Martinez, et al v. Estate of F. Lopez, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Puerto Rico District Court, Case No. 3:98-cv-01552-RLA

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ALL PLAINTIFFS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carlos A. Velasquez +1 954 767 6500 +1 954 766 2690

Represented by Troncoso & Schell

No Logo Ada Raymond-de-Padilla, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ira H. Leesfield +1 305 854 4900 +1 305 854 8266

Represented by Troncoso & Schell

No Logo Andrew Garthway, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ira H. Leesfield +1 305 854 4900 +1 305 854 8266

Represented by Troncoso & Schell

No Logo Concepcion Garcia-Rivas, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ira H. Leesfield +1 305 854 4900 +1 305 854 8266

Represented by Troncoso & Schell

No Logo Conjugal Partnership Rivas-Garcia, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ira H. Leesfield +1 305 854 4900 +1 305 854 8266

Represented by Troncoso & Schell

No Logo Deborah Padilla-Leon, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ira H. Leesfield +1 305 854 4900 +1 305 854 8266

Represented by Troncoso & Schell

No Logo Enrique Rivas, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ira H. Leesfield +1 305 854 4900 +1 305 854 8266

Represented by Troncoso & Schell

No Logo Estate of William Alex Padilla, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ira H. Leesfield +1 305 854 4900 +1 305 854 8266

Represented by Troncoso & Schell

No Logo Linda Padilla, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ira H. Leesfield +1 305 854 4900 +1 305 854 8266

Represented by Troncoso & Schell

No Logo Marco Aurelio Padilla, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ira H. Leesfield +1 305 854 4900 +1 305 854 8266

Represented by Troncoso & Schell

No Logo Mariana T. Territo, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ira H. Leesfield +1 305 854 4900 +1 305 854 8266

Represented by Troncoso & Schell

No Logo Ricardo Manuel Padilla, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ira H. Leesfield +1 305 854 4900 +1 305 854 8266

Represented by Troncoso & Schell

No Logo Wendy Garthway, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ira H. Leesfield +1 305 854 4900 +1 305 854 8266

Represented by Troncoso & Schell

No Logo Caribbean Air Transport, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by LEGAL PARTNERS PSC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lydia Lizarribar-Buxo +1 787 250 7505 +1 787 758 4512 lizarribarlaw@onelinkpr.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Morales Morales Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jaime E. Morales-Morales +1 787 755 1570 +1 787 755 1571 jmorales@moralesmorales.com
No Logo Caribbean Airlines Services, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dombroff & Gilmore

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark A. Dombroff +1 703 336 8700 +1 202 625 3150 mdombroff@dglitigators.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LEGAL PARTNERS PSC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lydia Lizarribar-Buxo +1 787 250 7505 +1 787 758 4512 lizarribarlaw@onelinkpr.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Morales Morales Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jaime E. Morales-Morales +1 787 755 1570 +1 787 755 1571 jmorales@moralesmorales.com
No Logo Caribbean Airport Facilities Incorporated, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dombroff & Gilmore

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark A. Dombroff +1 703 336 8700 +1 202 625 3150 mdombroff@dglitigators.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LEGAL PARTNERS PSC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lydia Lizarribar-Buxo +1 787 250 7505 +1 787 758 4512 lizarribarlaw@onelinkpr.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Morales Morales Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jaime E. Morales-Morales +1 787 755 1570 +1 787 755 1571 jmorales@moralesmorales.com
No Logo Fernando Joel Lopez, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by SCURA MEALEY SCURA & STACK

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JOHN J. SCURA, III +1 973 696 8391 +1 973 696 8571 jscura@scuramealey.com
No Logo Great American Insurance Company, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fiddler Gonzalez & Rodriguez, P.S.C

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space DIEGO A. RAMOS +1 787 759 3123 dramos@fgrlaw.com
No Logo Katherine Lopez, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by SCURA MEALEY SCURA & STACK

