Colgan Air, Inc. v. Raytheon Aircraft
Federal Civil Lawsuit Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-00213-TSE-TRJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 12, 2019 at 6:59 PM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Colgan Air, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dombroff & Gilmore

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas Barton Almy +1 703 336 8723 +1 703 336 8750 talmy@dglitigators.com
Space Morgan Warren Campbell +1 703 336 8800 +1 703 336 8750 mcampbell@dglitigators.com
Space Mark A. Dombroff +1 703 336 8700 +1 202 625 3150 mdombroff@dglitigators.com
v.
No Logo Raytheon Aircraft Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hall Sickels Frei & Mims

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Holly Parkhurst Essing +1 703 925 0500
Space Robert Taggart Hall +1 703 925 0500 +1 703 925 9166 rthall@hallandsethi.com
Office Alexandria
Filed 2/24/2005
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $2700000
Nature of Suit 380 - Personal Property: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Prince William
Terminated 5/5/2008
Origin 3
Reopened 11/28/2007
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case '06-1069'[]
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, JURY
  Entries (331) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 295 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: 5/5/2008 OrderCourt Filing
SO ORDERED re: [294] STIPULATION of Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by Colgan Air, Inc., Raytheon Aircraft Company. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 5/5/2008. Copies sent: yes.(stas)
    LREF
    Blank 294 Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: 5/2/2008 Stipulation of Dismissal
    STIPULATION of Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by Colgan Air, Inc., Raytheon Aircraft Company. (stas)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 4/24/2008, Entered: 4/24/2008 Docket Annotation
      CASE SETTLED 4/10/08. Called counsel, per chambers, to request a date by which parties plan to file a stipulation of dismissal. (tbul, )
        LREF
        Blank 293 Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: 4/11/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
        TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 3/28/08 before Judge Ellis. Court Reporter: Rodriquez. 78 pages. (tbul, )
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 4/10/2008, Entered: 4/14/2008 Jury Trial Completed
          Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge T. S. Ellis, III: Jury Trial completed on 4/10/2008. (Court Reporter Rodriquez.) (tbul, )
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 4/10/2008, Entered: 4/14/2008 Status Conference
            Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge T. S. Ellis, III: Status Conference held on 4/10/2008. Parties notified the Court, on the record, that they have reached a settlement. Trial exhibits were returned and counsel were excused. The Court then spoke with the jury off the record and excused them from further service. (Court Reporter Rhonda Montgomery.) (tbul, )
              LREF
              Blank 292 Filed: 4/9/2008, Entered: 4/10/2008 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER, for good cause, BIFURCATING the trial, per the parties' agreement to do so, with the issue of whether the maintenance manual and the aircraft were a single product to be tried before, and separately from, plaintiffs' breach of warranty claims. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 4/9/08. Mailed: yes(tbul, )
                LREF
                Blank 291 Filed: 4/9/2008, Entered: 4/9/2008 Proposed Jury Instructions
                Raytheon Aircraft Company's PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS on Limited Warranty (Trial No. 1) (tbul, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 290 Filed: 4/9/2008, Entered: 4/9/2008 Jury Verdict
                  Raytheon Aircraft Company's Proposed VERDICT FORM for Limited Warranty (Trial No. 1) (tbul, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 289 Filed: 4/9/2008, Entered: 4/9/2008 Jury Verdict
                    Colgan Air, Inc.'s Proposed Interrogatory (Verdict Form for Trial No. 1) (tbul, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 288 Filed: 4/9/2008, Entered: 4/9/2008 Order on Motion in LimineCourt Filing
                      ORDER, for reasons stated herein and from the Bench, GRANTING defendant's [220] Motion in Limine to exclude the flight simulator evaluations contained in NYSB Group Chairman's Factual Report. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 4/9/08. Copies: By Hand (tbul, )
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 4/9/2008, Entered: 4/9/2008 Jury Trial Held
                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge T. S. Ellis, III: Jury Trial Day 2 (hrg. out of the presence of the jury) held on 4/9/2008. Appearances: Same as Day 1. Bifurcation issues heard, incld'g. revised proposed jury instrux. and revised proposed verdict forms. Objections to exhbits heard: Deft 8 (reserve), 10 (Deft to w/draw exh.), 12 -overruled, but Pltff may cross-examine as to the differences, and 171 -overruled, because the Affidavit itself was never meant to come in. Also Pltff 68 - Deft's obj. overruled, may examine on it. Opening arguments on Trial 1 to be heard first thing tomorrow: Jury Trial set for 4/10/2008 at 09:30 AM before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. Then Deft will go first w/ evidence (2 witnesses) and Pltff next (1 witness).(Court Reporter Rodriquez.) (tbul, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 287 Filed: 4/8/2008, Entered: 4/8/2008 Order on Motion in LimineCourt Filing
                          ORDER GRANTING IN PART (with respect to Pltff's damages request for $74,611.47 for "crew family payments" and $15,155.08 for "memorial services") and DENIED IN PART (in all other respects) Deft's [202] Motion in Limine to preclude evidence of voluntary payments made by Pltff and consequential damages, for good cause and for reasons stated from the Bench in the course of a hearing on 3/28/08. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 4/8/08. (tbul, )
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 4/8/2008, Entered: 4/8/2008 Jury Trial Held
                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge T. S. Ellis, III: Jury Trial Day 1 held on 4/8/2008. Appearances: Dombroff/Almy for Pltff; Essing/Hall/Jones. The Court stated its reconsidered rulings from the Bench and vacated a previous Bench ruling re: Docket No. 203 217, 218 221, all originally denied and now granted, then also stated that No. 219 and 223 are now granted in part. Counsel agreed to bifurcate the trial. Jurors appeared as summoned, were sworn on voir dire, and 7 consisting of 6 jurors and 1 unidentified alternate were sworn to try the issues. Jury excused until Thurs. 4/10/08 @ 9:30 a.m. and counsel to appear for: Jury Trial/Status conf. re: bifurcated trial, set for 4/9/2008 at 04:00 PM before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (Court Reporter Rodriquez.) (tbul, )
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 4/8/2008, Entered: 4/8/2008 Set/Reset Hearings
                              Set/Reset Hearings: Jury Trial re-set for 4/8/2008 at 10:00 AM before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (tbul, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 286 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: 4/8/2008 Order on Motion in LimineCourt Filing
                                ORDER GRANTING Pltff's [216] Motion in Limine to exclude references to the fact that Richard Nelson's wife and Michael Scheidt's wife had cancer, for reasons stated from the Bench and herein, with leave to Raytheon to renew its objection in the course of the trial if circumstances warrant. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 4/7/08. Copies: By Hand (tbul, ) Modified to correct the date of the entry (tbul, ).
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 285 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: 4/7/2008 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                  ORDER GRANTING Deft's [201] Motion to join AIG Aviation, Inc. as an additional party, for reasons stated herein and from the Bench. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 4/7/08. By Hand. (tbul, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: 4/8/2008 Motion Hearing
                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge T. S. Ellis, III: Motion Hearing held on 4/7/2008 re: various motions, including [211] MOTION in Limine filed by Colgan Air, Inc., [216] MOTION in Limine filed by Colgan Air, Inc., [202] MOTION in Limine filed by Raytheon Aircraft Company. Appearances: Dombroff/Almy for Pltff; Essing/Jones/Hall for Deft. (Court Reporter Rodriquez.) (tbul, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: 4/7/2008 Exhibit
                                      Trial Exhibits received from Raytheon Aircraft Company (3 sets (1 orig. and 2 copies)-5 binders per set). (stas)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: 4/7/2008 Exhibit
                                        Trial Exhibits received from Colgan Air, Inc. (3 sets (1 orig. and 2 copies)- 8 binders per set). (stas)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 284 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: 4/7/2008 Order on Motion in LimineCourt Filing
                                          ORDER, for reasons stated herein and from the Bench, DENYING in part the Deft's [204] Motion in Limine (to exclude references by Pltff's counsel that the jury should send Deft a message or punish Deft and to exclude evidence of or references to the wrongful death suits brought against Deft in connection with the accident at issue), and DEFERRING in part (deferring a ruling on the remainder of the motion with respect to "various matters"). Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 4/4/08. By Hand (tbul, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 283 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: 4/7/2008 Order on Motion in LimineCourt Filing
                                            ORDER GRANTING Pltff's [213] Motion in Limine to exclude evidence of post-accident changes to Pltff's internal maintenance procedures, for reasons stated herein and from the Bench, unless Pltff chooses to offer as a measure of its damages the costs associated with its post-accident maintenance consultants. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 4/4/08. By Hand (tbul, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 282 Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: 4/3/2008 Response
                                              Response by Raytheon Aircraft Company to [278] Supplemental Submission by Colgan Air, Inc. Relating to [223] MOTION in Limine #13. (stas)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 281 Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: 4/3/2008 Docket Annotation
                                                Counter-Desigations of Deposition Testimony by Raytheon Aircraft Company. (stas)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 280 Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: 4/3/2008 Objection
                                                  Objections by Raytheon Aircraft Company to [279] Designation of Deposition Testimony by Colgan Air, Inc. (stas)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: 4/7/2008 Motion Hearing
                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge T. S. Ellis, III: Motion Hearing held on 4/3/2008 re: [218] MOTION in Limine filed by Colgan Air, Inc. - heard, [213] MOTION in Limine filed by Colgan Air, Inc. - heard, findings stated and granted. Appearances: Dombroff/Almy for Pltff; Jones/Essing/Hall for Deft. This motion hrg. to cont. on Mon. 4/7/08 and the jury trial is moved back one day, to 4/8/08. Jury notified. (Court Reporter Rodriquez.) (tbul, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 279 Filed: 4/2/2008, Entered: 4/3/2008 Docket Annotation
                                                      Designation of Deposition Testimony by Colgan Air, Inc. (LARGE PLEADING) (stas)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 278 Filed: 4/2/2008, Entered: 4/3/2008 Memorandum
                                                        Supplemental Submission by Colgan Air, Inc. Relating to [223] MOTION in Limine #13 by Colgan Air, Inc. (stas)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 277 Filed: 4/2/2008, Entered: 4/2/2008 Memorandum
                                                          Memorandum by Raytheon Aircraft Company in Support of the Admissibility of Evidence Relating to the Cockpit Voice Recording (UNDER SEAL). (stas)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 4/2/2008, Entered: 4/2/2008 Exhibit
