Lapolla v. Maricopa, County of, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:01-cv-02523-RCB
District Judge Robert C. Broomfield, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Chris Lapolla, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Cox Communications, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Roshka DeWulf & Patten, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James M McGuire +1 602 256 6100 +1 602 256 6800 jmcguire@rdp-law.com
Space Darlene Marie Wauro +1 602 256 6100 +1 602 256 6800 wauro@rdp-law.com
No Logo M&M's Candies, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Schneider & Onofry PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jon D Schneider +1 602 200 1288 +1 602 230 8985 jschneider@soarizonalaw.com
No Logo Maricopa, County of, Defendant
No Logo Phoenix Newspapers, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Steptoe & Johnson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Jeremy Bodney +1 602 257 5200 +1 602 257 5299 dbodney@steptoe.com
Space Peter Shawn Kozinets +1 602 257 5200 +1 602 257 5299 pkozinets@steptoe.com
No Logo Popular Outdoor Stores, Defendant
Qwest Corporation Qwest Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fennemore Craig, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Duane Burgess +1 602 916 5000 +1 602 916 5564 jburgess@fclaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Thomas Thomas & Markson PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles Hamilton Houston, III +1 602 274 8289 +1 602 285 4482 chouston@ttmfirm.com
Office Phoenix Division
Filed 12/26/2001
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County Maricopa
Terminated 4/12/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags STD, TERMED
  Entries (32) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 30 Filed: 10/1/2002, Entered: 10/1/2002 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER by Judge Robert C. Broomfield denying motion for reconsideration (of dismissal of this case) by pla Chris Lapolla [29-1] (cc: all counsel) (LAD)
    LREF
    Blank 29 Filed: 8/5/2002, Entered: 8/9/2002, Terminated: 10/1/2002 Motion for Reconsideration
    MOTION for reconsideration (of dismissal of this case) by pla Chris Lapolla [29-1] (LAD)
      LREF
      Blank 28 Filed: 4/15/2002, Entered: 4/18/2002 Summons Returned Executed - Complaint/Habeas Petit
      RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED summons/complaint upon dft Qwest Corporation by certified mail service on CT Corporation System in Phoenix, AZ on 4/1/02 (LAD)
        LREF
        Blank 26 Filed: 4/12/2002, Entered: 4/12/2002 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER by Judge Robert C. Broomfield finding the motion to dismiss dft Maricopa, County of for lack of jurisdiction and failure to state a claim by dft Maricopa, County of [13-1] moot., finding the motion to dismiss pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) because pla has failed to plead any facts in support of his claim against Qwest as to dft Qwest Corporation by dft Qwest Corporation [14-1] moot., finding the motion for more definite statement pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(e) so that it may formulate a response to pla's amended complaint by dft Qwest Corporation [14-2] (proposed response/answer not provided) moot. finding the motion to dismiss as to dft Cox Communications by dft Cox Communications [19-1] moot., finding the motion for more definite statement concerning pla's specific legal claim against Cox, the specific factual allegations supporting Plaintiff's legal claim against Cox (including any alleged acts or omissions by Cox which form the basis for Pla's legal claim, the relief that pla is seeking against Cox and the basis for the Court's jurisdiction over pla's claim against Cox by dft Cox Communications [19-2] moot. finding the motion to Dismiss Case, Presenting Defenses of Failure to State a Claim, and of Lack of Jurisdiction Under Rule 12(b) by dft M&M's Candies (Mars Incorporated) [22-1] moot. finding the motion to dismiss complaint with prejudice (for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted) by dft Arizona Republic New (Phoenix Newspapers Inc) [24-1] moot. granting motion to dismiss case by pla Chris Lapolla [21-1] FURTHER ORDERED dismissing this suit, without prejudice and FINALLY ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate this action and enter judgment in favor of dfts (cc: all counsel) (judgment not needed on voluntary dismissal by pla) (LAD)
          LREF
          Blank 27 Filed: 4/10/2002, Entered: 4/16/2002 Joinder
          JOINDER by dft M&M's Candies to motion to dismiss case by pla Chris Lapolla [21-1] [21-1] (LAD)
            LREF
            Blank 25 Filed: 4/5/2002, Entered: 4/10/2002 Memorandum
            MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by dft Arizona Republic New of motion to dismiss complaint with prejudice (for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted) by dft Arizona Republic New (Phoenix Newspapers Inc) [24-1] [24-1] (LAD)
              LREF
              Blank 24 Filed: 4/5/2002, Entered: 4/10/2002 Motion to Dismiss
              MOTION to dismiss complaint with prejudice (for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted) by dft Arizona Republic New (Phoenix Newspapers Inc) [24-1] (LAD)
                LREF
                Blank 23 Filed: 4/5/2002, Entered: 4/8/2002 Joinder
                JOINDER by dft Qwest Corporation to motion to dismiss case by pla Chris Lapolla [21-1] [21-1] (former emp)
                  LREF
                  Blank 22 Filed: 4/3/2002, Entered: 4/5/2002 Motion to Dismiss
                  MOTION to Dismiss Case, Presenting Defenses of Failure to State a Claim, and of Lack of Jurisdiction Under Rule 12(b) by dft M&M's Candies (Mars Incorporated) [22-1] (SAT)
                    LREF
                    Blank 21 Filed: 4/2/2002, Entered: 4/3/2002 Motion to Dismiss
                    MOTION to dismiss case by pla Chris Lapolla [21-1] (SAT)
                      LREF
                      Blank 20 Filed: 4/2/2002, Entered: 4/3/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                      REPLY by dft Maricopa, County of to response to motion to dismiss dft Maricopa, County of for lack of jurisdiction and failure to state a claim by dft Maricopa, County of [13-1] (SAT)
                        LREF
                        Blank 19 Filed: 3/29/2002, Entered: 4/1/2002 Motion to Dismiss Party
                        MOTION to dismiss as to dft Cox Communications by dft Cox Communications [19-1] , or in the alternative, for more definite statement concerning pla's specific legal claim against Cox, the specific factual allegations supporting Plaintiff's legal claim against Cox (including any alleged acts or omissions by Cox which form the basis for Pla's legal claim, the relief that pla is seeking against Cox and the basis for the Court's jurisdiction over pla's claim against Cox by dft Cox Communications [19-2] (SAT)
                          LREF
                          Blank 18 Filed: 3/29/2002, Entered: 4/1/2002 Response to Motion
                          RESPONSE by pla Chris Lapolla to motion to dismiss pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) because pla has failed to plead any facts in support of his claim against Qwest as to dft Qwest Corporation by dft Qwest Corporation [14-1] (SAT)
                            LREF
                            Blank 17 Filed: 3/28/2002, Entered: 4/1/2002 Summons Returned Executed - Complaint/Habeas Petit
                            RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED summons/complaint upon William Garcia for dft Arizona Republic New on 3/19/02 (SAT)
                              LREF
                              Blank 16 Filed: 3/26/2002, Entered: 3/27/2002 Response to Motion
                              RESPONSE (MOTION) by pla Chris Lapolla to motion to dismiss dft Maricopa, County of for lack of jurisdiction and failure to state a claim by dft Maricopa, County of [13-1] (LAD)
                                LREF
                                Blank 15 Filed: 3/26/2002, Entered: 3/27/2002 Summons Returned Executed - Complaint/Habeas Petit
                                RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED summons/complaint upon dft M&M's Candies by service upon Lorin Bradley in Hackettstown, New Jersey on 3/14/02 (LAD)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 14 Filed: 3/25/2002, Entered: 3/27/2002 Motion to Dismiss Party
                                  MOTION to dismiss pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) because pla has failed to plead any facts in support of his claim against Qwest as to dft Qwest Corporation by dft Qwest Corporation [14-1] or in the alternative for more definite statement pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(e) so that it may formulate a response to pla's amended complaint by dft Qwest Corporation [14-2] (proposed response/answer not provided) (LAD)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 13 Filed: 3/20/2002, Entered: 3/22/2002, Terminated: 4/12/2002 Motion to Dismiss Party
                                    MOTION to dismiss dft Maricopa, County of for lack of jurisdiction and failure to state a claim by dft Maricopa, County of [13-1] (SAT)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 12 Filed: 3/15/2002, Entered: 3/18/2002 Summons Returned Executed - Complaint/Habeas Petit
