USA v. O'Shell
Criminal Case Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:95-cr-00002

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Alexandria
Filed 1/3/1995
County Prince William
Terminated 3/17/1995
Reopened
Magistrate Case
194-mj-01112
Citation
Offense Level
Conspiracy to distribute 100 kilograms of Marijuana (sch. I) in viol. of 21 USC 846 [ 194-m -1112 ]
Count 1
Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 846=MD.F
Offense Level 4
21846 Conspiracy to distribute marijuana (Sch. I) (11-94)
Def Custody Status Released
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (32) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 19 Filed: 3/15/1996, Entered: 3/15/1996 OrderCourt Filing
ORDERED that the motion of govt. pursuant to F. R. Crim. P. 35(b) is granted and the J&C Order of 3-17-95 is amended to reflect that the deft. is committed to custody of Atty. Gen. for imprisonment for 12 months. In all other respects the J&C Order shall remain the same - entered and filed ( Signed by Judge Albert V. Bryan Jr. ) Cert. copies to U.S. Atty., Marshal, PO, PTS and counsel for deft. (clerk)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 3/15/1996, Entered: 3/15/1996 Motion Hearing
    Motion hearing held re: [16-1] motion by USA to Reduce Sentence before Judge Albert V. Bryan Jr. ( Reporter: Priscilla Hopchas.) USA appeared through: Hidalgo. Dft appeared through counsel Carroll. Motion granted. Sentence reduced to 12 months. (clerk)
      LREF
      Blank 18 Filed: 3/8/1996, Entered: 3/11/1996 Notice of Hearing.
      NOTICE of Hearing as to Chris O'Shell :, Motion Hearing set for for [16-1] motion by USA to Reduce Sentence (clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 17 Filed: 3/8/1996, Entered: 3/11/1996 Response in Support
        MEMORANDUM by USA as to Chris O'Shell in support of [16-1] motion by USA to Reduce Sentence (clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 16 Filed: 3/8/1996, Entered: 3/11/1996 Motion to Reduce Sentence
          MOTION as to Chris O'Shell by USA to Reduce Sentence (clerk)
            LREF
            Blank 15 Filed: 3/17/1995, Entered: 3/20/1995 Miscellaneous Document
            FINDINGS and reasons in connection w/sentence - filed (AVB). Copies sent. (clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 14 Filed: 3/17/1995, Entered: 3/20/1995 Judgment*Court Filing
              JUDGMENT in a criminal case - entered and filed ( Signed by Judge Albert V. Bryan Jr. ) Cert. copies to U.S. Atty., Marshal, PO, PTS and counsel for deft. (clerk)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 3/17/1995, Entered: 3/20/1995 Set/Reset Hearings
                Sentencing held before Judge Albert V. Bryan Jr. ( Reporter: Rocky Hopchas.) USA appeared through: Alexander. Dft appeared w/counsel Carroll. Chris O'Shell (1) count(s) 1. JUDGMENT: Guilty. Deft. committed to custody of US BOP for 30 months w/3 year super. release term and assessed $50.00. Cond. of SR: receive and undergo such substance abuse treatment as may be directed by PO. Deft.'s motion for voluntary surrender denied; for incarceration at a Level I inst. - court leaves to discretion of BOP. Deft. remanded. (clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank 13 Filed: 3/13/1995, Entered: 3/14/1995 Position on Sentencing
                  POSITION with Respect to Sentencing Factors by USA as to Chris O'Shell (clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank 12 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/3/1995 Description not available
                    STATEMENT OF FACTS as to Chris O'Shell - filed in open Court. (clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank 11 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/3/1995 Plea Agreement
                      PLEA AGREEMENT - filed in open Court. (clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank 10 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/3/1995 Waiver of Indictment
                        WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Chris O'Shell - filed in open Court. (clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank 9 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/3/1995 Information - Felony
                          CRIMINAL INFORMATION as to Chris O'Shell (1) count(s) 1 - filed in open Court. (clerk)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/3/1995 Set/Reset Hearings
                            Sentencing set for 9:00 3/17/95 for Chris O'Shell , count(s) 1 (clerk)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/3/1995 Plea - Miscellaneous
                              PLEA entered by Chris O'Shell . Court accepts plea. Guilty: count(s) 1 (clerk)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/3/1995 Plea Agreement
                                Plea Agreement Hearing as to Chris O'Shell held before Judge Albert V. Bryan Jr. ( Reporter: Farmer.) USA appeared through: Alexander. Dft. appeared w/counsel Carroll. Dft. FA, PG to Cr. Info. Accepted. Referred to PO for PSI and report. Cont. to 3/17/95 at 9:00 for G/L sentencing. Dft. released on present bond. (clerk)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 8 Filed: 12/20/1994, Entered: 12/21/1994 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER granting [7-1] motion to Extend Time to Indict by 30 days as to Chris O'Shell (1) - entered & filed ( Signed by Judge James C. Cacheris ) Copies Mailed: Yes [ 1:94-m -1112 ] (clerk)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 7 Filed: 12/20/1994, Entered: 12/21/1994, Terminated: 12/20/1994 Motion for Extension of Time to Indict