                                                            UNDER SEAL 4 CDs of CVR received from Raytheon Aircraft Company. (stas)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 273 Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: 4/1/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER that Raytheon is DIRECTED to submit UNDER SEAL, by 12:00 p.m., Wednesday, April 2, 2008, the complete cockpit voice recording (CVR), as well as those portions of the CVR transcript it seeks to use in the course of the trial for any purpose, together with a brief pleading setting forth the reasons it seeks to use any portion of the CVR transcript and the identity of any witness through whom it seeks to offer any portion of the CVR transcript. Signed by Judge District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 3/31/2008. Copies sent & faxed: yes.(stas)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 276 Filed: 3/28/2008, Entered: 4/2/2008 Proposed Voir Dire
                                                                Amended Proposed Voir Dire Questions by Raytheon Aircraft Company. (stas)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 275 Filed: 3/28/2008, Entered: 4/2/2008 Exhibit
                                                                  REVISED Exhibit List by Raytheon Aircraft Company.(stas)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 274 Filed: 3/28/2008, Entered: 4/1/2008 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge T. S. Ellis, III: Motion Hearing held on 3/28/2008 re: various pre-trial motions, incld'g [223] MOTION in Limine filed by Colgan Air, Inc. (heard, findings stated and denied w/out prejudice to Pltffs to bring specifics later), [202] MOTION in Limine filed by Raytheon Aircraft Company, and motion for adding or substituting AIG in lieu of Colgan. Motions hrg. to cont. 1:00 next Thurs. (Court Reporter Rodriquez.) (tbul, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/28/2008, Entered: 4/1/2008 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                      Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set to continue on 4/3/2008 at 01:00 PM before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (tbul, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 272 Filed: 3/26/2008, Entered: 3/27/2008 Objection
                                                                        Objection by Raytheon Aircraft Company to Colgan Air Inc.'s Addition of Three Experts to Its May Call Witness List. (stas)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 271 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: 3/25/2008 Reply
                                                                          Reply by Colgan Air, Inc. to [261] Memorandum by Raytheon Aircraft Company in Opposition to [223] MOTION in Limine #13 by Colgan Air, Inc. to Exclude Evidence of Alleged Colgan Negligence and Rebuttal Brief. (stas)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 270 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: 3/25/2008 Reply
                                                                            Rebuttal Brief by Raytheon Aircraft Company to [239] Response by Colgan Air, Inc. to [207] TRIAL BRIEF by Raytheon Aircraft Company. (stas)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 269 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: 3/25/2008 Reply
                                                                              Reply Memorandum by Raytheon Aircraft Company in Support of [204] MOTION in Limine by Raytheon Aircraft Company with Respect to Various Matters. (stas)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 268 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: 3/25/2008 Reply
                                                                                Reply by Raytheon Aircraft Company in Further Support of [201] MOTION by Raytheon Aircraft Company to Join AIG Aviation, Inc. as an Additional Party Plaintiff. (stas)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 267 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: 3/25/2008 Reply
                                                                                  Reply by Raytheon Aircraft Company in Further Support of [200] MOTION in Limine by Raytheon Aircraft Company to Preclude Opinion Evidence Contained in the Reports of the National Transportation Safety Board. (stas)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 266 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: 3/25/2008 Reply
                                                                                    Reply by Raytheon Aircraft Company in Further Support of [202] MOTION in Limine by Raytheon Aircraft Company to Preclude Evidence of Voluntary Payments Made by the Plaintiff and Consequential Damages. (stas)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 265 Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: 3/18/2008 Objection
                                                                                      Objections by Raytheon Aircraft Company to [209] Proposed Jury Instructions by Colgan Air, Inc. (stas)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 264 Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: 3/18/2008 Response
                                                                                        Response by Raytheon Aircraft Company in Opposition to [210] Memorandum by Colgan Air, Inc. in Support of 50 Objections to deft's 41 Exhibit List filed by Colgan Air, Inc. (stas)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 263 Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: 3/18/2008 Proposed Jury Instructions
                                                                                          List of Proposed Jury Instructions by Raytheon Aircraft Company. (stas)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 262 Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: 3/18/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                            Memorandum by Raytheon Aircraft Company in Opposition to [224] MOTION in Limine #14 by Colgan Air, Inc. to Admit Evidence of FAA-Issued Airworthiness Directive Applicable to the Beech 1900D Aircraft. (stas)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 261 Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: 3/18/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                              Memorandum by Raytheon Aircraft Company in Opposition to [223] MOTION in Limine #13 by Colgan Air, Inc. to Exclude Evidence of Alleged Colgan Negligence. (stas)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 260 Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: 3/18/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                Memorandum by Raytheon Aircraft Company in Opposition to [222] MOTION in Limine #12 by Colgan Air, Inc. to Preclude Reference to Federal Aviation Regulations Regarding Use of the Raytheon Maintenance Manual for the Beech 1900D Aircraft. (stas)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 259 Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: 3/18/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                  Memorandum by Raytheon Aircraft Company in Opposition to [221] MOTION in Limine #11 by Colgan Air, Inc. to Exclude Colgan's Beech 1900 Company Flight Manual, General Maintenance Manual, and Flight Operations Policies and Procedures Manual from Evidence. (stas)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 258 Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: 3/18/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                    Memorandum by Raytheon Aircraft Company in Opposition to [219] MOTION in Limine #9 by Colgan Air, Inc. to Exclude Testimony of Defendant's Expert Richard Nelson Regarding Human Factors and Accident Investigation. (stas)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 257 Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: 3/18/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                      Memorandum by Raytheon Aircraft Company in Opposition to [218] MOTION in Limine #8 by Colgan Air, Inc. to Exclude the Cockpit Voice Recorder Tape and Transcript, and References to Either or Both of Them, and All Opinions Predicated or Stemming Therefrom. (stas)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 256 Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: 3/18/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                        Memorandum by Raytheon Aircraft Company in Opposition to [217] MOTION in Limine #7 by Colgan Air, Inc. to Exclude Testimony Regarding Flight Time Limitations and Rest Requirements, Sterile Cockpit Concept, and First Flight of the Day Checklist. (stas)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 255 Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: 3/18/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                          Memorandum by Raytheon Aircraft Company in Opposition to [216] MOTION in Limine #6 by Colgan Air, Inc. to Exclude References to the Fact that Richard Nelson's Wife and Michael Scheidt's Wife had Cancer. (stas)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 254 Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: 3/18/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                            Memorandum by Raytheon Aircraft Company in Opposition to [215] MOTION in Limine #5 by Colgan Air, Inc. to Exclude Evidence of Flight Crew's Prior Failures of Flight Tests, Proficiency Checks, or Check Rides. (stas)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 253 Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: 3/18/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                              Memorandum by Raytheon Aircraft Company in Opposition to [214] MOTION in Limine #4 by Colgan Air, Inc. to Exclude Evidence of the Failure of Maintenance Personnel to Remove the Elevators From the Incident Aircraft When Replacing the Elevator Trim Tab Actuators and [220] MOTION in Limine #10 by Colgan Air, Inc. to Exclude Evidence of Enforcement Actions and Suspensions of Colgan Mechanics for Failure to Remove Aircraft Elevators During Maintenance. (LARGE PLEADING) (stas)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 252 Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: 3/18/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                Memorandum by Raytheon Aircraft Company in Opposition to [213] MOTION in Limine #3 by Colgan Air, Inc. to Exclude Evidence of Post-Accident Changes to Internal Maintenance Procedures. (stas)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 251 Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: 3/18/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                  Memorandum by Raytheon Aircraft Company in Opposition to [212] MOTION in Limine #2 by Colgan Air, Inc. to Admit into Evidence NTSB Report of Flight 5481 Accident. (stas)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 250 Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: 3/18/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                    Memorandum by Raytheon Aircraft Company in Opposition to [211] MOTION in Limine #1 by Colgan Air, Inc. to Admit Evidence Regarding the Pre-Accident and Post-Accident Revisions to the Beech 1900D Maintenance Manual. (stas)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 249 Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: 3/18/2008 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                      RESPONSE BRIEF by Colgan Air, Inc. to [200] MOTION in Limine by Raytheon Aircraft Company to Preclude Opinion Evidence Contained in the Reports of the National Transportation Safety Board. (stas)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 248 Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: 3/18/2008 Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                        Massachusetts Superior Court Civil Pattern Jury Instructions - Excerpts by Colgan Air, Inc. (LARGE PLEADING) (stas) Modified on 3/18/2008 to indicate pleading is large(stas).
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 247 Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: 3/18/2008 Objection
                                                                                                                          Objections by Colgan Air, Inc. to [236] PROPOSED Verdict Form by Raytheon Aircraft Company. (stas)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 246 Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: 3/18/2008 Objection
                                                                                                                            Objections by Colgan Air, Inc. to [206] Proposed Jury Instructions by Raytheon Aircraft Company. (stas)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 245 Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: 3/18/2008 Response
                                                                                                                              Response Brief by Colgan Air, Inc. to [205] Memorandum by Raytheon Aircraft Company in Support of [49] Objections by Raytheon Aircraft Company to [37] Colgan's Exhibits. (stas)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 244 Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: 3/18/2008 Response
                                                                                                                                Response BRIEF by Colgan Air, Inc. to [83] MOTION by Raytheon Aircraft Company in Limine to exclude testimony or documents. (stas) Modified on 3/27/2008 to link to document 83 as per counsel for pltf(stas).
