Out of Chaos, Ltd., et al v. Federal Ins. Co., et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:00-cv-00592-LMB

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Out of Chaos, Ltd., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Edward B MacMahon Jr.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward B. MacMahon +1 540 687 3902 +1 540 687 6366 ebmjr@macmahon-law.com
v.
No Logo Aon Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Griffith L. Green +1 202 736 8126 +1 202 736 8711 ggreen@sidley.com
No Logo Aon/Albert G. Ruben Insurance Services, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Griffith L. Green +1 202 736 8126 +1 202 736 8711 ggreen@sidley.com
No Logo J. Michael Curtis, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cherie B. Artz +1 202 216 4200 +1 703 821 0561
Office Alexandria
Filed 4/7/2000
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $26000000
Nature of Suit 110 - Contract - Insurance
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Loudoun
Terminated 11/17/2000
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 00-2592[]
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, JURY
  Entries (128) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 110 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: 10/19/2001 Costs Taxed
Costs taxed in the amount of $ 1,902.78 for Aon Corporation, Aon/Albert G Ruben - taxed and ent by the Clerk c/m (jsol)
    LREF
    Blank 109 Filed: 10/12/2001, Entered: 10/18/2001 Bill of Costs
    Bill of costs in the amount of 2,822.71 by Aon/Albert G Ruben (Documentation for Bill of Costs filed 12/21/00 w/copy of costs form) (jsol)
      LREF
      Blank 108 Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: 9/11/2001 USCA Judgment
      JUDGMENT OF USCA (certified copy) together with the Opinion, decided 8/3/01, Affirming the decision of the USDC, Re: [104-1] appeal (clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 107 Filed: 8/6/2001, Entered: 8/6/2001 USCA Mandate
        Opinion of USCA, decided 8/3/01, Affirming the decision of the USDC, re: [104-1] appeal by Out of Chaos, Ltd. (clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 106 Filed: 1/29/2001, Entered: 1/29/2001 TranscriptCourt Filing
          TRANSCRIPT for dates of 8/18/00 Motions Hrg. before Judge Ellis, 36 Pp. (tbul)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 1/5/2001, Entered: 1/9/2001 USCA Case Number
            USCA Case Number Re: [104-1] appeal by Out of Chaos, Ltd. CASE MANAGER: CD Ida USCA NUMBER: 00-2592 (clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 105 Filed: 12/21/2000, Entered: 1/2/2001 Bill of Costs
              Bill of costs in the amount of 2,822.71 filed by Aon Corporation, Aon/Albert G Ruben (clerk)
                LREF
                Blank 104 Filed: 12/8/2000, Entered: 12/11/2000 Notice of Appeal
                NOTICE OF APPEAL OF [102-1] judgment order and, [101-1] order dated 11/17/00 by Out of Chaos, Ltd. FILING FEE $ 105.00 RECEIPT # 100141636. Copies sent to Out of Chaos, Ltd., Aon Corporation, Aon/Albert G Ruben, J. Michael Curtis. Copy of docket entries, notice of appeal, order and transmittal forwarded to the USCA. (clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank 103 Filed: 12/4/2000, Entered: 12/4/2000 Transcript
                  TRANSCRIPT for dates of 11/17/00 (LMB), filed. (clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank 102 Filed: 11/17/2000, Entered: 11/20/2000 Judgment*
                    JUDGMENT pursuant to the Order of this Court, entered 11/17/00 and in accordance with FRCP 58, JUDGMENT is hereby entered in favor of Aon Corporation, Aon/Albert G Ruben against Out of Chaos, Ltd. Copies Mailed: 11.17.00 [EOD DATE: 11/20/00] (rtra)
                      LREF
                      Blank 101 Filed: 11/17/2000, Entered: 11/20/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                      For the reasons stated in open court, ORDER granting [96-1] motion by Aon/Albert G Ruben, Aon Corporation for Summary Judgment as to Counts V and VI of the Amended Complaint. ( signed by Judge Leonie M. Brinkema ) Copies Mailed: 11.17.00 [EOD Date: 11/20/00] (rtra)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 11/17/2000, Entered: 11/20/2000 Terminated Case
                        Case closed (rtra)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 11/17/2000, Entered: 11/20/2000 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                          CASE assigned to Judge Leonie M. Brinkema (rtra)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 11/17/2000, Entered: 11/20/2000 Motion Hearing
                            Motion hearing held before Judge Brinkema; Reporter: Thomson; Appearances by counsel for parties re: [96-1] motion by Aon/Albert G Ruben, Aon Corporation for Summary Judgment-Argued and Granted. Order to follow. (rtra)
                              LREF
                              Blank 100 Filed: 11/16/2000, Entered: 11/16/2000 Response/Reply - Miscellaneous
                              REPLY MEMORANDUM in support by Aon Corporation, Aon/Albert G Ruben, of [96-1] motion by Aon/Albert G Ruben, Aon Corporation for Summary Judgment (clar) Modified on 01/09/2001
                                LREF
                                Blank 99 Filed: 11/15/2000, Entered: 11/15/2000 Memorandum in Opposition
                                MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities by Out of Chaos, Ltd. in opposition to [96-1] motion by Aon/Albert G Ruben, Aon Corporation for Summary Judgment (large pleading) (clar)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 98 Filed: 11/3/2000, Entered: 11/6/2000 Notice of Hearing.