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JOHN J. SCURA, III +1 973 696 8391 +1 973 696 8571 jscura@scuramealey.com
Office San Juan
Filed 5/19/1998
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $8000000
Nature of Suit 310 - Personal Injury: Airplane
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Wrongful Death
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Comerio
Terminated 3/6/2000
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (130) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 3/29/2000, Entered: 4/10/2000 Scheduling Conference
Scheduling conference held before Judge Raymond L. Acosta (ni)
    LREF
    Legal Document 117 Filed: 3/13/2000, Entered: 3/13/2000 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER granting [116-1] motion to Extend Time until 3/17/00 to file ISC memo. Joint memorandum due 3/17/00 for all parties ( signed by Judge Gilberto Gierbolini for Judge Raymond L. Acosta) (ct)
      LREF
      Blank 116 Filed: 3/8/2000, Entered: 3/8/2000, Terminated: 3/13/2000 Motion for Extension of Time
      MOTION by All Plaintiffs to Extend Time until 3/17/00 to file ISC memo (ni)
        LREF
        Legal Document 115 Filed: 3/6/2000, Entered: 3/6/2000 Judgment*
        PARTIAL JUDGMENT dismissing without prejudice the cross claims and third party claims filed by codeft Estate of Fernando Joel Lopez in Civil No. 98-1583 (RLA) against co-defts Caribbean Air Transport, Inc., Caribbean Airline Services, Inc., and Caribbean Airport Facilities and the third-party claims asserted against Cessna Aircraft Co. and Avco Corp. (ni)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 3/6/2000, Entered: 3/29/2000 Terminated Case
          Case closed (ni)
            LREF
            Blank 114 Filed: 3/3/2000, Entered: 3/6/2000 Answer to Crossclaim
            ANSWER by Caribbean Airlines, Caribbean Airport to [32-1] cross claim (ni)
              LREF
              Blank 113 Filed: 2/29/2000, Entered: 3/1/2000 Motion to Dismiss
              MOTION by Estate of F. Lopez to Dismiss co-defts Caribbean Air Transport, Caribbean Airline Services, Caribbean Airport Facilities and Cessna Aircraft and Avco Corp. Response due 3/13/00 . (ni)
                LREF
                Legal Document 112 Filed: 2/22/2000, Entered: 2/22/2000 Judgment*Court Filing
                PARTIAL JUDGMENT dismissing the claims against Estate of Fernando Lopez in Civil No. 98-1583(RLA) ( signed by Judge Raymond L. Acosta ) (ni)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 111 Filed: 2/22/2000, Entered: 2/22/2000 Order to Show Cause Court Filing
                  ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE regarding cross-claims and third party claims asserted by the Estate of Fernando Lopez in Civil No. 98-1583(RLA). Response due on 3/1/00 for parties. ( signed by Judge Raymond L. Acosta ) (ni)
                    LREF
                    Blank 110 Filed: 2/16/2000, Entered: 2/17/2000 Motion to Dismiss
                    JOINT MOTION by Plaintiffs in Civil No. 98-1583 and Estate of L. Lopez, Fernando Joel Lopez, Katherine Lopez to Dismiss (ni)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 109 Filed: 2/15/2000, Entered: 2/15/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER granting [105-1] motion to Continue ISC resetting Initial Scheduling Conference for 2:30 3/29/00 before Judge Raymond L. Acosta , joint ISC memorandum due 3/8/00 for parties ( signed by Judge Raymond L. Acosta ) (ni)
                        LREF
                        Blank 108 Filed: 2/11/2000, Entered: 2/14/2000 none
                        Informative Motion by Estate of L. Lopez re: no objections to continuance of ISC. (ni)
                          LREF
                          Blank 107 Filed: 2/10/2000, Entered: 2/11/2000 Amended Answer to Complaint
                          SECOND AMENDED ANSWER to first amended Complaint, crossclaims, third party complaint and jury demand in Civil No. 98-1583, by Estate of L. Lopez, Fernando Joel Lopez, Katherine Lopez : amends [32-1] complaint answer by Katherine Lopez, Fernando Joel Lopez, Estate of F. Lopez (ni) Modified on 02/11/2000
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 106 Filed: 2/9/2000, Entered: 2/9/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER granting [105-1] motion to Continue ISC, granting [103-1] motion to Continue ISC reset Initial Scheduling Conference for 2:30 3/16/00 before Judge Raymond L. Acosta ,and Joint Initial Scheduling Memorandum due 3/8/00 for all parties, etc as stated herein ( signed by Judge Raymond L. Acosta ) (su)
                              LREF
                              Blank 105 Filed: 2/7/2000, Entered: 2/8/2000, Terminated: 2/9/2000 Motion to Continue
                              MOTION by Caribbean Airlines, Caribbean Airport to Continue ISC (ni)
                                LREF
                                Blank 104 Filed: 2/7/2000, Entered: 2/8/2000 Motion for Leave to File Document
                                MOTION by All Plaintiffs for Leave to File reply to response to mot. to impose sanctions w/reply tendered. (ni)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 103 Filed: 2/4/2000, Entered: 2/7/2000 Motion to Continue
                                  MOTION by Great American Ins. to Continue ISC (ni)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 102 Filed: 2/2/2000, Entered: 2/2/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                    ORDER re-setting Initial Scheduling Conference for 10:30 2/25/00 before Judge Raymond L. Acosta , Joint ISC memorandum due 2/18/00 for parties The Pretrial/Settlement Conf and the trial are continued. terminated deadlines denying [96-1] motion to Stay proceedings until the deft rep. by atty Ramos is identified. Atty Carlos Ramos Ortiz does not appear as counsel in these proceedings, etc. as stated herein. ( signed by Judge Raymond L. Acosta ) (ni)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 101 Filed: 2/2/2000, Entered: 2/2/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER in the matter of the remaining third-party claims asserted by The Estate of Fernando Lopez in Civil No. 98-1583 (RLA); disposing of [79-1] motion to Dismiss, [79-2] motion for Summary Judgment on remaining third party claims in Civil No. 98-1552 and 98-1583, [88-1] motion to Join motions filed Cessna Aircraft as stated herein. Further denying [78-1] motion for setting of oral arguments, denying [83-1] motion to Strike supporting documents submitted by the Estate of Lopez. The Estate shall file an amended third-party complaint by 2/10/00. setting Pleadings deadline to 2/10/00 etc. as stated herein. ( signed by Judge Raymond L. Acosta ) (ni)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 100 Filed: 2/2/2000, Entered: 2/2/2000 Sur Reply to Reply to Opposition
