USA v. Blaise
Criminal Case Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:00-cr-00218-CMH

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Alexandria
Filed 6/22/2000
County Alexandria City
Terminated 6/22/2000
Reopened
Magistrate Case
100-mj-00402
Citation
Offense Level
(18871.F) 18871(a) Threats against the President [ 100-m -402 ]
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 871.F
Offense Level 4
(18871.F)18 USC 871 THREATS AGAINST PRESIDENT (Ct.14/20/00)
Count 2
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 879.F
Offense Level 4
(18879.F)18 USC 879(a) THREATS AGAINST PERSONS PROTECTED BY THE SECRET SERVICE (Ct.24/20/00)
Count 3-4
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 876.F
Offense Level 4
(18876.F)18 USC 876 MAILING THREATENING COMMUNICATIONS (Ct.34/20/00),(Ct.44/20/00)
Def Custody Status Custody This Court
Flags 2255, CLOSED
  Entries (129) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 79 Filed: 1/15/2008, Entered: 1/15/2008 Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Conor B. Dugan on behalf of the USA. (krob)
    LREF
    Blank 78 Filed: 11/21/2007, Entered: 11/21/2007 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
    ORDER denying [76] MOTION for credit for time served and case dismissal by Carl Blaise as to Carl Blaise (1) and any motion regarding credit for time served must be addressed with BOP. Signed by Judge Claude M. Hilton on 11/21/07. Copies sent. (krob )
      LREF
      Blank 77 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: 10/3/2007 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
      NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Nia Ayanna Vidal appearing for Carl Blaise (jlan)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: 10/3/2007 Add and Terminate Attorneys
        Attorney update in case as to Carl Blaise. Attorney Alan H. Yamamoto terminated. (jlan)
          LREF
          Blank 76 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: 9/5/2007, Terminated: 11/21/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
          MOTION for credit for time served and case dismissal by Carl Blaise. (krob)
            LREF
            Blank 75 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: 7/19/2007 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
            NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Alan H. Yamamoto appearing for Carl Blaise. (jlan)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: 7/19/2007 Add and Terminate Attorneys
              Attorney update in case as to Carl Blaise. Attorney Alan H. Yamamoto for added. Attorney Suzanne Little terminated. (jlan)
                LREF
                Blank 74 Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: 3/23/2007 Judgment*Court Filing
                JUDGMENT on Revocation of Supervised Release as to Carl Blaise (1). 3 mos. (to run concurrently w/the term imposed in 1:01cr371) and Supervised Release is terminated. Signed by Judge Claude M. Hilton on 3/23/07. Copies sent. (tarm, )
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: 3/23/2007 Supervised Release - Final Revocation Hrg
                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Claude M. Hilton:Final Hearing re Revocation of Supervised Release as to Carl Blaise held on 3/23/2007. US appeared through: Kevin Jinks. Dft appeared w/counsel Suzanne Little. Dft admits viol. of conditions of supervised release. Court finds dft in viol. Dft committed to custody of US Atty General to serve a term of 3 mos. (on this case and 1:01CR00371) to run concurrently with each other, and supervised release is terminated. Dft remanded to be released today to self surrender on 4/6/07 to the USMS. (Court Reporter Linnell.) (tarm, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 73 Filed: 3/21/2007, Entered: 3/22/2007 Memorandum
                    Memorandum concerning deft's supervised release violation by USA as to Carl Blaise (clar, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 72 Filed: 3/21/2007, Entered: 3/22/2007 Report and OrderCourt Filing
                      Report and Order as to Carl Blaise that the defendant be remanded to the custody of the United States Marshal, and that this case be continued until March 23, 2007, at 9:00 a.m., before the Honorable Claude M. Hilton, for further proceedings under Fed. R. Crim. P. 32.1. Signed by Judge Thomas Rawles Jones Jr. on 03/21/07. c/s (ctat, )
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 3/21/2007, Entered: 3/21/2007 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
                        Terminate Deadlines and Hearings as to Carl Blaise: (ctat, )
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 3/21/2007, Entered: 3/21/2007 Preliminary Revocation Hearing
                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas Rawles Jones Jr.:Preliminary Revocation Hearing as to Carl Blaise held on 3/21/2007. US appeared through: Kevin Jinks. Deft appeared w/atty: Meghan Skelton. Deft admits violation - Court finds PC. Case cont'd for further proceedings before Judge Hilton. Hearing re Revocation of Supervised Release set for 3/23/2007 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. Deft remanded.(Tape #FTR.) (ctat, ).
