Yovanovich, et al v. Bassett, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:93-cv-00022

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Anna Yovanovich, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Edward B MacMahon Jr.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward B. MacMahon +1 540 687 3902 +1 540 687 6366 ebmjr@macmahon-law.com
No Logo Joseph Yovanovich, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Edward B MacMahon Jr.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward B. MacMahon +1 540 687 3902 +1 540 687 6366 ebmjr@macmahon-law.com
v.
No Logo Carolyn M Bassett, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Defender Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Frank W. Dunham, Jr. +1 804 343 0800 +1 703 525 2489

Toggle Switch Represented by rblaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Edward Gagliano +1 703 525 2260 +1 703 525 2489
Office Alexandria
Filed 1/4/1993
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $520000
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Out of State
Terminated 10/13/1993
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (44) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 10/14/1993, Entered: 10/14/1993 Docket Annotation
NOTE:EXHIBITS DESTROYED.(2 black binders) (clerk)
    LREF
    Blank 38 Filed: 10/13/1993, Entered: 10/14/1993 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER that the amended complaint is dismissed, with prejudice, against Carol M. Bassett and that a judgment of retraxit be entered withdrawing all allegations of the amended complaint against her - entered & filed ( signed by Judge Albert V. Bryan Jr. ) Copies Mailed: Yes (clerk)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 10/13/1993, Entered: 10/14/1993 Terminated Case
      Case closed (clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 37 Filed: 9/3/1993, Entered: 9/7/1993 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER denying [32-1] motion by Carolyn M Bassett for Summary Judgment on amended complaint - entered & filed ( signed by Judge Claude M. Hilton ) Copies Mailed: Yes (clerk)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 9/3/1993, Entered: 9/3/1993 Minutes-Miscellaneous
          Minute entry: (CMH) r: Linnell. Appearances: counsel. On for hearing on deft's motion for SJ on amended complaint - argued & denied. (jsol) Modified on 09/07/1993
            LREF
            Blank 36 Filed: 9/2/1993, Entered: 9/2/1993 Memorandum in Support
            REPLY MEMORANDUM by Carolyn M Bassett in support of [33-1] memorandum in support of motion for summary judgment by Carolyn M Bassett (clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 35 Filed: 8/30/1993, Entered: 8/30/1993 Memorandum in Opposition
              MEMORANDUM by Anna Yovanovich, Joseph Yovanovich in opposition to [32-1] motion by Carolyn M Bassett for Summary Judgment on amended complaint by Carolyn M Bassett (clerk)
                LREF
                Blank 34 Filed: 8/17/1993, Entered: 8/17/1993 Notice of Hearing.
                NOTICE of Hearing: Motion Hearing set for 10:00 9/3/93 for [32-1] motion by Carolyn M Bassett for Summary Judgment on amended complaint (clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank 33 Filed: 8/17/1993, Entered: 8/17/1993 Memorandum in Support
                  MEMORANDUM by Carolyn M Bassett in support of [32-1] motion by Carolyn M Bassett for Summary Judgment on amended complaint by Carolyn M Bassett (clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank 32 Filed: 8/17/1993, Entered: 8/17/1993, Terminated: 9/3/1993 Motion for Summary Judgment
                    MOTION by Carolyn M Bassett for Summary Judgment on amended complaint (clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank 31 Filed: 7/29/1993, Entered: 7/30/1993 Objection
                      OBJECTION by defendant Carolyn M Bassett to documents listed in joint submission of trial exhibits (clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank 30 Filed: 7/26/1993, Entered: 7/26/1993 Objection
                        OBJECTION by plaintiff Anna Yovanovich to [29-1] exhibits list by Joseph Yovanovich, Carolyn M Bassett, Anna Yovanovich (clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank 29 Filed: 7/15/1993, Entered: 7/15/1993 Exhibit
                          Exhibit list by Anna Yovanovich, Carolyn M Bassett, Joseph Yovanovich (clerk)
                            LREF
                            Blank 28 Filed: 7/15/1993, Entered: 7/15/1993 Witness List
                            Witness list by Anna Yovanovich, Carolyn M Bassett, Joseph Yovanovich (clerk)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 7/15/1993, Entered: 7/15/1993 Pretrial Conference - Final
                              Pre-Trial Conference:(JCC) Appearances:Counsel. Case for trial by JURY on 9/14/93. Joint exhibits filed by pltf & deft (2 black binders) on exhibit row. 10 days to file objections. (clerk)
                                LREF
                                Blank 27 Filed: 6/17/1993, Entered: 6/18/1993 Docket Annotation
                                Suggestion of Death - filed by pltfs' counsel as to deft. William L. Bassett (clerk)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 26 Filed: 6/14/1993, Entered: 6/15/1993 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER that the motion for expedited discovery is granted and the deft. shall produce all insurance policies on the life of William L. Bassett in her possession, custody or control w/i 5 days from the entry of this order - entered & filed ( signed by Judge James C. Cacheris ) Copies Mailed: Yes (clerk) Modified on 06/15/1993
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 25 Filed: 6/11/1993, Entered: 6/15/1993 OrderCourt Filing
                                    ORDER that the pretrial conference scheduled for 6/17/93 is continued to 7/15/93 at 10:00 a.m. - entered & filed ( signed by Judge James C. Cacheris ) Copies Mailed: Yes (clerk) Modified on 06/15/1993
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 24 Filed: 5/28/1993, Entered: 6/2/1993 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER granting [20-1] motion by Joseph Yovanovich, Anna Yovanovich to Compel and the deft. William Bassett, shall provide responses to discovery w/i 10 days from the entry of this order - entered & filed ( signed by Magistrate Judge Barry R. Poretz ) Copies Mailed: Yes (clerk)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 23 Filed: 5/27/1993, Entered: 6/2/1993 Request for Admissions
                                        REQUEST for Admissions by Carolyn M Bassett (clerk)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 22 Filed: 5/25/1993, Entered: 5/25/1993 Notice of Hearing.