                                        Sur reply by Cessna Aircraft Co. to [99-1] response reply by All Plaintiffs to opposition to [87-1] motion for Reconsideration of [86-1] order dismissing claims by All Plaintiffs (ni)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 99 Filed: 2/2/2000, Entered: 2/2/2000 Reply to Response to Motion
                                          REPLY by Plaintiffs in Civil No. 98-1552 (RLA) to response to [87-1] motion for Reconsideration of [86-1] order dismissing claims by All Plaintiffs w/attach. (ni)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 2/2/2000, Entered: 2/2/2000 Judgment*Court Filing
                                            JUDGMENT dismissing all claims asserted in Civil No. 98-1552 (RLA) by pltfs against defts the Estate of Fernando Lopez composed of Fernando Joel Lopez, Katherine Lopez and unknown defts. Further, the claims asserted by the Estate of Fernando Lopez in the third party complaint filed in Civil No. 98-1552(RLA), dkt #28, against Caribbean Airlines Services, Inc., Caribbean Air Transport, Caribbean Airport Facilities, Great American Ins. Co., The Cessna Aircraft Co., Lycoming Engine Corp., and Lycoming Textron Corp. are also dismissed, etc. ( signed by Judge Raymond L. Acosta ) (ni) Modified on 02/02/2000
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Legal Document 98 Filed: 2/2/2000, Entered: 2/2/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER (RLA) denying [87-1] motion for Reconsideration of [86-1] order dismissing claims granting [92-1] motion for Leave to File reply to opp. to mot. for reconsideration and sur-reply; [93-1] motion for Sanctions upon the atty for the Estate of Fernando Lopez for violating local rules Noted. [91-1] motion for Joinder Cessna's reply to opposition to motion to dismiss third party complaint Noted. [94-1] statement Noted. mooting [84-1] motion information. ( signed by Judge Raymond L. Acosta ) (ni)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 97 Filed: 2/1/2000, Entered: 2/2/2000 none
                                                RESPONSE by Estate of F. Lopez in opposition to [93-1] motion for Sanctions upon the atty for the Estate of Fernando Lopez for violating local rules by All Plaintiffs w/affidavit attached. (ni)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 96 Filed: 1/26/2000, Entered: 1/27/2000, Terminated: 2/2/2000 Motion to Stay
                                                  NOTICE of death of atty Carlos A. Ramos Ortiz and MOTION to Stay proceedings until the deft rep. by atty Ramos is identified (ni)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 95 Filed: 1/25/2000, Entered: 1/26/2000 none
                                                    RESPONSE by Estate of F. Lopez in opposition to [91-1] motion for Joinder Cessna's reply to opposition to motion to dismiss third party complaint by Caribbean Airport, Caribbean Airlines (ni)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 94 Filed: 1/20/2000, Entered: 1/21/2000 none
                                                      Separate Statement of uncontroverted facts, w/attach, by Caribbean Airlines, Caribbean Airport (ni)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 93 Filed: 1/19/2000, Entered: 1/20/2000 Motion for Sanctions
                                                        MOTION by All Plaintiffs in Civil No. 98-1552 for Sanctions upon the atty for the Estate of Fernando Lopez for violating local rules Response due 2/1/00 . (ni)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 1/13/2000, Entered: 1/14/2000 none
                                                          Sur reply to reply to opp. to mot. for reconsideration tendered, by Cessna Aircraft Co. (ni)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 92 Filed: 1/10/2000, Entered: 1/11/2000 Motion for Leave to File Document
                                                            MOTION by All Plaintiffs for Leave to File reply to opp. to mot. for reconsideration w/reply tendered. (ni)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 91 Filed: 1/7/2000, Entered: 1/7/2000, Terminated: 2/2/2000 ~Motion for Joinder
                                                              MOTION by Caribbean Airlines, Caribbean Airport for Joinder Cessna's reply to opposition to motion to dismiss third party complaint (ct)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 90 Filed: 12/29/1999, Entered: 12/30/1999 none
                                                                RESPONSE by Estate of F. Lopez to [87-1] motion for Reconsideration of [86-1] order dismissing claims by All Plaintiffs and CROSS-MOTION for entry of final judgment in the Martinez action (ni)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 89 Filed: 12/27/1999, Entered: 12/28/1999 none
                                                                  RESPONSE by Cessna Aircraft Co. in opposition to [87-1] motion for Reconsideration of [86-1] order dismissing claims by All Plaintiffs w/attach. (ni)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 88 Filed: 12/27/1999, Entered: 12/28/1999 ~Motion for Joinder
                                                                    MOTION by Lycoming Engine Corp to Join motions filed by Cessna Aircraft (ni)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 87 Filed: 12/21/1999, Entered: 12/22/1999 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                      MOTION by All Plaintiffs in CV 98-1552 for Reconsideration of [86-1] order dismissing claims (su)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 86 Filed: 12/20/1999, Entered: 12/20/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER granting [76-1] motion for Summary Judgment in Civil No. 98-1552, granting [76-2] motion to request order precluding personal liability of Kathleen or Fernando Joel Lopez. Pltfs' claims in 98-1552 against dfts Estate F. Lopez, Fernando J. Lopez, Katherine Lopez and unknown dfts are dismissed. The Estate F. Lopez shall show cause by 12/29/99 or the third party compliant (dkt #28) will be dismissed Set Notice of Compliance deadline to 12/29/99 ( signed by Judge Raymond L. Acosta ) (ct)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 85 Filed: 12/15/1999, Entered: 12/16/1999 none
