USA v. Bradley
Criminal Case Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:95-cr-00003-TSE

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Alexandria
Filed 1/3/1995
County Alexandria City
Terminated 4/28/1995
Reopened
Magistrate Case
194-mj-01037
Citation
Offense Level
18 USC 1014 FALSE Statement to a Financial Institution a [ 194-m -1037 ]
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1029A.F
Offense Level 4
181029(a) (2) & 182 CREDIT CARD FRAUD (June 1994)
Count 2
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1014.F
Offense Level 4
181014 False Statements on loan application in amt of $20,850. (October 1994)
Def Custody Status Released
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (62) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 41 Filed: 1/14/2000, Entered: 1/21/2000 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER that for reasons stated from the Bench and for good cause shown, the Petition for Revocation of Supervised Release is DISMISSED; the 8/18/99 Order is VACATED; the conditions of supervised release are MODIFIED to require that Deft serve 100 hours of community service, as directed by the Probation Officer, and upon completion, Deft's term of supervised release shall be TERMINATED. Until community service is completed, Deft shall continue under the same conditions of supervised release and any violation may result in sanctions, including incarceration. Further ORDERED that Deft pay any unpaid restitution balance immediately upon termination of supervised release. ( Signed by Judge T. S. Ellis III ) Copies Mailed: Yes (tbul)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 1/14/2000, Entered: 1/21/2000 Minutes-Miscellaneous
    Minute entry as to Nikita S. Bradley : before Judge T. S. Ellis III ( Moses) USA appeared through: John Morton Dft(s) appeared w/ counsel: Drew Hutcheson. Petition to terminate sup. rel. heard (the Ct. adduced evidence; Deft adduced evidence) & granted. The Ct. will terminate the sup. rel. & Deft will have to serve 10 days B.O.P. - counsel to notify the Ct. whether Deft shall serve the term on weekends or all at once. (tbul)
      LREF
      Blank 40 Filed: 1/11/2000, Entered: 1/12/2000 Response in Support
      MEMORANDUM by USA as to Nikita S. Bradley in support of [39-1] Petition and order on revocation of deft's supervised release (clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 39 Filed: 12/22/1999, Entered: 12/22/1999 Miscellaneous DocumentCourt Filing
        PETITION AND ORDER on Probation/Supervised Release as to Nikita S. Bradley the supervised releasee be summoned to court for violation of supervised release Nikita S. Bradley (1) count(s) 1, 2 signed by Judge T. S. Ellis III ) (djoh)
          LREF
          Blank 38 Filed: 9/23/1999, Entered: 9/24/1999 Summons Issued
          Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Nikita S. Bradley (clar)
            LREF
            Blank 37 Filed: 8/18/1999, Entered: 8/19/1999 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER as to Nikita S. Bradley, upon P.O.'s petition for action in light of Deft's violation of terms of Sup. Rel. - for reasons stated from the Bench, & because violations are not contested - Deft's conditions of Sup. Rel. are MODIFIED: 1) Deft to serve BOP term of intermittent confinement over 5 weekends (10 days) to commence 1 mo. after the birth of her child; 2) Sup. Rel. shall be terminated upon Deft's completion of the new BOP term; and 3) unpaid bal. of restitution of $21,382.35 ordered by the Court is due and payable immed. upon terminiation of Deft's Sup. Rel. ( Signed by Judge T. S. Ellis III ) Mailed: Yes (tbul)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 8/18/1999, Entered: 8/18/1999 Set/Reset Deadlines:
              Supervised Release Violation Hearing as to Nikita S. Bradley held before Judge T. S. Ellis III ( Reporter: Rodriquez) USA appeared through: Judith O'Sullivan Dft(s) appeared w/ counsel: Drew Hutcheson. P.O. Heckenbach answered the Ct's questions; allocution by Deft. The Ct. continued Sup. Rel. until one mo. after the birth of Deft's child, at which time a spec. cond. shall be added which requires Deft to serve 10 days in jail on weekends or work release, and at that time the Sup. Rel. would be terminated & restitution program reimposed. The Ct. shall consider Deft's request to revoke Sup. Rel. now. Order to follow. (agil)
