Stiffarm v. Interstate Assurance, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:01-cv-02207-FJM
District Judge Frederick J Martone, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Raymond Stiffarm, Sr, Plaintiff

Represented by Schneider & Onofry PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cody Maryl Hall +1 602 200 1289 +1 602 230 8985 minute-entries@soarizonalaw.com
Space Jon D Schneider +1 602 200 1288 +1 602 230 8985 jschneider@soarizonalaw.com
v.
No Logo Black and White Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Inter-state Assurance Company, Defendant

Represented by Snell & Wilmer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Matthew Kort +1 602 382 6000 +1 602 382 6070 rkort@swlaw.com
No Logo John/Jane Does, Defendant
Office Phoenix Division
Filed 11/13/2001
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 110 - Contract - Insurance
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Maricopa
Terminated 2/26/2003
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case CV-2001-017985[Sup Ct Maricopa]
Def Custody Status
Flags STD, TERMED
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 26 Filed: 2/26/2003, Entered: 2/26/2003, Terminated: 7/17/2003 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER of Dismissal With Prejudice by Judge Frederick J. Martone granting Stipulation to Dismiss case w/prejudice by pla, dft [25-1]; FURTHER ORDERED that the above-captioned matter is dismissed with prejudice, each of the parties to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees incurred herein (cc: all counsel) (SAT)
    LREF
    Blank 25 Filed: 2/21/2003, Entered: 2/22/2003, Terminated: 2/26/2003 Stipulation
    STIPULATION to dismiss case w/prejudice by pla, dft (MAP)
      LREF
      Blank 24 Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: 2/19/2003 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER by Judge Frederick J. Martone that this matter will be dismissed with prejudice within 30 days of the date of this order unless a stipulation to dismiss is filed prior to the dismissal date ; possbl dsm ddl set for 3/21/03 ; FURTHER ORDERED that all hearings and pending motions are deemed moot discovery ddl vacated; dispositive motion ddl vacated; pretrial order ddl vacated ; pretrial conference vacated ; jury trial vacated (no pending motions) (cc: all counsel) (SAT)
        LREF
        Blank 23 Filed: 1/22/2003, Entered: 1/24/2003 Notice of Settlement
        NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT filed by dft Interstate Assurance ; possible dism ddl set for 3/24/03 (MAP)
          LREF
          Blank 22 Filed: 12/4/2002, Entered: 12/4/2002 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER by Judge Frederick J. Martone granting motion for leave to file List of Witnesses by pla Raymond Stiffarm Sr [21-1]; This order will not be offered as a reason to amend any of the other dates inthis court's Rule 16 scheduling order. All such dates are affirmed. (cc: all counsel) (SAT)
            LREF
            Blank 21 Filed: 11/1/2002, Entered: 11/8/2002, Terminated: 12/4/2002 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
            MOTION for leave to file List of Witnesses by pla Raymond Stiffarm Sr [21-1] (No lodged pleading submitted) (MAP)
              LREF
              Blank 20 Filed: 11/1/2002, Entered: 11/8/2002 Other Notice
              NOTICE by pla Raymond Stiffarm Sr of Service of List of Witnesses (MAP)
                LREF
                Blank 19 Filed: 10/3/2002, Entered: 10/3/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER by Judge Frederick J. Martone: rejecting the stipulation to extend dates for disclosure of witnesses for 30 days by pla Raymond Stiffarm Sr, dft Interstate Assurance (cc: all counsel) (former emp)
                  LREF
                  Blank 18 Filed: 9/30/2002, Entered: 10/2/2002 Stipulation
                  STIPULATION to extend dates for disclosure of witnesses for 30 days by pla Raymond Stiffarm Sr, dft Interstate Assurance (former emp)
                    LREF
                    Blank 17 Filed: 7/29/2002, Entered: 8/1/2002 Other Notice
                    NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCivP 26(a) by pla (SAT)
                      LREF
                      Blank 16 Filed: 7/19/2002, Entered: 7/19/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                      Rule 16 Scheduling ORDER by Judge Frederick J. Martone ; discovery ddl set for 1/31/03 ; dispositive motions due 2/28/03 ; PTO ddl set for 5/23/03 ; Pretrial conference set for 3:00 5/30/03 ; jury trial set for 9:30 6/10/03 (cc: all counsel) (SAT)
                        LREF
                        Blank 15 Filed: 7/12/2002, Entered: 7/15/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                        MINUTE ENTRY before Judge Frederick J. Martone. Crt Rptr: Linda Schroeder-Willis. Appearances: Kay Karolszyk for plaintiff; Robert Kort for defendant. Scheduling conference is held. The court enters the following orders: discovery ddl set for 1/31/03; dispositive motions due 2/28/03; PTO ddl set for 5/23/03; pretrial conference set for 3:00 pm on 5/30/02; jury trial set for 9:30 am on 6/10/03. [cc: FJM] [15-2] (KCB) Modified on 12/30/2002
                          LREF
