Gorski v. Colgan Air, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-01487-JCC

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Judy Gorski, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald Alton Clower +1 202 638 0086 +1 202 628 0014 clowerda@aol.com
v.
No Logo Colgan Air, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dombroff & Gilmore

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Morgan Warren Campbell +1 703 336 8800 +1 703 336 8750 mcampbell@dglitigators.com
Office Alexandria
Filed 11/28/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand $500000
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Notice of Removal-Employment Discrimination (Sex)
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Fairfax
Terminated 8/16/2004
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Cases 04-2190[], 218305[Faifax County CC]
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (47) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 37 Filed: 12/9/2004, Entered: 12/10/2004 USCA Judgment
ORDER OF USCA (certified copy) dismissing the appeal of the judgment of the District Court upon such terms as have been agreed to by the parties, pursuant to Rule 42(b) of the FRAP re: [34-1] appeal (stas)
    LREF
    Blank 36 Filed: 11/24/2004, Entered: 11/24/2004 Certificate of Completion
    Certification of completion sent to USCA re: [34-1] appeal by Judy Gorski (to be forwarded via US Mail 11/26/04) (pmil)
      LREF
      Blank 35 Filed: 10/14/2004, Entered: 10/18/2004 Transcript
      TRANSCRIPT for dates of 07/30/04 - FILED - JCC (pmil)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 9/24/2004, Entered: 9/30/2004 Letter
        LETTER by USCA to Counsel re: USCA forms, requirements, and deadlines (pmil)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 9/24/2004, Entered: 9/30/2004 USCA Case Number
          USCA Case Number Re: [34-1] appeal by Judy Gorski CASE MANAGER: Mike Radday USCA NUMBER: 04-2190 (pmil)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 9/16/2004, Entered: 9/16/2004 Docket Annotation
            Notice of Appeal forwarded to the USCA (pmil)
              LREF
              Blank 34 Filed: 9/13/2004, Entered: 9/15/2004 Notice of Appeal
              NOTICE OF APPEAL OF [32-1] Memorandum Opinion and [33-1] Order of 08/16/04 by Judy Gorski transmitted to the USCA. FILING FEE $ 255.00 RECEIPT # 100 175049; Copies sent to Judy Gorski, Colgan Air, Inc. (pmil)
                LREF
                Blank 33 Filed: 8/16/2004, Entered: 8/17/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER, in accordance w/Memorandum Opinion, that [22-1] motion by Colgan Air, Inc. for Summary Judgment is granted. (signed by Judge James C. Cacheris) Copies Mailed: yes [EOD Date: 8/17/04] (dper)
                  LREF
                  Blank 32 Filed: 8/16/2004, Entered: 8/17/2004 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                  MEMORANDUM OPINION re: deft's motion for summary judgment. (signed by Judge James C. Cacheris) Copies Mailed: yes (dper)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 8/16/2004, Entered: 8/18/2004 Terminated Case
                    Case closed (dper)
                      LREF
                      Blank 31 Filed: 8/12/2004, Entered: 8/16/2004 Motion to Continue
                      UNOPPOSED MOTION by Colgan Air, Inc. for a Continuance of the Trial Date set for 09/01-09/02/04 w/out a Jury (pmil)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 7/30/2004, Entered: 7/30/2004 Motion Hearing
                        Motion hearing held before Judge Cacheris (r: Carol Lowe w/Platt & Dawson) re: [22-1] motion by Colgan Air, Inc. for Summary Judgment. Appearances of counsel. Deft's motion for summary judgement - argued - taken under advisement. Order to follow. (dper)
                          LREF
                          Blank 30 Filed: 7/14/2004, Entered: 7/14/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                          REPLY Brief by Colgan Air, Inc. to response to [22-1] motion by Colgan Air, Inc. for Summary Judgment (clar)
                            LREF
                            Blank 29 Filed: 7/14/2004, Entered: 7/14/2004 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                            Re-NOTICE of Hearing: Motion Hearing Deadline before Judge James C. Cacheris set for 10:00 7/30/04 for [22-1] motion by Colgan Air, Inc. for Summary Judgment (clar)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 7/14/2004, Entered: 7/14/2004 Docket Annotation
                              Per JCC chambers motions set for 7/16/04 are to be re-noticed (clar)
                                LREF
                                Blank 28 Filed: 7/6/2004, Entered: 7/9/2004 Memorandum in Support
