Machado v. Commissioner of SS
Federal Civil Lawsuit Puerto Rico District Court, Case No. 3:98-cv-02266-CC-ADC

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Rosaura Machado, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Fabio Andres Roman-Garcia +7878807 677 880 1270 +1 787 878 5292 fanroga4@aol.com
v.
No Logo Commissioner of Social Security, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lilliam E. Mendoza-Toro +1 787 772 3589 +1 787 502 1089 mendozatorolaw@aol.com
Office San Juan
Filed 11/9/1998
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 862 - Social Security: Black Lung
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Transfer/Remand - Remanded to U.S. Agency
County Manati
Terminated 5/26/2000
Origin 4
Reopened 6/21/1999
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, FRC
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 2/6/2001, Entered: 9/24/2003 Set FRC Flag
CASE REFERRED TO FEDERAL RECORDS CENTER. ACC.021 - 01-0060 Box 7 (fg)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/26/2000, Entered: 5/26/2000 Judgment*Court Filing
    JUDGMENT affirming the Commissioner's decision and denying pltf's petition. ( signed by Magistrate Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon ) (ct)
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 5/26/2000, Entered: 5/26/2000 Terminated Case
      Case closed (ct)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/24/2000, Entered: 5/24/2000 Opinion and OrderCourt Filing
        OPINION AND ORDER affirming the decision of the Commissioner of SS and denying pltf's appeal, etc. as stated herein. ( signed by Magistrate Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon ) (re)
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Blank 14 Filed: 10/15/1999, Entered: 10/18/1999 none
          Memorandum of law filed by Rosaura Machado (np)
            LREF
            Blank 13 Filed: 7/26/1999, Entered: 7/28/1999 none
            Memorandum of Law filed by Commissioner of SS (re)
              LREF
              Blank 12 Filed: 7/16/1999, Entered: 7/22/1999 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER: Deft. is granted 60 days, until 7/27/99, to file his memorandum of law memorandum due 7/27/99 for Commissioner of SS . Pltf. will file her statment of fact and memorandum of law within 60 days after deft's filing setting Notice of Compliance deadline to 9/27/99 . ( signed by Magistrate Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon ) (re)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 7/13/1999, Entered: 7/14/1999 none
                CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (re)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 7/13/1999, Entered: 7/14/1999 Order
                  ENDORSED ORDER granting [11-1] consent to Magistrate trial (Clerk) (re)
                    LREF
                    Blank 11 Filed: 7/2/1999, Entered: 7/6/1999 none
                    CONSENT to proceed before US Magistrate For: all further proceedings in the case by Rosaura Machado (re)
                      LREF
                      Blank 10 Filed: 6/23/1999, Entered: 6/23/1999 Memorandum of the Clerk forwarding form Consent to
                      MEMORANDUM (Clerk) forwarding form "Consent to Proceed before a Mag". and granting plaintiff 18 days to complete w/attach. Response due on 7/12/99 (re)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 6/21/1999, Entered: 6/23/1999 Order
                        ENDORSED ORDER [9-1] hhs transcript, Noted. ( signed by Judge Carmen C. Cerezo ) (re)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 6/21/1999, Entered: 6/23/1999 Case Reopened
                          Case reopened (re)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 6/21/1999, Entered: 6/23/1999 Order
                            ENDORSED ORDER granting [7-1] motion to Vacate [6-1] judgment order remanding case ( signed by Judge Carmen C. Cerezo ) (re)
                              LREF
                              Blank 9 Filed: 5/26/1999, Entered: 5/27/1999 Social Security Transcript
                              Transcript of proceedings before BHA, with notice of filing thereof. (re)
                                LREF
                                Blank 8 Filed: 5/26/1999, Entered: 5/27/1999 Answer to Social Security Complaint
                                ANSWER to the Complaint by Commissioner of SS (Attorney Lilliam Mendoza Toro). Follow-up deadline for 6/7/99 for Commissioner of SS (re)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 7 Filed: 5/26/1999, Entered: 5/27/1999 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence - 2255
                                  MOTION by Commissioner of SS to Vacate [6-1] judgment order remanding case Response due 6/8/99. (re)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 6 Filed: 3/23/1999, Entered: 3/26/1999 Judgment*Court Filing
                                    JUDGMENT remanding this case for further administrative action. ( signed by Judge Carmen C. Cerezo ) (re)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/23/1999, Entered: 3/26/1999 Terminated Case
                                      Case closed (re)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 5 Filed: 3/9/1999, Entered: 3/11/1999 Motion to Remand
                                        MOTION by Commissioner of SS to Remand pursuant to sentence six of 42 USC sec. 405(g) Response due 3/23/99 . (re)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 2/18/1999, Entered: 2/22/1999 Order
                                          ENDORSED ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Extend Time until 3/10/99 to answer complaint, resetting Answer deadline to 3/10/99 for Commissioner of SS ( signed by Chief Judge Carmen C. Cerezo ) (re)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 4 Filed: 2/8/1999, Entered: 2/9/1999 Motion for Extension of Time
                                            MOTION by Commissioner of SS to Extend Time until 3/10/99 to answer complaint (ct)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 3 Filed: 12/10/1998, Entered: 12/14/1998 Summons Returned Executed as to USA
                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Commissioner of SS 12/10/98 upon Guillermo Gil thru Myrna Ferrer. Answer due on 2/8/99 for Commissioner of SS (re)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 12/7/1998, Entered: 12/8/1998 Summons Issued
                                                SUMMONS issued for Commissioner of SS Follow up by 4/7/99 . (re)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 11/25/1998, Entered: 12/3/1998 Order
                                                  ENDORSED ORDER granting [1-1] motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis ( signed by Chief Judge Carmen C. Cerezo ) (re)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 11/9/1998, Entered: 11/17/1998 Complaint
                                                    COMPLAINT (xi)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 11/9/1998, Entered: 11/17/1998 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                                                      MOTION w/Affidavit in support by Rosaura Machado to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (xi)
                                                        LREF

                                                        Statistics

                                                        This case has been viewed 157 times.

                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                        Space
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                         
                                                        PlainSite
                                                        Sign Up
                                                        Need Password Help?