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 243 Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: 3/18/2008 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE BRIEF by Colgan Air, Inc. to [203] MOTION in Limine by Raytheon Aircraft Company to Preclude Any Witness From Speculating as to the Extent of the Pre-Flight Check Done by the Pilots. (stas)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 242 Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: 3/18/2008 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE BRIEF by Colgan Air, Inc. to [204] MOTION in Limine by Raytheon Aircraft Company with Respect to Various Matters. (stas)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 241 Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: 3/18/2008 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE BRIEF by Colgan Air, Inc. to [202] MOTION in Limine by Raytheon Aircraft Company to Preclude Evidence of Voluntary Payments Made by the Plaintiff and Consequential Damages. (stas)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 240 Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: 3/18/2008 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE BRIEF by Colgan Air, Inc. to [201] MOTION by Raytheon Aircraft Company to Join AIG Aviation, Inc. as an Additional Party Plaintiff. (stas)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 239 Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: 3/18/2008 Response
                                                                                                                                          Response by Colgan Air, Inc. to [207] TRIAL BRIEF by Raytheon Aircraft Company. (stas)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 238 Filed: 3/13/2008, Entered: 3/14/2008 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            CONSENT ORDER that Raytheon Aircraft Company and Colgan Air, Inc. may use the Evidence Presentation System during trial, which is to begin on April 7, 2008. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Raytheon Aircraft Company's counsel, Robert T. Hall and Michael G. Jones may bring into the Courthouse/Courtroom their personal laptop computers for use in connection with the trial of this case. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Colgan Air, Inc.'s counsel, Mark A. Dombroff and Thomas B. Almy may bring into the Courthouse/Courtroom their personal laptop computers for use in connection with the trial of this case. Signed by Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 3/13/2008. Copies sent: yes. (stas)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 237 Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: 3/12/2008 Witness List
                                                                                                                                              AMENDED Witness List by Raytheon Aircraft Company. (stas)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 236 Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: 3/12/2008 Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                                PROPOSED Verdict Form by Raytheon Aircraft Company. (stas)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 235 Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: 3/12/2008 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Hearing on [233] MOTION by Raytheon Aircraft Company for Leave to Deliver to the Clerk Only the Original of Raytheon's Trial Exhibit 12 - the Paper Version of the Maintenance Manual: Motion Hearing set for 3/28/2008 at 02:00 PM before T. S. Ellis III. (stas)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 234 Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: 3/12/2008 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Hearing on [231] MOTION by Raytheon Aircraft Company for Leave to Correct a Misspelling of a Witness' Name: Motion Hearing set for 3/28/2008 at 02:00 PM before T. S. Ellis III. (stas)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 233 Filed: 3/10/2008, Entered: 3/10/2008, Terminated: 5/5/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by Raytheon Aircraft Company for Leave to Deliver to the Clerk Only the Original of Raytheon's Trial Exhibit 12 - the Paper Version of the Maintenance Manual and Memorandum in Support. (stas)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 232 Filed: 3/10/2008, Entered: 3/10/2008, Terminated: 5/5/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by Raytheon Aircraft Company to Clarify that the Witness Listed as "May Testify" Will be Called to Testify and Memorandum in Support. (stas)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 231 Filed: 3/10/2008, Entered: 3/10/2008, Terminated: 5/5/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by Raytheon Aircraft Company for Leave to Correct a Misspelling of a Witness' Name and Memorandum in Support. (stas)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 230 Filed: 3/10/2008, Entered: 3/10/2008 Answer
                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to First Amended Complaint by Raytheon Aircraft Company.(stas)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 229 Filed: 3/10/2008, Entered: 3/10/2008, Terminated: 3/13/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                              JOINT MOTION by Colgan Air, Inc., Raytheon Aircraft Company for Permission for Counsel to Bring Their Laptops into the Courthouse/Courtroom. (stas)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 228 Filed: 3/10/2008, Entered: 3/10/2008, Terminated: 4/8/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                JOINT MOTION by Colgan Air, Inc., Raytheon Aircraft Company Allowing the Use of the Court's Evidence Presentation System. (stas)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 227 Filed: 3/10/2008, Entered: 3/10/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Barton Almy on behalf of Colgan Air, Inc. (stas)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 226 Filed: 3/10/2008, Entered: 3/10/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Andrew Dombroff on behalf of Colgan Air, Inc. (stas)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 225 Filed: 3/10/2008, Entered: 3/10/2008 Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                                                      Consolidated Deposition Transcript Reference for Motions in Limine #1-#14 by Colgan Air, Inc. (large pleading - spiral bound) (stas) Modified on 3/10/2008 to clarify pleading is large (stas).
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 224 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: 3/7/2008 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION in Limine #14 by Colgan Air, Inc. to Admit Evidence of FAA-Issued Airworthiness Directive Applicable to the Beech 1900D Aircraft and Memorandum in Support. (stas)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 223 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: 3/7/2008 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION in Limine #13 by Colgan Air, Inc. to Exclude Evidence of Alleged Colgan Negligence and Memorandum in Support. (stas)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 222 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: 3/7/2008 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION in Limine #12 by Colgan Air, Inc. to Preclude Reference to Federal Aviation Regulations Regarding Use of the Raytheon Maintenance Manual for the Beech 1900D Aircraft and Memorandum in Support. (stas)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 221 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: 3/7/2008 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION in Limine #11 by Colgan Air, Inc. to Exclude Colgan's Beech 1900 Company Flight Manual, General Maintenance Manual, and Flight Operations Policies and Procedures Manual from Evidence and Memorandum in Support. (stas)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 220 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: 3/7/2008, Terminated: 4/9/2008 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION in Limine #10 by Colgan Air, Inc. to Exclude Evidence of Enforcement Actions and Suspensions of Colgan Mechanics for Failure to Remove Aircraft Elevators During Maintenance and Memorandum in Support. (stas)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 219 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: 3/7/2008 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION in Limine #9 by Colgan Air, Inc. to Exclude Testimony of Defendant's Expert Richard Nelson Regarding Human Factors and Accident Investigation and Memorandum in Support. (stas)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 218 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: 3/7/2008 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION in Limine #8 by Colgan Air, Inc. to Exclude the Cockpit Voice Recorder Tape and Transcript, and References to Either or Both of Them, and All Opinions Predicated or Stemming Therefrom and Memorandum in Support. (stas)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 217 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: 3/7/2008 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION in Limine #7 by Colgan Air, Inc. to Exclude Testimony Regarding Flight Time Limitations and Rest Requirements, Sterile Cockpit Concept, and First Flight of the Day Checklist and Memorandum in Support. (stas)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 216 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: 3/7/2008, Terminated: 4/7/2008 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION in Limine #6 by Colgan Air, Inc. to Exclude References to the Fact that Richard Nelson's Wife and Michael Scheidt's Wife had Cancer and Memorandum in Support. (stas)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 215 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: 3/7/2008 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION in Limine #5 by Colgan Air, Inc. to Exclude Evidence of Flight Crew's Prior Failures of Flight Tests, Proficiency Checks, or Check Rides and Memorandum in Support. (stas)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 214 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: 3/7/2008 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION in Limine #4 by Colgan Air, Inc. to Exclude Evidence of the Failure of Maintenance Personnel to Remove the Elevators From the Incident Aircraft When Replacing the Elevator Trim Tab Actuators and Memorandum in Support. (stas)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 213 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: 3/7/2008, Terminated: 4/4/2008 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION in Limine #3 by Colgan Air, Inc. to Exclude Evidence of Post-Accident Changes to Internal Maintenance Procedures and Memorandum in Support. (stas) Modified on 3/7/2008 to add text re: memorandum in support (stas).
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 212 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: 3/7/2008 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION in Limine #2 by Colgan Air, Inc. to Admit into Evidence NTSB Report of Flight 5481 Accident and Memorandum in Support. (stas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 211 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: 3/7/2008 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION in Limine #1 by Colgan Air, Inc. to Admit Evidence Regarding the Pre-Accident and Post-Accident Revisions to the Beech 1900D Maintenance Manual and Memorandum in Support. (stas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 210 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: 3/7/2008 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum by Colgan Air, Inc. in Support of [50] Objections to deft's [41] Exhibit List filed by Colgan Air, Inc. (stas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 209 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: 3/7/2008 Proposed Jury Instructions
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Jury Instructions by Colgan Air, Inc. (stas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 208 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: 3/7/2008 Trial Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRIAL MEMORANDUM by Colgan Air, Inc. (stas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 207 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: 3/7/2008 Trial Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRIAL BRIEF by Raytheon Aircraft Company. (stas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 206 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: 3/7/2008 Proposed Jury Instructions