                            LREF
                            Blank 71 Filed: 3/20/2007, Entered: 3/20/2007 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                            ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Carl Blaise. Signed by Judge Thomas Rawles Jones Jr. on 03/20/07. (ctat, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 70 Filed: 3/20/2007, Entered: 3/20/2007 Warrant Returned Executed
                              Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 03/20/07 in case as to Carl Blaise. (ctat, )
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 3/20/2007, Entered: 3/20/2007 Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings
                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas Rawles Jones Jr.:Initial Appearance re Revocation of Supervised Release as to Carl Blaise held on 3/20/2007. US appeared through: John Snyder. Deft appeared w/o atty. Deft informed of rights. Court to contact atty Little. Status Conference set for 3/21/2007 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones Jr. Deft remanded.(Tape #FTR.) (ctat, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 2/12/2007, Entered: 2/12/2007 Warrant Issued
                                  Arrest Warrant Issued as to Carl Blaise to be lodged as a detainer with the PWCADC. (stas)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 69 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: 2/12/2007 Addendum to Petition on ProbationCourt Filing
                                    Addendum to Petition on Supervised Release as to Carl Blaise that a warrant be issued for violation of supervised release, and that a warrant be lodged as a detainer at the Prince William County Adult Detention Center. Signed by Judge Claude M. Hilton on 1/9/2007. (stas)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 68 Filed: 1/10/2007, Entered: 1/10/2007 Memorandum
                                      Memorandum by USA Concerning Deft's Supervised Release Violation as to Carl Blaise (stas)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 67 Filed: 12/12/2006, Entered: 12/13/2006 Petition and Order on Supervised Release/ProbationCourt Filing
                                        Petition and Order on Supervised Release praying that the Court will order that a warrant be issued for violation of supervised release. Signed by Judge Claude M. Hilton on 12/12/2006. (rban, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 12/12/2006, Entered: 12/13/2006 Warrant Issued
                                          Arrest Warrant Issued as to Carl Blaise. (rban, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 66 Filed: 9/19/2006, Entered: 9/19/2006 Judgment*Court Filing
                                            JUDGMENT on Revocation of Supervised Release as to Carl Blaise (1). 3 mos. w/1 year SR term. Signed by Judge Claude M. Hilton on 9/19/06. Copies sent. (tarm, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: 9/15/2006 Supervised Release - Final Revocation Hrg
                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Claude M. Hilton :Final Hearing re Revocation of Supervised Release as to Carl Blaise held on 9/15/2006. US appeared through: Brian Samuels. Dft appeared w/counsel Suzanne Little. Dft admits viol. of conditions of SR. Court finds dft in violation. Dft committed to custody of US Atty General to serve a term of 3 mos. followed by a 1 year supervised release term. Cond. of SR: Comply with the directions of the probation officer with regard to any mental health care. Counsel for dft to try to coordinate with the USMS on a way to get the dft his medication and to submit order to CMH if necessary. Dft remanded. (Court Reporter Linnell.) (tarm, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 65 Filed: 9/13/2006, Entered: 9/14/2006 Position on Sentencing
                                                Position on Supervised Release Violation by USA as to Carl Blaise (pmil)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 9/12/2006, Entered: 9/13/2006 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                  Set/Reset Hearings as to Carl Blaise: Hearing re Revocation of Supervised Release set for 9/15/2006 09:00 AM before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. (agol, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 9/12/2006, Entered: 9/13/2006 Preliminary Revocation Hearing
                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Liam O'Grady :Preliminary Revocation Hearing as to Carl Blaise held on 9/12/2006. USA appeared through: B. Samuels. Deft. appeared through: Little. Deft. admits to violations. Deft. motion for release - Denied. Case cont. to 9-15-06 @ 9 for further action before Judge Hilton. Deft. is remanded to the USMS. (Tape # FTR.) (agol, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 64 Filed: 9/11/2006, Entered: 9/11/2006 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Carl Blaise . Signed by Judge Liam O'Grady on 09/11/2006. (nbla, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 63 Filed: 9/11/2006, Entered: 9/11/2006 Warrant Returned Executed
                                                        ARREST Warrant Returned Executed on 09/11/2006. in case as to Carl Blaise. (nbla, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 62 Filed: 9/11/2006, Entered: 9/11/2006 Petition and Order on Supervised Release/ProbationCourt Filing
                                                          Petition and Order on Supervised Release that a warrant be issued for violation of supervised release. Signed by Judge Claude M. Hilton on 09/11/06.Copies mailed: yes (pmil)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 9/11/2006, Entered: 9/11/2006 Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings
                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Liam O'Grady :Initial Appearance re Revocation of Supervised Release as to Carl Blaise held on 9/11/2006. USA appeared through; B. Samuels. Deft appeared w/o counse. Court to contact atty; S. Little. USA seeks detention pending a PH/DH on the violation-GRANTED. Deft is remanded. Preliminary Revocation Hearing set for 9/12/2006 01:45 PM before Magistrate Judge Liam O'Grady. (Tape #ftr.) (nbla, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank -- Filed: 9/11/2006, Entered: 9/11/2006 Arrest
                                                              Arrest of Carl Blaise (nbla, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 9/11/2006, Entered: 9/11/2006 Warrant Issued
                                                                ARREST Warrant Issued as to Carl Blaise. (pmil)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/6/2006, Entered: 4/6/2006 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
                                                                  Removed Hearing as to Carl Blaise (per chambers) (agil)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 61 Filed: 3/21/2006, Entered: 3/22/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                    PRELIMINARY Hearing and ORDER as to Carl Blaise. Based on the matters set forth in the Petition and because the Defendant has produced no evidence before the Court, the Magistrate Judge finds that probable cause exists to require the Defendant to appear for a hearing before the Honorable Clude M. Hilton, United States District Judge, on the charge that he violated the terms of his supervised release. It is therefore ORDERED that the defendant, Carl Blaise appear before the Honorable Claude M. Hilton, on Friday, April 7, 2006 at 9:00 a.m. at 401 Courthouse Square Alexandria, Virginia - entered by Magistrate Judge Barry R. Poretz on 3/21/2006. (jsch)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/21/2006, Entered: 3/22/2006 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                      REVOCATION of Supervised Release Hearing Set as to Carl Blaise: for 4/7/2006 09:00 AM before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. (jsch)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 3/21/2006, Entered: 3/21/2006 Preliminary Revocation Hearing
                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Barry R. Poretz :Preliminary Revocation Hearing as to Carl Blaise held on 3/21/2006. USA appeared through; M. Frank. Deft. appeared w/atty; S. Little. Deft admitted Probable Cause as to the allegations of violating his conditions of supervised release. Deft is released and recognized to appear on 04/07/06 at 9:00 am, for a hrg on the violation. Hearing re Revocation of Supervised Release set for 4/7/2006 09:00 AM before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. (Tape #ftr.) (nbla, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 3/14/2006, Entered: 3/15/2006 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                          Set/Reset Hearings as to Carl Blaise: Preliminary Revocation Hearing set for 3/21/2006 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Barry R. Poretz. (agol, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 3/14/2006, Entered: 3/15/2006 Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                            Attorney update in case as to Carl Blaise. Attorney Peter Linn Goldman terminated. (agol, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/14/2006, Entered: 3/15/2006 Order Appointing Public Defender
                                                                              ORAL ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Carl Blaise Suzanne Little for appointed. . Entered by Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 3/14/2006. (agol, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 3/14/2006, Entered: 3/15/2006 Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings
                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan :Initial Appearance re Revocation of Supervised Release as to Carl Blaise held on 3/14/2006. USA appeared through: Mrazek. Deft. appeared through; w/out counsel. Deft. motion the court to appt. counsel - Granted. Case cont. to 3-21-06 @ 10 before Judge Poretz for a preliminary hearing on the violations. Deft. is cont.on supervised release. (Tape #FTR.) (agol, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 60 Filed: 2/17/2006, Entered: 2/17/2006 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                  Summons Returned Executed on 02/17/06 as to Carl Blaise. (stas)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 2/10/2006, Entered: 2/10/2006 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                    Set Hearing as to Carl Blaise: Preliminary Revocation Hearing set for 3/14/2006 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (pmil)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 2/10/2006, Entered: 2/10/2006 Summons Issued
                                                                                      Summons Issued in case for 03/14/06 at 10:00 a.m. before Theresa C. Buchanan as to Carl Blaise (pmil)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 59 Filed: 2/8/2006, Entered: 2/10/2006 Petition and Order on Supervised Release/ProbationCourt Filing
                                                                                        Petition and Order on Supervised Release that the Court will Order a summons be issued directing that the offender appear before the Court to show cause why supervision should not be revoked. Signed by Judge Claude M. Hilton on 02/08/06. Copies mailed: yes (pmil)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 58 Filed: 12/11/2003, Entered: 12/12/2003 Judgment on Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision
                                                                                          JUDGMENT AND OPINION OF USCA (certified copy) as to Carl Blaise Re: [52-1] appeal denying the certificate of appealability and dismissing the appeal (stas)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 12/11/2003, Entered: 12/12/2003 Appeal Record Returned
                                                                                            Record on Appeal as to Carl Blaise returned from U.S. Court of Appeals: [52-1] appeal # volumes returned 6 (stas)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 57 Filed: 12/8/2003, Entered: 12/9/2003 USCA Order
                                                                                              USCA Order (decided 12/02/03) as to Carl Blaise that the petition by Carl Blaise for rehearing en banc is denied (stas)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 56 Filed: 9/22/2003, Entered: 9/24/2003 Appeal - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                copy of OPINION of the USCA decided 09/17/03 Denying the certificate of appealability and dismissing the appeal. as to Carl Blaise re: [52-1] appeal (clerk)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 9/17/2003, Entered: 9/22/2003 Order
                                                                                                  So Ordered: as to Carl Blaise denying [53-1] motion by Carl Blaise to Proceed in Forma Pauperis as to Carl Blaise (1) ( Signed by Judge Claude M. Hilton ) Copies Mailed: y (clerk)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 55 Filed: 9/16/2003, Entered: 9/16/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER denying [54-1] motion by Carl Blaise for Release from Custody pending appeal pursuant to title 18:3145(c) as to Carl Blaise (1) ( Signed by Judge Claude Hilton ) Copies Mailed: y (clerk)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 9/2/2003, Entered: 9/2/2003 Initial Paper Record Transmitted to 4CCA
                                                                                                      Certified and transmitted record on appeal to U.S. Court of Appeals as to Carl Blaise : [52-1] appeal (Vol.6 UNDERSEAL) (clerk)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 9/2/2003, Entered: 9/2/2003 Presentence Investigation Report
                                                                                                        PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT (Under Seal in vault) as to Carl Blaise (clerk)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 54 Filed: 8/14/2003, Entered: 8/20/2003, Terminated: 9/16/2003 Motion for Release from Custody
                                                                                                          MOTION by Carl Blaise for Release from Custody pending appeal pursuant to title 18:3145(c) (clerk)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 53 Filed: 8/14/2003, Entered: 8/20/2003 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                            MOTION by Carl Blaise to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (clerk)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 4/29/2003, Entered: 4/29/2003 Initial Paper Record Transmitted to 4CCA
                                                                                                              Certified and transmitted record on appeal to U.S. Court of Appeals as to Carl Blaise : [52-1] appeal Vol. 1 (Pleadings 1-52) Vol. 2 (Pleading 17) Vol. 3 (Pleading 39) Vol. 4 (Pleading 40) Vol. 5 (Pleading 24 UNDERSEAL) (ctat)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 4/28/2003, Entered: 4/29/2003 USCA Case Number
                                                                                                                USCA Case Number as to Carl Blaise Re: [52-1] appeal USCA Number: 03-6636 Case Manager: S.J. Beasley (ctat)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 52 Filed: 4/18/2003, Entered: 4/18/2003, Terminated: 12/11/2003 Notice of Appeal -Final Judgment
                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEAL of order dated 04/07/03 by Carl Blaise (clerk)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 4/18/2003, Entered: 4/18/2003 Transmission of Notice of Appeal to 4CCA
                                                                                                                    Notice of appeal and certified copy of order dated 04/07/03 and docket as to Carl Blaise to USCA: [52-1] appeal (clerk)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 51 Filed: 4/7/2003, Entered: 4/9/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER denying [49-1] motion by Carl Blaise for Reconsideration of [47-1] order ( Signed by Judge Claude M. Hilton ) Copies Mailed: y (clerk)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 50 Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: 1/31/2003 Response/Reply - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by Carl Blaise as to [44-1] opposition response as to Carl Blaise (clerk)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 49 Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: 1/31/2003, Terminated: 4/7/2003 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                          MOTION by Carl Blaise for Reconsideration of [47-1] order (clerk)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 48 Filed: 1/13/2003, Entered: 1/14/2003 Memorandum/OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OPINION as to Carl Blaise [42-1] 2255 motion by Carl Blaise ( Signed by Judge Claude M. Hilton ) (clerk)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 47 Filed: 1/13/2003, Entered: 1/14/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER denying [42-1] 2255 motion as to Carl Blaise (1) ( Signed by Judge Claude M. Hilton ) Mailed: y (clerk)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 1/7/2003, Entered: 1/8/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                So Ordered: granting [46-1] request by Carl Blaise to Proceed in Forma Pauperis ( Signed by Judge Claude M. Hilton ) Copies Mailed: y (pmet)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 46 Filed: 1/3/2003, Entered: 1/6/2003 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                  Application/REQUEST by Carl Blaise to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (pmet)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 45 Filed: 1/3/2003, Entered: 1/6/2003 Response in Support