                                                                          RESPONSE by Cessna Aircraft Co. in opposition to [73-1] request to further amend third-party complaint (ni)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 84 Filed: 12/14/1999, Entered: 12/15/1999 none
                                                                            Informative Motion by Cessna Aircraft Co. regarding the Estate of Lopez' motion for summary judgment w/attach. (ni)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 83 Filed: 12/14/1999, Entered: 12/15/1999 Motion to Strike
                                                                              MOTION by Cessna Aircraft Co. to Strike supporting documents submitted by the Estate of Lopez (ni)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 82 Filed: 12/14/1999, Entered: 12/15/1999 Sur Reply to Reply to Opposition
                                                                                Sur reply by Estate of F. Lopez to [81-1] response reply by Cessna Aircraft Co. to opposition to [79-1] motion to Dismiss by Cessna Aircraft Co., [79-2] motion for Summary Judgment on remaining third party claims in Civil No. 98-1552 and 98-1583 by Cessna Aircraft Co. w/affidavits attached. (ni)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 81 Filed: 12/14/1999, Entered: 12/15/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                  REPLY by Cessna Aircraft Co. to response to [79-1] motion to Dismiss by Cessna Aircraft Co., [79-2] motion for Summary Judgment on remaining third party claims in Civil No. 98-1552 and 98-1583 by Cessna Aircraft Co. (ni)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 80 Filed: 12/14/1999, Entered: 12/15/1999 none
                                                                                    RESPONSE by Estate of F. Lopez in opposition to [79-1] motion to Dismiss by Cessna Aircraft Co., [79-2] motion for Summary Judgment on remaining third party claims in Civil No. 98-1552 and 98-1583 by Cessna Aircraft Co. w/stmt of controverted facts & affidavits attached. (ni)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 79 Filed: 12/14/1999, Entered: 12/15/1999, Terminated: 2/2/2000 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                      MOTION with Memorandum in Support by Cessna Aircraft Co. to Dismiss and/or for Summary Judgment on remaining third party claims in Civil No. 98-1552 and 98-1583 w/stmt of uncontroverted facts attached. (ni) Modified on 12/21/1999
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 78 Filed: 12/14/1999, Entered: 12/15/1999 Motion for Setting
                                                                                        MOTION by Cessna Aircraft Co. for setting of oral arguments (ni)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 77 Filed: 12/14/1999, Entered: 12/15/1999 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                          NOTICE of filing dispositive motion together with responses, by Cessna Aircraft Co. (ni)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 76 Filed: 12/8/1999, Entered: 12/8/1999, Terminated: 12/20/1999 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                            MOTION with Memorandum in Support by Estate of F. Lopez for Summary Judgment in Civil No. 98-1552 and in the alternative to request order precluding personal liability of Kathleen or Fernando Joel Lopez w/stmt of uncontroverted facts and affidavits attached . Response due 12/21/99 . (ni)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 75 Filed: 12/8/1999, Entered: 12/8/1999 none
                                                                                              MOTION SUBMITTING dispositive motion and req. disposition without the benefit of opp. in Civil No. 98-1552, w/attachment by Estate of F. Lopez (ni)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 74 Filed: 12/8/1999, Entered: 12/8/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                ORDER [70-1] appear/appearance notice Noted. ( signed by Judge Jaime Pieras Jr. for Judge Acosta) (ni)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 73 Filed: 12/7/1999, Entered: 12/8/1999 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                  NOTICE of service of sur-reply of opp. to mot for summray judgment and cross motion for leave to file amended ans. and third party complaint and cross motion under Rule 56(f), by Estate of F. Lopez (ni)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 72 Filed: 12/3/1999, Entered: 12/6/1999 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                    NOTICE of service of motion for summary judgment, by Caribbean Airlines, Caribbean Airport (ni)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 70 Filed: 11/30/1999, Entered: 12/1/1999 Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for Estate of F. Lopez, Fernando Joel Lopez, Katherine Lopez and as local cnsl. for Atty. John J. Scura by Jorge Bermudez-Torregrosa (ct) Modified on 12/01/1999