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proposed Jury Instructions by Raytheon Aircraft Company (with and without citations). (LARGE PLEADING) (stas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 205 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: 3/7/2008 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum by Raytheon Aircraft Company in Support of [49] Objections by Raytheon Aircraft Company to 37 Colgan's Exhibits. (stas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 204 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: 3/7/2008, Terminated: 4/4/2008 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION in Limine by Raytheon Aircraft Company with Respect to Various Matters and Memorandum in Support. (stas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 203 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: 3/7/2008 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION in Limine by Raytheon Aircraft Company to Preclude Any Witness From Speculating as to the Extent of the Pre-Flight Check Done by the Pilots and Memorandum in Support. (stas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 202 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: 3/7/2008, Terminated: 4/8/2008 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION in Limine by Raytheon Aircraft Company to Preclude Evidence of Voluntary Payments Made by the Plaintiff and Consequential Damages and Memorandum in Support. (stas) Modified on 3/7/2008 to add text re: memorandum in support(stas).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 201 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: 3/7/2008, Terminated: 4/7/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by Raytheon Aircraft Company to Join AIG Aviation, Inc. as an Additional Party Plaintiff and Memorandum in Support. (stas) Modified on 3/7/2008 to include text re: memorandum in support(stas).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 200 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: 3/7/2008 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION in Limine by Raytheon Aircraft Company to Preclude Opinion Evidence Contained in the Reports of the National Transportation Safety Board and Memorandum in Support. (stas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 199 Filed: 3/5/2008, Entered: 3/6/2008 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Raytheon Aircraft Company filed by Colgan Air, Inc.(stas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 198 Filed: 3/5/2008, Entered: 3/5/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CONSENT ORDER that Pltf Colgan Air, Inc. shall be permitted to file a First Amended Complaint, eliminating Count I (Negligence) as a claim for relief. It is hereby ORDERED that the First Amended Complaint shall be filed and served on all parties no later than five (5) days from the date of this Order. It is hereby further Ordered that the Deft shall have ten (10) days from the date of service of the First Amended Complaint in which to file its Answer. (See order for details). Signed by Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 3/5/2008. Copies sent: yes.(stas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 197 Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: 3/3/2008 Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              List of Issues to be Decided by Jury by Colgan Air, Inc. (stas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 196 Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: 3/3/2008 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUPPLEMENT by Colgan Air, Inc. to [193] MOTION by Colgan Air, Inc. to Amend the [1] Complaint. (stas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 195 Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: 2/29/2008 Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  List of Specific Factual Issues to be Decided by the Jury by Raytheon Aircraft Company. (stas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 194 Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: 2/26/2008 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum by Colgan Air, Inc. in Support of [193] MOTION by Colgan Air, Inc. to Amend the [1] Complaint. (stas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 193 Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: 2/26/2008 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by Colgan Air, Inc. to Amend the [1] Complaint. (atty called - told to ntc) (stas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 192 Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: 2/25/2008 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER that the [181] MOTION by Raytheon Aircraft Company for permission to use an aircraft mock-up as a demonstrative aid in the course of the jury trial (docket no. 181) is GRANTED. (See order for details) Signed by Judge District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 2/21/2008. Copies sent: yes. (stas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 191 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: 2/21/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER that the parties are DIRECTED to meet and confer for the purpose of identifying the specific factual issues to be decided by the jury in this case and to FILE a joint pleading listing those factual issues by 5:00 p.m., Friday, February 29, 2008. And, in the event counsel cannot agree on a joint statement of the factual issues for decision by the jury, the parties must file individual pleadings identifying the factual issues each believes remain to be decided by the jury by 5:00 p.m., Friday, February 29, 2008. Signed by Judge T. S. Ellis III on 2/19/2008. Copies sent: yes.(stas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 190 Filed: 1/17/2008, Entered: 1/18/2008 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Supplemental Submission and Objection by Colgan Air, Inc. to [181] MOTION by Raytheon Aircraft Company Requesting Permission to Bring a Mockup into the Court Room. (stas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 189 Filed: 1/15/2008, Entered: 1/18/2008 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUPPLEMENT to [181] MOTION by Raytheon Aircraft Company Requesting Permission to Bring a Mockup into the Court Room filed by Raytheon Aircraft Company. (stas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 188 Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: 1/17/2008 Financial Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Colgan Air, Inc. (stas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/11/2008, Entered: 1/16/2008 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge T. S. Ellis III: Motion Hearing held on 1/11/2008 re: [181] MOTION Requesting Permission to Bring a Mockup into the Court Room filed by Raytheon Aircraft Company, [185] MOTION to Bar Defendant from Using the Mockup for any Purpose at Trial filed by Colgan Air, Inc. Appearances: Mark Dumbroft and Tom Alney for Pltff; Holly Essing and Robert Hall for Defts. Heard. Order to follow. (Court Reporter Rodriquez.) (tbul, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 187 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: 1/7/2008 Response in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Reply memorandum in further Support of [185] MOTION to Bar Defendant from Using the Mockup for any Purpose at Trial filed by Raytheon Aircraft Company. (clar, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 186 Filed: 1/2/2008, Entered: 1/3/2008 Notice of Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Hearing on [181] MOTION Requesting Permission to Bring a Mockup into the Court Room filed by Defendant Raytheon Aircraft Company. Motion Hearing set for 1/11/2008 10:00 AM in A Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (lhin, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 185 Filed: 12/31/2007, Entered: 12/31/2007, Terminated: 4/8/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REQUEST by Colgan Air, Inc. to Bar Defendant from Using the Mockup for any Purpose at Trial. (stas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 184 Filed: 12/31/2007, Entered: 12/31/2007 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Response by Colgan Air, Inc. to [182] Memorandum in Support re [181] MOTION Requesting Permission to Bring a Mockup into the Court Room filed by Raytheon Aircraft Company. (stas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 183 Filed: 12/26/2007, Entered: 12/27/2007 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Opposition to [181] MOTION Requesting Permission to Bring a Mockup into the Court Room filed by Colgan Air, Inc. (clar, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 182 Filed: 12/20/2007, Entered: 12/21/2007 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in Support re [181] MOTION Requesting Permission to Bring a Mockup into the Court Room filed by Raytheon Aircraft Company. (yguy, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 181 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: 12/20/2007, Terminated: 2/21/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by Raytheon Aircraft Company Requesting Permission to Bring a Mockup into the Court Room. (stas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 180 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: 12/20/2007 Financial Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Raytheon Aircraft Company. (stas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 179 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: 12/19/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER that for reasons stated from the Bench, parties are DIRECTED to file proposed jury instructions, trial memoranda, motions in limine, and memoranda in support of obj. to any exhbits by 3/6/08; to file responses to trial memoranda, responses to memoranda in support of obj. to exhbits, responses to motions in limine, and obj. to jury instructions, by 3/18/08; that oral argument will be held at 2:00 on 3/28/08; and that the jury trial is set for 10:00 on 4/87/08. Signed by Judge T. S. Ellis III on 12/14/07. Mailed: ehp(tbul, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: 12/19/2007 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set Deadlines/Hearings: Oral argument, if needed, set for 3/28/2008 at 02:00 PM before District Judge T. S. Ellis III per TSE 12/14/07 Order. (tbul, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: 12/19/2007 Pretrial Conference - Final
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge T. S. Ellis III: Final Pretrial Conference held on 12/14/2007. Appearances: Dombroff, Alman, Campbell for Pltff; Jones, Hall, Effing for Deft. Jury Trial set for 4/7/2008 at 10:00 AM before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. Trial estimated 7-8 days. Court wants trial briefs and will set a sched., incld'g. for motions in limine. (Court Reporter Rodriquez.) (tbul, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 178 Filed: 12/5/2007, Entered: 12/5/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER that the Final Pretrial Conference set for December 7, 2007 at 10:00 a.m. is rescheduled for December 14, 2007 at 02:00 PM before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. Signed by Judge T. S. Ellis III on 12/5/2007. (stas) Modified on 12/6/2007 to correct typo (stas).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 177 Filed: 12/5/2007, Entered: 12/5/2007, Terminated: 4/8/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by Raytheon Aircraft Company Requesting a Different Date for Final Pretrial Conference. (stas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 176 Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: 12/4/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER that a Final Pretrial Conference is SCHEDULED in this matter for 10:00 AM, Friday, December 7, 2007 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. Signed by Judge T. S. Ellis III on 12/03/2007. Copies sent: yes.(stas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 175 Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: 11/29/2007 USCA Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                USCA JUDGMENT as to [166] Notice of Appeal, filed by Colgan Air, Inc., in accordance with the written opinion of this court filed this day, the court affirms in part and Vacates in part the judgment of the District Court. This case is Remanded to the District Court for further proceedings consistent with the court's opinion. A certified copy of this judgment will be provided to the district court upon issuance of the mandate. The judgment will take effect upon issuance of the mandate. (mandate issued) (nmck, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 174 Filed: 11/5/2007, Entered: 11/6/2007 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter to court from USCA re: The mandate in this case will not issue at the scheduled time because a timely petition for rehearing has been filed. (nmck, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 173 Filed: 10/22/2007, Entered: 10/31/2007 USCA Mandate
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Opinion of USCA (Copy) decided 10/18/07 re [166] Notice of Appeal, Affirmed in part, Vacated in part and Remanded, attached copy of judgment will not take effect until issuance of the mandate. (nmck, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 172 Filed: 12/1/2006, Entered: 12/6/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing Proceeding held on December 1, 2005 before Judge T.S. Ellis, III. Court Reporter: M.A. Rodriquez. (stas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 171 Filed: 12/1/2006, Entered: 12/6/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of MOtions Hearing Proceeding held on November 17, 2005 before Judge T.S. Ellis, III. Court Reporter: M.A. Rodriquez. (stas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 170 Filed: 12/1/2006, Entered: 12/6/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing Proceeding held on December 5, 2005 before Judge T.S. Ellis, III. Court Reporter: M.A. Rodriquez. (stas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 169 Filed: 7/18/2006, Entered: 7/18/2006, Terminated: 11/28/2007 Certificate of Completion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of Completion re [166] Notice of Appeal, : (nmck, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 1/20/2006, Entered: 1/20/2006, Terminated: 11/28/2007 USCA Case Number
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              USCA Case Number 06-1069, case manager Barbara Rowe for [166] Notice of Appeal, filed by Colgan Air, Inc.,. (nmck, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 168 Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: 1/10/2006 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Response Memorandum by Raytheon Aircraft Company in Support of [164] Bill of Costs. (stas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/4/2006, Entered: 1/4/2006, Terminated: 11/28/2007 USCA Appeal Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  USCA Appeal Fees received $ 255 receipt number 100 185173, 100 185175 re [166] Notice of Appeal, filed by Colgan Air, Inc., Court of Appeals notified. (nmck, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 167 Filed: 1/3/2006, Entered: 1/6/2006 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OPPOSITION to Raytheon Aircraft Company's [164] Bill of Costs filed by Colgan Air, Inc. (pmil)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 166 Filed: 12/28/2005, Entered: 12/29/2005 Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEAL as to [163] Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment,, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, dated 12/7/05 [162] Memorandum Opinion dated 12/7/05 by Colgan Air, Inc.. Appeal fee not paid. Copy sent to USCA. Copy sent to parties. (nmck, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 165 Filed: 12/19/2005, Entered: 12/21/2005 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum in Support of [164] Bill of Costs filed by Raytheon Aircraft Company. (pmil)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 164 Filed: 12/19/2005, Entered: 12/21/2005 Bill of Costs