                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM by Carl Blaise in support of [42-1] 2255 motion (pmet)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 44 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/2/2003 Response in Opposition
                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by USA as to Carl Blaise in opposition to [42-1] 2255 motion (pmet)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 43 Filed: 12/12/2002, Entered: 12/13/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        Order requesting USA to respond to [42-1] 2255 motion by Carl Blaise within 23 days of this order. ( Signed by Judge Claude M. Hilton ) (pmet) Modified on 01/02/2003
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 42 Filed: 12/11/2002, Entered: 12/11/2002, Terminated: 1/13/2003 Motion to Vacate(2255)
                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Vacate 2255 by Carl Blaise ( Civil Action # 02-1808) (pmet)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 41 Filed: 7/11/2002, Entered: 7/15/2002 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                            MOTION by Carl Blaise For this court to order the defendant's court appointed attorney to send the defendant,any and all of his legal files in lieu of the deft's filing a petition for writ of mandamus (clerk)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 40 Filed: 4/24/2002, Entered: 4/24/2002 Transcript
                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT filed in case as to Carl Blaise for dates of 12/7/01 (also filed in 01-371) (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 39 Filed: 4/24/2002, Entered: 4/24/2002 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT filed in case as to Carl Blaise for dates of 9/26/01(also filed for 01-371) (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 38 Filed: 12/10/2001, Entered: 12/11/2001 Judgment*Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  JUDGMENT Carl Blaise (1) count(s) 1, 2 . 12 months as to counts 1 and 2 to run concurrently with each other (CR01-371-A to run consecutive) w/3 yr supervised release term w/conds and $200 S/A ( Signed by Judge Claude M. Hilton ) Copies Mailed: 12/11/01 (agil)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 12/10/2001, Entered: 1/6/2003 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                                                                    CASE assigned to Judge Claude M. Hilton (pmet)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 12/7/2001, Entered: 12/10/2001 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                                                      Sentencing held before Judge Claude M. Hilton ( Reporter: Linnell) USA appeared through: William Lovett, Dennis Kennedy. Dft appeared w/counsel Peter Goldman. Carl Blaise (1) count(s) 1, 2. JUDGMENT: Gulity. Dft's motion for downward departure - denied. Dft committed to the custody of BOP for 12 months as to counts 1 and 2 to run concurrently with each other.(Sentence in CR-01-371 to run consecutively) 3 year supervised release term and assessed $200. Fine waived. Cond of sr: mental health treatment. US motion for upper range of g/l - granted. Court recommends dft receive mental health treatment while incarcerated. Dft remanded. (agil) Modified on 12/10/2001
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 37 Filed: 12/6/2001, Entered: 12/6/2001, Terminated: 12/10/2001 Response in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by USA and opposition to [34-1] motion by Carl Blaise for Downward Departure and to other Sentencing Factors (jcup)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 36 Filed: 12/5/2001, Entered: 12/5/2001 Response in Support
                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in support of [34-1] motion by Carl Blaise for Downward Departure based upon Diminished mental Capacity (jcup)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 35 Filed: 12/5/2001, Entered: 12/5/2001 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Hearing Motion Hearing Deadline set for 9:00 12/7/01 for Carl Blaise for [34-1] motion by Carl Blaise for Downward Departure based upon Diminished mental Capacity (jcup)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 34 Filed: 12/5/2001, Entered: 12/5/2001, Terminated: 12/10/2001 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by Carl Blaise for Downward Departure based upon Diminished mental Capacity (jcup)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 33 Filed: 12/5/2001, Entered: 12/5/2001, Terminated: 12/10/2001 Response/Reply - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by Carl Blaise to Presentence Report (jcup)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 32 Filed: 11/15/2001, Entered: 11/15/2001 Position on Sentencing
