USA, et al v. Garibalde-Salazar
Federal Court Proceeding Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:01-mj-01010-JRI

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Office Phoenix Division
Filed 1/2/2001
County Yuma
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Citation
Offense Level
81326, Re-entry After Removal
Def Custody Status Custody This Court
Flag MAG-TERMED
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 1/24/2001, Entered: 1/25/2001 Order
MINUTE ORDER excludable delay stopped , dft Eliazar Garibalde-Salazar moved to Crim Case No: CR-01-68-PHX-JAT , counts terminated and excludables stopped at magistrate level., , all parties moved to a criminal case, mag case termed [0-4] (CMM) Modified on 01/26/2001
    LREF
    Blank 8 Filed: 1/22/2001, Entered: 1/22/2001 Response to Motion
    RESPONSE by pla USA to motion to extend time to indict (for 30 days) by Eliazar Garibalde-Salazar [5-1] (SMM)
      LREF
      Blank 5 Filed: 1/19/2001, Entered: 1/22/2001 Motion to Extend Time
      MOTION to extend time to indict (for 30 days) by Eliazar Garibalde-Salazar [5-1] (1st request) (LAD)
        LREF
        Blank 7 Filed: 1/18/2001, Entered: 1/22/2001 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER by Mag Judge Lawrence O. Anderson appointing counsel Jon M Sands for Eliazar Garibalde-Salazar (SMM)
          LREF
          Blank 6 Filed: 1/18/2001, Entered: 1/22/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
          ( FILED: 1/18/01) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Lawrence O. Anderson; Ct Rptr: A01-12: 4756-5256; Spanish Interpreter: Lita Duzer appointing counsel Jon M Sands for Eliazar Garibalde-Salazar [cc: INTER, LOA] [6-2] (SMM)
            LREF
            Blank 4 Filed: 1/11/2001, Entered: 1/17/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
            ( FILED: 1/11/01) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Jay R. Irwin Interpreter: Marcia Resler. Preliminary hearing held for Eliazar Gabibalde-Salazar, probable cause found. Defendant requests transfer to Phoenix. Appointment of counsel set for 1/18/01 at 11:00 before Judge Anderson. [4-1] re: minute entry [4-1] (former emp)
              LREF
              Blank 3 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/17/2001 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
              ORDER of detention pending trial by Mag Judge Jay R. Irwin as to Eliazar Garibalde-Salazar re: detention order [3-1] (former emp)
                LREF
                Blank 2 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/17/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                ( FILED: 01/02/01) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Jay R. Irwin Interpreter: Kathy Schaben SPANISH for Eliazar Garibalde-Salazar. , first appearance of Eliazar Garibalde-Salazar ; informed of rights, charges, etc.; , dft Eliazar Garibalde-Salazar appears with counsel Jay Cairns for Yuma proceedings. Detention hearing held, defendant detained. [2-4] (former emp) Modified on 01/17/2001
                  LREF
                  Blank 1 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/17/2001 Complaint
                  COMPLAINT filed as to Eliazar Garibalde-Salazar (former emp)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/17/2001 Arrest
                    DEFENDANT Eliazar Garibalde-Salazar arrested. Eliazar Garibalde-Salazar (1) count(s) cmp (former emp)
                      LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 42 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?