                                      RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED summons/complaint upon dft Popular Outdoor Stor on 3/7/02 (USM 285 does not indicate who was served) (LAD)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 11 Filed: 3/15/2002, Entered: 3/18/2002 Summons Returned Executed - Complaint/Habeas Petit
                                        RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED summons/complaint upon dft Maricopa, County of by service upon Jessie Gallagher, Administrative Assistant, on 3/7/02 (LAD)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 10 Filed: 3/13/2002, Entered: 3/13/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER by Judge Robert C. Broomfield denying motion to assign an attorney to pla by pla Chris Lapolla [7-1] (cc: all counsel) (LAD)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 9 Filed: 3/6/2002, Entered: 3/11/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                                            ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for dft Qwest Corporation by James Duane Burgess, Charles Hamilton Houston III (LAD)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 8 Filed: 2/27/2002, Entered: 3/4/2002 Other Notice
                                              NOTICE by pla Chris Lapolla of attached notice of dismissal of this case by EEOC (former emp)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 7 Filed: 2/27/2002, Entered: 3/4/2002, Terminated: 3/13/2002 Motion to Appoint Counsel
                                                MOTION to assign an attorney to pla by pla Chris Lapolla [7-1] (former emp)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 2/20/2002, Entered: 2/25/2002 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                  WAIVER of Service of summons and complaint upon dft Cox Communications; waiver sent on 1/30/02 (LAD)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 2/6/2002, Entered: 2/8/2002 Supplement
                                                    NOTICE by pla Chris Lapolla of charge of discrimination to complaint [1-1] (LAD)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/15/2002, Entered: 1/15/2002 Service Packet Forwarded to USMS
                                                      USM 285, summons/notice/amended complaint/order, forwarded to USMS this date (for dfts Maricopa County Government, AZ Republic care of Gannett, M & M/Mars Company, Quest Inc, Cox Communications and Popular Stores Inc) (LAD) Modified on 02/27/2002
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/15/2002, Entered: 1/15/2002 Remark re Service Packets Received
                                                        Service Packets received on 1/15/02 from pla as to dft Maricopa, County of, dft Cox Communications, dft Arizona Republic New, dft Qwest Corporation, dft M&M's Candies, dft Popular Outdoor Stor (LAD)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 1/10/2002, Entered: 1/11/2002 Amended Complaint
                                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT by pla Chris Lapolla ; [1-1] terminating dft Southwest Airlines, dft KDKB Radio, dft 76 Gasoline, dft Dodge, dft KPHO Channel 5 TV, dft Bashas' Markets Inc, dft Catholic Church, dft Church of Jesus Chri, dft Phoenix Baptist Chur, dft Cigna Health Care AZ, dft K-Mart, dft Glendale, City of, dft Arizona, State of, dft USA, dft Fry's Marketplace, dft Fry's Food Stores AZ, dft Safeway Stores Inc, dft Live Regis & Kelly, dft Channel 12, dft Channel 15, dft KTSP-TV (Channel 10), dft Channel 3 KTVK, dft NBC, dft CBS Broadcasting Inc, dft ABC Television Ntwk, dft CNN, dft Fox News Network, dft Staples Inc (LAD)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER by Judge Robert C. Broomfield granting motion to proceed in forma pauperis by pla Chris Lapolla [2-1] (cc: all counsel) (service forms sent to pla along with copy of this order) (LAD)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 12/26/2001, Entered: 1/2/2002, Terminated: 1/7/2002 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                                                              MOTION to proceed in forma pauperis by pla Chris Lapolla [2-1] (LAD)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 12/26/2001, Entered: 12/28/2001 Complaint
                                                                COMPLAINT FILED (SAT)
                                                                  LREF

                                                                  Statistics

                                                                  This case has been viewed 216 times.

                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                  Space
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                   
                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                  Need Password Help?