                                                                                                                                                                  POSITION with Respect to Sentencing Factors by USA as to Carl Blaise (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 31 Filed: 9/26/2001, Entered: 9/27/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER as to Carl Blaise granting [30-1] motion by USA to Dismiss Counts 3 and 4 of the Indictment as to Carl Blaise (1) ( Signed by Judge Claude M. Hilton ) Copies Mailed: yes (psid)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 30 Filed: 9/26/2001, Entered: 9/27/2001, Terminated: 9/26/2001 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA as to Carl Blaise by USA to Dismiss Counts 3 and 4 of the Indictment (psid)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 29 Filed: 9/26/2001, Entered: 9/27/2001 Description not available
                                                                                                                                                                        STATEMENT OF FACTS as to Carl Blaise (psid)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 28 Filed: 9/26/2001, Entered: 9/27/2001 Plea Agreement
                                                                                                                                                                          Plea Agreement as to Carl Blaise (psid)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 9/26/2001, Entered: 9/27/2001 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                            Sentencing set for 9:00 12/7/01 for Carl Blaise , Carl Blaise (1) count(s) 1, 2 (psid)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 9/26/2001, Entered: 9/27/2001 Dismissal of Counts on Government Motion
                                                                                                                                                                              DISMISSAL of Count(s) on Government Motion as to Carl Blaise Counts Dismissed: Carl Blaise (1) count(s) 3-4 (psid)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 9/26/2001, Entered: 9/27/2001 Plea - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                PLEA entered by Carl Blaise . Court accepts plea. by Carl Blaise Guilty: Carl Blaise (1) count(s) 1, 2 Terminated motion: [21-1] motion by USA to Extend the time period of hospitalization of deft. to restore compentency and for examination of deft. to determine for the existence of insanity at the time of the alleged offenses as to Carl Blaise (1), [11-1] motion by Carl Blaise for Reconsideration of [10-1] order dated 7/11/00 as to Carl Blaise (1) (psid)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 9/26/2001, Entered: 9/27/2001 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                  Change of Plea Hearing as to Carl Blaise held before Judge Claude M. Hilton ( Reporter: Linnell) USA appeared through: Dennis Kennedy Dft(s) appeared w/counsel Peter Goldman. Dft w/d NG plea and PG to Counts 1 and 2 of the Indictment (& the Criminal Information filed in 00-371-A) Pleas accepted. US' motion to dismiss Counts 3 and 4 of the Indictment - granted, Order entered in open court. Referred to PO for PSIR and cont'd to 12/7/01 @ 9:00 for g/l sent. Dft remanded. (psid)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 27 Filed: 9/24/2001, Entered: 9/25/2001 Proposed Jury Instructions
                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Jury Instructions by USA as to Carl Blaise (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 26 Filed: 9/24/2001, Entered: 9/24/2001 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                      Exhibit list by USA as to Carl Blaise (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 25 Filed: 9/24/2001, Entered: 9/24/2001 Proposed Jury Instructions
                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Jury Instructions by USA as to Carl Blaise (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 24 Filed: 9/12/2001, Entered: 9/12/2001 Psychiatric Report +
                                                                                                                                                                                          Psychiatric Report as to Carl Blaise (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 23 Filed: 8/3/2001, Entered: 8/3/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER as to Carl Blaise that this matter is CONTINUED to 10/1/01, for trial w/a jury and motions, if any are filed, shall be filed within 20 days and will be heard on 9/14/01J ( Signed by Judge Claude M. Hilton) Copies Mailed: yes (psid)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 8/3/2001, Entered: 8/3/2001 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion Hearing Deadline as to Carl Blaise, USA set 9:00 9/14/01 (psid)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 8/3/2001, Entered: 8/3/2001 Jury Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                Jury trial proceedings as to Carl Blaise set at 10:00 10/1/01 for Carl Blaise (psid)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 8/3/2001, Entered: 8/3/2001 Waiver of Speedy Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORAL WAIVER of Speedy Trial by Carl Blaise (psid)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 8/3/2001, Entered: 8/3/2001 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Status conference as to Carl Blaise held before Judge Claude M. Hilton ( Reporter: Linnell) USA appeared William Lovett and Dana Boente Dft(s) appeared w/counsel Peter Goldman. Court finds dft competent to stand trial. Dft waives speedy trial. Case set for trial by jury on 10/1/01. 