Lebron-Pacheco, et al v. SS Fascination, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Puerto Rico District Court, Case No. 3:98-cv-01371-RLA

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Ismael Lebron-Andino, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joaquin Pena-Pena +1 787 757 1936 +1 787 762 6062 rocse_services00919@yahoo.com
No Logo Ismael Lebron-Ortiz, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joaquin Pena-Pena +1 787 757 1936 +1 787 762 6062 rocse_services00919@yahoo.com
No Logo Ismael Lebron-Pacheco, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joaquin Pena-Pena +1 787 757 1936 +1 787 762 6062 rocse_services00919@yahoo.com
No Logo Maria Yolanda Ortiz, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joaquin Pena-Pena +1 787 757 1936 +1 787 762 6062 rocse_services00919@yahoo.com
v.
No Logo A-Z Ins. Co., Defendant
Carnival Cruise Lines Carnival Cruise Lines, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jimenez, Graffam & Lausell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jorge C. Pizarro-Garcia +1 787 767 1030 +1 787 751 4068 usdccases@jgl.com
No Logo Conjugal Partnership Doe-Doe, Defendant
No Logo John Doe 98CV1371, Defendant
No Logo John Roe 98CV1371, Defendant
No Logo Mary Doe 98CV1371, Defendant
No Logo Richard Roe 98CV1371, Defendant
No Logo SS Fascination, Defendant
Office San Juan
Filed 4/8/1998
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $1000000
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated 7/31/2000
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, FRC
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 3/6/2003, Entered: 3/6/2003 Set FRC Flag
CASE REFERRED TO FEDERAL RECORDS CENTER. ACC.021 - 02-0376 Box 6 (sr)
    LREF
    Legal Document 19 Filed: 7/31/2000, Entered: 8/1/2000 Judgment*
    JUDGMENT dismissing case without prejudice (Clerk) (su)
      LREF
      Legal Document 18 Filed: 7/31/2000, Entered: 8/1/2000 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER granting [13-1] motion to Dismiss [14-1] opposition response Noted. [15-1] response reply Noted. [16-1] reply sur Noted. This case is hereby dismissed without prejudice. ( signed by Judge Raymond L. Acosta ) (su)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 7/31/2000, Entered: 8/1/2000 Terminated Case
        Case closed (su)
          LREF
          Blank 17 Filed: 5/19/1999, Entered: 5/20/1999 none
          Informative Motion by Ismael Lebron-Pacheco, Maria Yolanda Ortiz, Ismael Lebron-Ortiz, Ismael Lebron-Andino re: atty will be out of PR for 3 weeks. (ni)
            LREF
            Blank 16 Filed: 9/16/1998, Entered: 9/29/1998 Sur Reply to Reply to Opposition
            Sur reply by Ismael Lebron-Pacheco, Maria Yolanda Ortiz, Ismael Lebron-Ortiz, Ismael Lebron-Andino to [15-1] response reply by Carnival Cruise to opposition to [13-1] motion to Dismiss by Carnival Cruise (ni)
              LREF
              Blank 15 Filed: 9/16/1998, Entered: 9/29/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
              REPLY by Carnival Cruise to response to [13-1] motion to Dismiss by Carnival Cruise (ni)
                LREF
                Blank 14 Filed: 9/16/1998, Entered: 9/29/1998 none
                RESPONSE by Ismael Lebron-Pacheco, Maria Yolanda Ortiz, Ismael Lebron-Ortiz, Ismael Lebron-Andino in opposition to [13-1] motion to Dismiss by Carnival Cruise (ni)
                  LREF
                  Blank 13 Filed: 9/16/1998, Entered: 9/29/1998, Terminated: 7/31/2000 Motion to Dismiss
                  MOTION by Carnival Cruise to Dismiss w/attachments. (ni)
                    LREF
                    Blank 12 Filed: 9/16/1998, Entered: 9/29/1998 ~Notice (other)
                    NOTICE of filing of dispositive motions together with responses, by Carnival Cruise (ni)
                      LREF
                      Blank 11 Filed: 8/31/1998, Entered: 9/2/1998 ~Notice (other)
                      NOTICE of Service of Sur-Reply to motion and opp on dismissal by Ismael Lebron-Pacheco, Maria Yolanda Ortiz, Ismael Lebron-Ortiz, Ismael Lebron-Andino (su)
                        LREF
                        Blank 10 Filed: 8/12/1998, Entered: 8/17/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER [8-1] notice of serevice of oppositive mot., Noted and [9-1] notice of service of reply to opp. to dispositive mot., Noted. ( signed by Judge Raymond L. Acosta ) (re)
                          LREF
                          Blank 9 Filed: 8/6/1998, Entered: 8/10/1998 ~Notice (other)
                          NOTICE of Service of Reply to opp to dispositive motion by Carnival Cruise (su)
                            LREF
                            Blank 8 Filed: 7/27/1998, Entered: 8/3/1998 ~Notice (other)
                            NOTICE of service of opp. to mot. to dismiss, w/attach, by Ismael Lebron-Pacheco, Maria Yolanda Ortiz, Ismael Lebron-Ortiz, Ismael Lebron-Andino (ni)
                              LREF
                              Blank 7 Filed: 7/17/1998, Entered: 7/21/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER granting [6-1] motion to Extend Time for a period of 30 dyas to answer the motion to dismiss ( signed by Judge Raymond L. Acosta ) (il)
                                LREF
                                Blank 6 Filed: 6/30/1998, Entered: 7/1/1998, Terminated: 7/17/1998 Motion for Extension of Time
                                MOTION by Ismael Lebron-Pacheco, Maria Yolanda Ortiz, Ismael Lebron-Ortiz, Ismael Lebron-Andino to Extend Time for a period of 30 dyas to answer the motion to dismiss (mr)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 5 Filed: 6/26/1998, Entered: 6/29/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER [4-1] notice of service of dispositive motion. Noted. ( signed by Judge Raymond L. Acosta ) (su)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 4 Filed: 6/18/1998, Entered: 6/22/1998 ~Notice (other)
                                    NOTICE of service of dispositive motion, by Carnival Cruise (ni)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 3 Filed: 6/2/1998, Entered: 6/4/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER granting [2-1] motion to Extend Time until 6/22/98 to ans. the complaint, resetting Answer deadline to 6/22/98 for Carnival Cruise ( signed by Judge Raymond L. Acosta ) (ni)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 2 Filed: 5/22/1998, Entered: 5/26/1998, Terminated: 6/2/1998 Motion for Extension of Time
                                        MOTION by Carnival Cruise to Extend Time until 6/22/98 to ans. the complaint (ni)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 4/13/1998, Entered: 4/15/1998 Summons Issued
                                          SUMMONS issued for SS Fascination, Carnival Cruise, Mary Doe 98CV1371, C/P Doe-Doe, ABC Insurance Compan, XYZ Insurance Co., John Doe 98CV1371 (mr)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 1 Filed: 4/8/1998, Entered: 4/13/1998 Complaint
                                            COMPLAINT Filing Fee $ 150.00 Receipt # 92348 (ct)
                                              LREF

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 103 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?