USA v. Melinsky, et al
Criminal Case Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:05-cr-00095-JCC

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark Grundvig +1 703 299 3700

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Alexandria
Filed 3/9/2005
County Fairfax
Terminated 9/9/2005
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 371.F
Offense Level 4
[18371.F] 18371 Conspiracy (March 1998)
Count 2
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1344A.F
Offense Level 4
[181344A.F] 181344 Bank Fraud (June 1998)
Count 3-4
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1014.F
Offense Level 4
[181014.F] 181014 False Statements (Ct. 3 8.5.97) (Ct. 4
Count 7-8
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1014.F
Offense Level 4
[181014.F] 181014 False Statements (Ct. 7 June 1997) (Ct. 8
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (72) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 77 Filed: 12/28/2006, Entered: 12/29/2006 USCA Judgment
JUDGMENT of USCA (certified copy) as to Suzanne L. Melinsky, Raymond J. Melinsky re [61] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, [50] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, In accordance with the written opinion of this court filed this day, the court affirms the judgment of the district court. A certified copy of this judgment will be provided to the district court upon issuance of the mandate. The judgment will take effect upon issuance of the mandate. (mandate issued) (nmck, )
    LREF
    Blank 76 Filed: 12/5/2006, Entered: 12/6/2006 USCA Mandate
    Opinion of USCA (Copy) as to Suzanne L. Melinsky, Raymond J. Melinsky re [61] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, [50] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, Affirmed. (nmck, )
      LREF
      Blank 75 Filed: 3/27/2006, Entered: 3/27/2006 Certificate of Completion
      Certificate of Completion re [61] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, [50] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment (nmck, )
        LREF
        Blank 74 Filed: 3/20/2006, Entered: 3/20/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Suzanne L. Melinsky held on 5/26/05 before Judge Cacheris. Court Reporter: N. Linnell. (agil)
          LREF
          Blank 73 Filed: 3/13/2006, Entered: 3/14/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Suzanne L. Melinsky, Raymond J. Melinsky held on 9/9/05 before Judge Cacheris. Court Reporter: D. McCoy. (agil)
            LREF
            Blank 72 Filed: 2/17/2006, Entered: 2/17/2006 Certificate of Completion
            Certificate of Completion re [61] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, [50] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment (nmck, )
              LREF
              Blank 71 Filed: 2/3/2006, Entered: 2/4/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Suzanne L. Melinsky, Raymond J. Melinsky held on 6/15/05 before Judge Cacheris. Court Reporter: N. Linnell. (agil)
                LREF
                Blank 70 Filed: 2/3/2006, Entered: 2/3/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Suzanne L. Melinsky, Raymond J. Melinsky held on 6/16/05 before Judge Cacheris. Court Reporter: McCoy. (agil)
                  LREF
                  Blank 69 Filed: 2/3/2006, Entered: 2/3/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Suzanne L. Melinsky, Raymond J. Melinsky held on 6/14/05 before Judge Cacheris. Court Reporter: McCoy. (agil)
                    LREF
                    Blank 68 Filed: 1/19/2006, Entered: 1/19/2006 USCA Order
                    ORDER of USCA (copy) as to Suzanne L. Melinsky, Raymond J. Melinsky The court reporter, Edward D. McCoy, has filed a motion for an extension of time to file the transcript without the imposition of sanctions. The court extends the time for filing the transcript, without sanctions, to 2/6/06. A 10 percent fee reduction will apply if the transcript is not filed by that date, and a 20 percent fee reduction will apply if the transcript is not filed by 3/8/06. (nmck, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 67 Filed: 12/9/2005, Entered: 12/14/2005 USCA Order
                      ORDER of USCA that the Court extends the time for filing a transcript to 1/17/06.(agil)
                        LREF
                        Blank 66 Filed: 11/28/2005, Entered: 11/29/2005 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                        ORDER that gvt's [65] Motion is GRANTED and that Restitution shall be credited w/payment of $8000 as to Suzanne L. Melinsky (1), Raymond J. Melinsky (2). See order for details. Signed by Judge James C. Cacheris on 11/28/05. c/s: 11/29/05 (agil)
                          LREF