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 69 Filed: 11/30/1999, Entered: 11/30/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER [63-1] notice Noted. [66-1] notice Noted. ( signed by Judge Raymond L. Acosta ) (ni)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 68 Filed: 11/30/1999, Entered: 11/30/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER [67-1] notice Noted. ( signed by Judge Raymond L. Acosta ) (ni)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 67 Filed: 11/22/1999, Entered: 11/23/1999 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                            NOTICE of service of opposition to Cessna's motion for summary judgment by Estate of F. Lopez (ct)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 66 Filed: 11/18/1999, Entered: 11/19/1999 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                              NOTICE of service of dispositive motion on remaining third party claims in Civil No. 98-1552 (RLA) and 98-1583(RLA), by Cessna Aircraft Co. (ni)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 65 Filed: 11/15/1999, Entered: 11/15/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER granting [61-1] motion to Continue ISC set for 1/19/00 setting Initial Scheduling Conference for 10:30 2/11/00 before Judge Raymond L. Acosta , joint ISC memorandum due 2/4/00 for parties ( signed by Judge Raymond L. Acosta ) (ni)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 64 Filed: 11/15/1999, Entered: 11/15/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER [58-1] notice Noted. striking [62-1] opposition memorandum ( signed by Judge Raymond L. Acosta ) (ni)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 63 Filed: 11/10/1999, Entered: 11/10/1999, Terminated: 11/30/1999 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                    NOTICE of service of dispositive motion in Civil No. 98-1552 (RLA), by Estate of F. Lopez (ni)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 62 Filed: 11/9/1999, Entered: 11/10/1999 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM by Estate of F. Lopez in opposition to [58-1] motion for summary judgment by Cessna Aircraft Co., w/stmt of controverted fact and affidavit attached. (ni)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 61 Filed: 11/1/1999, Entered: 11/2/1999, Terminated: 11/15/1999 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                        MOTION by Great American Ins. to Continue ISC set for 1/19/00 (ni)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 60 Filed: 10/29/1999, Entered: 11/1/1999 Answer to Third-Party Complaint
                                                                                                                          ANSWER by Lycoming Engine Corp, Lycoming Engine Corp, Lycoming Textron (Attorney Antonio Gnocchi ) to [32-1] third-party complaint by Katherine Lopez, Fernando Joel Lopez, Estate of F. Lopez, [28-1] third-party complaint by Katherine Lopez, Fernando Joel Lopez, Estate of F. Lopez (ni)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 59 Filed: 10/29/1999, Entered: 10/29/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            OMNIBUS ORDER [54-1] miscellaneous Noted. Granting [55-1] motion for Virgilio Ramos Gonzalez to Withdraw as Attorney and directing dfts to designate new counsel set Notice of Attorney Appearance Deadline on 11/30/99 for Katherine Lopez, for Fernando Joel Lopez, for Estate of F. Lopez . Granting [57-1] motion to be included in the service list. Setting Initial Scheduling for 10:00 1/19/00 before Judge Raymond L. Acosta , and instructing parties to file a Joint ISC Memo memorandum due 1/12/00 for all parties ( signed by Judge Gilberto Gierbolini for Judge Raymond L. Acosta) (ct)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 58 Filed: 10/26/1999, Entered: 10/27/1999 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                              NOTICE of service of dispositive motion on remaining third party claims, by Cessna Aircraft Co. (ni)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 57 Filed: 10/25/1999, Entered: 10/26/1999 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                MOTION by (AVCO) Lycoming Engine Corp to be included in the service list (ni)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 56 Filed: 10/13/1999, Entered: 10/14/1999 Answer to Third-Party Complaint
                                                                                                                                  ANSWER by Cessna Aircraft Co. (Attorney Bruce J. McGiverin) to [32-1] third-party complaint by Katherine Lopez, Fernando Joel Lopez, Estate of F. Lopez, [28-1] third-party complaint by Katherine Lopez, Fernando Joel Lopez, Estate of F. Lopez (ni)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 55 Filed: 10/6/1999, Entered: 10/6/1999, Terminated: 10/29/1999 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                    MOTION by defts and third party pltfs for Virgilio Ramos Gonzalez to Withdraw as Attorney (ni)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 54 Filed: 9/30/1999, Entered: 10/1/1999, Terminated: 10/29/1999 none
                                                                                                                                      MOTION SUBMITTING proof of service re: third party complaint w/attachment by Estate of F. Lopez (ct)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 53 Filed: 9/20/1999, Entered: 9/20/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER [52-1] miscellaneous Noted. ( signed by Judge Raymond L. Acosta ) (ni)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 52 Filed: 9/16/1999, Entered: 9/16/1999, Terminated: 9/20/1999 none
                                                                                                                                          MOTION SUBMITTING pro hac vice fee w/ receipt #103746 in the amt of $150.00 attached, by Cessna Aircraft Co. (ni)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 51 Filed: 9/13/1999, Entered: 9/13/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [47-1] motion for James M. Derr to Appear Pro Hac Vice subject to payment of $150.00. ( signed by Judge Raymond L. Acosta ) (ni)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 50 Filed: 9/8/1999, Entered: 9/8/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                              REPLY by Cessna Aircraft Co. to response to [42-1] motion to Dismiss third party complaints and certain counts in Cv. 98-1552 and 98-1583 by Lycoming Engine Corp (ni)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 49 Filed: 9/8/1999, Entered: 9/8/1999 Judgment*Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                PARTIAL JUDGMENT dismissing "first party" claims asserted in the third-party complaints against Cessna and AVCO. The Counts V and VII of the third-party complaint filed by the Estate of Fernando Lopez in Civ. 98-1552 and Counts II and III of the third-party complaint filed in Civ. No. 98-1583 are dismissed insofar as they relate to Cessna Aircraft Co. and AVCO, incorrectly named as Lycoming Engine Co., Lycoming Engine Corp. and