                                  NOTICE of Hearing: Motion Hearing Deadline set for 10:00 11/17/00 for [96-1] motion by Aon/Albert G Ruben, Aon Corporation for Summary Judgment (clerk)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 97 Filed: 11/3/2000, Entered: 11/6/2000 Memorandum in Support
                                    MEMORANDUM by Aon Corporation, Aon/Albert G Ruben in support of [96-1] motion by Aon/Albert G Ruben, Aon Corporation for Summary Judgment (clerk)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 96 Filed: 11/3/2000, Entered: 11/6/2000, Terminated: 11/17/2000 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                      MOTION by Aon/Albert G Ruben, Aon Corporation for Summary Judgment (clerk)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 95 Filed: 10/30/2000, Entered: 10/31/2000 Objection
                                        OBJECTION by plaintiff Out of Chaos, Ltd. to [92-1] exhibits list by Aon/Albert G Ruben, Aon Corporation (clerk)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 94 Filed: 10/30/2000, Entered: 10/31/2000 Objection
                                          OBJECTION by defendant Aon Corporation, defendant Aon/Albert G Ruben to [90-1] exhibits list by Out of Chaos, Ltd. (clerk)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 93 Filed: 10/30/2000, Entered: 10/31/2000 Objection
                                            OBJECTION by defendant Aon Corporation, defendant Aon/Albert G Ruben to [91-1] by Out of Chaos, Ltd. (clerk)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 92 Filed: 10/19/2000, Entered: 10/19/2000 Miscellaneous Document
                                              Pretrial Statement (Witness List and Exhibit List) by Aon Corporation, Aon/Albert G Ruben (clerk)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 91 Filed: 10/19/2000, Entered: 10/19/2000 Remark
                                                Designation of Deposition Transcripts for Potential Use at Trial filed by plaintiff Out of Chaos, Ltd. (clerk)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 90 Filed: 10/19/2000, Entered: 10/19/2000 Exhibit
                                                  Exhibit list by Out of Chaos, Ltd. (clerk)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 89 Filed: 10/19/2000, Entered: 10/19/2000 Witness List
                                                    Witness list by Out of Chaos, Ltd. (clerk)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 10/19/2000, Entered: 10/19/2000 Jury Trial Begun
                                                      Jury Trial set at 10:00 12/5/00 (clerk)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 10/19/2000, Entered: 10/19/2000 Pretrial Conference - Final
                                                        Pre-Trial Conference held; Judge Hilton; appearances of counsel; case set for trial by jury on 12/5/00 (clerk)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 10/12/2000, Entered: 10/16/2000 Docket Annotation
                                                          Received order back in the mail for Cherie B. Artz, Esq., forwarding order expired (clerk)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 88 Filed: 9/29/2000, Entered: 10/3/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            For the reasons stated in open court, ORDER denying [72-1] motion to Intervene by J. Michael Curtis, denying [77-1] motion by J. Michael Curtis for Preliminary Injunction, denying [77-2] motion by J. Michael Curtis for Temporary Restraining Order. Ordered that Out of Chaos, Ltd's Petition for Release of Fees and Expenses is Granted and that the Temporary Restraining Order imposed on September 18, 2000 is hereby VACATED. ( signed by Judge Leonie M. Brinkema ) Copies Mailed: 09.29.00 [EOD Date: 10/3/00] (rtra) Modified on 10/18/2000
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 87 Filed: 9/29/2000, Entered: 9/29/2000 Affidavit
                                                              AFFIDAVIT by Cherie B. Artz (clerk)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 86 Filed: 9/29/2000, Entered: 9/29/2000, Terminated: 11/17/2000 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                RESPONSE by J. Michael Curtis in opposition to [82-1] petition by Out of Chaos, Ltd. for release of fees and expenses (clerk) Modified on 09/29/2000
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 85 Filed: 9/29/2000, Entered: 9/29/2000 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                  RBUTTAL by J. Michael Curtis to response in opposition to [72-1] motion to Intervene (clerk)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 9/29/2000, Entered: 10/3/2000 Motion Hearing
                                                                    Motion hearing held before Judge Brinkema; Reporter: Thomson; Appearances by counsel for parties re: [72-1] motion to Intervene by J. Michael Curtis-Argued and Denied, [77-1] motion by J. Michael Curtis for Preliminary Injunction-Argued and Denied. Order to follow (rtra)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 84 Filed: 9/28/2000, Entered: 9/28/2000 Affidavit
