USA v. Mahmoud
Criminal Case Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:05-cr-00085-CMH

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert J. Erickson +1 202 514 2841 +1 202 305 2121 robert.erickson@usdoj.gov

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Alexandria
Filed 2/28/2005
County Arlington
Terminated 6/22/2005
Reopened
Magistrate Case
100-mj-00721
Citation
Offense Level
(181014.F) 181014 Intentionally provide false information to a federal financial institution [ 100-m -721 ]
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1014.F
Offense Level 4
(181014.F) 181014 False Statements on a Loan Application (3/19/99)
Def Custody Status Custody This Court
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 17 Filed: 9/7/2005, Entered: 9/7/2005 Judgment Returned Executed
Judgment Returned Executed as to Sherif Ahmed Mahmoud on 8/2/05. (LSCI Allenwood) (tarm, )
    LREF
    Blank 16 Filed: 6/22/2005, Entered: 6/29/2005 Judgment*Court Filing
    JUDGMENT as to Sherif Ahmed Mahmoud (1), Count(s) 1, 12 mos. and 1 day w/3 year SR term; $156,792.91 restitution (Signed by Judge Claude M. Hilton on 6/22/05) Copies sent. (tarm, )
      LREF
      Blank 15 Filed: 6/17/2005, Entered: 6/20/2005 Restitution JudgmentCourt Filing
      Restitution Judgment in the amount of $156,792.91 as to Sherif Ahmed Mahmoud . Signed by Judge Claude M. Hilton on 6/17/05. Copies sent. (tarm, )
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 6/17/2005, Entered: 6/20/2005 Sentencing
        Sentencing held on 6/17/2005 for Sherif Ahmed Mahmoud (1) before Judge Claude M. Hilton : Count(s) 1. Reporter: Linnell. US appeared through: Robert Erickson; Dft appeared w/counsel Joel Anders and Greg Hunter. Court finds g/l properly assessed at a range of 12 to 18 mos. Dft committed to custody of US Atty General to serve a term of 12 mos. and 1 day w/3 year SR term and assessed $100; $156,792.91 restitution pursuant to Restitution Judgment filed in open court. Cond. of SR: pay the restitution in monthly installments of $200.00 to commence 60 days after release from confinement. Dft remanded. (tarm, )
          LREF
          Blank 14 Filed: 6/1/2005, Entered: 6/1/2005 Position on Sentencing
          Position with Respect to Sentencing Factors by USA as to Sherif Ahmed Mahmoud (jcup, )
            LREF
            Blank 13 Filed: 3/10/2005, Entered: 3/10/2005 Plea Agreement
            Plea Agreement as to Sherif Ahmed Mahmoud (psid)
              LREF
              Blank 12 Filed: 3/10/2005, Entered: 3/10/2005 Description not available
              STATEMENT OF FACTS as to Sherif Ahmed Mahmoud (psid)
                LREF
                Blank 11 Filed: 3/10/2005, Entered: 3/10/2005 Information - Felony
                INFORMATION as to Sherif Ahmed Mahmoud (1) count(s) 1 (psid)
                  LREF
                  Blank 10 Filed: 3/10/2005, Entered: 3/10/2005 Waiver of Indictment
                  WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Sherif Ahmed Mahmoud (psid)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 3/10/2005, Entered: 3/10/2005 Plea - Miscellaneous
                    PLEA entered by Sherif Ahmed Mahmoud . Court accepts plea. by Sherif Ahmed Mahmoud Guilty: Sherif Ahmed Mahmoud (1) count(s) 1 (psid)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 3/10/2005, Entered: 3/10/2005 Set/Reset Hearings
                      Sentencing before Judge Claude M. Hilton set for 9:00 6/17/05 for Sherif Ahmed Mahmoud Sherif Ahmed Mahmoud (1) count(s) 1 (psid)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 3/10/2005, Entered: 3/10/2005 Plea Agreement
                        Plea Agreement Hearing as to Sherif Ahmed Mahmoud held before Judge Claude M. Hilton ( Reporter: Linnell) USA appeared through: Robert Erickson; Dft(s) appeared w/counsel George Gillis. US appeeared through: Robert Erickson. Dft FA, PG to the Criminal Information. Plea Accepted. Referred to PO For PSIR and cont'd to 6/17/05 @ 9:00. Dft remanded. (psid)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 3/3/2005, Entered: 3/3/2005 Plea Agreement
                          Plea Agreement Hearing as to Sherif Ahmed Mahmoud set for 2:00 3/10/05 for Sherif Ahmed Mahmoud before Judge Claude M. Hilton (psid)
                            LREF
                            Blank 9 Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: 3/2/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER OF DETENTION as to Sherif Ahmed Mahmoud ( Signed by Mag Judge Barry R. Poretz ) Copies Mailed: y [ 1:00-m -721 ] (jsch)
                              LREF