                          Blank 65 Filed: 11/10/2005, Entered: 11/14/2005, Terminated: 11/28/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                          MOTION to Adjust Dft's Restitution Order by USA as to Suzanne L. Melinsky, Raymond J. Melinsky. (agil)
                            LREF
                            Blank 64 Filed: 10/25/2005, Entered: 10/26/2005 USCA Order
                            ORDER of USCA (copy) as to Suzanne L. Melinsky, Raymond J. Melinsky, the court consolidates the above cases for further appellate action. 05-4948, 05-5040. (nmck, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 60 Filed: 10/14/2005, Entered: 10/17/2005 Response in Opposition
                              Opposition by USA as to Suzanne L. Melinsky's [57] MOTION for Release Pending Appeal (agil)
                                LREF
                                Blank 58 Filed: 10/13/2005, Entered: 10/14/2005 Order on Motion for Release from CustodyCourt Filing
                                ORDER denying [57] Motion for Release Pending Appeal as to Suzanne L. Melinsky (1). Signed by Judge James C. Cacheris on 10/13/05. Copies mailed; 10/14/05 (jwhe, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 57 Filed: 10/7/2005, Entered: 10/7/2005, Terminated: 10/13/2005 Motion for Release from Custody
                                  MOTION for Release Pending Appeal by Suzanne L. Melinsky. (agil)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 56 Filed: 9/28/2005, Entered: 9/29/2005 USCA Order
                                    ORDER of USCA as to Suzanne L. Melinsky the court relieves appellants court appointed counsel, the Federal Public Defender, from the obligation of further legal repesentation of appellant in this appeal. The court appoints Paul Vangellow as new counsel for appellant pursuant to the provisions of the CJA. (nmck, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 55 Filed: 9/27/2005, Entered: 9/27/2005 USCA Order
                                      ORDER of USCA (copy) as to Suzanne L. Melinsky. The court appoints the Federal Public Defender at Alexandria, VA as counsel to represent appellant in this case. (nmck, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 9/27/2005, Entered: 9/27/2005 USCA Case Number
                                        USCA Case Number 05-4948, case manager Tony Webb for [50] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment filed by Suzanne L. Melinsky,. (nmck, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 54 Filed: 9/22/2005, Entered: 9/22/2005 CJA 20 AppointmentCourt Filing
                                          CJA 20 as to Suzanne L. Melinsky: Appointment of Attorney Paul P. Vangellow. Authorized by Judge James C. Cacheris on 09/22/05. (dhoo )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 9/20/2005, Entered: 9/20/2005 Oral Order
                                            ORAL ORDER that the Clerk's Office shall appoint the next attorney on the list to represent Suzanne L. Melinsky for purposes of appeal. So Ordered by Judge James C. Cacheris on 9/16/05. (dper)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 50 Filed: 9/16/2005, Entered: 9/20/2005 Notice of Appeal -Final Judgment
                                              NOTICE OF APPEAL by Suzanne L. Melinsky (1) re [46] Judgment dated 9/9/05 count(s) 1,2,3,4,7,8. Copy sent to USCA. Copy sent to parties. (nmck, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 47 Filed: 9/9/2005, Entered: 9/13/2005 Order on Motion to VacateCourt Filing
                                                ORDER, for reasons stated in open court, it is accordingly Ordered that: 1) deft's [39] Motion for New Trial is denied as to Suzanne L. Melinsky (1). Further, Bobby Stafford is relieved as counsel for deft and the office of Federal Public Defender is appointed to represent the deft on appeal. Signed by Judge James C. Cacheris on 9/9/05. (dper)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 46 Filed: 9/9/2005, Entered: 9/13/2005 Judgment*Court Filing
                                                  JUDGMENT as to Suzanne L. Melinsky (1), Counts 1, 2, 3, 4, 7, & 8: BOP for 18 months on each count, to run concurrently; 3 years supervised release on each count, to run concurrently w/special conditions; restitution of $86,277.48; $600 special assessment ($100 on each count). Signed by Judge James C. Cacheris on 9/9/05. (dper)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 9/9/2005, Entered: 9/16/2005 Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                    Attorney update in case as to Suzanne L. Melinsky. Attorney Bobby B. Stafford terminated. (dper)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 9/9/2005, Entered: 9/13/2005 Sentencing