                                                                      Declaration of Randall M. Starrett in opposition to [77-1] motion by J. Michael Curtis for Preliminary Injunction (stas)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 83 Filed: 9/27/2000, Entered: 9/27/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        Consent Order Extending Time - The current discovery cutoff of 9/29/00 is extended by ten business days to and including 10/13/00. The current date and time for the pretrial conference, 10/19/00 at 11:30 a.m., is not changed. ( signed by Judge Claude M. Hilton ) Copies Mailed: yes (clerk) Modified on 10/02/2000
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 82 Filed: 9/27/2000, Entered: 9/27/2000 Complaint - Miscellaneous
                                                                          Petition for Release of Fees and Expenses by Out of Chaos, Ltd. (Under Seal for Eyes of Counsel Only) (clar) Modified on 09/28/2000
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 81 Filed: 9/27/2000, Entered: 9/27/2000 Affidavit
                                                                            AFFIDAVIT of Edward B. MacMahon (Under Seal for Eyes of Counsel Only) (clar) Modified on 09/28/2000
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 80 Filed: 9/27/2000, Entered: 9/27/2000 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                              Opposition by Out of Chaos, Ltd. to [72-1] motion to Intervene by J. Michael Curtis (clar)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 79 Filed: 9/21/2000, Entered: 9/25/2000 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                NOTICE of Hearing: Motion Hearing Deadline set for 10:00 9/29/00 for [72-1] motion to Intervene by J. Michael Curtis (clar)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 76 Filed: 9/21/2000, Entered: 9/22/2000 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                  NOTICE of Hearing: Motion Hearing Deadline set for 10:00 9/29/00 for [72-1] motion to Intervene by J. Michael Curtis (clar)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 75 Filed: 9/21/2000, Entered: 9/21/2000 Stipulation
                                                                                    STIPULATION of DISMISSAL with Prejudice pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1) as to the defts Federal Insurance Company, Vigilant Insurance Company and Pacific Indemnity Company as parties to this action. Each party to bear its own cost. (clerk)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 74 Filed: 9/19/2000, Entered: 9/21/2000 Notice
                                                                                      NOTICE by Out of Chaos, Ltd. to take deposition of Aon Corporation and Aon/Albert G. Ruben Insurance Services (clerk)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 73 Filed: 9/19/2000, Entered: 9/19/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                        ORDERED that the defendant insurance companies deposit the proceeds of the settlement agreement into the escrow account of Edward B. MacMahon, Jr., Esquire; and it is further ORDERED that Mr. MacMahon not dispurse any portion of those proceeds until further relief from the Court is granted; and it is further ORDERED that Mr. MacMahon may prepare a petition, under seal and "for eyes of counsel only", for recovery of his attorney's fees and litigation expenses accrued in representing OCL to date; and it is further ORDERED that OCL's counsel promptly inform Curtis' counsel if OCL enters into a settlement agreement with any other defendants in the above captioned action before any funds resulting from such an agreement are disbursed; and it is further ORDERED that counsel for OCL and Curtis appear before this Court on Friday, September 29, 2000 at 10:00 a.m. to address fully whether a preliminary injunction is appropriate. [SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS] ( signed by Judge Leonie M. Brinkema ) Copies Mailed: 09.19.00 [EOD Date: 9/19/00] (rtra)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 9/19/2000, Entered: 9/19/2000 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                          Hearing Deadline as to Out of Chaos, Ltd. set 10:00 9/29/00 before Judge Leonie M. Brinkema for Preliminary Injunction Hearing (rtra)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 78 Filed: 9/18/2000, Entered: 9/22/2000 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                            MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities by J. Michael Curtis in support of [77-1] motion by J. Michael Curtis for Preliminary Injunction, [77-2] motion by J. Michael Curtis for Temporary Restraining Order (clar)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 77 Filed: 9/18/2000, Entered: 9/22/2000 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                              MOTION by J. Michael Curtis for Preliminary Injunction , and by J. Michael Curtis for Temporary Restraining Order tog. w/Notice for 9/18/00 @ 10:00 am (clar)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 72 Filed: 9/18/2000, Entered: 9/19/2000, Terminated: 9/29/2000 Motion to Intervene
