CHILLSON v. COMMISSIONER
Federal Civil Lawsuit Pennsylvania Western District Court, Case No. 2:00-cv-02515-WLS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo JAMES J. CHILLSON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Peirce, Raimond & Coulter

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory George Paul +1 412 281 7229 +1 412 281 4229 gpaul@peircelaw.com
v.
No Logo Commissioner, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Lieber Smolar +1 412 894 7419 jessica.smolar@usdoj.gov
Office Pittsburgh
Filed 12/27/2000
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 862 - Social Security: Black Lung
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Transfer/Remand - Remanded to U.S. Agency
County Allegheny
Terminated 6/20/2001
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 6/4/2002, Entered: 6/4/2002 Order
ORDER upon motion granting [9-1] motion for Award of Attorney Fees; Pltf's counsel is awarded attys' fee in the amount of $3,940.00 pursuant to the Social Security Act. (signed by Judge William L. Standish on 6/4/02 ) CM all parties of record. (plh)
    LREF
    Blank 11 Filed: 5/31/2002, Entered: 5/31/2002 Response to Motion
    RESPONSE by COMMISSIONER to [9-1] motion for Award of Attorney Fees by JAMES J. CHILLSON (plh)
      LREF
      Blank 10 Filed: 5/21/2002, Entered: 5/21/2002 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER, Response to Motion set to 6/5/02 for [9-1] motion for Award of Attorney Fees , and that should she fail to do so, she will be deemed to have consented to the motion. (signed by Judge William L. Standish on 5/21/02) CM all parties of record. (plh) Modified on 05/24/2002
        LREF
        Blank 9 Filed: 5/20/2002, Entered: 5/20/2002, Terminated: 6/4/2002 Motion for Attorney Fees
        MOTION by JAMES J. CHILLSON for Award of Attorney Fees with Proposed Order. (plh)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 6/20/2001, Entered: 6/20/2001 Terminated Case
          Case closed (plh)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 6/20/2001, Entered: 6/20/2001 Order
            ORDER upon motion granting [8-1] motion to Remand, granting [8-2] motion for request for entry of final judgment; the Commissioner requests additional administrative proceedings to further consider the evidence of record; this case is hereby dismissed. ( signed by Judge William L. Standish on 6/19/01 ) CM all parties of record. NOTICE MAILED (plh)
              LREF
              Blank 8 Filed: 6/15/2001, Entered: 6/18/2001 Motion to Remand
              MOTION by COMMISSIONER to Remand , and for request for entry of final judgment with Proposed Order. (plh)
                LREF
                Blank 7 Filed: 5/17/2001, Entered: 5/18/2001 Brief in Support of Motion
                BRIEF by JAMES J. CHILLSON in support of [6-1] motion for Summary Judgment by JAMES J. CHILLSON (plh)
                  LREF
                  Blank 6 Filed: 5/17/2001, Entered: 5/18/2001 Motion for Summary Judgment
                  MOTION by JAMES J. CHILLSON for Summary Judgment with Proposed Order. (plh)
                    LREF
                    Blank 5 Filed: 3/28/2001, Entered: 3/28/2001 Transcript
                    TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held before the Appeal Council filed by deft. (plh)
                      LREF
                      Blank 4 Filed: 3/28/2001, Entered: 3/28/2001 Answer
                      ANSWER to Complaint by COMMISSIONER (Attorney Jessica Lieber Smolar) (plh)
                        LREF
                        Blank 3 Filed: 12/28/2000, Entered: 12/28/2000 Social Security Appeal OrderCourt Filing
                        Social Security Order setting Summons and Complaint to be served by 1/29/01 for COMMISSIONER Answer and Transcript deadline on 4/2/01 Pla Sum. Jgm. Motion and Brief ddl 5/17/01; Dft Sum. Jgm. Motion and Brief ddl 6/18/01. (signed by Judge William L. Standish on 12/28/00) CM all parties of record. (plh)
                          LREF
                          Blank 2 Filed: 12/28/2000, Entered: 12/28/2000 Complaint
                          COMPLAINT with summons issued (plh)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 12/28/2000, Entered: 12/28/2000 Order
                            ORDER upon motion granting [1-1] motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. (signed by Judge William L. Standish on 12/28/00) CM all parties of record. (plh)
                              LREF
                              Blank 1 Filed: 12/27/2000, Entered: 12/27/2000, Terminated: 12/28/2000 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                              MOTION by JAMES J. CHILLSON to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Proposed Order. (plh)
                                LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 158 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?