal with prejudice , with proposed order. (tt)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 1/25/2002, Entered: 1/28/2002 Terminated Case
    Case closed (tt)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 1/25/2002, Entered: 1/28/2002 Order
      ORDER upon stipulation granting [39-1] stipulation for dismissal with prejudice. ( signed by Judge Donald E. Ziegler on 1/25/02 ) CM all parties of record. (tt)
        LREF
        Blank 38 Filed: 10/3/2001, Entered: 10/3/2001 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER, it appearing to ct. that parties have agreed to amicable resolution of matter, that Clerk mark case closed. ( signed by Judge Donald E. Ziegler on 10/2/01 ) CM all parties of record. (ces)
          LREF
          Blank 37 Filed: 9/19/2001, Entered: 9/20/2001 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER denying [35-1] motion for Expedited Extension of Time to Respond to Defts' Joint Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Motion to Strike Jury Demand ( signed by Judge Donald E. Ziegler on 9/19/01 ) CM all parties of record. (ces)
            LREF
            Blank 36 Filed: 9/18/2001, Entered: 9/19/2001 Response to Motion
            JOINT EXPEDITED RESPONSE by MCDONNELL DOUGLAS CO, BOEING COMPANY, BRITISH AEROSPACE PL, BAE SYSTEMS PLC, HUGHES TRAINING, INC, RAYTHEON TRAINING, I, RAYTHEON SYSTEMS COM, RAYTHEON COMPANY, L-3 COMMUNICATIONS C, L-3 COMMUNICATIONS H in opposition to [35-1] motion for Expedited Extension of Time to Respond to Defts' Joint Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Motion to Strike Jury Demand by JAMES SHELLEBY (jsp)
              LREF
              Blank 35 Filed: 9/17/2001, Entered: 9/17/2001, Terminated: 9/19/2001 Motion to Extend Time
              MOTION by JAMES SHELLEBY for Expedited Extension of Time to Respond to Defts' Joint Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Motion to Strike Jury Demand . (ces) Modified on 09/17/2001
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 9/17/2001, Entered: 9/17/2001 Remark
                Proposed order received (ces)
                  LREF
                  Blank 34 Filed: 8/29/2001, Entered: 8/29/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER, Response to Motion set to 9/29/01 for [33-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment, set to 9/29/01 for [33-2] motion to Strike Jury Demand ( signed by Judge Donald E. Ziegler on 8/29/01 ) CM all parties of record. (ces)
                    LREF
                    Blank 33 Filed: 8/23/2001, Entered: 8/24/2001 Motion for Summary Judgment
                    JOINT MOTION by MCDONNELL DOUGLAS CO, BOEING COMPANY, BRITISH AEROSPACE PL, BAE SYSTEMS PLC, HUGHES TRAINING, INC, RAYTHEON TRAINING, I, RAYTHEON SYSTEMS COM, RAYTHEON COMPANY, L-3 COMMUNICATIONS C, L-3 COMMUNICATIONS H, DOES 1-100 for Partial Summary Judgment , and to Strike Jury Demand with Proposed Order. (ces)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 5/17/2001, Entered: 5/17/2001 Order
                      ORDER upon motion granting [32-1] motion for Randal R. Craft, Jr., Esq. and David J. Harrington, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee $ 80.00 Receipt # 3475 ( signed by Judge Donald E. Ziegler on 5/17/01 ) CM all parties of record. (ces)
                        LREF
                        Blank 32 Filed: 5/15/2001, Entered: 5/16/2001 motion to appear pro hac vice
                        MOTION by BAE SYSTEMS PLC for Randal R. Craft, Jr., Esq. and David J. Harrington, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee $ 80.00 Receipt # 3475 with Proposed Order. (ces)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 4/9/2001, Entered: 4/9/2001 Order
                          ORDER upon motion granting [31-1] Motion for Richard C. Coyle, Esq. and G.Josiah Silvernale, III, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( signed by Judge Donald E. Ziegler on 4/9/01 ) CM all parties of record. (emc)
                            LREF
                            Blank 31 Filed: 4/5/2001, Entered: 4/6/2001 motion to appear pro hac vice
                            MOTION by BOEING COMPANY, MCDONNELL DOUGLAS CO for Richard C. Coyle, Esq. and G. Josiah Silvernale, III, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee $ 80.00 Receipt # 2829 with Proposed Order. (ces) Modified on 04/10/2001
                              LREF
                              Blank 30 Filed: 3/23/2001, Entered: 3/23/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER, set Summary Judgment Deadline for 8/23/01 , set Response to Motion for Summary Judgment Deadline for 9/23/01 ( signed by Judge Donald E. Ziegler on 3/23/01 ) CM all parties of record. (ces)
                                LREF
                                Blank 29 Filed: 3/22/2001, Entered: 3/23/2001 Case Management ConferenceCourt Filing