                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James C. Cacheris :Sentencing held on 9/9/2005 for Suzanne L. Melinsky (1). USA appeared through: Mark Grundvig/Charles Connolly. Deft appeared with: Bobby Stafford. Court adopts PSI. Deft's motion for a new trial - argued and denied. JUDGMENT: Counts 1, 2, 3, 4, 7 & 8: BOP for 18 months on each count, to run concurrently; 3 years supervised release on each count, to run concurrently w/special conditions: 1) provide PO w/access to financial info; 2) shall not incur new credit card charges or open add'l lines of credit w/o approval of PO; $86,277.48 restitution, jointly and severally with her codefendant, in monthly payments of $100 to begin w/in 60 days from release from custody; $600 special assessment ($100 on each count). Deft notified of right to appeal. The court will appoint the Federal Public Defender to represent the deft on appeal. The court recommends that the deft be designated to FCI Alderson, WV. The deft shall self surrender on or before 2 weeks (September 23, 2005) as dir by Mshl. (Court Reporter D. McCoy.) (dper)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 45 Filed: 9/8/2005, Entered: 9/8/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                        Memorandum in Support by Suzanne L. Melinsky re [39] MOTION for New Trial, [38] MOTION to Vacate Judgment (clar, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 44 Filed: 9/7/2005, Entered: 9/8/2005 Response to Motion
                                                          RESPONSE by USA as to Suzanne L. Melinsky to [39] MOTION for New Trial, [38] MOTION to Vacate Judgment (jwhe, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 43 Filed: 9/6/2005, Entered: 9/6/2005 Response to Motion
                                                            SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE by USA as to Suzanne L. Melinsky, Raymond J. Melinsky [36] MOTION to Grant a New Trial and MOTION to Vacate Judgment, [39] MOTION for New Trial, [38] MOTION to Vacate Judgment (jwhe, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 42 Filed: 9/6/2005, Entered: 9/6/2005 Response to Motion
                                                              RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Suzanne L. Melinsky, Raymond J. Melinsky re [36] MOTION to Vacate Judgment and Grant a New Trial by Raymond J. Melinsky (kbar, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 41 Filed: 9/2/2005, Entered: 9/6/2005 Position on Sentencing
                                                                Position with respect to sentencing by USA as to Suzanne L. Melinsky, Raymond J. Melinsky (kjon )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 40 Filed: 8/29/2005, Entered: 8/30/2005 Notice of Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                  NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION in case as to Suzanne L. Melinsky [39] MOTION for New Trial, [38] MOTION to Vacate Judgment: Motion Hearing set for 9/9/2005 09:00 AM before District Judge James C. Cacheris. (jwhe, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 39 Filed: 8/29/2005, Entered: 8/30/2005, Terminated: 9/9/2005 Motion for New Trial
                                                                    MOTION for New Trial by Suzanne L. Melinsky. (jwhe, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 38 Filed: 8/29/2005, Entered: 8/30/2005 Motion to Vacate
                                                                      MOTION to Vacate Judgment by Suzanne L. Melinsky. (jwhe, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 34 Filed: 6/17/2005, Entered: 6/17/2005 Jury Verdict
                                                                        JURY VERDICT as to Suzanne L. Melinsky (1) Guilty on Count 1,2,3-4,7-8 and Raymond J. Melinsky (2) Guilty on Count 1,2,5-6,7-8. (dper)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 6/17/2005, Entered: 6/17/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                          Set/Deadlines/Hearings as to Suzanne L. Melinsky, Raymond J. Melinsky: Sentencing set for 9/9/2005 09:00 AM before Honorable District James C. Cacheris. (dper)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 6/17/2005, Entered: 6/17/2005 Jury Trial
                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James C. Cacheris. Jury Trial as to Suzanne L. Melinsky, Raymond J. Melinsky cont'd on 6/17/2005. Appearances as previous. Jury appeared as previous and retired to start their deliberations. The jury returned to the courtroom with a verdict of Guilty on all counts as to each defendant. Jury polled and excused. Jury Verdict filed in open court. Defts referred to PO for PSI and cont'd to 9/9/05 for sentencing. Defts cont'd on present bond with an additional condition directing them to notify PO of any change of address. (Court Reporter D. McCoy.) (dper)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 33 Filed: 6/16/2005, Entered: 6/16/2005 Jury Instructions