Lycoming Textron Corp. ( signed by Judge Raymond L. Acosta ) (ni)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 48 Filed: 9/8/1999, Entered: 9/8/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER dismissing "first party" claims asserted in third party complaints against Cessna and AVCO, granting [40-1] motion to Dismiss third party complaint and certain counts in Civil No. 98-1552 and 98-1583, [40-2] motion to Quash service of process, [42-1] motion to Dismiss third party complaints and certain counts in Cv. 98-1552 and 98-1583 granting [46-1] motion Joinder reply to opp. to mot. to dismiss, granting [44-1] motion for Leave to File reply to Estate of Lopez's opposition to motion to dismiss. Third party pltfs shall properly serve Cessna and AVCO and submit evidence thereof by 9/30/99, etc. setting Notice of Compliance deadline to 9/30/99 ( signed by Judge Raymond L. Acosta ) (ni)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 47 Filed: 9/7/1999, Entered: 9/7/1999, Terminated: 9/13/1999 Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by Cessna Aircraft Co. for James M. Derr to Appear Pro Hac Vice (ni)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 46 Filed: 8/31/1999, Entered: 9/1/1999 ~Motion for Joinder
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by Lycoming Engine Corp, Lycoming Textron for Joinder reply to opp. to mot. to dismiss (ni)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 45 Filed: 8/31/1999, Entered: 9/1/1999 Answer to Third-Party Complaint
                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER by Caribbean Airlines, Caribbean Airport (Attorney Jaime E. Morales-Morales) to [24-1] third-party complaint by Katherine Lopez, Fernando Joel Lopez, Estate of F. Lopez (ni)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 44 Filed: 8/25/1999, Entered: 8/26/1999 Motion for Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by Cessna Aircraft Co. for Leave to File reply to Estate of Lopez's opposition to motion to dismiss w/reply tendered (ct)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 43 Filed: 8/20/1999, Entered: 8/23/1999 none
                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by Estate of F. Lopez in opposition to [42-1] motion to Dismiss third party complaints and certain counts in Cv. 98-1552 and 98-1583 by AVCO (Lycoming Engine Corp.) [40-1] motion to Dismiss third party complaint and certain counts in Civil No. 98-1552 and 98-1583 by Cessna Aircraft Co. (ni)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 42 Filed: 8/13/1999, Entered: 8/23/1999 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by AVCO ( Lycoming Engine Corp) to Dismiss third party complaints and certain counts in Cv. 98-1552 and 98-1583 w/attach. Response due 8/26/99 . (ni)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 41 Filed: 8/10/1999, Entered: 8/11/1999 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of proof of service of summons upon Caribbean Airport Facilities, Caribbean Airline Services, Inc., Lycoming Engine Company and Textron/Lycoming w/attach, by Estate of F. Lopez (ni)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 40 Filed: 8/10/1999, Entered: 8/11/1999, Terminated: 9/8/1999 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by Cessna Aircraft Co. to Dismiss third party complaint and certain counts in Civil No. 98-1552 and 98-1583 and/or to Quash service of process w/attach. Response due 8/23/99 . (ni)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 39 Filed: 7/20/1999, Entered: 7/21/1999 Answer to Third-Party Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER by Great American Ins. (Attorney Diego Ramos) to [24-1] third-party complaint by Katherine Lopez, Fernando Joel Lopez, Estate of F. Lopez (ct)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 38 Filed: 7/14/1999, Entered: 7/15/1999 Answer to Third-Party Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER by Caribbean Air Trans. (Attorney Lydia Lizarribar) to [24-1] third-party complaint by Katherine Lopez, Fernando Joel Lopez, Estate of F. Lopez (ct)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 7/13/1999, Entered: 7/14/1999 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                        THIRD PARTY SUMMONS issued for Cessna Aircraft Co., Lycoming Engine Corp, Lycoming Textron (mr)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 37 Filed: 7/6/1999, Entered: 7/12/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER [34-1] service waiver Noted., [33-1] service waiver Noted., granting [35-1] motion to Extend Time for 15 days to serve third party defts, etc., as stated herein, [36-1] notice Noted., set Answer deadline to 7/30/99 for Great American Ins., for Caribbean Air Trans. ( signed by Judge Raymond L. Acosta ) (il)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 6/29/1999, Entered: 6/30/1999 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS issued for Caribbean Airlines, Caribbean Airport (mr)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 36 Filed: 6/25/1999, Entered: 6/29/1999 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of counsel's unavailability from 7/19 - 7/23/99 by Mariana T. Territo, Estate of A. Padilla, Wendy Garthway, Andrew Garthway (mr)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 35 Filed: 6/25/1999, Entered: 6/28/1999 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by Estate of F. Lopez, Fernando Joel Lopez, Katherine Lopez to Extend Time for 15 days to serve third party defts (ni) Modified on 06/28/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 34 Filed: 6/25/1999, Entered: 6/28/1999, Terminated: 7/6/1999 none
                                                                                                                                                                                  WAIVER of Service by Mail as to Caribbean Air Trans. on 6/4/99 Answer due on 8/24/99 for Caribbean Air Trans. (ni)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 33 Filed: 6/25/1999, Entered: 6/28/1999 none
