USA v. Sanchez-Valdez
Federal Court Proceeding Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:01-mj-01006-JRI

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Office Phoenix Division
Filed 1/1/2001
County Yuma
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Citation
Offense Level
81326(a) enhanced by (b)(2) Illegal re-entry after deportation
Def Custody Status Custody This Court
Flag MAG-TERMED
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 1/11/2001, Entered: 1/18/2001 Order
MINUTE ORDER excludable delay stopped , dft Mauricio Sanchez-Valdez moved to Crim Case No: CR 01-51-PHX-JAT , counts terminated and excludables stopped at magistrate level. , all parties moved to a criminal case, mag case termed [0-4] (former emp)
    LREF
    Blank 5 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/18/2001 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
    ORDER of detention pending trial by Mag Judge Jay R. Irwin as to Mauricio Sanchez-Valdez re: detention order [5-1] (PHR)
      LREF
      Blank 4 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/18/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
      ( FILED: 1/2/01) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Jay R. Irwin Interpreter: Kathy Schaben dft Mauricio Sanchez-Valdez appears with counsel Jay Randall Cairns; dft detained; prelim hrg is set for 1/11/01 at 1:30 pm before this Court [4-2] (PHR)
        LREF
        Blank 3 Filed: 1/1/2001, Entered: 1/18/2001 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER by Mag Judge Jay R. Irwin for temporary detention as to Mauricio Sanchez-Valdez (PHR)
          LREF
          Blank 2 Filed: 1/1/2001, Entered: 1/18/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
          ( FILED: 1/01/01) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Jay R. Irwin Interpreter: Kathy Schaben first appearance of Mauricio Sanchez-Valdez ; informed of rights, charges, etc.; , detention hrg is set for 1/2/01 at 1:30 before this Court; dft present w/o cnsl; SPANISH interpreter required for Mauricio Sanchez-Valdez. [2-3] (PHR)
            LREF
            Blank 1 Filed: 1/1/2001, Entered: 1/18/2001 Complaint
            COMPLAINT filed as to Mauricio Sanchez-Valdez (PHR) Modified on 01/18/2001
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 12/30/2000, Entered: 1/18/2001 Arrest
              DEFENDANT Mauricio Sanchez-Valdez arrested. Mauricio Sanchez-Valdez (1) count(s) cmp (PHR)
                LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 96 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?