                                Case Management Conference held 3/22/01 before Judge Donald E. Ziegler [ Reporter: none ] (Discovery order to follow) (ces)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 28 Filed: 3/9/2001, Entered: 3/9/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER, set Case Management Conference for 2:00 3/22/01 ( signed by Judge Donald E. Ziegler on 3/9/01 ) CM all parties of record. (ces)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 26 Filed: 3/7/2001, Entered: 3/8/2001 Disclosure Statement
                                    DISCLOSURE statement by BAE SYSTEMS PLC (ces)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/1/2001, Entered: 3/1/2001 Order
                                      ORDER upon motion granting [24-1] motion for Marc S. Moller, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee $ 40.00 Receipt # 01-293, granting [24-2] motion for Daniel O. Rose, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee $ 40.00 Receipt # 2051 ( signed by Judge Donald E. Ziegler on 2 ) CM all parties of record. (ces)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 25 Filed: 2/23/2001, Entered: 2/23/2001 Notice Opting Out of Arbitration
                                        NOTICE opting out of arbitration by JAMES SHELLEBY (ces)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 24 Filed: 2/13/2001, Entered: 2/15/2001 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                          MOTION by JAMES SHELLEBY for Marc S. Moller, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee $ 40.00 Receipt # 01-293 , and for Daniel O. Rose, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee $ 40.00 Receipt # 2051 with Proposed Order. (ces)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 23 Filed: 2/13/2001, Entered: 2/13/2001 Disclosure Statement
                                            DISCLOSURE statement by HUGHES TRAINING, INC, RAYTHEON TRAINING, I, RAYTHEON SYSTEMS COM, RAYTHEON COMPANY (ces)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 22 Filed: 1/26/2001, Entered: 1/26/2001 Answer
                                              ANSWER to complaint; jury demand and CROSSCLAIM by RAYTHEON TRAINING, I, RAYTHEON SYSTEMS COM, RAYTHEON COMPANY against L-3 COMMUNICATIONS C, L-3 COMMUNICATIONS H (ces)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 21 Filed: 12/22/2000, Entered: 12/22/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for HUGHES TRAINING, INC, RAYTHEON TRAINING, I, RAYTHEON SYSTEMS COM, RAYTHEON COMPANY by Eric N. Anderson (ces)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 20 Filed: 12/20/2000, Entered: 12/21/2000 Amended Answer to Complaint
                                                  FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by BOEING COMPANY : amends [18-1] answer by BOEING COMPANY (ces)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 19 Filed: 12/20/2000, Entered: 12/21/2000 Amended Answer to Complaint
                                                    AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by MCDONNELL DOUGLAS CO : amends [17-1] answer by MCDONNELL DOUGLAS CO (ces)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 18 Filed: 11/30/2000, Entered: 12/1/2000 Answer
                                                      ANSWER to Complaint by BOEING COMPANY (ces)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 17 Filed: 11/30/2000, Entered: 12/1/2000 Answer
                                                        ANSWER to Complaint by MCDONNELL DOUGLAS CO (ces)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 16 Filed: 11/29/2000, Entered: 11/30/2000 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                          ANSWER by L-3 COMMUNICATIONS C, L-3 COMMUNICATIONS H (Attorney Charles I. Cohen) to first amended complaint (ces)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 11/21/2000, Entered: 11/21/2000 Order
                                                            ORDER upon motion granting [6-1] motion for Charles W. Cohen, Robb W. Patryk, Ned Bassen to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee $ 120.00 Receipt # 760 ( signed by Judge Donald E. Ziegler on 11/20/00 ) CM all parties of record. (plh)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 15 Filed: 11/20/2000, Entered: 11/20/2000 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                              WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to L-3 COMMUNICATIONS H on 11/8/00 Answer due on 1/7/01 for L-3 COMMUNICATIONS H (emc)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 14 Filed: 11/20/2000, Entered: 11/20/2000 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to L-3 COMMUNICATIONS C on 10/24/00 Answer due on 12/23/00 for L-3 COMMUNICATIONS C (emc)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 