USA v. Chacon
Criminal Case Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:01-cr-00392-LMB

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Adam Isles +1 703 299 3700

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Alexandria
Filed 10/10/2001
County Alexandria City
Terminated 1/14/2002
Reopened
Magistrate Case
101-mj-00638
Citation
Offense Level
(18871.F)18871 Threats against the President [ 101-m -638 ]
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 871.F
Offense Level 4
[18871.F] 18871(a) THREATS AGAINST PRESIDENT (6/9/01)
Count 2
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 871.F
Offense Level 4
[18871.F] 18871(a) THREATS AGAINST PRESIDENT (6/9/01)
Count 3
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 879.F
Offense Level 4
[18879.F] 18879 THREATS AGAINST FORMER PRESIDENT (3/13/01)
Def Custody Status Custody This Court
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (37) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 19 Filed: 1/4/2002, Entered: 1/5/2002 Judgment*Court Filing
JUDGMENT Eddie Alberto Chacon (1) count(s) 3. BOP for TIME SERVED; 3 Yrs Supervised Release w/special conditions; S/A $100.00 ( Signed by Judge Leonie M. Brinkema ) Copies Mailed: 01.04.02 (rtra)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 1/4/2002, Entered: 1/5/2002 Set/Reset Hearings
    Sentencing held before Judge Leonie M. Brinkema ( Reporter: Thomson)USPO: Nina Blanchard USA appeared through: Adam Isles Dft(s) appeared through: Frank Salvato Eddie Alberto Chacon (1) count(s) 3. Court adopts PSI w/o exception. JUDGMENT: BOP for TIME SERVED; 3 Yrs Supervised Release w/special conditions: Deft. to remain drug free, In/Out Patient treatment as directed(fees waived); particiapte in mental health counseling as directed; seek and maintain full time employment, should his mental health counselor feel it is appropriate; deft. barred from White House Complex, Naval Observatory, Camp David, U.S. Capitol ground, Specific area in New York City (See Judgment Order for specific geographical restrictions); shall reside w/Nancy Espinoza, shall not move from that residence w/o prior approval of his probation officer. Fine/Costs waived. S/A $100.00 due within 90 days of imposition of sentence. Deft. remanded to be released forthwith. (rtra) Modified on 01/05/2002
      LREF
      Blank 18 Filed: 1/2/2002, Entered: 1/2/2002 Position on Sentencing
      POSITION on Sentencing Factors by USA as to Eddie Alberto Chacon (ctat)
        LREF
        Blank 17 Filed: 1/2/2002, Entered: 1/2/2002 Position on Sentencing
        POSITION on Sentencing by Eddie Alberto Chacon (ctat)
          LREF
          Blank 16 Filed: 12/3/2001, Entered: 12/3/2001 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER granting [15-1] motion by USA to Dismiss Counts One and Two of the Indictment as to Eddie Alberto Chacon (1) ( Signed by Judge Leonie M. Brinkema ) Copies Mailed: yes (ctat)
            LREF
            Blank 15 Filed: 12/3/2001, Entered: 12/3/2001, Terminated: 12/3/2001 Motion to Dismiss
            MOTION as to Eddie Alberto Chacon by USA to Dismiss Counts One and Two of the Indictment (ctat)
              LREF
              Blank 14 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: 11/29/2001 Description not available
              STATEMENT OF FACTS as to Eddie Alberto Chacon filed in open court (rtra)
                LREF
                Blank 13 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: 11/29/2001 Plea Agreement
                Plea Agreement as to Eddie Alberto Chacon filed in open court (rtra)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: 11/29/2001 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                  CASE assigned to Judge Leonie M. Brinkema (rtra)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: 11/29/2001 Set/Reset Hearings
                    Sentencing set for 9:00 1/4/02 for Eddie Alberto Chacon , Eddie Alberto Chacon (1) count(s) 3 (rtra)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: 11/29/2001 Dismissal of Counts on Government Motion
                      DISMISSAL of Count(s) on Government Motion as to Eddie Alberto Chacon Counts Dismissed: Eddie Alberto Chacon (1) count(s) 1, 2 (rtra)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: 11/29/2001 Oral Order
                        ORAL ORDER as to Eddie Alberto Chacon granting [0-0] oral motion by USA to Dismiss Counts 1 and 2 of the Indictment as to Eddie Alberto Chacon (1) ( Entered by Judge Leonie M. Brinkema ) (rtra)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: 11/29/2001 Oral Order
                          MOTION in open court by USA as to Eddie Alberto Chacon by USA to Dismiss Counts 1 and 2 of the Indictment (rtra)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: 11/29/2001 Plea - Miscellaneous