                                                                                                MOTION with Memorandum in Support to Intervene by J. Michael Curtis (told to notice for hearing) (clerk)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 9/18/2000, Entered: 9/18/2000 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                                  Minute entry: Judge Brinkema; Reporter: Thomson; Appearances by Counsel for parties. Matter came on for Parties motion for TRO-Argued and Granted in Part; Denied in Part. Insurance Companies to fulfill settlement agreement. No funds to be dispursed from counsel's escrow account without leave of Court. Order to follow. (rtra)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 71 Filed: 9/7/2000, Entered: 9/8/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ORDERED that the case be and hereby is DISMISSED with Prejudice as to deft The Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania, with each party to bear its own cost.-ent. & filed. ( signed by Judge T. S. Ellis III ) Copies Mailed: yes [EOD Date: 9/8/00] (clerk)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 70 Filed: 9/7/2000, Entered: 9/8/2000 Remark
                                                                                                      Privilege Log filed by plaintiff Out of Chaos, Ltd. (clerk)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 69 Filed: 9/7/2000, Entered: 9/8/2000 Objection
                                                                                                        OBJECTION by plaintiff Out of Chaos, Ltd. to defts' Second Set of Interrogatories. (clerk)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 68 Filed: 9/7/2000, Entered: 9/8/2000 Objection
                                                                                                          OBJECTIONS by plaintiff Out of Chaos, Ltd. to defts' Second Set of Document Requests. (clerk)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 67 Filed: 9/6/2000, Entered: 9/7/2000 Notice
                                                                                                            NOTICE by Pacific Indemnity Co, Vigilant Insurance, Federal Insurance Co Withdrawing [63-1] motion by Pacific Indemnity Co, Vigilant Insurance, Federal Insurance Co to Compel Answers to first set of Interrogatories (clerk)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 66 Filed: 9/5/2000, Entered: 9/6/2000 Response/Reply - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                              REPLY in support by Federal Insurance Co, Vigilant Insurance, Pacific Indemnity Co of [50-1] motion by Pacific Indemnity Co, Vigilant Insurance, Federal Insurance Co for Summary Judgment (clar)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 65 Filed: 9/1/2000, Entered: 9/5/2000 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                NOTICE of Hearing: Motion Hearing Deadline set for 10:00 9/8/00 for [63-1] motion by Pacific Indemnity Co, Vigilant Insurance, Federal Insurance Co to Compel Answers to first set of Interrogatories (clar)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 64 Filed: 9/1/2000, Entered: 9/5/2000 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM by Federal Insurance Co, Vigilant Insurance, Pacific Indemnity Co in support of [63-1] motion by Pacific Indemnity Co, Vigilant Insurance, Federal Insurance Co to Compel Answers to first set of Interrogatories (clar)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 63 Filed: 9/1/2000, Entered: 9/5/2000 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                    MOTION by Pacific Indemnity Co, Vigilant Insurance, Federal Insurance Co to Compel Answers to first set of Interrogatories (clar)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 62 Filed: 8/31/2000, Entered: 9/1/2000 Remark
                                                                                                                      Praecipe filing the attached Preliminary Opinions of Maurice J. Whalen, CPA and Navigant Counsulting, Inc. filed by defendant Federal Insurance Co, defendant Vigilant Insurance, defendant Pacific Indemnity Co (clar)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 61 Filed: 8/31/2000, Entered: 9/1/2000 Remark
                                                                                                                        Praecipe filing the attached expert report of Ronald L. Coleman filed by defendant Federal Insurance Co, defendant Vigilant Insurance, defendant Pacific Indemnity Co (clar)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 60 Filed: 8/30/2000, Entered: 8/30/2000 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities by Out of Chaos, Ltd. in opposition to [50-1] motion by Pacific Indemnity Co, Vigilant Insurance, Federal Insurance Co for Summary Judgment (large pleading) (clar) Modified on 08/30/2000
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 8/30/2000, Entered: 8/30/2000 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                            Deadline updated; Motion Hearing Deadline set for 10:00 9/8/00 for [50-1] motion by Pacific Indemnity Co, Vigilant Insurance, Federal Insurance Co for Summary Judgment (clar)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 59 Filed: 8/25/2000, Entered: 8/28/2000 Notice
