USA v. Hernandez-Cruz
Federal Court Proceeding Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:01-mj-01003-JRI

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Office Phoenix Division
Filed 1/1/2001
County Yuma
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Citation
Offense Level
81326(a) enhanced by (b)(2) - Re-entry After Removal
Def Custody Status Custody This Court
Flag MAG-TERMED
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 1/19/2001, Entered: 1/19/2001 Order
MINUTE ORDER excludable delay stopped , dft Raul Hernandez-Cruz moved to Crim Case No: 01-47-PHX-ROS , counts terminated and excludables stopped at magistrate level. [0-3] (former emp)
    LREF
    Blank 5 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/16/2001 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
    ORDER of detention pending trial by Mag Judge Jay R. Irwin as to Raul Hernandez-Cruz re: detention order [5-1] (LAD)
      LREF
      Blank 4 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/16/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
      ( FILED: 1/2/01) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Jay R. Irwin Interpreter: Kathy Schaben - SPANISH; appointment of counsel hearing held; dft Raul Hernandez-Cruz appears with counsel Jay Randall Cairns ; detention hearing held; preliminary hearing set for 1/1/01 at 1:30 pm before Mag Judge Jay R Irwin [4-2] (LAD)
        LREF
        Blank 3 Filed: 1/1/2001, Entered: 1/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER of temporary detention as to Raul Hernandez-Cruz by Mag Judge Jay R. Irwin re: order [3-1] (LAD)
          LREF
          Blank 2 Filed: 1/1/2001, Entered: 1/16/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
          ( FILED: 1/1/01) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Jay R. Irwin Interpreter: Kathy Schaben - SPANISH first appearance of Raul Hernandez-Cruz ; informed of rights, charges, etc.; , SPANISH interpreter required for Raul Hernandez-Cruz ; detention hearing set for 1/2/01 at 1:30 pm before Mag Judge Jay R Irwin [2-3] (LAD)
            LREF
            Blank 1 Filed: 1/1/2001, Entered: 1/16/2001 Complaint
            COMPLAINT filed as to Raul Hernandez-Cruz (LAD)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 12/31/2000, Entered: 1/16/2001 Arrest
              DEFENDANT Raul Hernandez-Cruz arrested. Raul Hernandez-Cruz (1) count(s) cmp (LAD)
                LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 102 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?