                                                                              Jury Instructions as to Suzanne L. Melinsky (dper)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 6/16/2005, Entered: 6/16/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                Set/Deadlines/Hearings as to Suzanne L. Melinsky, Raymond J. Melinsky: Jury Trial set for 6/17/2005 09:30 AM before Honorable District James C. Cacheris. (dper)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 6/16/2005, Entered: 6/16/2005 Jury Trial
                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James C. Cacheris. Jury Trial as to Suzanne L. Melinsky, Raymond J. Melinsky cont'd on 6/16/2005. Appearances as previous. Instruction conference held. Jury appeared as previous. Deft Suzanne Milinsky adduced evidence and rests. Deft Raymond Melinsky adduced evidence and rests. At bench conference, defts renewed their R.29 motions - denied as previously stated. Closing arguments. Jury charged and excused to return on 6/17/05 @ 9:30 a.m. to begin deliberations. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter D. McCoy.) (dper)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 32 Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: 6/15/2005 Order on Motion in LimineCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER, for reasons stated in open Court, denying [22] Motion in Limine as to Raymond J. Melinsky (2); denying [23] Motion to Dismiss as to Raymond J. Melinsky (2). Signed by Judge James C. Cacheris on 6/15/05. (dper)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 31 Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: 6/15/2005 Stipulation
                                                                                      STIPULATION - R&S Construction Business Records by USA, Raymond J. Melinsky and Suzanne L. Melinsky. (dper)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 30 Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: 6/15/2005 Stipulation
                                                                                        STIPULATION - First Savings Bank Business Records by USA, Raymond J. Melinsky and Suzanne L. Melinsky. (dper)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 29 Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: 6/15/2005 Stipulation
                                                                                          STIPULATION - Burke and Herbert Bank Business Records by USA, Raymond J. Melinsky and Suzanne L. Melinsky. (dper)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: 6/15/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                            Set Deadlines/Hearings as to Suzanne L. Melinsky, Raymond J. Melinsky: Jury Trial set for 6/16/2005 09:30 AM for counsel and 10:00 AM for jury before Honorable District James C. Cacheris. (dper)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: 6/15/2005 Jury Trial
                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James C. Cacheris. Jury Trial as to Suzanne L. Melinsky, Raymond J. Melinsky cont'd on 6/15/2005. Appearances as previous. Out of presence of the jury, the Govt's previous motion to reconsider striking the testimony of Mr. Boxer was amended to allow testimony regarding procedures and licenses only - granted by the Court. Stipulations filed in open court as to: 1) Burke and Herbert Bank Business Records; 2) 1st Savings Bank Business Records; 3) R&S Construction Business Records. Jury appeared as previous. Govt cont'd to adduce evidence. The court notified the jury as to its' ruling regarding Boxer's testimony. Govt. rests. Jury excused to return on 6/16/05 at 10:00 a.m. Defts' R. 29 motions - argued and denied. Govt. to strike "Fairfax County Department of Public Works" in Count 7 and will provide Indictment w/redacted language. Counsel to return on 6/16/05 at 9:30 a.m. for jury instructions. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter N. Linnell.) (dper)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 28 Filed: 6/14/2005, Entered: 6/14/2005 Witness List
                                                                                                WITNESS LIST by USA as to Suzanne L. Melinsky, Raymond J. Melinsky (dper)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 6/14/2005, Entered: 6/14/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                  Set Deadlines/Hearings as to Suzanne L. Melinsky, Raymond J. Melinsky: Jury Trial set for 6/15/2005 10:00 AM before Honorable District James C. Cacheris. (dper)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 6/14/2005, Entered: 6/14/2005 Jury Trial