20 days to file motions w/argument on 9/14/01 @ 9:00. Dft remanded. (psid)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 7/27/2001, Entered: 7/27/2001 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Status conference as to Carl Blaise reset at 9:00 8/3/01 for Carl Blaise (psid)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 7/27/2001, Entered: 7/27/2001 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute entry as to Carl Blaise : before Judge Claude M. Hilton ( Reporter: Linnell) USA appeared through: Dennis Kennedy and William Lovett Dft(s) appeared w/out counsel. Matter on for status. Counsel for dft not present. Cont'd 1 week, to 8/3/01 @ 9:00. Dft remanded. (psid)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 22 Filed: 2/23/2001, Entered: 2/23/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDERED that the deft. is commited for an additional period of time not to exceed (4) months,to FCI Butner N.C.,for examination by at least (1) qualified psychiatrist to determine the existence of a mental disease or defect at the time of the offenses alleged in the indictment which would bear on the issue of guilt at trial and for treatment to restore competency. The USMS and BOP and thier representatives are authorized to take custody of and transport the deft. neccesary for purposes of the examination and treatment.The USMS and BOP shall promptly return the deft to the district as soon as the examination and treatment is completed. Upon completion of the examination and treatment,the examiner shall prompyly file with the court a report of the psychiatric or psychological examination of the deft with copies served on counsel for the United States and counsel for the deft.Any period of delay for purposes of conducting the examination is excluded time within the meaning of title 18 USC 3161(h). as to Carl Blaise ( Signed by Judge Claude M. Hilton Copies Mailed: y (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 21 Filed: 2/22/2001, Entered: 2/22/2001, Terminated: 9/26/2001 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA as to Carl Blaise by USA to Extend the time period of hospitalization of deft. to restore compentency and for examination of deft. to determine for the existence of insanity at the time of the alleged offenses (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 20 Filed: 8/23/2000, Entered: 8/23/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER as to Carl Blaise that the the dft is committed for a reasonable time, not to exceed 4 mos. to FCI, Butner, NC for examination by a qualified psychiatrist to determine the existence of a mental health disease at the time of the offenses and for treatment to restore competency. The USMS and BOP are authorized to take custody of and transport the dft as necessary for purposes of the examination and treatment and shall promptly return the dft to this district as soon as the exam and treatment is completed. The examiner shall promptly file a report of the exam. (See Order for details) ( Signed by Judge Claude M. Hilton) Copies Mailed: yes (psid)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 8/22/2000, Entered: 8/23/2000 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute entry as to Carl Blaise : Judge Hilton. Reporter: Linnell. US appeared through: William Lovett. Dft appeared w/counsel Peter Goldman. Matter on for [18-1] motion For Hospitalization of Deft. To Restore Competency - unopposed and denied per dft being sent for mental health exam. Motion for Examination of Deft. to determine The Existence of Insanity At The Alleged Offenses - argued and granted. US to submit Order transporting dft to Butner, NC for mental health exam. Trial is removed from docket (currently set for 9/12/00) to be reset when dft returns from Butner. Dft remanded. (psid)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 19 Filed: 8/21/2000, Entered: 8/21/2000 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Hearing: Motion Hearing Deadline set for 9:00 a.m. on 8/22/00 for Carl Blaise for [18-1] motion For Hospitalization of Deft. To Restore Competency and For Examination of Deft. To Determine For The Existence of Insanity At The Alleged Offenses (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 18 Filed: 8/17/2000, Entered: 8/17/2000, Terminated: 8/22/2000 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA as to Carl Blaise For Hospitalization of Deft. To Restore Competency and For Examination of Deft. To Determine For The Existence of Insanity At The Alleged Offenses (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 17 Filed: 8/2/2000, Entered: 8/2/2000 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT filed in case as to Carl Blaise for dates of 7/21/00 (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 16 Filed: 7/26/2000, Entered: 7/26/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER as to Carl Blaise, for Discovery and Inspection ( Signed by Judge Claude M. Hilton ) Copies Mailed: y (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 15 Filed: 7/24/2000, Entered: 7/25/2000 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Supplement to [11-1] motion by Carl Blaise for Reconsideration of [10-1] order dated 7/11/00 for mental health examination by Carl Blaise (jcup)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 14 Filed: 7/21/2000, Entered: 7/21/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED ORDER as to Carl Blaise granting [13-1] motion by USA for a mental health examination as to Carl Blaise and the Dft shall undergo a psychiatric or psychological examination in accordance with the procedure set forth in 18 USC 4247 to determine whether the dft is competent to stand trial. (See Order for details) ( Signed by Judge Claude M. Hilton ) Copies Mailed: yes (USMS, BOP, AUSA and counsel for dft) (psid)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 7/21/2000, Entered: 7/21/2000 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion hearing held as to Carl Blaise before Judge Claude M. Hilton ( Reporter: Linnell) USA appeared through: William Lovett Dft(s) appeared w/counsel Peter Goldman. US' amended motion for mental health exam - argued and granted. Amended Order clarifying mental evaluation entered in open court. Dft remanded. (psid)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 13 Filed: 7/19/2000, Entered: 7/20/2000, Terminated: 7/21/2000 