                                                                                                                                                                                    WAIVER of Service by Mail as to Great American Ins. on 5/26/99 Answer due on 8/24/99 for Great American Ins. (ni)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 32 Filed: 6/24/1999, Entered: 6/28/1999 Third-Party Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                      THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT by Estate of F. Lopez, Fernando Joel Lopez, Katherine Lopez in Civil No. 98-1583 against Cessna Aircraft Co., Lycoming Engine Corp, Lycoming Textron (ni) Modified on 09/01/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 32 Filed: 6/24/1999, Entered: 6/28/1999 Crossclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                        CROSSCLAIM by Estate of F. Lopez, Fernando Joel Lopez, Katherine Lopez against Caribbean Airlines, Caribbean Air Trans., Caribbean Airport, Great American Ins. (ni)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 32 Filed: 6/24/1999, Entered: 6/28/1999 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED ANSWER by Estate of F. Lopez, Fernando Joel Lopez, Katherine Lopez to first amended complaint (ni)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 31 Filed: 6/21/1999, Entered: 6/23/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            OMNIBUS ORDER granting mot. to consolidate Civil No. 98-1583 (PG) with this case and authorizing the filing of third party complaint. granting [29-1] motion to Extend Time for 30 days to ans. third party complaint. Third party defts shall be served by 7/30/99 and exec. summons filed by 8/10/99 setting Answer deadline to 7/15/99 for Caribbean Air Trans. , setting Notice of Compliance deadline to 8/10/99 ( signed by Judge Raymond L. Acosta ) (ni)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 30 Filed: 6/21/1999, Entered: 6/22/1999 Answer to Third-Party Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER by Great American Ins. (Attorney Diego A. Ramos-Cayon) to [24-1] third-party complaint by Katherine Lopez, Fernando Joel Lopez, Estate of F. Lopez (ni)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 29 Filed: 6/8/1999, Entered: 6/9/1999, Terminated: 6/21/1999 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by Caribbean Air Trans. to Extend Time for 30 days to ans. third party complaint (ni)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 28 Filed: 6/2/1999, Entered: 6/4/1999 Third-Party Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                  THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT by Estate of F. Lopez, Fernando Joel Lopez, Katherine Lopez against Cessna Aircraft Co., Lycoming Engine Corp, ABC Corps. 1-5 (ni)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 28 Filed: 6/2/1999, Entered: 6/4/1999 Amended Answer to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                    SECOND AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Estate of F. Lopez, Fernando Joel Lopez, Katherine Lopez : amends [24-1] answer by Katherine Lopez, Fernando Joel Lopez, Estate of F. Lopez (ni)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 27 Filed: 6/2/1999, Entered: 6/4/1999 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [25-1] motion for Leave to File second amended answer to the complaint and third party complaint. Defts shall serve 3dpty defts by 6/25/99 and file exec. summons by 6/30/99. Notice of Compliance deadline to 6/30/99 ( signed by Raymond L. Acosta ) (ni)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 26 Filed: 5/28/1999, Entered: 6/1/1999 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of service of third party complaint and waiver of summons, by Estate of F. Lopez, Fernando Joel Lopez, Katherine Lopez (ni) Modified on 06/04/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 25 Filed: 5/11/1999, Entered: 5/12/1999, Terminated: 6/2/1999 Motion for Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by Estate of F. Lopez, Fernando Joel Lopez, Katherine Lopez for Leave to File amended answer to the complaint and third party complaint w/attchs. and amended answer tendered(ct) Modified on 06/04/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 24 Filed: 5/10/1999, Entered: 6/4/1999 Third-Party Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                            THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT by Estate of F. Lopez, Fernando Joel Lopez, Katherine Lopez against Caribbean Airlines, Caribbean Air Trans., Caribbean Airport, Great American Ins., John Doe 98CV01552, Jane Doe 98CV01552, John Doe Insurance (ni) Modified on 06/04/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 24 Filed: 5/10/1999, Entered: 6/4/1999 Amended Answer to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Estate of F. Lopez, Fernando Joel Lopez, Katherine Lopez : amends [15-1] answer by Katherine Lopez, Fernando Joel Lopez, Estate of F. Lopez (ni) Modified on 06/04/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 23 Filed: 5/10/1999, Entered: 5/12/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER [22-1] miscellaneous Noted. ( signed by Judge Raymond L. Acosta ) (ct)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 22 Filed: 4/23/1999, Entered: 4/26/1999 none
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION SUBMITTING check in the amt of $100.00 as sanctions imposed, w/receipt #100586 attached by Estate of F. Lopez, Fernando Joel Lopez, Katherine Lopez (ni)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 21 Filed: 4/16/1999, Entered: 4/20/1999 noneCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute entry: ISC HELD. Mr. Scura shall pay sanctions in the amt of $100.00 for non-compliance with the filing of joint ISC memo. setting sanctions deadline to 4/30/99 for Estate of F. Lopez , Joint ISC memorandum due 4/16/99 for All Plaintiffs, for Estate of F. Lopez Defts shall file third party complaint. setting Notice of Compliance deadline to 5/11/99 Defts shall file proof of having served summons upon Caribbean. setting Motion Filing deadline to 5/28/99 , setting Jury Trial for 9:30 2/22/00 before Judge Raymond L. Acosta , setting Pretrial/ Settlement Conference for 10:00 2/15/00 before Judge Raymond L. Acosta , setting Pretrial Order deadline to 2/8/00 etc. ( Judge Raymond L. Acosta ) (ni)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 20 Filed: 4/14/1999, Entered: 4/15/1999 none