                                MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES by Judy Gorski in support of [27-1] Response and opposition to Deft's Motion for Summary Judgment by Judy Gorski (LARGE PLEADING) (pmil)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 27 Filed: 7/6/2004, Entered: 7/9/2004 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                  RESPONSE by Judy Gorski and opposition to [22-1] motion by Colgan Air, Inc. for Summary Judgment (pmil)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 26 Filed: 7/1/2004, Entered: 7/6/2004 Stipulation
                                    Stipulations filed by Judy Gorski, Colgan Air, Inc. (pmil)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 25 Filed: 6/30/2004, Entered: 7/6/2004 Exhibit
                                      Revised Exhibit list by Colgan Air, Inc. (pmil)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 24 Filed: 6/28/2004, Entered: 6/29/2004 Objection
                                        OBJECTIONS by Colgan Air, Inc. to [18-1] exhibits list by Judy Gorski (pmil)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 23 Filed: 6/22/2004, Entered: 6/24/2004 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                                          NOTICE of Hearing: Motion Hearing Deadline before Judge James C. Cacheris set for 10:00 7/16/04 for [22-1] motion by Colgan Air, Inc. for Summary Judgment (pmil)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 22 Filed: 6/22/2004, Entered: 6/24/2004, Terminated: 8/16/2004 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                            MOTION and Incorporated Memorandum of Law together w/Supplemental Material (BINDED) by Colgan Air, Inc. for Summary Judgment (pmil)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 21 Filed: 6/17/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004 Witness List
                                              Witness list by Judy Gorski (dper)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 20 Filed: 6/17/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004 Discovery - Miscellaneous
                                                Rule 26 Disclosures by Judy Gorski (dper)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 19 Filed: 6/17/2004, Entered: 6/18/2004 Witness List
                                                  Witness list by Colgan Air, Inc. (dper)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 18 Filed: 6/17/2004, Entered: 6/18/2004 Exhibit
                                                    Exhibit list by Judy Gorski (dper)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 6/17/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004 Exhibit
                                                      Exhibits received by Judy Gorski (1 small white 3-ring binder) (dper)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 6/17/2004, Entered: 6/18/2004 Bench Trial - Held
                                                        Bench trial set at 10:00 9/1/04 before Judge James C. Cacheris (dper)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 6/17/2004, Entered: 6/18/2004 Pretrial Conference - Final
                                                          Pre-Trial Conference held before Judge Cacheris; appearances of counsel; Bench Trial set 10:00 9/1/04 (dper)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 17 Filed: 5/7/2004, Entered: 5/11/2004 Notice
                                                            NOTICE by Colgan Air, Inc. to take deposition of Judy Gorski (pmil)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 16 Filed: 4/14/2004, Entered: 4/19/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER for Mark Andrew Dombroff to appear pro hac vice Filing Fee Paid $ 50.00 Receipt # 100 171428 ( signed by Judge James C. Cacheris ) Copies Mailed: yes [EOD Date: 4/19/04] (pmil)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 15 Filed: 4/14/2004, Entered: 4/19/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER for Thomas Barton Almy to appear pro hac vice Filing Fee Paid $ 50.00 Receipt # 100 171428 ( signed by Judge James C. Cacheris ) Copies Mailed: yes [EOD Date: 4/19/04] (pmil)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 14 Filed: 3/11/2004, Entered: 3/11/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER for Kay Maureen Clarke to appear pro hac vice Filing Fee Paid $ 50.00 Receipt # 100 170615 ( signed by Judge James C. Cacheris ) Copies Mailed: yes [EOD Date: 3/11/04] (pmil)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 13 Filed: 3/10/2004, Entered: 3/11/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                    Rule 16(B) Scheduling Order - Pursuant to the Rule 16(B) Conference it is hereby ordered that: The Rule 26(f) report filed by the parties is approved and shall control discovery to the extent of its application unless modified by the Court; Any motion to amend the pleadings or to join a party shall be made as soon as possible after counsel becomes aware of the grounds for the motion; No material designated "confidential" by any party shall be disclosed to anyone except counsel and their staffs until further Order of the Court. (No such material shall be filed w/ the court except in compliance w/paragraph 2 below) (see order for details) ( signed by Mag Judge Thomas R. Jones Jr. ) Mailed: yes (pmil)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/10/2004, Entered: 3/10/2004 Pretrial Conference - Initial
