USA v. Russell
Criminal Case Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:95-cr-00001

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Alexandria
Filed 1/3/1995
County Fairfax
Terminated 3/17/1995
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 846=ND.F
Offense Level 4
21846 Conspiracy to distribute 50 grams or more of crack cocaine (Sch. II) (2-94)
Def Custody Status Released
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 10 Filed: 12/10/2002, Entered: 12/11/2002 Miscellaneous DocumentCourt Filing
Report and Order, it is ordered that the supervised releasee be discharged from supervision and that the proceedings in the case be terminated as to Reginald Russell (signed by Judge Claude M. Hilton) (jcup)
    LREF
    Blank 9 Filed: 3/17/1995, Entered: 3/20/1995 Miscellaneous Document
    FINDINGS and reasons in connection w/sentence - filed (AVB) Copies sent. (clerk)
      LREF
      Blank 8 Filed: 3/17/1995, Entered: 3/20/1995 Judgment*Court Filing
      JUDGMENT in a criminal case - entered and filed ( Signed by Judge Albert V. Bryan Jr. ) Cert. copies to U.S. Atty., Marshal, PO, PTS and counsel for deft. (clerk)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 3/17/1995, Entered: 3/20/1995 Set/Reset Hearings
        Sentencing held before Judge Albert V. Bryan Jr. ( Reporter: Rocky Hopchas.) USA appeared through: Trump. Dft appeared w/counsel Howard. Reginald Russell (1) count(s) 1. JUDGMENT: Guilty. U.S.' 5K motion for downward departure granted. Deft. committed to custody of US BOP for 60 months w/5 year super. release term and assessed $50.00. Cond. of SR: receive and undergo such mental health treatment and counseling and substance abuse treatment as may be directed by PO. Court recommends that deft. receive treatment for his medical cond. while incarcerated. Deft. remanded. (clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 7 Filed: 3/16/1995, Entered: 3/16/1995 Notice of Hearing.
          NOTICE of Hearing as to Reginald Russell :, Motion Hearing set for 9:00 3/17/95 for Reginald Russell for [6-1] motion by USA for downward departure (clerk)
            LREF
            Blank 6 Filed: 3/16/1995, Entered: 3/16/1995 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
            MOTION as to Reginald Russell by USA for downward departure (clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 5 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/3/1995 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
              ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Reginald Russell - entered ande filed ( Signed by Judge Albert V. Bryan Jr. ) Copies sent. (clerk)
                LREF
                Blank 4 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/3/1995 Plea Agreement
                PLEA AGREEMENT as to Reginald Russell - filed in open Court. (clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank 3 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/3/1995 Description not available
                  STATEMENT OF FACTS as to Reginald Russell - filed in open Court. (clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank 2 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/3/1995 Waiver of Indictment
                    WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Reginald Russell - filed in open Court. (clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank 1 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/3/1995 Information - Felony
                      CRIMINAL INFORMATION as to Reginald Russell (1) count(s) 1 - filed in open Court. (clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 3/20/1995 Plea - Miscellaneous
                        PLEA entered. Court accepts plea. Guilty: count(s) 1 (clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/3/1995 Set/Reset Hearings
                          Sentencing set for 9:00 3/17/95 for Reginald Russell Reginald Russell (1) count(s) 1 (clerk)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/3/1995 Plea Agreement
                            Plea Agreement Hearing as to Reginald Russell held before Judge Albert V. Bryan Jr. ( Reporter: Farmer.) USA appeared through: Trump. Dft appeared w/counsel Howard. Dft. FA, PG to Cr. Info. Accepted. Referred to PO for PSI and report. Cont. to 3-17-95 at 9:00 for G/L sentencing. Dft. recognized in PR Bond of $5,000 w/cond. 1)remain under super. of PTS; 2)undergo mental health eval. and treatment as directed by PTS; 3)refrain from excessive use of alcohol and any use of illegal drugs and 4)undergo substance abuse testing and treatment. Dft. released. (clerk)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/3/1995 Initial Appearance
                              Initial appearance as to Reginald Russell held before Judge Albert V. Bryan Jr. (clerk)
                                LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 52 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?