                              Blank 8 Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: 3/1/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER as to Sherif Ahmed Mahmoud, for Joel W. Anders to appear pro hac vice Filing Fee Paid $ 50.00 Receipt # 100 178722 ( Signed by Mag Judge Barry R. Poretz ) Copies Mailed: yes [ 1:00-m -721 ] (jcup)
                                LREF
                                Blank 7 Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: 2/28/2005 Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing
                                Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing by Sherif Ahmed Mahmoud [ 1:00-m -721 ] (jsch)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 6 Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: 2/28/2005 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                  NOTICE of Appearance for Sherif Ahmed Mahmoud by Attorney Joel Anders [ 1:00-m -721 ] (jsch)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 5 Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: 2/28/2005 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                    NOTICE of Appearance for Sherif Ahmed Mahmoud by Attorney George W. Gills [ 1:00-m -721 ] (jsch)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: 2/28/2005 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                      Minute entry as to Sherif Ahmed Mahmoud : ( before Mag Judge Barry R. Poretz )( FTR) USA Appeared through: Robert Erickson Dft(s) appeared through: Gills & Anders. This matter came on for a DH/PH. Deft's. Attys. Gills & Anders entered appearances: Deft. waived PH. Gov't requested Detention - Granted. Deft. remanded. [ 1:00-m -721 ] (jsch)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 4 Filed: 2/24/2005, Entered: 2/24/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                        ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Sherif Ahmed Mahmoud Detention Hearing set for 2:00 2/28/05 for Sherif Ahmed Mahmoud ( Signed by Mag Judge Liam O'Grady ) Copies Mailed: y [ 1:00-m -721 ] (avax)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 3 Filed: 2/24/2005, Entered: 2/24/2005 Warrant Returned Executed
                                          Arrest WARRANT Returned Executed as to Sherif Ahmed Mahmoud on 2/22/05 ' [ 1:00-m -721 ] (avax)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 2/24/2005, Entered: 2/24/2005 Detention Hearing
                                            Detention hearing as to Sherif Ahmed Mahmoud before Mag Judge Barry R. Poretz set for 2:00 2/28/05 for Sherif Ahmed Mahmoud [ 1:00-m -721 ] (avax)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 2/24/2005, Entered: 2/24/2005 Initial Appearance
                                              Initial appearance as to Sherif Ahmed Mahmoud before Mag Judge Liam O'Grady held ;Preliminary Examination set for 2:00 2/28/05 for Sherif Ahmed Mahmoud ( FTR) USA appeared through: Erickson Dft(s) appeared through: w/out counsel (Defendant informed of rights.) Deft. advised he has retained counsel. U.S. motion for detention - Granted. Case cont. to 2-28-05 @ 2 before Judge Poretz. Deft. is remanded to the USMS. [ 1:00-m -721 ] (avax)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 2/24/2005, Entered: 2/24/2005 Arrest
                                                ARREST of Sherif Ahmed Mahmoud [ 1:00-m -721 ] (avax)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 9/5/2000, Entered: 9/5/2000 Affidavit
                                                  AFFIDAVIT by USA as to Sherif Ahmed Mahmoud Re: [1-1] complaint [ 1:00-m -721 ] (pmet)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 9/5/2000, Entered: 9/5/2000 Complaint
                                                    COMPLAINT as to Sherif Ahmed Mahmoud [ 1:00-m -721 ] (pmet)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 9/5/2000, Entered: 9/5/2000 Warrant Issued
                                                      Arrest WARRANT issued as to Sherif Ahmed Mahmoud [ 1:00-m -721 ] (pmet)
                                                        LREF

                                                        Statistics

                                                        This case has been viewed 62 times.

                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                        Space
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                         
                                                        PlainSite
                                                        Sign Up
                                                        Need Password Help?