                            PLEA entered by Eddie Alberto Chacon . Court accepts plea. by Eddie Alberto Chacon Guilty: Eddie Alberto Chacon (1) count(s) 3 (rtra)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: 11/29/2001 Set/Reset Hearings
                              Change of Plea Hearing as to Eddie Alberto Chacon held before Judge Leonie M. Brinkema ( Reporter: Thomson) USA appeared through: Adam Isles w/Kevin DiGregory Dft(s) appeared through: Frank Salvato ( before Judge Leonie M. Brinkema ) Deft. w/d NG plea and entered plea to Count 2 of the Indictment. The Court, through plea colloquy, finds the facts support plea to Count 3. Court accepts plea. Govt. oral motion to dismiss remaining Counts-Granted; Counts 1 and 2 of the Indictment Dismissed. Govt. to file proposed Order for entry. Matter referred to USPO for PSI and continued to 01/04/2002 at 9:00 a.m. for sentencing. PSI expedited, full report from FMC Butner forwarded to USPO. Deft. remanded. (rtra)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 11/26/2001, Entered: 11/26/2001 Set/Reset Hearings
                                Change of Plea Hearing as to Eddie Alberto Chacon set for 9:00 11/28/01 for Eddie Alberto Chacon ( before Judge Leonie M. Brinkema ) (agil)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 12 Filed: 10/22/2001, Entered: 10/22/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER as to Eddie Alberto Chacon, for Discovery and Inspection ( Signed by Judge Claude M. Hilton ) Copies Mailed: yes (ctat)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 10/22/2001, Entered: 10/22/2001 Set/Reset Hearings
                                    Arraignment as to Eddie Alberto Chacon held before Judge Claude M. Hilton. Dft WFA, PNG and demanded a jury trial. 20 days to file motions. Motion Hearing set for 9:00 11/30/01 for Eddie Alberto Chacon; Jury Trial set for 10:00 12/5/01 for Eddie Alberto Chacon ; ( Reporter: Linnell) USA appeared through: Adam Isles Dft(s) appeared w/counsel Frank Salvato. Discovery Order entered and filed in open court. All exhibits to be filed 5 days prior to trial. Dft remanded. (psid)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 11 Filed: 10/17/2001, Entered: 10/18/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER OF DETENTION as to Eddie Alberto Chacon ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Barry R. Poretz ) (jsch)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 10/17/2001, Entered: 10/18/2001 Detention Hearing
                                        Detention hearing as to Eddie Alberto Chacon held before Magistrate Judge Barry R. Poretz ( Tape 414) USA appeared through: Isles Dft(s) appeared through: Salvato. The Deft. returned to court after a mental evaluation which determined that the Deft. does not and did not have a mental defect at the time of the offense. Gov't requested Detention - Granted. Deft. remanded. (jsch)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 10 Filed: 10/10/2001, Entered: 10/10/2001 Indictment
                                          INDICTMENT as to Eddie Alberto Chacon (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3 (Preliminary Examination cancelled.) (ctat)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 10/10/2001, Entered: 10/10/2001 Set/Reset Hearings
                                            Arraignment set for 9:00 a.m on 10/22/01 for Eddie Alberto Chacon (ctat)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 9 Filed: 8/8/2001, Entered: 8/10/2001 Miscellaneous Document
                                              REQUEST as to Eddie Alberto Chacon by A.F. Beeler (Warden) that the psychological evaluation period begin on the date of the deft's arrival at the institution, not to exceed 45 days. [ 1:01-m -638 ] (pmet)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 8/8/2001, Entered: 8/10/2001 Order
                                                So Ordered: as to Eddie Alberto Chacon granting [9-1] Request as to Eddie Alberto Chacon (1) ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Barry R. Poretz ) Copies Mailed: y [ 1:01-m -638 ] (pmet)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 7/2/2001, Entered: 7/2/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER as to Eddie Alberto Chacon granting [7-1] motion by USA for Mental Examination to Determine the defendant's Competence to stand trial as to Eddie Alberto Chacon (1) ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Barry R. Poretz ) Copies Mailed: y [ 1:01-m -638 ] (avax)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 6/26/2001, Entered: 7/9/2001 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                    Minute entry as to Eddie Alberto Chacon : before Magistrate Judge Barry R. Poretz ( Tape 270) USA appeared through: Isles Dft(s) appeared through: Salvato. This matter came on for a DH/PH/Motion. Gov't motion for a mental exam - Matter argued and Granted. DH/PH held in abeyance. Deft. remanded to be transported to a Federal Facility for a mental exam. [ 1:01-m -638 ] (jsch)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 6/20/2001, Entered: 6/21/2001, Terminated: 7/2/2001 Motion for Psychiatric Exam