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          BILL OF COSTS by Raytheon Aircraft Company. (pmil)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 163 Filed: 12/7/2005, Entered: 12/8/2005 Order on Motion for Partial Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER For the reasons stated in a Memorandum Opinion of even date, It is ORDERED that the [80] Motion by Raytheon Aircraft Company for Summary Judgment is GRANTED, and the complaint is DISMISSED. It is further ORDERED that the [53] Motion by Colgan Air, Inc. for Partial Summary Judgment is DENIED. Signed by Judge T. S. Ellis III on 12/07/05. Copies sent: yes. (stas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 162 Filed: 12/7/2005, Entered: 12/8/2005 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OPINION Re: Motion for summary judgment and motion for partial summary judgment. Signed by Judge T. S. Ellis III on 12/07/05. Copies sent: yes. (stas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 161 Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: 12/7/2005 Order on Motion to Disqualify CounselCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying Raytheon Aircraft Company's [145] Motion to Disqualify Counsel, for reasans stated from the Bench . Signed by Judge T. S. Ellis III on 12/5/05. Mailed: epn (tbul, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 160 Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: 12/7/2005 Order on Motion for SanctionsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying Colgan Air, Inc.'s emergency [143] Motion for Sanctions, Motion to Continue, for reasons stated from the Bench . Signed by Judge T. S. Ellis III on 12/5/05. Mailed: epn (tbul, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 159 Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: 12/6/2005 Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Designation of Deposition Testimony by Raytheon Aircraft Company. (klau, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 158 Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: 12/5/2005, Terminated: 12/5/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Admit Laptop Computers Into the Courthouse by Colgan Air, Inc. (pmil)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 157 Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: 12/5/2005 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Kevin A. Gonzalez, Director of Maintenance at Colgan Air, Inc. (pmil)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 156 Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: 12/5/2005 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Marcus A. Cunningham, of the Quality Assurance Dept. at Colgan Air, Inc. (pmil)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 155 Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: 12/5/2005 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT of Patti I. Barth, Vice President & Chief Financial Officer for Colgan Air, Inc. (LARGE PLEADING) (pmil)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 154 Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: 12/5/2005 Brief in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Supplemental Brief Relating to Acquisition of Manuals filed by Colgan Air, Inc.(per Court Directive of 12/01/05) (pmil)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 153 Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: 12/5/2005 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum in Opposition to [145] MOTION to Disqualify filed by Colgan Air, Inc. (pmil)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 152 Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: 12/5/2005 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Amended Trial Exhibit List by Colgan Air, Inc.(pmil)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 151 Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: 12/5/2005 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Additional Objections to Raytheon Aircraft's [41] Trial Exhibit No. 81 filed by Colgan Air, Inc. (pmil)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 150 Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: 12/5/2005 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by Raytheon Aircraft Company in Opposition to [143] Emergency MOTION by Colgan Air, Inc. for Sanctions. (stas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 149 Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: 12/5/2005 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Second Supplemental Briefing by Raytheon Aircraft Company in Support of [80] MOTION by Raytheon Aircraft Company for Summary Judgment. (stas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: 12/7/2005 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge T. S. Ellis III: Motion Hearing held on 12/5/2005 re: [145] MOTION to Disqualify Counsel filed by Raytheon Aircraft Company - denied; [143] MOTION for Sanctions or in the alternative MOTION to Continue filed by Colgan Air, Inc - denied; [80] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Raytheon Aircraft Company - granted; [53] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Colgan Air, Inc. - denied. Appearances: Dombroff/Almy/Gregorian for Pltff; Essing/Jones/Hall for Deft. Memorandum Opinion and Order to follow. All other pending motions - moot. (Court Reporter Rodriquez.) (tbul, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 148 Filed: 12/1/2005, Entered: 12/1/2005 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Raytheon Aircraft Company of Filing Original Affidavit of Kathy Sade to be Attached as Exhibit 2 to [141] Supplemental Brief by Raytheon Aircraft Company in Support of [80] MOTION by Raytheon Aircraft Company for Summary Judgment (stas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 147 Filed: 12/1/2005, Entered: 12/1/2005 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Brian Burris, Assistant General Counsel of Raytheon Airline Aviation Services LLC from 04/15/02 through 11/11/05. (pmil)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 146 Filed: 12/1/2005, Entered: 12/1/2005 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of Michael G. Jones. (pmil)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 145 Filed: 12/1/2005, Entered: 12/1/2005, Terminated: 12/5/2005 Motion to Disqualify Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Disqualify the Law Firm of Dombroff and Gilmore by Raytheon Aircraft Company. (pmil)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 144 Filed: 12/1/2005, Entered: 12/1/2005 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum in Support of [143] Emergency MOTION for Sanctions, or in the Alternative, MOTION to Continue filed by Colgan Air, Inc. (agil)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 143 Filed: 12/1/2005, Entered: 12/1/2005, Terminated: 12/5/2005 Motion for Sanctions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Emergency MOTION for Sanctions, or in the Alternative, MOTION to Continue by Colgan Air, Inc. (agil)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 12/1/2005, Entered: 12/2/2005 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge T. S. Ellis III: Motion Hearing held on 12/1/2005 re: 80] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Raytheon Aircraft Company; [53] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Colgan Air, Inc. Appearances: Dombroff/Almy/Gregorian for Pltff; Essing/Jones/Hall for Defts. Heard. Court will resolve all the motions on Monday at 11:00, including the motions filed this morning. Jury for Monday is canceled. It is poss. that no jury will be needed at all. (Trial was re-set for Tues. 12/6/05)(Jury notified).(Reporter Rodriquez.) (tbul, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 12/1/2005, Entered: 12/2/2005 set motion and R&R; deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Set/Reset Deadlines as to [63] MOTION in Limine, [90] MOTION to Compel, [75] MOTION in Limine, [125] MOTION to Amend/Correct [39] Rule 26 Disclosure, [55] MOTION in Limine, [71] MOTION in Limine, [143] MOTION for Sanctions MOTION to Continue, [61] MOTION in Limine, [57] MOTION in Limine, [65] MOTION in Limine, [73] MOTION in Limine, [91] MOTION to exclude Raytheon Aircraft Company Witnesses, [129] MOTION to Store Trial Exhibit 81 "Mock Up" in Garage, [145] MOTION to Disqualify Counsel, [67] MOTION in Limine, [59] MOTION in Limine, [83] MOTION in Limine, [69] MOTION in Limine, [77] MOTION in Limine. Motion Hearing set for 12/5/2005 11:00 AM before Honorable District T. S. Ellis III, in lieu of Jury trial, which has been postponed until 10:00 on Tuesday 12/6/05. (tbul, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 12/1/2005, Entered: 12/2/2005 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Set/Reset Hearings: Jury Trial re- for 12/6/2005 10:00 AM before Honorable District T. S. Ellis III. (tbul, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 142 Filed: 11/30/2005, Entered: 11/30/2005 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum to Correct an Error in Its [136] Memorandum in Opposition to Pltf Colgan Air's Motion to Amend Its Rule 26(A)(3) Disclosures filed by Raytheon Aircraft Company. (pmil)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 11/30/2005, Entered: 11/30/2005 set motion and R&R; deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Re-set Deadlines as to [80] MOTION for Summary Judgment, [53] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing re-set for 12/1/2005 11:00 AM before Honorable District T. S. Ellis III. (tbul, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 141 Filed: 11/29/2005, Entered: 11/29/2005 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Supplemental Brief by Raytheon Aircraft Company in Support of [80] MOTION by Raytheon Aircraft Company for Summary Judgment. (stas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 140 Filed: 11/29/2005, Entered: 11/29/2005 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Supplemental Brief by Colgan Air, Inc. (brief is not signed by local counsel) (stas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 139 Filed: 11/29/2005, Entered: 11/29/2005 Notice of Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Hearing on [125] MOTION to Amend [39] Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures by Colgan Air, Inc.: Motion Hearing set for 11/30/2005 at 02:00 PM before Honorable District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (notice is not signed by local counsel)(stas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 138 Filed: 11/29/2005, Entered: 11/29/2005 Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Reply by Colgan Air, Inc. in further support of [125]MOTION by Colgan Air, Inc. to Amend [39] Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures. (stas) (document is not signed by local counsel and is not an original)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 137 Filed: 11/28/2005, Entered: 11/29/2005 Proposed Jury Instructions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          List of Proposed Jury Instructions by Raytheon Aircraft Company. (pmil)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 136 Filed: 11/28/2005, Entered: 11/29/2005 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in Opposition to Pltf's [125] MOTION to Amend [39] Rule 26(A)(3)Disclosures filed by Raytheon Aircraft Company. (pmil)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 135 Filed: 11/28/2005, Entered: 11/29/2005 Proposed Voir Dire
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Voir Dire Questions by Raytheon Aircraft Company. (pmil)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 134 Filed: 11/28/2005, Entered: 11/29/2005 Proposed Jury Instructions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Verdict Form by Colgan Air, Inc.(nhall, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 133 Filed: 11/28/2005, Entered: 11/29/2005 Proposed Voir Dire