                                          NOTICE of Hearing: Motion Hearing set for 10:00 5/28/93 for [20-1] motion by Joseph Yovanovich, Anna Yovanovich to Compel (rvoi)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 21 Filed: 5/25/1993, Entered: 5/25/1993 Memorandum in Support
                                            MEMORANDUM by Anna Yovanovich, Joseph Yovanovich in support of [20-1] motion to Compel (rvoi)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 20 Filed: 5/25/1993, Entered: 5/25/1993, Terminated: 5/28/1993 Motion to Compel
                                              MOTION by Joseph Yovanovich, Anna Yovanovich to Compel (rvoi)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 19 Filed: 5/14/1993, Entered: 5/17/1993 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                ANSWER by Carolyn M Bassett (Attorney John Edward Gagliano) to amended complaint (clerk)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 18 Filed: 5/12/1993, Entered: 5/13/1993 Notice
                                                  NOTICE by Anna Yovanovich, Joseph Yovanovich to take deposition of Carollyn M. Bassett (clerk)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 17 Filed: 4/28/1993, Entered: 4/28/1993 Amended Complaint
                                                    FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Anna Yovanovich, Joseph Yovanovich amending [1-1] complaint ;; jury demand (clerk)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 16 Filed: 4/28/1993, Entered: 4/28/1993 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER granting [13-1] motion by Anna Yovanovich to Amend [1-1] complaint. That the defts shall have 15 days from the entry of this order to file responsive pleadings in the event either determines it necessary to file a responsive pleading - entered & filed ( signed by Judge Albert V. Bryan Jr. ) Copies Mailed: Yes (clerk)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 15 Filed: 4/21/1993, Entered: 4/21/1993 Notice
                                                        NOTICE by Anna Yovanovich to take deposition of William L. Bassett (clerk)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 14 Filed: 4/19/1993, Entered: 4/19/1993 Memorandum in Support
                                                          MEMORANDUM by Anna Yovanovich in support of [13-1] motion by Anna Yovanovich to Amend [1-1] complaint by Anna Yovanovich (clerk)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 13 Filed: 4/19/1993, Entered: 4/19/1993, Terminated: 4/28/1993 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                            MOTION by Anna Yovanovich to Amend [1-1] complaint (clerk)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 12 Filed: 4/12/1993, Entered: 4/12/1993 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER that leave to withdraw as counsel for deft. Carolyn Bassett is granted as to Peter Wright - entered & filed ( signed by Judge Albert V. Bryan Jr. ) Copies Mailed: Yes (clerk)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 11 Filed: 4/12/1993, Entered: 4/12/1993, Terminated: 4/12/1993 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                MOTION for leave to withdraw notice of appearance by Peter Wright by Carolyn M Bassett and NOTICE OF APPPEARANCE of Frank Dunham and Stewart Leeth for Carolyn Bassett (clerk)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 4/5/1993, Entered: 4/6/1993 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                  NOTICE of Hearing: Motion Hearing set for 10:00 4/9/93 for [8-1] motion by Carolyn M Bassett to Compel (clerk)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 4/5/1993, Entered: 4/6/1993 Memorandum in Support
                                                                    MEMORANDUM by Carolyn M Bassett in support of [8-1] motion by Carolyn M Bassett to Compel by Carolyn M Bassett (clerk)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 4/5/1993, Entered: 4/6/1993 Motion to Compel
                                                                      MOTION by Carolyn M Bassett to Compel (clerk)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 4/1/1993, Entered: 4/1/1993 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER setting Discovery cutoff 6/11/93 ; Pretrial Conference for 11:20 6/17/93 ; ( signed by Judge James C. Cacheris ) Copies Mailed: Yes (clerk) Modified on 06/15/1993
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 3/16/1993, Entered: 3/16/1993, Terminated: 10/13/1993 Answer
                                                                          ANSWER to Complaint by William L. Bassett (clerk)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 3/1/1993, Entered: 3/1/1993 Request for Production of Documents
                                                                            REQUEST for Production of Documents by Carolyn M Bassett (clerk)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 2/24/1993, Entered: 2/24/1993 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                              SUMMONS Returned by SPS, Stan Soaper, Executed as to William L. Bassett 2/22/93 Answer due on 3/15/93 for William L. Bassett (clerk)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 2/5/1993, Entered: 2/5/1993 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                Summons returned unexecuted by mail as to William L. Bassett (clerk)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 2/5/1993, Entered: 2/5/1993 Summons Reissued
                                                                                  ALIAS SUMMONS (Org & 1) issued and given to SPS, Stan Soaper, for William L. Bassett (clerk)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 1/28/1993, Entered: 1/29/1993 Answer
                                                                                    ANSWER to Complaint by Carolyn M Bassett (Attorney Peter W. D. Wright), (clerk)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/6/1993, Entered: 1/7/1993 Summons Issued
                                                                                      SUMMONS(ES) (2) issued and given to attorney for service by mail for William L. Bassett, Carolyn M Bassett (clerk)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 1/4/1993, Entered: 1/7/1993 Complaint
                                                                                        COMPLAINT Filing Fee $ 120.00 Receipt # 94080; jury demand (clerk)
                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                          This case has been viewed 99 times.

                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                          Space
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                           
                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                          Need Password Help?