Norton v. Fake, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-00315-GBL

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Barton F. Norton, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by THE MARTIN LAW FIRM, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth Allen Martin +1 703 918 0350 +1 703 918 0386 Ken@martin-lawfirm.com
v.
No Logo Barent L. Fake, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by rblaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harvey B. Cohen +1 703 525 2260
No Logo Miles & Stockbridge, PC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams Mullen, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Lewis Stauffer, Jr. +1 757 249 5100 +1 757 249 5109 wstauffer@williamsmullen.com
Office Alexandria
Filed 2/26/2001
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 370 - Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County Out of State
Terminated 5/25/2001
Origin 5
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Cases 00-250[Superior Ct. Dist. C], CA-00-184[USDC- Dist. of Colum]
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, JURY, PROTO
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 5 Filed: 5/25/2001, Entered: 5/30/2001 OrderCourt Filing
Consent Order Dismissing with prejudice and retraxit as to all parties, each party to bear their respective costs and attorneys fees, and pursuant to FRCP. 41(a), that this dismissal order shall serve as an order of retraxit as to all claims made by pltf ( signed by Judge Gerald B. Lee ) Copies Mailed: yes (mcke)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 5/25/2001, Entered: 5/30/2001 Docket Annotation
    all pleadings accounted for (mcke)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 5/25/2001, Entered: 5/30/2001 Case Assigned/Reassigned
      CASE assigned to Judge Gerald B. Lee (mcke)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 5/25/2001, Entered: 5/30/2001 Terminated Case
        Case closed (mcke)
          LREF
          Blank 4 Filed: 4/4/2001, Entered: 4/5/2001 OrderCourt Filing
          Rule 16(B) Scheduling Order - Pursuant to the Rule 16(B) Conference it is hereby ordered that: the rule 26(f) report previously filed with the court, as amended and initialed by the court, is approved and shall control discovery to the extent of its application unless modified by the court. Unless the parties submit a consent order under local rule 26(d)(1) within five days, expert discovery shall be governed by local rule 26(d)(2-4). (see order for details) ( signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas R. Jones Jr. ) Copies Mailed: yes (mcke)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 4/4/2001, Entered: 4/5/2001 Pretrial Conference - Initial
            Initial pretrial conference held MJ Jones. Appearances: Counsel. Discovery plan approved. Adr/Settlement - discussed. (mcke)
              LREF
              Blank 3 Filed: 3/30/2001, Entered: 3/30/2001 Discovery - Miscellaneous
              Discovery Plan by Barton F. Norton, Barent L. Fake, Miles & Stockbridge, (mcke)
                LREF
                Blank 2 Filed: 3/5/2001, Entered: 3/5/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER setting Initial Pretrial Conference for 10:30 4/4/01 Discovery Deadline for 8/10/01 Final Pretrial Conference for 10:45 8/16/01 (see order for details) ( signed by Judge Claude M. Hilton ) Copies Mailed: yes (mcke)
                  LREF
                  Blank 1 Filed: 2/26/2001, Entered: 2/28/2001 Case Transferred In - District Transfer
                  Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from District of Columbia (Large pleading) (mcke)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 2/26/2001, Entered: 2/28/2001 Set/Clear Flags
                    **Set Protective Order Flag. (mcke)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 2/26/2001, Entered: 2/28/2001 Set/Clear Flags
                      Jury Trial Flag (mcke)
                        LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 75 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?