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Voir Dire by Colgan Air, Inc.(nhall, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 132 Filed: 11/28/2005, Entered: 11/29/2005 Proposed Jury Instructions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Jury Instructions by Colgan Air, Inc.(nhall, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 131 Filed: 11/28/2005, Entered: 11/29/2005 Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DEPOSITION Transcript Designations by Colgan Air, Inc.(nhall, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 130 Filed: 11/22/2005, Entered: 11/23/2005 Notice of Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Hearing on [129] MOTION by Raytheon Aircraft Company to Store Trial Exhibit 81 "Mock Up" in Garage: Motion Hearing set for 11/30/2005 at 02:00 PM before Honorable District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (stas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 129 Filed: 11/22/2005, Entered: 11/23/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by Raytheon Aircraft Company to Store Trial Exhibit 81 "Mock Up" in Garage. (stas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 128 Filed: 11/17/2005, Entered: 11/22/2005 Order on Motion for Partial Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER deferring a ruling on the parties' cross motions, the [53] Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and the [80] Motion for Summary Judgment, pending supplemental briefs, because a more complete record is essential to their disposition, and for good cause. Simultaneous briefs are due 11/29/05, and oral argument will be heard at 2:00 11/30/05 on summary judgment, and also on any unresolved motions in limine . Signed by Judge T. S. Ellis III on 11/17/05. Mailed: epn (tbul, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 127 Filed: 11/17/2005, Entered: 11/18/2005 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge T. S. Ellis III: Motion Hearing held on 11/17/2005 re: [80] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Raytheon Aircraft Company, [53] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Colgan Air, Inc. Appearances: Counsel for Pltff and Deft. Heard. Parties dir. to file add'l. simultaneous briefs by noon on 11/29/05, and a hrg. will be held @ 2:00 on 11/30/05. (Court Reporter Rodriquez.) (tbul, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 11/17/2005, Entered: 11/18/2005 set motion and R&R; deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set Deadlines as to [80] MOTION for Summary Judgment, [53] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing (Part II) set for 11/30/2005 02:00 PM before Honorable District T. S. Ellis III. (tbul, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 126 Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: 11/17/2005 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum of Law in Support of [125] MOTION to Amend [39] Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures filed by Colgan Air, Inc. (pmil)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 125 Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: 11/17/2005 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Amend [39] Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures by Colgan Air, Inc. (pmil)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 124 Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: 11/17/2005 Rule 26 Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUPPLEMENTAL Initial Rule 26 Disclosure by Colgan Air, Inc. (pmil)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 123 Filed: 11/10/2005, Entered: 11/10/2005 Response in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY in further Support of [90] MOTION to Compel production of Raytheon Aircraft Employees, or in the alternative, [91] MOTION to exclude Raytheon Aircraft Company Witnesses filed by Colgan Air, Inc. (pmil)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 122 Filed: 11/7/2005, Entered: 11/9/2005 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum in Opposition re [90] MOTION to Compel filed by Raytheon Aircraft Company. (nmck, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 121 Filed: 11/4/2005, Entered: 11/7/2005 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Additional Exhibit to [118-1] Rebuttal Memorandum by Raytheon Aircraft Company in Support of [80] MOTION for Summary Judgment by Raytheon Aircraft Company (stas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 120 Filed: 11/4/2005, Entered: 11/7/2005 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Additional Exhibits to Raytheon's [119-1] Rebuttal Memorandum in Support of Its Motion in Limine (stas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 119 Filed: 11/3/2005, Entered: 11/4/2005 Rebuttal Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Rebuttal Memorandum by Raytheon Aircraft Company in Support of [83] MOTION in Limine to exclude testimony or documents by Raytheon Aircraft Company. (stas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 118 Filed: 11/3/2005, Entered: 11/4/2005 Rebuttal Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Rebuttal Memorandum by Raytheon Aircraft Company in Support of [80] MOTION for Summary Judgment by Raytheon Aircraft Company. (stas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 117 Filed: 11/3/2005, Entered: 11/4/2005 Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Pltf's Exhibit Binder for Its Replies to Motions in Limine Nos. 1-12 by Colgan Air, Inc. (LARGE PLEADING) (pmil)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 116 Filed: 11/3/2005, Entered: 11/4/2005 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Deft's Opposition to [77] MOTION in Limine #12 filed by Colgan Air, Inc. (pmil)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 115 Filed: 11/3/2005, Entered: 11/4/2005 Response in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY in Support of [73] MOTION in Limine #10 to Exclude Testimony of Deft's Expert Richard Nelson Regarding Human Factors and Accident Investigation filed by Colgan Air, Inc. (pmil)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 114 Filed: 11/3/2005, Entered: 11/4/2005 Response in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY in Support of [71] MOTION in Limine #9 to Exclude Data Obtained from the Flight Data Recorder, Any References to it, and All Opinions Predicated or Stemming Therefrom filed by Colgan Air, Inc. (pmil)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 113 Filed: 11/3/2005, Entered: 11/4/2005 Response in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY in Support of [69] MOTION in Limine #8 to Exclude the Cockpit Voice Recorder Transcript, Any References to it, and All Opinions Predicated or Stemming, Therefrom filed by Colgan Air, Inc. (pmil)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 112 Filed: 11/3/2005, Entered: 11/4/2005 Response in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY in Support of [67] MOTION in Limine #7 to Exclude Testimony Regarding Flight Time Limitations and Rest Requirements, Sterile Cockpit Concept, and First Flight of the Day Checklist filed by Colgan Air, Inc. (pmil)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 111 Filed: 11/3/2005, Entered: 11/4/2005 Response in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY in Further Support of [63] MOTION in Limine #5 to Exclude Evidence of Flight Crew's Prior Failures of Flight Tests, Proficiency Checks, or Check Rides filed by Colgan Air, Inc. (pmil)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 110 Filed: 11/3/2005, Entered: 11/4/2005 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Deft's Opposition to [61] MOTION in Limine #4 and [75] MOTION in Limine #11 filed by Colgan Air, Inc. (pmil)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 109 Filed: 11/3/2005, Entered: 11/4/2005 Response in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY in Support of [59] MOTION in Limine #3 to Exclude Evidence of Post-Accident Remedial Measures filed by Colgan Air, Inc. (pmil)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 108 Filed: 11/3/2005, Entered: 11/4/2005 Response in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY in Support of [57] MOTION in Limine #2 to Admit Into Evidence NTSB Report of Flight 5481 Accident filed by Colgan Air, Inc. (pmil)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 107 Filed: 11/3/2005, Entered: 11/4/2005 Response in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY in Support of [55] MOTION in Limine #1 Regarding Admission of Maintenance Manual filed by Colgan Air, Inc. (pmil) Modified on 11/4/2005 to edit text (pmil).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 106 Filed: 10/31/2005, Entered: 11/1/2005 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum in Opposition re [77] MOTION in Limine # 12 to exclude beech 1900 company flight manual, general maintenance manual, and flight operations policies and procedures manual from evidence by Colgan Air, Inc. filed by Raytheon Aircraft Company. (kbar)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 105 Filed: 10/31/2005, Entered: 11/1/2005 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in Opposition re [61] MOTION in Limine # 4 to exclude evidence of the failure of maintenance personnel to remove the elevators from the incident aircraft when replacing the elevator trim tab actuators by Colgan Air, Inc. [75] MOTION in Limine # 11 to exclude evidence of enforcement actions and suspensions of Colgan Mechanics for failure to remove aircraft elevators during maintenance by Colgan Air, Inc. filed by Raytheon Aircraft Company. (kbar, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 104 Filed: 10/31/2005, Entered: 11/1/2005 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in Opposition re [73] MOTION in Limine # 10 to exclude testimony of deft's expert Richard Nelson regarding Human factors and accident investigation by Colgan Air, Inc. filed by Raytheon Aircraft Company. (kbar, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 103 Filed: 10/31/2005, Entered: 11/1/2005 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum in Opposition re [71] MOTION in Limine # 9 to exclude data obtained from the flight data recorder, any references to it, and all opinions predicated or stemming therefrom by Colgan Air, Inc. filed by Raytheon Aircraft Company. (kbar, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 102 Filed: 10/31/2005, Entered: 11/1/2005 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum in Opposition re [69] MOTION in Limine # 8 to exclude the cockpit voice recorder transcript, any references to it, and all opinions predicated or stemming therefrom by Colgan Air, Inc filed by Raytheon Aircraft Company. (kbar, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 101 Filed: 10/31/2005, Entered: 11/1/2005 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum in Opposition re [67] MOTION in Limine # 7 to exclude testimony regarding flight time limitations and rest requirements, sterile cockpit concept, and first flight of the day checklist by Colgan Air, Inc filed by Raytheon Aircraft Company. (kbar, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 100 Filed: 10/31/2005, Entered: 11/1/2005 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in Opposition re [65] MOTION in Limine # 6 to exclude references to the fact that Richard Nelson's wife and Michael Scheidt's wife had cancer by Colgan Air, Inc filed by Raytheon Aircraft Company. (kbar )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 99 Filed: 10/31/2005, Entered: 11/1/2005 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum in Opposition re [63] MOTION in Limine # 5 to exclude evidence of flight crew's prior failures of flight tests, proficiency checks, or check rides by Colgan Air, Inc. filed by Raytheon Aircraft Company. (kbar, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 98 Filed: 10/31/2005, Entered: 11/1/2005 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum in Opposition re [59] MOTION in Limine # 3 to exclude evidence of post-accident remedial measures by Colgan Air, Inc. filed by Raytheon Aircraft Company. (kbar, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 97 Filed: 10/31/2005, Entered: 11/1/2005 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in Opposition re [57] MOTION in Limine # 2 to admit into evidence NTSB report of flight 5481 accident by Colgan Air, Inc. filed by Raytheon Aircraft Company. (kbar, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 96 Filed: 10/31/2005, Entered: 11/1/2005 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in Opposition re [55] MOTION in Limine # 1 regarding admission of Maintenance Manual by Colgan Air, Inc. filed by Raytheon Aircraft Company. (kbar )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 95 Filed: 10/31/2005, Entered: 11/1/2005 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum in Opposition re [55] MOTION in Limine # 1 regarding admission of Maintenance Manual by Colgan Air, Inc (large pleading).(kbar )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 94 Filed: 10/31/2005, Entered: 11/1/2005 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Opposition re [80] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Colgan Air, Inc. (kbar)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 93 Filed: 10/26/2005, Entered: 10/27/2005 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Hearing on Motion [90] MOTION to Compel, [91] MOTION to exclude Raytheon Aircraft Company Witnesses: Motion Hearing set for 11/17/2005 02:00 PM before Honorable District T. S. Ellis III. (nmck, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 92 Filed: 10/26/2005, Entered: 10/27/2005 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in Support re [90] MOTION to Compel production of Raytheon Employees, [91] MOTION to exclude Raytheon Aircraft Company Witnesses filed by Colgan Air, Inc.. (nmck, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 91 Filed: 10/26/2005, Entered: 10/27/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to exclude Raytheon Aircraft Company Witnesses by Colgan Air, Inc.. (nmck, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 90 Filed: 10/26/2005, Entered: 10/27/2005 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Compel production of Raytheon Aircraft Company Employees by Colgan Air, Inc.. (nmck, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 89 Filed: 10/26/2005, Entered: 10/27/2005 Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Reply in further support to [53] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Colgan Air, Inc.. (Large Pleading) (nmck, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 88 Filed: 10/24/2005, Entered: 10/25/2005 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in Opposition re [53] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Raytheon Aircraft Company. (nmck, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 87 Filed: 10/21/2005, Entered: 10/24/2005 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Hearing on [63] MOTION in Limine, [75] MOTION in Limine, [55] MOTION in Limine, [71] MOTION in Limine, [61] MOTION in Limine, [57] MOTION in Limine, [65] MOTION in Limine, [73] MOTION in Limine, [67] MOTION in Limine, [59] MOTION in Limine, [69] MOTION in Limine, [77] MOTION in Limine, [53] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Colgan Air, Inc.: Motion Hearing set for 11/17/2005 02:00 PM before Honorable District T. S. Ellis III. (pmil, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 86 Filed: 10/20/2005, Entered: 10/21/2005 Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF FEASIBILITY by Raytheon Aircraft Company. (pmil)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 85 Filed: 10/20/2005, Entered: 10/21/2005 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Hearing on [83] MOTION in Limine to