                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Federal Insurance Co, Vigilant Insurance, Pacific Indemnity Co of Foreign Law Issues by Pacific Indemnity Co, Vigilant Insurance, Federal Insurance Co (clar)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 58 Filed: 8/24/2000, Entered: 8/25/2000 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Hearing: Motion Hearing Deadline set for 10:00 9/8/00 for [50-1] motion by Pacific Indemnity Co, Vigilant Insurance, Federal Insurance Co for Summary Judgment (clar)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 57 Filed: 8/21/2000, Entered: 8/23/2000 Objection
                                                                                                                                  OBJECTION by plaintiff Out of Chaos, Ltd. to deft Insurance Co. of the State of Penn Second Set of Document Requests. (clerk)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 56 Filed: 8/18/2000, Entered: 8/23/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [37-1] motion by Aon/Albert G Ruben, Aon Corporation for Judgment on the Pleadings and [34-1] motion by Pacific Indemnity Co, Vigilant Insurance, Federal Insurance Co for Judgment on the Pleadings, for reasons stated from the Bench. Counts 8 and 9 are DISMISSED. Pltff may amend by 5p.m. 8/28/00, w/ Defts' responsive pldg. due 5p.m. 9/4/00 (signed by Judge T.S. Ellis III) Mailed: Yes [EOD Date: 8/23/00] (tbul)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 54 Filed: 8/18/2000, Entered: 8/18/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDERED, for reasons stated from the bench, granting [40-1] motion by Out of Chaos, Ltd. to Compel, and the contents of the documents produced shall not be disclosed to anyone except pltf's counsel and staff w/o further order of the court ( signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas R. Jones Jr. ) Copies Mailed: y [EOD Date: 8/18/00] (dana)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 8/18/2000, Entered: 8/18/2000 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                        Minute entry: Motion hrg. held before Judge Ellis. Defts' motion for judgment on pldgs. heard and granted., but Pltff. has leave to amend w/in R.11 by 8/28/00, w/ Defts' pldg. due 9/8/00 and oral arg. set for 9/14/00. If Pltff decides not to file now, a pldg. to that effect must be filed. (tbul)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 8/18/2000, Entered: 8/18/2000 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                          Minute entry: Mag. Judge Jones. Tape 340. Rpt. Casamo. Appearance of counsel. Matter called, argued and pltf's. motion to compel- granted. Order to be entered. (dana) Modified on 08/18/2000
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 53 Filed: 8/17/2000, Entered: 8/17/2000 Response/Reply - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                            REPLY MEMORANDUM in support by Out of Chaos, Ltd. of [40-1] motion by Out of Chaos, Ltd. to Compel (clar)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 55 Filed: 8/16/2000, Entered: 8/21/2000 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Kathryn Jones by Federal Insurance Co, Vigilant Insurance, Pacific Indemnity Co In Support of [50-1] motion by Pacific Indemnity Co, Vigilant Insurance, Federal Insurance Co for Summary Judgment (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 52 Filed: 8/16/2000, Entered: 8/17/2000 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Hearing: Motion Hearing Deadline set for 10:00 9/1/00 for [50-1] motion by Pacific Indemnity Co, Vigilant Insurance, Federal Insurance Co for Summary Judgment (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 51 Filed: 8/16/2000, Entered: 8/17/2000 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM by Federal Insurance Co, Vigilant Insurance, Pacific Indemnity Co in support of [50-1] motion by Pacific Indemnity Co, Vigilant Insurance, Federal Insurance Co for Summary Judgment; TOGETHER WITH Exhibits, vols. 1 & 2 (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 50 Filed: 8/16/2000, Entered: 8/17/2000 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by Pacific Indemnity Co, Vigilant Insurance, Federal Insurance Co for Summary Judgment (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 49 Filed: 8/15/2000, Entered: 8/15/2000 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                      Opposition by Aon Corporation, Aon/Albert G Ruben to [40-1] motion by Out of Chaos, Ltd. to Compel (clar)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 48 Filed: 8/14/2000, Entered: 8/15/2000 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                        Opposition by Federal Insurance Co, Vigilant Insurance, Pacific Indemnity Co to [40-1] motion by Out of Chaos, Ltd. to Compel (clar)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 47 Filed: 8/9/2000, Entered: 8/10/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDERED that the hearing on the pending motion is POSTPONED from 10:00 am, 8/11/00 until 10:00 am 8/18/00.