USA v. Khafagy
Criminal Case Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:03-cr-00099-JCC

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kathleen M. Kahoe +1 703 299 3700 Kathy.Kahoe@usdoj.gov

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Alexandria
Filed 3/6/2003
County Fairfax
Terminated 5/1/2003
Reopened
Magistrate Case
103-mj-00199
Citation
Offense Level
(18871.F) 18871 Threats against the President of the United States [ 103-m -199 ]
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 871.F
Offense Level 4
[18871.F] 18871(a) Threats Against the President (2.11.03)
Def Custody Status Custody This Court
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 11 Filed: 5/1/2003, Entered: 5/1/2003 Judgment*Court Filing
JUDGMENT Sherif Atef Khafagy (1) count 1: Sentenced to TIME SERVED; 3 years supervised release w/special condition to cooperate w/INS; $100 special assessment. (Signed by Judge James C. Cacheris) Copies Mailed: yes (dper)
    LREF
    Blank 10 Filed: 5/1/2003, Entered: 5/1/2003 Description not available
    STATEMENT OF FACTS as to Sherif Atef Khafagy (dper)
      LREF
      Blank 9 Filed: 5/1/2003, Entered: 5/1/2003 Plea Agreement
      Plea Agreement as to Sherif Atef Khafagy (dper)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 5/1/2003, Entered: 5/1/2003 Miscellaneous Document
        All pleadings accounted for and in order. (dper)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 5/1/2003, Entered: 5/1/2003 Set/Reset Hearings
          Sentencing before Judge James C. Cacheris held (r: D. McCoy) USA appeared through: Kathy Kahoe. Dft appeared with: Michael Hadeed as to Sherif Atef Khafagy (1) count 1. Deft waived his right to PSI and consented to proceed w/sentencing. Deft sentenced to TIME SERVED; 3 yrs. supv. release w/special conditions of mental health counseling as dir by PO and cooperate w/INS. $100 special assessment. Deft remanded and Mshl directed to turn deft over to INS immediately. (dper)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 5/1/2003, Entered: 5/1/2003 Plea - Miscellaneous
            PLEA entered by Sherif Atef Khafagy. Court accepts plea by Sherif Atef Khafagy. Guilty: count 1. (dper)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 5/1/2003, Entered: 5/1/2003 Set/Reset Hearings
              Change of Plea Hearing as to Sherif Atef Khafagy held (r: D. McCoy) USA appeared through: Kathy Kahoe. Dft appeared with: Michael Hadeed before Judge James C. Cacheris. Deft w/drew NG plea and PG to Count 1 of the Indictment. Court accepts plea. Deft waived his right to PSI and consents to proceed w/sentencing. Court Hours: 23 minutes (9:30-9:53) (dper)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 4/30/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003 Plea Agreement
                Plea Agreement Hearing as to Sherif Atef Khafagy reset for 9:30 5/1/03 before Judge James C. Cacheris (dper)
                  LREF
                  Blank 8 Filed: 4/29/2003, Entered: 4/29/2003 Miscellaneous Document
                  TRIAL EXHIBIT CUSTODY FORM filed by USA (pmet)
                    LREF
                    Blank 7 Filed: 4/29/2003, Entered: 4/29/2003 Exhibit
                    Exhibit list by USA as to Sherif Atef Khafagy (pmet)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 4/28/2003, Entered: 4/28/2003 Plea Agreement
                      Plea Agreement Hearing as to Sherif Atef Khafagy set for 2:00 5/1/03 before Judge James C. Cacheris (dper)
                        LREF
                        Blank 6 Filed: 4/18/2003, Entered: 4/18/2003 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                        NOTICE of Appearance for Sherif Atef Khafagy by Attorney Michael M. Hadeed Jr. (clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 3/10/2003, Entered: 3/10/2003 Set/Reset Hearings
                          Arraignment as to Sherif Atef Khafagy before Judge James C. Cacheris held. Deft WFA, PNG and demanded a jury trial. 30 days to file motions. Motion Hearing set for 9:00 5/2/03. Jury Trial set for 10:00 5/7/03. All exhibits are to be filed w/Clerk 5 days prior to trial. (r: D. McCoy) USA appeared through: Steve Learned Dft appeared with: Ivan Davis. Deft remanded. (dper)
                            LREF
                            Blank 5 Filed: 3/6/2003, Entered: 3/7/2003 Indictment
                            INDICTMENT as to Sherif Atef Khafagy (1) count(s) 1 (ctat)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 3/6/2003, Entered: 3/7/2003 Set/Reset Hearings
                              Arraignment before Judge James C. Cacheris set for 9:00 a.m. on 3/10/03 for Sherif Atef Khafagy (ctat)
                                LREF
                                Blank 4 Filed: 2/20/2003, Entered: 2/21/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER OF DETENTION as to Sherif Atef Khafagy ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas R. Jones Jr. ) [ 1:03-m -199 ] (dana)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: 2/20/2003 Preliminary Examination
                                  Preliminary Examination/Detention Hearing as to Sherif Atef Khafagy held ( FTR) USA appeared through: Kahoe Dft(s) appeared through: Davis before Magistrate Judge Thomas R. Jones Jr. Govt. adduced evidence and rested. Govt. exhibit # 1 admitted. Deft. argues detetnion - Denied. U.S. requests detention - Granted. Court finds probable cause. Deft. is detained. [ 1:03-m -199 ] (avax)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 3 Filed: 2/14/2003, Entered: 2/14/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                    ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Sherif Atef Khafagy ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas R. Jones Jr. ) [ 1:03-m -199 ] (kjon)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 2/14/2003, Entered: 2/14/2003 Oral Order
                                      ORAL ORDER as to Sherif Atef Khafagy , to appoint federal public defender Ivan Darnell Davis ( Entered by Magistrate Judge Thomas R. Jones Jr. ) [ 1:03-m -199 ] (clerk)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 2/14/2003, Entered: 2/14/2003 Initial Appearance
                                        Initial appearance as to Sherif Atef Khafagy before Magistrate Judge Thomas R. Jones Jr. held ;Preliminary Examination/Detention Hearing set for 2:00 2/18/03 for Sherif Atef Khafagy ( FTR) USA appeared through: Kahoe Dft(s) appeared through: without (Defendant informed of rights.). Court to appoint counsel. Interpreter was present but not needed. Govt seeks detention - granted. Dft is remanded to USMS pending PH/DH 2/18/03 at 2:00 pm before BRP [ 1:03-m -199 ] (kjon)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 2 Filed: 2/13/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 Affidavit
                                          AFFIDAVIT by USA as to Sherif Atef Khafagy Re: [1-1] complaint [ 1:03-m -199 ] (clerk)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 1 Filed: 2/13/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 Complaint
                                            COMPLAINT as to Sherif Atef Khafagy [ 1:03-m -199 ] (clerk)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 2/13/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 Warrant Issued
                                              Arrest WARRANT issued as to Sherif Atef Khafagy [ 1:03-m -199 ] (clerk)
                                                LREF

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 52 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?