                          Blank 14 Filed: 7/10/2002, Entered: 7/10/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER by Judge Frederick J. Martone granting motion to set aside 6/17/02 Minute Entry and Reinstate Rule 16 Scheduling Conference [10-2] by dft Interstate Assurance [12-1] This case is set the Standard Track and not the Arbitration Track. FURTHER ORDERED prel scheduling conf set for 3:00 7/12/02 , case removed from Arbitration (cc: all counsel) (MAP)
                            LREF
                            Blank 13 Filed: 7/3/2002, Entered: 7/10/2002 Report re: Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
                            JOINT PROPOSED CASE MGT (MAP)
                              LREF
                              Blank 12 Filed: 6/19/2002, Entered: 6/21/2002 Motion to Set Aside
                              MOTION to set aside 6/17/02 Minute Entry and Reinstate Rule 16 Scheduling Conference [10-2] by dft Interstate Assurance [12-1] (MAP)
                                LREF
                                Blank 11 Filed: 6/19/2002, Entered: 6/19/2002 ADR-Miscellaneous
                                NOTICE of selection of Arbitrator Merton Marks ; strike ddl set for 7/1/02 (cc: all counsel) (MAP)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 10 Filed: 6/17/2002, Entered: 6/17/2002 Minute Order - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                  MINUTE ORDER: This matter having been referred to arbitration and the opt-out deadline having expired without any withdrawal filed by counsel, IT IS ORDERED referring this matter to the arbitration clerk for appointment of an arbitrator. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED vacating the Rule 16 scheduling conference set July 12, 2002 before Judge Martone. (cc: all counsel, arb clerk) [10-2] (KCB)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 6/17/2002, Entered: 6/17/2002 ADR-Miscellaneous
                                    LETTER to Arbitrator Merton Marks ; arbitrator acceptance due 6/24/02 (MAP)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 9 Filed: 5/24/2002, Entered: 5/24/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Frederick J. Martone prel scheduling conf set for 3:00 7/12/02 (cc: all counsel) (MAP)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 8 Filed: 2/20/2002, Entered: 2/20/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                        The Court has ORDERED that effective February 25, 2002, the above captioned matter is reassigned to Judge Frederick J. Martone for all further proceedings. Any deadline, hearing, conference, or trial scheduled on or after 2/25/2002 in this action will remain in effect and will be placed on the calendar of Judge Frederick J. Martone . All further pleadings and papers filed in this action should bear the complete case number and judge's initials, as shown above. (cc: all counsel) [8-1] (MAP)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 7 Filed: 11/30/2001, Entered: 11/30/2001 Minute Order - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                          MINUTE ORDER that pursuant to Local Rule 1.2(e), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Roslyn O. Silver All further pleadings should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CIV-01-2207-PHX-VAM (cc: all counsel/VAM/ROS) [7-2] (MAP)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 6 Filed: 11/29/2001, Entered: 11/30/2001 Election to Assign Case to District Judge
                                            Party elects assignment of case to district judge ; mag election form ddl satisfied 11/29/01 (MAP)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 5 Filed: 11/29/2001, Entered: 11/30/2001 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction
                                              Party agrees to mag judge jurisdiction (MAP)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 4 Filed: 11/29/2001, Entered: 11/29/2001 ADR-Miscellaneous
                                                NOTICE: this case referred to Arbitration; removal from arbitration due 12/20/01 (cc: all counsel/VAM) (MAP)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 11/27/2001, Entered: 11/29/2001 Jury Demand
                                                  DEMAND for jury trial by pla Raymond Stiffarm Sr (MAP)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 11/26/2001, Entered: 11/29/2001 Answer
                                                    ANSWER to Complaint [1-2] by dft Interstate Assurance (MAP)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 11/13/2001, Entered: 11/17/2001 ADR-Miscellaneous
                                                      NOTICE of removal from Maricopa County Superior Court; Court Number: CV-2001-017985 (summons/complaint). Considered for possible arbitration. (MAP)
                                                        LREF

                                                        Statistics

                                                        This case has been viewed 146 times.

                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                        Space
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                         
                                                        PlainSite
                                                        Sign Up
                                                        Need Password Help?