exclude testimony or documents: Motion Hearing set for 11/17/2005 02:00 AM before Honorable District T. S. Ellis III. (pmil)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 84 Filed: 10/20/2005, Entered: 10/21/2005 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in Support of [83] MOTION in Limine to exclude testimony or documents filed by Raytheon Aircraft Company. (LARGE PLEADING) (pmil)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 83 Filed: 10/20/2005, Entered: 10/21/2005 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION in Limine to exclude testimony or documents by Raytheon Aircraft Company. (pmil)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 82 Filed: 10/19/2005, Entered: 10/21/2005 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Hearing on [80] MOTION for Summary Judgment: Motion Hearing set for 11/17/2005 02:00 PM before Honorable District T. S. Ellis III. (pmil)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 81 Filed: 10/19/2005, Entered: 10/21/2005 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in Support of [80] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Raytheon Aircraft Company. (LARGE PLEADING) (pmil)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 80 Filed: 10/19/2005, Entered: 10/21/2005, Terminated: 12/7/2005 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Summary Judgment by Raytheon Aircraft Company. (pmil)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 79 Filed: 10/19/2005, Entered: 10/20/2005 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Exhibits by pltff in support of there 12 motions in limine received (1 bound volume, Large pleading) (nmck, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 78 Filed: 10/19/2005, Entered: 10/20/2005 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum in Support re [77] MOTION in Limine # 12 to exclude beech 1900 company flight manual, general maintenance manual, and flight operations policies and procedures manual from evidence filed by Colgan Air, Inc.. (nmck, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 77 Filed: 10/19/2005, Entered: 10/20/2005 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION in Limine # 12 to exclude beech 1900 company flight manual, general maintenance manual, and flight operations policies and procedures manual from evidence by Colgan Air, Inc.. (nmck, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 76 Filed: 10/19/2005, Entered: 10/20/2005 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in Support re [75] MOTION in Limine # 11 to exclude evidence of enforcement actions and suspensions of Colgan Mechanics for failure to remove aircraft elevators during maintenance filed by Colgan Air, Inc.(nmck, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 75 Filed: 10/19/2005, Entered: 10/20/2005 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION in Limine # 11 to exclude evidence of enforcement actions and suspensions of Colgan Mechanics for failure to remove aircraft elevators during maintenance by Colgan Air, Inc.. (nmck, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 74 Filed: 10/19/2005, Entered: 10/20/2005 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum in Support re [73] MOTION in Limine # 10 to exclude testimony of deft's expert Richard Nelson regarding Human factors and accident investigation filed by Colgan Air, Inc..(nmck, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 73 Filed: 10/19/2005, Entered: 10/20/2005 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION in Limine # 10 to exclude testimony of deft's expert Richard Nelson regarding Human factors and accident investigation by Colgan Air, Inc.. (nmck, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 72 Filed: 10/19/2005, Entered: 10/20/2005 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in Support re [71] MOTION in Limine # 9 to exclude data obtained from the flight data recorder, any references to it, and all opinions predicated or stemming therefrom filed by Colgan Air, Inc.. (nmck, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 71 Filed: 10/19/2005, Entered: 10/20/2005 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION in Limine # 9 to exclude data obtained from the flight data recorder, any references to it, and all opinions predicated or stemming therefrom by Colgan Air, Inc.. (nmck, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 70 Filed: 10/19/2005, Entered: 10/20/2005 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum in Support re [69] MOTION in Limine # 8 to exclude the cockpit voice recorder transcript, any references to it, and all opinions predicated or stemming therefrom filed by Colgan Air, Inc.. (nmck, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 69 Filed: 10/19/2005, Entered: 10/20/2005 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION in Limine # 8 to exclude the cockpit voice recorder transcript, any references to it, and all opinions predicated or stemming therefrom by Colgan Air, Inc.. (nmck, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 68 Filed: 10/19/2005, Entered: 10/20/2005 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in Support re [67] MOTION in Limine # 7 to exclude testimony regarding flight time limitations and rest requirements, sterile cockpit concept, and first flight of the day checklist filed by Colgan Air, Inc.. (nmck, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 67 Filed: 10/19/2005, Entered: 10/20/2005 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION in Limine # 7 to exclude testimony regarding flight time limitations and rest requirements, sterile cockpit concept, and first flight of the day checklist by Colgan Air, Inc.. (nmck, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 66 Filed: 10/19/2005, Entered: 10/20/2005 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum in Support re [65] MOTION in Limine # 6 to exclude references to the fact that Richard Nelson's wife and Michael Scheidt's wife had cancer filed by Colgan Air, Inc.. (nmck, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 65 Filed: 10/19/2005, Entered: 10/20/2005 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION in Limine # 6 to exclude references to the fact that Richard Nelson's wife and Michael Scheidt's wife had cancer by Colgan Air, Inc.. (nmck, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 64 Filed: 10/19/2005, Entered: 10/20/2005 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in Support re [63] MOTION in Limine # 5 to exclude evidence of flight crew's prior failures of flight tests, proficiency checks, or check rides filed by Colgan Air, Inc.. (nmck, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 63 Filed: 10/19/2005, Entered: 10/20/2005 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION in Limine # 5 to exclude evidence of flight crew's prior failures of flight tests, proficiency checks, or check rides by Colgan Air, Inc.. (nmck, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 62 Filed: 10/19/2005, Entered: 10/20/2005 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum in Support re [61] MOTION in Limine # 4 to exclude evidence of the failure of maintenance personnel to remove the elevators from the incident aircraft when replacing the elevator trim tab actuators filed by Colgan Air, Inc.. (nmck, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 61 Filed: 10/19/2005, Entered: 10/20/2005 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION in Limine # 4 to exclude evidence of the failure of maintenance personnel to remove the elevators from the incident aircraft when replacing the elevator trim tab actuators by Colgan Air, Inc.. (nmck, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 60 Filed: 10/19/2005, Entered: 10/20/2005 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in Support re [59] MOTION in Limine # 3 to exclude evidence of post-accident remedial measures filed by Colgan Air, Inc.. (nmck, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 59 Filed: 10/19/2005, Entered: 10/20/2005 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION in Limine # 3 to exclude evidence of post-accident remedial measures by Colgan Air, Inc.. (nmck, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 58 Filed: 10/19/2005, Entered: 10/20/2005 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum in Support re [57] MOTION in Limine # 2 to admit into evidence NTSB report of flight 5481 accident filed by Colgan Air, Inc.. (nmck, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 57 Filed: 10/19/2005, Entered: 10/20/2005 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION in Limine # 2 to admit into evidence NTSB report of flight 5481 accident by Colgan Air, Inc.. (nmck, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 56 Filed: 10/19/2005, Entered: 10/20/2005 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in Support re [55] MOTION in Limine # 1 regarding admission of maintenance manual filed by Colgan Air, Inc.. (nmck, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 55 Filed: 10/19/2005, Entered: 10/20/2005 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION in Limine # 1 regarding admission of Maintenance Manual by Colgan Air, Inc.. (nmck, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 52 Filed: 10/11/2005, Entered: 10/12/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER that the deft's motion for summary judgment shall be FILED by 5:00 p.m., Wednesday, 10/19/05; any response or reply briefs thereto shall be FILED in accordance w/the Local Rules of this jurisdiction; Oral argument on all motions shall be held at 2 p.m., Thursday, 11/17/05; any matters not resolved on summary judgment will be tried before a jury beginning at 10 a.m., Monday, 12/5/05; the previous scheduling order dated 08/18/05 is hereby VACATED (see Order for details). Signed by Judge T. S. Ellis III on 10/11/05. Copies mailed: yes (pmil, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 10/11/2005, Entered: 10/12/2005 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set Hearing: Jury Trial set for 12/5/2005 10:00 AM before Honorable District T. S. Ellis III. (PER ORDER OF TSE 10/11/05) (pmil)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 10/11/2005, Entered: 10/12/2005 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set Hearings: Summary Judgment Motions Hearing set for 11/17/2005 02:00 PM before Honorable District T. S. Ellis III. (PER ORDER OF TSE 10/11/05) (pmil)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 54 Filed: 10/7/2005, Entered: 10/12/2005 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum of Law in Support of [53] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Colgan Air, Inc. (LARGE PLEADING) (pmil)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 53 Filed: 10/7/2005, Entered: 10/12/2005 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Colgan Air, Inc. (pmil)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 51 Filed: 9/13/2005, Entered: 9/14/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER that pltf's motion to postpone the trial is DENIED (see order for details). Signed by Judge T. S. Ellis III on 9/13/05(kjon ) Copies mailed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 50 Filed: 9/1/2005, Entered: 9/6/2005 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Objections to deft's [40] Witness List, [41] Exhibit List filed by Colgan Air, Inc.. (nmck, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 49 Filed: 8/29/2005, Entered: 8/29/2005 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Objections by Raytheon Aircraft Company to [37] Colgan's Exhibits. (stas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 48 Filed: 8/25/2005, Entered: 8/26/2005 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE to Take Deposition of James Irving by Raytheon Aircraft Company.(pmil)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 47 Filed: 8/25/2005, Entered: 8/26/2005 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE to Take Deposition of Paris Michaels by Raytheon Aircraft Company.(pmil)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 46 Filed: 8/25/2005, Entered: 8/26/2005 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE to Take Deposition of Frederick Leonelli by Raytheon Aircraft Company.(pmil)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 43 Filed: 8/19/2005, Entered: 8/22/2005 Rule 26 Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures by Raytheon Aircraft Company. (pmil)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 42 Filed: 8/19/2005, Entered: 8/22/2005 Statement of Undisputed Facts
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION OF UNCONTESTED FACTS by Colgan Air, Inc., Raytheon Aircraft Company. (pmil)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 41 Filed: 8/19/2005, Entered: 8/22/2005 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Exhibit List by Raytheon Aircraft Company.(pmil)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 40 Filed: 8/19/2005, Entered: 8/22/2005 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Witness List by Raytheon Aircraft Company. (pmil)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 44 Filed: 8/18/2005, Entered: 8/23/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, for good cause and for reasons stated from the Bench, setting a jury trial for 10:00 11/21/05 . Signed by Judge T. S. Ellis III on 8/18/05. Mailed: epn(tbul, ) (VACATED PER ORDER OF TSE 10/11/05) Modified on 10/12/2005 to indicate that this Order is vacated (pmil).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 39 Filed: 8/18/2005, Entered: 8/22/2005 Rule 26 Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures by Colgan Air, Inc. (pmil)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 38 Filed: 8/18/2005, Entered: 8/22/2005 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Witness List by Colgan Air, Inc.(pmil)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 37 Filed: 8/18/2005, Entered: 8/22/2005 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Exhibit List by Colgan Air, Inc.(pmil)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 8/18/2005, Entered: 8/18/2005 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Set Deadlines/Hearings: Jury Trial set for 11/21/2005 10:00 AM before Honorable District T. S. Ellis III. (tbul, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 8/18/2005, Entered: 8/18/2005 Pretrial Conference - Final