                                                                      Initial pretrial conference held MJ Jones. Appearance of counsel.. Discovery plan approved. Pltf to make settlement demand. Order to issue. (dana)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 12 Filed: 3/3/2004, Entered: 3/5/2004 Discovery - Miscellaneous
                                                                        JOINT RULE 26(f) DISCOVERY PLAN AND REPORT by Judy Gorski, Colgan Air, Inc. (pmil)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 11 Filed: 2/9/2004, Entered: 2/11/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER setting Initial Pretrial Conference for 10:20 3/10/04 Discovery Deadline for 6/11/04 Final Pretrial Conference for 10:00 6/17/04 (see order for details) ( signed by Judge James C. Cacheris ) Copies Mailed: yes (pmil)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 10 Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER granting [9-1] motion by Colgan Air, Inc. for Michael A. Viccora and Annamaria L. Nields to Withdraw as Attorney (Terminated attorney Michael Andrew Viccora for Colgan Air, Inc., attorney Annamaria Locsin Nields for Colgan Air, Inc., granting [9-2] motion by Colgan Air, Inc. to Substitute Attorney, Morgan Campbell of Dombroff and Gilmore as counsel of record for Deft Colgan Air, Inc. (Added Morgan Warren Campbell) ( signed by Judge James C. Cacheris ) Copies Mailed: yes [EOD Date: 1/29/04] (pmil)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 9 Filed: 1/23/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004, Terminated: 1/28/2004 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                              MOTION by Colgan Air, Inc. for Michael A. Viccora and Annamaria L. Nields to Withdraw as Attorney and by Colgan Air, Inc. to Substitute Attorney, Morgan Campbell of Dombroff and Gilmore as counsel of record for Deft Colgan Air, Inc. (pmil)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 8 Filed: 1/6/2004, Entered: 1/7/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER GRANTING [5-1] motion by Colgan Air, Inc. for Sue Marie King to Withdraw as Attorney (Terminated attorney Sue Marie King for Colgan Air, Inc.); GRANTING [5-2] motion by Colgan Air, Inc. to Substitute Attorney Michael A. Viccora and Annamaria L. Nields of Seyfarth and Shaw LLP as counsel of record for Deft Colgan Air, Inc. ( signed by Judge James C. Cacheris ) Copies Mailed: yes [EOD Date: 1/7/04] (pmil)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 1/2/2004, Entered: 1/6/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for Colgan Air, Inc. by Annamaria Locsin Nields (pmil)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 1/2/2004, Entered: 1/6/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for Colgan Air, Inc. by Michael Andrew Viccora (pmil)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 1/2/2004, Entered: 1/5/2004, Terminated: 1/6/2004 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                      MOTION by Colgan Air, Inc. for Sue Marie King to Withdraw as Attorney and by Colgan Air, Inc. to Substitute Attorney Michael A. Viccora and Annamaria L. Nields of Seyfarth and Shaw LLP as counsel of record for Deft Colgan Air, Inc. (pmil)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 12/15/2003, Entered: 12/16/2003 Answer
                                                                                        AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Colgan Air, Inc. (kjon)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 12/12/2003, Entered: 12/12/2003 Financial Disclosure Statement
                                                                                          Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Colgan Air, Inc. (kjon)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 12/10/2003, Entered: 12/11/2003 Remark
                                                                                            Praecipe filed by defendant Colgan Air, Inc. re: copy of answer that was not attached to the notice of removal (copy of answer attached to notice of removal as part of Exhibit 1) (kjon)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 11/28/2003, Entered: 12/3/2003 Notice of Removal
                                                                                              NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fairfax County Circuit Court by Colgan Air, Inc. ; FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 100 168212 (No Answer filed) (clerk)
                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                This case has been viewed 57 times.

                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                 
                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                Need Password Help?