13 Filed: 11/20/2000, Entered: 11/20/2000 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                  WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to RAYTHEON COMPANY on 10/17/00 Answer due on 12/16/00 for RAYTHEON COMPANY (emc)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 12 Filed: 11/20/2000, Entered: 11/20/2000 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                    WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to RAYTHEON SYSTEMS COM on 10/17/00 Answer due on 12/16/00 for RAYTHEON SYSTEMS COM (emc)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 11 Filed: 11/20/2000, Entered: 11/20/2000 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                      WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to RAYTHEON COMPANY on 10/17/00 Answer due on 12/16/00 for RAYTHEON COMPANY (emc)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 10 Filed: 11/20/2000, Entered: 11/20/2000 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                        WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to RAYTHEON TRAINING, I on 10/17/00 Answer due on 12/16/00 for RAYTHEON TRAINING, I (emc)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 9 Filed: 11/20/2000, Entered: 11/20/2000 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                          WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to HUGHES TRAINING, INC on 10/17/00 Answer due on 12/16/00 for HUGHES TRAINING, INC (emc)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 8 Filed: 11/20/2000, Entered: 11/20/2000 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                            WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to BOEING COMPANY on 10/16/00 Answer due on 12/15/00 for BOEING COMPANY (emc)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 7 Filed: 11/20/2000, Entered: 11/20/2000 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                              WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to MCDONNELL DOUGLAS CO on 10/16/00 Answer due on 12/15/00 for MCDONNELL DOUGLAS CO (emc)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 6 Filed: 11/17/2000, Entered: 11/20/2000 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                MOTION by L-3 COMMUNICATIONS C, L-3 COMMUNICATIONS H for Charles W. Cohen, Robb W. Patryk, Ned Bassen to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee $ 120.00 Receipt # 760 with Proposed Order. (plh)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 11/14/2000, Entered: 11/14/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for L-3 COMMUNICATIONS C by Richard Wile (ces)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 11/8/2000, Entered: 11/8/2000 Disclosure Statement
                                                                                    DISCLOSURE statement by MCDONNELL DOUGLAS CO, BOEING COMPANY (ces)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 11/3/2000, Entered: 11/3/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for MCDONNELL DOUGLAS CO, BOEING COMPANY by Edwin L. Klett, W. Gregory Rhodes, Richard C. Coyle, Esq., G. Josiah Silvernale, III and Eric C. Strain (ces)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 9/7/2000, Entered: 9/8/2000 Amended Complaint
                                                                                        FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by JAMES SHELLEBY (Answer due 9/21/00 for DOES 1-100, for L-3 COMMUNICATIONS H, for L-3 COMMUNICATIONS C, for RAYTHEON COMPANY, for RAYTHEON SYSTEMS COM, for RAYTHEON TRAINING, I, for HUGHES TRAINING, INC, for BAE SYSTEMS PLC, for BRITISH AEROSPACE PL, for BOEING COMPANY, for MCDONNELL DOUGLAS CO ) amending [1-1] complaint (ces)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 8/18/2000, Entered: 8/22/2000 Complaint
                                                                                          COMPLAINT with summons issued; jury demand Filing Fee $ 150.00 Receipt # 880 (ces)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 27 Filed: 3/7/1991, Entered: 3/8/2001 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                            ANSWER by HUGHES TRAINING, INC (Attorneys Michael Yablonski, Anthony DiTommaso, Randal R. Craft, Jr, Esq. and David J. Harrinton, Esq.) to amended complaint (ces)
                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                              This case has been viewed 97 times.

                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                              Space
                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                               
                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                              Need Password Help?