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge T. S. Ellis III: Final Pretrial Conference held on 8/18/2005. Appearances: Dombroff for Pltff; Hall for Deft. Counsel stated parties will work out a schedule for summary judgment motions and motions in limine. Jury trial set for 10:00 11/21/05 (Court Reporter Rodriquez.) (tbul, ) Modified on 8/22/2005 to correct trial date (tbul, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 45 Filed: 8/15/2005, Entered: 8/24/2005 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certified Copy of Order of Panel of Multi-District Litigation denying transfer of action (pmil)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 36 Filed: 7/15/2005, Entered: 7/15/2005 Order on Motion to CompelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDERED, for reasons stated from the bench, granting [23] Motion to Compel, granting [26] Motion to compel, granting [29] Motion to compel . Signed by Judge Thomas Rawles Jones Jr. on 07/15/2005. (dtro, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 35 Filed: 7/15/2005, Entered: 7/15/2005 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas Rawles Jones Jr.: Appearance of counsel. Motion Hearing held on 7/15/2005 re [26] MOTION for an order overruling objections to request for production and complelling production of documents filed by Raytheon Aircraft Company- argued and Granted., [23] MOTION to Compel filed by Colgan Air, Inc.- argued and granted [29] MOTION for an order overruling objections to interrogatories and compelling answers filed by Raytheon Aircraft Company,- argued and granted. (Tape #FTR.) Court to enter order. (dtro, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 34 Filed: 7/14/2005, Entered: 7/14/2005 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum in Opposition to [26] MOTION for an order overruling objections to request for production and complelling production of documents filed by Colgan Air, Inc.. (clar, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 33 Filed: 7/14/2005, Entered: 7/14/2005 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum in Opposition to [29] MOTION for an order overruling objections to interrogatories and compelling answers filed by Colgan Air, Inc.. (clar, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 32 Filed: 7/13/2005, Entered: 7/14/2005 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in Opposition to [23] MOTION to Compel defendant to produce documents responsive to plaintiff's first set of requests for production filed by Raytheon Aircraft Company. (clar, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 31 Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: 7/11/2005 Notice of Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Hearing on Motion [29] MOTION for an order overruling objections to interrogatories and compelling answers: Motion Hearing set for 7/15/2005 10:00 AM before Honorable Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones Jr.. (clar, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 30 Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: 7/11/2005 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum in Support of [29] MOTION for an order overruling objections to interrogatories and compelling answers filed by Raytheon Aircraft Company. (clar, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 29 Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: 7/11/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for an order overruling objections to interrogatories and compelling answers by Raytheon Aircraft Company. (clar, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 28 Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: 7/11/2005 Notice of Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Hearing on Motion [26] MOTION for an order overruling objections to request for production and complelling production of documents: Motion Hearing set for 7/15/2005 10:00 AM before Honorable Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones Jr.. (clar, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 27 Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: 7/11/2005 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum in Support of [26] MOTION for an order overruling objections to request for production and complelling production of documents filed by Raytheon Aircraft Company. (clar, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 26 Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: 7/11/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for an order overruling objections to request for production and complelling production of documents by Raytheon Aircraft Company. (clar, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 25 Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: 7/11/2005 Notice of Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Hearing on Motion [23] MOTION to Compel defendant to produce documents responsive to plaintiff's first set of requests for production Motion Hearing set for 7/15/2005 10:00 AM before Honorable Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones Jr.. (clar, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 24 Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: 7/11/2005 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum of Law in Support of [23] MOTION to Compel defendant to produce documents responsive to plaintiff's first set of requests for production filed by Colgan Air, Inc.. (clar, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 23 Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: 7/11/2005, Terminated: 7/15/2005 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Compel defendant to produce documents responsive to plaintiff's first set of requests for production by Colgan Air, Inc.. (clar, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: 7/11/2005 Motions Referred
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTIONS [29] MOTION for an order overruling objections to interrogatories and compelling answers REFERRED to Judge Jones. (clar, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: 7/11/2005 Motions Referred
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTIONS [26] MOTION for an order overruling objections to request for production and complelling production of documents REFERRED to Judge Jones. (clar, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: 7/11/2005 Motions Referred
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTIONS [23] MOTION to Compel defendant to produce documents responsive to plaintiff's first set of requests for production REFERRED to Judge Jones. (clar, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 22 Filed: 6/21/2005, Entered: 6/21/2005 Order on Motion for Protective OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDERED, for reasons stated from the bench, granting [17] Motion for Protective Order. Counsel from the other litigation may not participate in the depositions in issue. Signed by Judge Thomas Rawles Jones Jr. on 06/21/2005. (dtro, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 21 Filed: 6/21/2005, Entered: 6/21/2005 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum in support of [20] Opposition to Motion, filed by Colgan Air, Inc. (pmet, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 20 Filed: 6/21/2005, Entered: 6/21/2005 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Opposition re [17] MOTION for Protective Order, filed by Colgan Air, Inc. (pmet, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 6/21/2005, Entered: 6/21/2005 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas Rawles Jones Jr.: Motion Hearing held on 6/21/2005 re [17] MOTION for Protective Order filed by Raytheon Aircraft Company. Appearance of counsel. Matter called, argued and motion granted. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter FTR.) (dtro, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 19 Filed: 6/17/2005, Entered: 6/20/2005 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Hearing on Motion [17] MOTION for Protective Order: Motion Hearing set for 6/21/2005 02:00 PM before Honorable Magistrate Thomas Rawles Jones Jr. (kjon )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 18 Filed: 6/17/2005, Entered: 6/20/2005 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum in Support of [17] MOTION for Protective Order filed by Raytheon Aircraft Company (kjon )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 17 Filed: 6/17/2005, Entered: 6/20/2005, Terminated: 6/21/2005 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Protective Order by Raytheon Aircraft Company (kjon )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 16 Filed: 6/13/2005, Entered: 6/14/2005 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE to Take Deposition of Kinan, Battaglia, Ratliff, Gebauer, Servis, Vallejo, Desmond on June 23 and 24, by Raytheon Aircraft Company.(pmet, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 15 Filed: 6/8/2005, Entered: 6/9/2005 Order for Pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER for Pro hac vice of Andre Martin Gregorian Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 100 181024. Signed by Judge T. S. Ellis III on 06/08/05. c/s(pmet, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 14 Filed: 6/8/2005, Entered: 6/9/2005 Order for Pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER for Pro hac vice of Thomas Barton Almy Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 100 181023. Signed by Judge T. S. Ellis III on 06/08/05. c/s(pmet, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 13 Filed: 6/8/2005, Entered: 6/9/2005 Order for Pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER for Pro hac vice of Mark Andrew Dombroff Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 100 181022. Signed by Judge T. S. Ellis III on 06/08/05. c/s(pmet, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 12 Filed: 5/6/2005, Entered: 5/6/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Consent ORDER re: Expert Discovery Schedule. Signed by Judge Thomas Rawles Jones Jr. on 05/06/05. c/s(pmet, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 11 Filed: 5/4/2005, Entered: 5/4/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        R16(b)SCHEDULING ORDER: the Rule 26(f) report filed by the parties is approved and shall control discovery to the extent of its application unless modified by the court. Signed by Judge Thomas Rawles Jones Jr. on 05/04/2005. (dtro, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/4/2005, Entered: 5/4/2005 Pretrial Conference - Initial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas Rawles Jones Jr.: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 5/4/2005. Appearance of counsel. Discovery plan aproved as agreed, counsel to talk about settlement, counsel to discuss consent order, and court to enter order (dtro, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 10 Filed: 4/29/2005, Entered: 4/29/2005 Discovery - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan by Colgan Air, Inc., Raytheon Aircraft (kjon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 9 Filed: 4/13/2005, Entered: 4/13/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER setting Initial Pretrial Conference for 10:00 5/4/05 Discovery Deadline for 8/12/05 Final Pretrial Conference for 11:00 8/18/05 (see order for details) ( signed by Judge T. S. Ellis III ) Copies Mailed: Yes (kjon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 4/13/2005, Entered: 4/13/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Deadline updated; reset Initial Pretrial Conference for 10:00 5/4/05 before Mag Judge Thomas R. Jones Jr. (kjon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 4/11/2005, Entered: 4/12/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, for William L. Oliver, Jr. to appear pro hac vice Filing Fee Paid $ 50.00 Receipt # 100 179649 ( signed by Judge T. S. Ellis III ) Copies Mailed: Yes [EOD Date: 4/12/05] (kjon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 4/9/2005, Entered: 4/11/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, for Michael Gordon Jones to appear pro hac vice Filing Fee Paid $ 50.00 Receipt # 100 179648 ( signed by Judge T. S. Ellis III ) Copies Mailed: Yes [EOD Date: 4/11/05] (kjon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 4/7/2005, Entered: 4/7/2005 Financial Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Raytheon Aircraft (pmet)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 4/7/2005, Entered: 4/7/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Complaint by Raytheon Aircraft (pmet)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 4/7/2005, Entered: 4/7/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for Raytheon Aircraft by Robert Taggart Hall (pmet)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 4/7/2005, Entered: 4/7/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for Raytheon Aircraft by Holly Parkhurst Essing (pmet)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/8/2005, Entered: 3/8/2005 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS(ES) issued and given to atty for service for service as to deft. Raytheon Aircraft (stas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 2/24/2005, Entered: 2/24/2005 Financial Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Colgan Air, Inc. (otho)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 2/24/2005, Entered: 2/24/2005 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT Filing Fee $ 250.00 Receipt # 100 178666; jury demand (otho)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 2/24/2005, Entered: 2/24/2005 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CASE REFERRED to Mag Judge Thomas R. Jones Jr. (otho)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 2/24/2005, Entered: 2/24/2005 Set/Clear Flags
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Jury Trial Flag (otho)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 105 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?