                                                      MOTION as to Eddie Alberto Chacon by USA for Mental Examination to Determine the defendant's Competence to stand trial [ 1:01-m -638 ] (avax)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 6/20/2001, Entered: 6/21/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Eddie Alberto Chacon Detention Hearing set for 2:00 6/26/01 for Eddie Alberto Chacon ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Barry R. Poretz ) [ 1:01-m -638 ] (jsch)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 6/20/2001, Entered: 6/21/2001 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                          Minute entry as to Eddie Alberto Chacon : before Magistrate Judge Barry R. Poretz ( Tape 269) USA appeared through: Isles Dft(s) appeared through: Salvato. This matter came on for a DH/PH. Deft's. Atty. advised the Court that the Gov't had filed a Motion for a Mental Exam. Deft's Atty. requested a cont. to assess Deft's condition before considering the Motion of the Gov't. Cont. Granted. Case cont. to 6/26/01 @ 2:00 p.m. for DH/PH/Motion for Mental Exam. Deft. remanded. [ 1:01-m -638 ] (jsch)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 6/19/2001, Entered: 6/19/2001 CJA 20 AppointmentCourt Filing
                                                            CJA 20 as to Eddie Alberto Chacon Appointment of Attorney Frank Salvato ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Barry R. Poretz ) [ 1:01-m -638 ] (avax)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 6/15/2001, Entered: 6/18/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Eddie Alberto Chacon Detention Hearing set for 2:00 6/20/01 for Eddie Alberto Chacon ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Barry R. Poretz ) [ 1:01-m -638 ] (jsch)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 6/15/2001, Entered: 6/18/2001 Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                ARREST WARRANT Returned Executed as to Eddie Alberto Chacon on 6/15/01 [ 1:01-m -638 ] (jsch)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 6/15/2001, Entered: 6/18/2001 Affidavit
                                                                  AFFIDAVIT by USA as to Eddie Alberto Chacon Re: [1-1] complaint [ 1:01-m -638 ] (avax)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 6/15/2001, Entered: 6/18/2001 Complaint
                                                                    COMPLAINT as to Eddie Alberto Chacon [ 1:01-m -638 ] (avax)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 6/15/2001, Entered: 6/18/2001 Initial Appearance
                                                                      Initial appearance as to Eddie Alberto Chacon held ; Preliminary Examination set for 2:00 6/20/01 for Eddie Alberto Chacon before Magistrate Judge Barry R. Poretz ( Tape 266) USA appeared through: Isles Dft(s) appeared through: w/o counsel (Defendant informed of rights.) Deft. requested court appt. atty. - Granted. Gov't requested Detention - Granted. Case cont. to 6/20/01 @ 2:00 p.m. for DH/PH. Deft. remanded. [ 1:01-m -638 ] (jsch)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 6/15/2001, Entered: 6/18/2001 Arrest
                                                                        ARREST of Eddie Alberto Chacon [ 1:01-m -638 ] (jsch)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 6/15/2001, Entered: 6/18/2001 Warrant Issued
                                                                          Arrest WARRANT issued as to Eddie Alberto Chacon [ 1:01-m -638 ] (avax)
                                                                            LREF

                                                                            Statistics

                                                                            This case has been viewed 30 times.

                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                            Space
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                             
                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                            Need Password Help?