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      JOINT ISC Memorandum filed by All Plaintiffs, Estate of F. Lopez, Fernando Joel Lopez, Katherine Lopez (ni)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 4/12/1999, Entered: 4/20/1999 Scheduling Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Scheduling conference held before Judge Raymond L. Acosta (ni)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 19 Filed: 4/6/1999, Entered: 4/7/1999 none
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ISC Memorandum filed by All Plaintiffs (ni)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 18 Filed: 3/16/1999, Entered: 3/18/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [14-1] motion for John J. Scura III to Appear Pro Hac Vice provided he files admittance fee of $150.00. setting Notice of Compliance deadline to 3/31/99 ( signed by Judge Raymond L. Acosta ) (ni)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 17 Filed: 3/16/1999, Entered: 3/18/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, setting Initial Scheduling Conference for 3:30 4/12/99 before Judge Raymond L. Acosta , joint ISC memorandum due 4/6/99 for parties ( signed by Judge Raymond L. Acosta ) (ni)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 16 Filed: 3/8/1999, Entered: 3/10/1999 none
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Copy of Receipt # 99601 in the amount of $ 150.00 re: John Scura's pro hac vice fee (ct)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 15 Filed: 3/4/1999, Entered: 3/8/1999 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Complaint by Estate of F. Lopez, Fernando Joel Lopez, Katherine Lopez (ni)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 14 Filed: 3/4/1999, Entered: 3/8/1999, Terminated: 3/16/1999 Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by Estate of F. Lopez, Fernando Joel Lopez, Katherine Lopez for John J. Scura III to Appear Pro Hac Vice w/affidavits attached. (ni)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 13 Filed: 2/1/1999, Entered: 2/3/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying [8-1] motion to Consolidate Case with Civil No. 98-1583 (PG) in view of Judge Perez Gimenez's refusal to give his consent. ( signed by Judge Raymond L. Acosta ) (ni)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/26/1999, Entered: 1/28/1999 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS by publication issued for Estate of F. Lopez, Fernando Joel Lopez, Katherine Lopez, Jane Doe 98CV1552 (ni)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 12 Filed: 1/14/1999, Entered: 1/20/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [11-1] motion for Service of Summons by Publication ( signed by Judge Raymond L. Acosta ) (ni)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 11 Filed: 1/7/1999, Entered: 1/11/1999, Terminated: 1/14/1999 Motion for Service by Publication
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by All Plaintiffs for Service of Summons by Publication , and to Extend Time for a period of 60 days to serve summons (re)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 10 Filed: 12/23/1998, Entered: 12/30/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER [9-1] motion information, re: service of process, Noted. Pltfs. shall move for service by publication no later than 1/8/99. setting Notice of Compliance deadline to 1/8/99 ( signed by Judge Raymond L. Acosta ) (re)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 12/23/1998, Entered: 12/30/1998 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Text not available.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 12/11/1998, Entered: 12/15/1998 none
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Informative Motion by All Plaintiffs re: status of service of process. (ni)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 12/11/1998, Entered: 12/14/1998, Terminated: 2/1/1999 Motion to Consolidate Cases
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by All Plaintiffs to Consolidate Case with Civil No. 98-1583 (PG) (ni)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 12/4/1998, Entered: 12/9/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER for pltfs to report on status of service of process. setting Notice of Compliance deadline to 12/22/98 ( signed by Judge Raymond L. Acosta ) (ni)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 8/31/1998, Entered: 9/2/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Extend Time until 11/19/98 to serve process ( signed by Judge Raymond L. Acosta ) (su)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 8/19/1998, Entered: 8/20/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER stating that pltfs shall serve dfts and submit summons ret on 9/18/98 setting Motion Filing deadline to 9/18/98 ( signed by Judge Raymond L. Acosta ) (ct)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 8/19/1998, Entered: 8/20/1998, Terminated: 8/31/1998 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by All Plaintiffs to Extend Time until 11/19/98 to serve process (ct)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 7/21/1998, Entered: 7/22/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [2-1] motion to request order directing Army National Guard to produce copy of personal file of Luis Fernando Lopez and all pertinent info relating to case. w/attachments., setting Notice of Compliance deadline to 7/31/98 as to Army National Guard providing personal file of Luis Fernando Lopez (signed by Judge Jaime Pieras Jr. for Judge Raymond L. Acosta) (lm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 7/7/1998, Entered: 7/8/1998, Terminated: 7/21/1998 Motion Requesting Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by plaintiffs to request order directing Army National Guard to produce copy of personal file of Luis Fernando Lopez and all pertinent info relating to case. w/attachments. Response due 7/20/98. (lm) Modified on 07/08/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 5/19/1998, Entered: 5/21/1998 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT Filing Fee $ 150.00 Receipt # 93243 (ct)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 5/19/1998, Entered: 5/21/1998 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS issued for Fernando Joel Lopez, Katherine Lopez (ct)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space Space

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 103 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?