-ent. & filed. ( signed by Judge T. S. Ellis III ) Copies Mailed: yes [EOD Date: 8/10/00] (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 46 Filed: 8/9/2000, Entered: 8/10/2000 Response/Reply - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                            REPLY in support by Federal Insurance Co, Vigilant Insurance, Pacific Indemnity Co of [37-1] motion by Aon/Albert G Ruben, Aon Corporation for Judgment on the Pleadings (clar)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 8/9/2000, Entered: 8/10/2000 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                              Deadline updated; Motion Hearing Deadline set for 10:00 8/18/00 for [37-1] motion by Aon/Albert G Ruben, Aon Corporation for Judgment on the Pleadings, set for 10:00 8/18/00 for [34-1] motion by Pacific Indemnity Co, Vigilant Insurance, Federal Insurance Co for Judgment on the Pleadings (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 45 Filed: 8/8/2000, Entered: 8/9/2000 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Hearing: Motion Hearing Deadline set for 10:00 8/18/00 for [40-1] motion by Out of Chaos, Ltd. to Compel (clar)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 44 Filed: 8/8/2000, Entered: 8/9/2000 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM of points and authorities by Out of Chaos, Ltd. in opposition to [37-1] motion by Aon/Albert G Ruben, Aon Corporation for Judgment on the Pleadings (clar)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 43 Filed: 8/7/2000, Entered: 8/8/2000 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER by Aon Corporation, Aon/Albert G Ruben (Attorney ) to amended complaint (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 42 Filed: 8/4/2000, Entered: 8/4/2000 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Hearing: Motion Hearing Deadline set for 10:00 8/11/00 for [40-1] motion by Out of Chaos, Ltd. to Compel (clar)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 41 Filed: 8/4/2000, Entered: 8/4/2000 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM of points and authorities by Out of Chaos, Ltd. in support of [40-1] motion by Out of Chaos, Ltd. to Compel (clar)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 40 Filed: 8/4/2000, Entered: 8/4/2000, Terminated: 8/18/2000 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by Out of Chaos, Ltd. to Compel (clar)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 39 Filed: 7/28/2000, Entered: 8/1/2000 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Hearing: Motion Hearing Deadline set for 10:00 8/11/00 for [37-1] motion by Aon/Albert G Ruben, Aon Corporation for Judgment on the Pleadings (clar)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 38 Filed: 7/28/2000, Entered: 8/1/2000 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM by Aon Corporation, Aon/Albert G Ruben in support of [37-1] motion by Aon/Albert G Ruben, Aon Corporation for Judgment on the Pleadings (clar)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 37 Filed: 7/28/2000, Entered: 8/1/2000, Terminated: 8/18/2000 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by Aon/Albert G Ruben, Aon Corporation for Judgment on the Pleadings (clar)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 36 Filed: 7/27/2000, Entered: 7/28/2000 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Hearing: Motion Hearing Deadline set for 10:00 8/11/00 for [34-1] motion by Pacific Indemnity Co, Vigilant Insurance, Federal Insurance Co for Judgment on the Pleadings (jsol)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 35 Filed: 7/27/2000, Entered: 7/28/2000 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM by Federal Insurance Co, Vigilant Insurance, Pacific Indemnity Co in support of [34-1] motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (jsol)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 34 Filed: 7/27/2000, Entered: 7/28/2000 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by Pacific Indemnity Co, Vigilant Insurance, Federal Insurance Co for Judgment on the Pleadings (jsol)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 33 Filed: 7/18/2000, Entered: 7/20/2000 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER by Federal Insurance Co, Vigilant Insurance, Pacific Indemnity Co to amended complaint (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 32 Filed: 7/18/2000, Entered: 7/20/2000 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER by Ins Co State of Penn to the amended complaint (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 31 Filed: 7/7/2000, Entered: 7/10/2000 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                            OBJECTION by plaintiff Out of Chaos, Ltd. to deft Insurance Co., of the State of Pennsylvani First Set of Document Request (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 30 Filed: 6/28/2000, Entered: 7/5/2000 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT by Out of Chaos, Ltd. (Answer due 7/13/00 for Aon/Albert G Ruben, for Aon Corporation, for Ins Co State of Penn, for Pacific Indemnity Co, for Vigilant Insurance, for Federal Insurance Co ) amending [1-1] complaint; jury demand (LARGE PLEADING) (pmil) Modified on 07/05/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 29 Filed: 6/14/2000, Entered: 6/15/2000 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                OBJECTION by plaintiff Out of Chaso, Ltd. to defts, Federal Ins Co., Vigilant Ins Co., and Pacific Indemnity Co., First Set of Document Requests (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 28 Filed: 6/9/2000, Entered: 6/9/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying [17-1] motion by Aon/Albert G Ruben, Aon Corporation to Strike [1-1] complaint, denying [12-1] motion by Pacific Indemnity Co, Vigilant Insurance, Federal Insurance Co to Strike [1-1] complaint. Pltf has twenty days within which to file a new complaint and deft have twenty days following pltfs' compliance with the above within which to file their responsive pleadings.