                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James C. Cacheris. Jury Trial as to Suzanne L. Melinsky, Raymond J. Melinsky held on 6/14/2005. USA appeared through: Charles Connolly and Mark Grundvig. Deft Suzanne Melinsky appeared with: Bobby Stafford and deft Raymond Melinsky appeared with: Robert Whitestone. Preliminary matters: Deft Raymond Melinsky's motin to dismiss - w/drawn as to Conspiracy statute. Govt's objection to deft Raymond Melinsky's voir dire questions - the court will take up at bench conference if necessary. Govt's motion in limine re: admission of busiiness records and use of summary charts - the court will reserve ruling on business records until they are offered and will rule on summary charts when witness is on. The jury appeared as summoned and sworn on voir dire. 15 jurors selected to try the issues. Rule on witness by counsel. Opening Statements. Govt adduced evidence. The court strikes the testimony of Robert Boxer. Jury excused to return on 06/15/05 at 10:00 a.m. The Govt requested that the court reconsider striking Mr. Boxer's testimony - the court asked the court reporter to provide a transcript by tomorrow morning. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter D. McCoy.) (dper)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 6/14/2005, Entered: 6/14/2005 Voir Dire Begun
                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James C. Cacheris :Voir Dire begun on 6/14/2005 Suzanne L. Melinsky (1) on Count 1,2,3-4,7-8 and Raymond J. Melinsky (2) on Count 1,2,5-6,7-8 (Court Reporter D. McCoy.) (dper)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 22 Filed: 6/10/2005, Entered: 6/10/2005, Terminated: 6/15/2005 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                        MOTIONS in Limine by Raymond J. Melinsky(agil)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 21 Filed: 6/8/2005, Entered: 6/9/2005 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                          MOTIONS in Limine re: business recordsby USA as to Suzanne L. Melinsky, Raymond J. Melinsky. (agil)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 17 Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: 6/7/2005 Exhibit
                                                                                                            Trial Exhibit Custody Form by USA. Exhibits 1 - 126 Returned to SAUSA Mark Grundrig. (agil)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 16 Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: 6/7/2005 Exhibit
                                                                                                              EXHIBIT LIST by USA as to Suzanne L. Melinsky, Raymond J. Melinsky (agil)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 15 Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: 6/7/2005 Proposed Jury Instructions
                                                                                                                Proposed Jury Instructions by USA as to Suzanne L. Melinsky, Raymond J. Melinsky (agil)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 14 Filed: 5/26/2005, Entered: 5/27/2005 Order on Motion in LimineCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER, for the reasons stated in open Court, Granting the gvt's [12] Motion in Limine as to Suzanne L. Melinsky (1), Raymond J. Melinsky (2). Signed by Judge James C. Cacheris on 5/26/2005. Copies sent: 5/27/05 (agil)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 13 Filed: 5/26/2005, Entered: 5/26/2005 Response in Opposition
                                                                                                                    Opposition by Suzanne L. Melinsky re [12] Motion in Limine to require the defendant to testify in this cause. (dper)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 5/26/2005, Entered: 5/26/2005 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James C. Cacheris. USA appeared through: Mark Grundvig/Charles Connelly. Deft Suzanne Melinsky appeared with: Bobby Stafford. Motion Hearing held on 5/26/2005 re [12] Motion in Limine to require Suzanne Melinsky to testify in this case filed by USA. Motion argued and granted. Deft stipulated to the records in open court. (Court Reporter N. Linnell.) (dper)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 12 Filed: 4/19/2005, Entered: 4/19/2005, Terminated: 5/26/2005 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA as to Suzanne L. Melinsky, Raymond J. Melinsky in limine for a pre-trial hearing to est. foundation for business records. (agil)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 11 Filed: 4/14/2005, Entered: 4/14/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [10-1] motion for Discovery Order as to Suzanne Melinsky (1), Raymond J. Melinsky (2) ( Signed by Judge Albert V. Bryan Jr. ) Copies Mailed: y (pmet)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 10 Filed: 4/6/2005, Entered: 4/6/2005, Terminated: 4/14/2005 Motion for Discovery