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMEMDED MOTION by USA for Mental Health Examination as to Carl Blaise by USA (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 12 Filed: 7/17/2000, Entered: 7/17/2000 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Hearing as to Carl Blaise :, Motion Hearing Deadline set for 9:00 7/21/00 for Carl Blaise for [11-1] motion by Carl Blaise for Reconsideration of [10-1] order dated 7/11/00 (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 11 Filed: 7/17/2000, Entered: 7/17/2000, Terminated: 9/26/2001 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by Carl Blaise for Reconsideration of [10-1] order dated 7/11/00 (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 10 Filed: 7/11/2000, Entered: 7/12/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER as to Carl Blaise granting [9-1] motion by USA for Mental Health Exam as to Carl Blaise (1). ORDERED that the USMS shall surrender the deft. to the custody of Attorney General for psychiatric or psychlogical exam,to determine whether the deft. is competent to stand trial.The deft. shall be committed to the custody of the Attorney General for the purposes of the exam not to exceed forty-five (45) days. Unless impractible,the exam shall be conducted by Dr. Robert Phillips at the Alexandria Detention Center.The USMS and BOP are authorized to take custody of and transport deft. for purposes of examination.Upon completion the examiner shall promptly file with the court a report of psychiatric or psychological exam of the deft. with copies served on counsel and USAO. ( Signed by Judge Claude M. Hilton ) Copies Mailed: y (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 9 Filed: 7/10/2000, Entered: 7/10/2000, Terminated: 7/11/2000 Motion for Medical Exam
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA as to Carl Blaise by USA for Mental Health Exam (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 8 Filed: 7/5/2000, Entered: 7/6/2000 Notice of Intent to Use Evidence
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF INTENT to Use Specified Evidence by USA as to Carl Blais (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 7/3/2000, Entered: 7/5/2000 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Arraignment as to Carl Blais held before Judge Ellis. Deft WFA, PNG and demanded Jury trial. The Court instructed the clerk to change the spelling of Deft's name on the case to Blaise (note: Ind. says Blais) Motion Hearing set for 9:00 7/21/00 for Carl Blais Motion Filings due 5:00 7/17/00 for Carl Blais ; Jury Trial set for 10:00 8/29/00 for Carl Blais ; Exhibits due 8/24/00 ( Reporter: Rodriquez) USA appeared through: William Lovett and Frank Kennedy Dft(s) appeared w/ counsel: Joseph Bowman in for Peter Goldman. Deft remanded. (tbul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 7 Filed: 6/22/2000, Entered: 6/23/2000 Indictment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              INDICTMENT as to Carl Blais (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3-4 (Preliminary Examination cancelled.) (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 6/22/2000, Entered: 6/23/2000 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Arraignment as to Carl Blais set for 9:00 on 7/3/00 (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 5/31/2000, Entered: 6/1/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER OF DETENTION as to Carl Blais ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Barry R. Poretz ) [ 1:00-m -402 ] (jsch)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 5/31/2000, Entered: 5/31/2000 Detention Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Detention hearing as to Carl Blais held before Magistrate Judge Barry R. Poretz ( Tape 230) USA appeared through: Lovett Dft(s) appeared through: Goldman. This matter came on for a DH/PH. Probable cause - found. Gov't requested Detention - Granted. Deft. remanded. [ 1:00-m -402 ] (jsch)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 5/26/2000, Entered: 5/26/2000 CJA 20 Appointment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CJA 20 as to Carl Blais Appointment of Attorney Peter Linn Goldman () [ 1:00-m -402 ] (pmet)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 5/26/2000, Entered: 5/26/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Carl Blais ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Barry R. Poretz ) [ 1:00-m -402 ] (jsch)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 5/26/2000, Entered: 5/26/2000 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CJA 23 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Carl Blais [ 1:00-m -402 ] (jsch)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 5/26/2000, Entered: 5/26/2000 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT by USA as to Carl Blais Re: [1-1] complaint [ 1:00-m -402 ] (pmet)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 5/26/2000, Entered: 5/26/2000 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT as to Carl Blais [ 1:00-m -402 ] (pmet)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 5/26/2000, Entered: 5/26/2000 Initial Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Initial appearance as to Carl Blais held ;Preliminary Examination set for 2:00 5/31/00 for Carl Blais before Magistrate Judge Barry R. Poretz ( Tape 230) USA appeared through: Lovitt Dft(s) appeared through: w/o Counsel (Defendant informed of rights.) Deft. requested a court appt. atty. - Granted. Gov't requested Detention - Granted. Case cont. to 5/31/00 @ 2:00 p.m. for DH/PH. Deft. remanded. [ 1:00-m -402 ] (jsch)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 5/26/2000, Entered: 5/26/2000 Arrest
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ARREST of Carl Blais [ 1:00-m -402 ] (jsch)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 48 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?