-ent & filed. ( signed by Judge Albert V. Bryan Jr. ) Copies Mailed: yes [EOD Date: 6/9/00] (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 26 Filed: 6/7/2000, Entered: 6/7/2000 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1) of the deft the Chubb Corporation as a party to this action without Prejudice or without cost. (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 27 Filed: 6/6/2000, Entered: 6/7/2000 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER setting Discovery cutoff 9/29/00 ; Pretrial Conference for 11:30 10/19/00 ; ( signed by Judge Claude M. Hilton ) Copies Mailed: yes (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 25 Filed: 5/30/2000, Entered: 5/30/2000 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY by Ins Co State of Penn to response to [17-1] motion by Aon/Albert G Ruben, Aon Corporation to Strike [1-1] complaint [17-2] motion by Aon/Albert G Ruben, Aon Corporation to Extend Time to respond to the complaint [12-1] motion by Pacific Indemnity Co, Vigilant Insurance, Federal Insurance Co to Strike [1-1] complaint [12-2] motion by Pacific Indemnity Co, Vigilant Insurance, Federal Insurance Co to Extend Time to respond to the complaint (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 24 Filed: 5/25/2000, Entered: 1/9/2001 Response/Reply - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY MEMORANDUM in support by Federal Insurance Co, Vigilant Insurance, Pacific Indemnity Co of [12-1] motion by Pacific Indemnity Co, Vigilant Insurance, Federal Insurance Co to Strike [1-1] complaint, [12-2] motion by Pacific Indemnity Co, Vigilant Insurance, Federal Insurance Co to Extend Time to respond to the complaint (ltun)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 23 Filed: 5/22/2000, Entered: 5/24/2000 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM by Out of Chaso, Ltd. in opposition to [17-1] motion by Aon/Albert G Ruben, Aon Corporation to Strike [1-1] complaint by Aon/Albert G Ruben, Aon Corporation, [17-2] motion by Aon/Albert G Ruben, Aon Corporation to Extend Time to respond to the complaint by Aon/Albert G Ruben, Aon Corporation (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 22 Filed: 5/19/2000, Entered: 5/19/2000, Terminated: 5/19/2000 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Stipulation and Order to move, plead, answer or otherwise respond to the Summon and Complaint until 6/15/00 filed by Out of Chaso, Ltd., Ins Co State of Penn (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 5/19/2000, Entered: 5/22/2000 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                So Ordered: granting [22-1] stipulation and order ( signed by Judge T. S. Ellis III ) Copies Mailed: yes (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 21 Filed: 5/15/2000, Entered: 5/16/2000 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing: Motion Hearing Deadline set for 10:00 6/9/00 for [12-1] motion by Pacific Indemnity Co, Vigilant Insurance, Federal Insurance Co to Strike [1-1] complaint, set for 10:00 6/9/00 for [12-2] motion by Pacific Indemnity Co, Vigilant Insurance, Federal Insurance Co to Extend Time to respond to the complaint (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 20 Filed: 5/12/2000, Entered: 5/16/2000 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REVISED NOTICE of Hearing: Motion Hearing Deadline set for 10:00 6/9/00 for [17-1] motion by Aon/Albert G Ruben, Aon Corporation to Strike [1-1] complaint, set for 10:00 6/9/00 for [17-2] motion by Aon/Albert G Ruben, Aon Corporation to Extend Time to respond to the complaint (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 19 Filed: 5/12/2000, Entered: 5/12/2000 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE that the originial summon issued for the The Chubb Corp had the incorrect Registered Agent, therefore the, pltf has requested issuance of a new Summon by Out of Chaso, Ltd. (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 5/12/2000, Entered: 5/12/2000 Summons Reissued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ALIAS SUMMONS (1 orig.) issued and mailed to the atty for service upon the Secretary of the Commonwealth as to the deft Chubb Corporation (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 18 Filed: 5/10/2000, Entered: 5/11/2000 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Hearing: Motion Hearing Deadline set for 10:00 5/26/00 for [17-1] motion by Aon/Albert G Ruben, Aon Corporation to Strike [1-1] complaint, set for 10:00 5/26/00 for [17-2] motion by Aon/Albert G Ruben, Aon Corporation to Extend Time to respond to the complaint (mcke)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 17 Filed: 5/10/2000, Entered: 5/11/2000, Terminated: 6/9/2000 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by Aon/Albert G Ruben, Aon Corporation to Strike [1-1] complaint , or in the alternative by Aon/Albert G Ruben, Aon Corporation to Extend Time to respond to the complaint (mcke)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 16 Filed: 5/10/2000, Entered: 5/10/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER that deft ICSOP shall move, plead, answer, or otherwise respond to the Summons and complaint byh 5/31/00.