                                    JOINT MOTION to Extend Time to Indict by 30 days [ 1:94-m -1112 ] (clerk)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 12/5/1994, Entered: 12/5/1994 Miscellaneous Document
                                      FILE sent to 200 S. Washington St. Alexandria, Va 22314 as to Chris O'Shell [ 1:94-m -1112 ] (dana)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 12/2/1994, Entered: 12/5/1994 Preliminary Examination
                                        Preliminary Examination as to Chris O'Shell held before Magistrate Judge Thomas R. Jones Jr. ( tape 1046) USA appeared through: Alexander Dft(s) appeared through: Carroll. PC found and deft's conditions of release are continued to appear at 200 S. Washington St. Alexandria. Va 22314 as directed. [ 1:94-m -1112 ] (dana)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 6 Filed: 11/29/1994, Entered: 11/29/1994 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                          NOTICE of Appearance for Chris O'Shell by Attorney F. Andrew Carroll III, Paul Francis Nichols [ 1:94-m -1112 ] (dana)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 11/29/1994, Entered: 11/29/1994 Preliminary Examination
                                            Preliminary Examination as to Chris O'Shell set for 2:00 12/2/94 for Chris O'Shell [ 1:94-m -1112 ] (dana)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 11/29/1994, Entered: 11/29/1994 Status Conference
                                              Status conference as to Chris O'Shell held before Magistrate Judge Thomas R. Jones Jr. ( tape 1044) USA appeared through: Alexander Dft(s) appeared through: Carroll. Case continued to 12/2/94 at 2:00 pm. Conditions of Release contined and deft released. [ 1:94-m -1112 ] (dana)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 11/23/1994, Entered: 11/23/1994 Status Conference
                                                Status conference as to Chris O'Shell set at 10:00 11/29/94 for Chris O'Shell [ 1:94-m -1112 ] (dana)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 11/22/1994, Entered: 11/23/1994 Bond
                                                  UNSECURED PR BOND entered by Chris O'Shell in Amount $ 10,000. Deft brought to Clerk's Office and admitted to PR bond w/conditions of Release- executed. Copies sent. Deft released. [ 1:94-m -1112 ] (dana)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 11/22/1994, Entered: 11/23/1994 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Chris O'Shell ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas R. Jones Jr. ) [ 1:94-m -1112 ] (dana)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 11/22/1994, Entered: 11/23/1994 Warrant Returned Executed
                                                      ARREST WARRANT Returned Executed as to Chris O'Shell on 11/22/94 [ 1:94-m -1112 ] (dana)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 11/22/1994, Entered: 11/23/1994 Initial Appearance
                                                        Initial appearance as to Chris O'Shell held before Magistrate Judge Thomas R. Jones Jr. ( tape 1043) USA appeared through: Alexander Dft(s) appeared through: w/o counsel (Defendant informed of rights.). Deft will retain counsel. Deft placed on $10,000 unsecured PR bond w/conditions that the step-father co-sign, the deft appear for status on 11/29/94 at 10:00 am, maintain/seek employment, deft may not leave the Wash DC area or move from present address w/o prior approval of PTS, report to PTS as directed, refrain from excessive use of alcohol and any use or unlawfully possession of a narcotic drug and other controlled substances, and undergo drug testing/treatment as direct. Deft remanded. [ 1:94-m -1112 ] (dana)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 11/22/1994, Entered: 11/23/1994 Arrest
                                                          ARREST of Chris O'Shell [ 1:94-m -1112 ] (dana)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 11/21/1994, Entered: 11/23/1994 Affidavit
                                                            AFFIDAVIT by USA as to Chris O'Shell Re: [1-1] complaint, [0-0] modifier count [ 1:94-m -1112 ] (dana)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 11/21/1994, Entered: 11/23/1994 Complaint
                                                              COMPLAINT as to Chris O'Shell [ 1:94-m -1112 ] (dana)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 11/21/1994, Entered: 11/23/1994 Warrant Issued
                                                                ARREST WARRANT issued as to Chris O'Shell [ 1:94-m -1112 ] (dana)
                                                                  LREF

                                                                  Statistics

                                                                  This case has been viewed 64 times.

                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                  Space
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                   
                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                  Need Password Help?