                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA as to Suzanne L. Melinsky, Raymond J. Melinsky for Discovery Order (agil)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 8 Filed: 3/23/2005, Entered: 3/24/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER that the defts having been arraigned in open court and the court finds that the defts waived their rights to a speedy trial, and that it is in the interest of justice that it be tried on 06/14/05 as to Suzanne L. Melinsky, Raymond J. Melinsky, set Jury Trial for 10:00 6/14/05 for Suzanne L. Melinsky, for Raymond J. Melinsky before Judge James C. Cacheris (Signed by Judge James C. Cacheris) Copies Mailed: yes (dper)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 7 Filed: 3/22/2005, Entered: 3/23/2005 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance for Suzanne L. Melinsky by Attorney Bobby B. Stafford (jcup)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 3/22/2005, Entered: 3/22/2005 Receipt for Passport
                                                                                                                                  Receipt for surrender of Passport as to Suzanne L. Melinsky Passport # 404441824 Country: USA (jcup)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 3/21/2005, Entered: 3/21/2005 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Suzanne L. Melinsky (Signed by Judge James C. Cacheris) Copies Mailed: yes (dper)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/21/2005, Entered: 3/21/2005 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                                      Arraignment as to Suzanne L. Melinsky, Raymond J. Melinsky before Judge James C. Cacheris held. Defts waived formal arraignment, entered pleas of not guilty and requested a jury trial. 30 days to file motions. Motion Hearing set for 9:30 5/26/05 for Suzanne L. Melinsky, for Raymond J. Melinsky. Jury Trial set for 10:00 6/14/05 for Suzanne L. Melinsky, for Raymond J. Melinsky; (r: D. McCoy) USA appeared through: Mark Grundvig/Charles Connolly. Suzanne Melinsky appeared with: Bobby Stafford. Raymond Melinsky appeared with: Robert Whitestone. Defts waived their right to speedy trial in open court. Defts released on $30,000 PR bond w/special conditions: 1) travel restricted to Culpeper, VA and Metro DC area; 2) advise Pretrial Services of change of address; 3) Suzanne Melinsky to surrender her passport to Clerk's Office by 4:00 p.m. on 3/22/05. Release Order ent. & filed in open court. (dper)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 3/21/2005, Entered: 3/21/2005 Initial Appearance
                                                                                                                                        Initial appearance as to Suzanne L. Melinsky, Raymond J. Melinsky before Judge James C. Cacheris held (r: D. McCoy) USA appeared through: Mark Grundvig/Charles Connolly. Suzanne Melinskyi appeared with: Bobby Stafford. Raymond Melinsky appeared with: Robert Whitestone. (Defendants informed of rights.) (dper)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 3/17/2005, Entered: 3/17/2005 Summons Returned Unexecuted
                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Suzanne L. Melinsky (agil)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 3/11/2005, Entered: 3/11/2005 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS(ES) issued for Suzanne L. Melinsky, Raymond J. Melinsky for arraignment set for 3/21/05 at 9:30 a.m. (ctat)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 3/9/2005, Entered: 3/11/2005 Indictment
                                                                                                                                              INDICTMENT as to Suzanne L. Melinsky (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3-4, 7-8, Raymond J. Melinsky (2) count(s) 1, 2, 5-6, 7-8 (ctat)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 3/9/2005, Entered: 3/11/2005 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                                                Arraignment before Judge James C. Cacheris set for 9:30 a.m. on 3/21/05 for Suzanne L. Melinsky, for Raymond J. Melinsky (ctat)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 140 times.

                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?