-ent, & filed. ( signed by Judge Claude M. Hilton ) Copies Mailed: yes [EOD Date: 5/10/00] (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 15 Filed: 5/10/2000, Entered: 5/10/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Consent Order that the deft the Chubb Corp. shall have until 6/10/00 to answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint.-ent. & filed. ( signed by Judge Claude M. Hilton ) Copies Mailed: yes (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 14 Filed: 5/9/2000, Entered: 5/10/2000 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Hearing: Motion Hearing Deadline set for 10:00 5/26/00 for [12-1] motion by Pacific Indemnity Co, Vigilant Insurance, Federal Insurance Co to Strike [1-1] complaint, set for 10:00 5/26/00 for [12-2] motion by Pacific Indemnity Co, Vigilant Insurance, Federal Insurance Co to Extend Time to respond to the complaint (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 13 Filed: 5/9/2000, Entered: 5/10/2000 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM by Federal Insurance Co, Vigilant Insurance, Pacific Indemnity Co in support of [12-1] motion by Pacific Indemnity Co, Vigilant Insurance, Federal Insurance Co to Strike [1-1] complaint [12-2] motion by Pacific Indemnity Co, Vigilant Insurance, Federal Insurance Co to Extend Time to respond to the complaint (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 12 Filed: 5/9/2000, Entered: 5/10/2000 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by Pacific Indemnity Co, Vigilant Insurance, Federal Insurance Co to Strike [1-1] complaint , or, in the alternative by Pacific Indemnity Co, Vigilant Insurance, Federal Insurance Co to Extend Time to respond to the complaint (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 11 Filed: 5/3/2000, Entered: 5/4/2000 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Pacific Indemnity Co 4/27/00 Answer due on 5/17/00 for Pacific Indemnity Co (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 10 Filed: 4/27/2000, Entered: 4/27/2000 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Federal Insurance Co 4/19/00 Answer due on 5/9/00 for Federal Insurance Co (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 9 Filed: 4/27/2000, Entered: 4/27/2000 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Chubb Corporation 4/19/00 Answer due on 5/9/00 for Chubb Corporation (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 8 Filed: 4/27/2000, Entered: 4/27/2000 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Vigilant Insurance 4/19/00 Answer due on 5/9/00 for Vigilant Insurance (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 7 Filed: 4/25/2000, Entered: 4/26/2000 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Ins Co State of Penn 4/20/00 Answer due on 5/10/00 for Ins Co State of Penn (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 4/25/2000, Entered: 4/25/2000 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Vigilant Insurance 4/19/00 Answer due on 5/9/00 for Vigilant Insurance (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 4/25/2000, Entered: 4/25/2000 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Federal Insurance Co 4/19/00 Answer due on 5/9/00 for Federal Insurance Co (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 4/25/2000, Entered: 4/25/2000 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Chubb Corporation 4/19/00 Answer due on 5/9/00 for Chubb Corporation (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 4/21/2000, Entered: 4/25/2000 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Aon/Albert G Ruben 4/19/00 Answer due on 5/9/00 for Aon/Albert G Ruben (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 4/21/2000, Entered: 4/25/2000 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Aon Corporation 4/19/00 Answer due on 5/9/00 for Aon Corporation (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 4/7/2000, Entered: 4/10/2000 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT Filing Fee $ 150.00 Receipt # 100135463; jury demand (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 4/7/2000, Entered: 4/10/2000 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS(ES)(orig. & 7) issued and given the atty for service by SPS as to defts Chubb Corporation, Federal Insurance Co, Vigilant Insurance, Pacific Indemnity Co, Ins Co State of Penn, Aon Corporation, Aon/Albert G Ruben (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 4/7/2000, Entered: 4/10/2000 Set/Clear Flags
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Jury Trial Flag (clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 74 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?