Day v. Commonwealth of VA
Federal Civil Lawsuit Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-00101-GBL

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Phenroy Day, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Commonwealth of Virginia, Defendant
Office Alexandria
Filed 1/1/2001
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Sussex
Terminated 3/7/2001
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 3/7/2001, Entered: 3/7/2001 Terminated Case
Case closed (File transferred to Richmond Division and new case opened [3:01MS14]) (lsal)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 2/26/2001, Entered: 2/26/2001 Docket Annotation
    Received Receipt copy of interdivision transfer letter. Richmond Case Manager: L.T. Salmon. Case Number: 3:01MS14 (ppal)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 2/14/2001, Entered: 2/14/2001 Docket Annotation
      Case file CA-01-0101-AM is sent to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia, Richmond Division. (One Volume of Pleadings). (ppal)
        LREF
        Blank 2 Filed: 2/12/2001, Entered: 2/14/2001 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER, that this action be and is filed solely for the convenience of the Clerk; and this action be and is Transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia, Richmond Division.(see order for details) (signed by Judge Gerald B. Lee) Copies Mailed: Yes [EOD Date: 2/14/01] (ppal)
          LREF
          Blank 1 Filed: 12/28/2000, Entered: 1/23/2001 Complaint
          Prisoner complaint administratively filed by Phenroy Day (clerk) Modified on 01/25/2001
            LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 76 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?