                LREF
                Blank 36 Filed: 8/17/1999, Entered: 8/17/1999 Response in Support
                MEMORANDUM by USA in support of revocation of deft. Nikita Bradley (clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 8/10/1999, Entered: 8/10/1999 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                  Supervised Release Violation Hearing as to Nikita S. Bradley set for 9:30 8/18/99 for Nikita S. Bradley before Judge T.S. Ellis, III (tbul)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 8/4/1999, Entered: 8/4/1999 Summons Issued
                    SUMMONS(ES) issued for Nikita S. Bradley (clar)
                      LREF
                      Blank 35 Filed: 7/29/1999, Entered: 8/4/1999 Miscellaneous DocumentCourt Filing
                      PETITION AND ORDER on Probation/Supervised Release as to Nikita S. Bradley that the Court will Order that the supervised releasee be summoned to court for violation of supervised release - ent & filed signed by Judge T. S. Ellis III ) (clar)
                        LREF
                        Blank 34 Filed: 6/22/1998, Entered: 6/24/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER that for reasons stated from the bench, deft's sup. rel. is continued, but with the following special conds. added: 1) deft's term of sup. rel. is extended for a period of two years; 2) deft's restitution payments are increased to $100/mo. All other terms and conds. of deft's sentence shall remain in full force and effect, ent - filed ( Signed by Judge T. S. Ellis III ) Copies Mailed: yes (clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 6/22/1998, Entered: 6/24/1998 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                          Supervised Release Violation Hearing as to Nikita S. Bradley held before Judge T. S. Ellis III ( Reporter: Rodriquez) USA appeared through: Rodeghiero. Deft. appeared w/ counsel Hutcheson. Deft. denied violation of conds. of sup. rel. Govt. adduced evidence and rested. Deft. adduced evidence and rested. Matter argued and Court found deft. in violation of conds. of sup. rel. Deft. cont'd on sup. rel. w/ term extended for 2 years. Monthly restitution payments increased to $100.00. (clerk) Modified on 06/24/1998
                            LREF
                            Blank 33 Filed: 6/17/1998, Entered: 6/18/1998 Response in Support
                            MEMORANDUM by USA as to Nikita S. Bradley in support of revocation of supervised release (clerk)
                              LREF
                              Blank 32 Filed: 6/3/1998, Entered: 6/4/1998 Summons Returned Unexecuted
                              MARSHALS return on summons returned executed 06/01/98 as to Nikita S. Bradley (clerk)
                                LREF
                                Blank 31 Filed: 5/19/1998, Entered: 5/19/1998 Miscellaneous DocumentCourt Filing
                                PETITION AND ORDER on Probation Action & ordering that the deft. be summoned to court for violation of supervised release - entered & filed (signed by Judge T. S. Ellis III ) (clerk)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 5/19/1998, Entered: 5/20/1998 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                  Probation Violation Hearing set for 1:30 6/22/98 for Nikita S. Bradley (clerk)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 5/19/1998, Entered: 5/19/1998 Summons Issued
                                    SUMMONS(ES) returnable for 06/22/98 at 1:30 p.m. before TSE issued & given to USMS for service for Nikita S. Bradley (clerk)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 30 Filed: 7/21/1997, Entered: 7/24/1997 Miscellaneous DocumentCourt Filing
                                      Memorandum filed by US Probation Office - Clarification of Sentence as to Nikita S. Bradley Judge Ellis (avax)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 29 Filed: 6/20/1997, Entered: 6/23/1997 Summons Issued
                                        Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Nikita S. Bradley (clerk)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 28 Filed: 6/19/1997, Entered: 6/19/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER the the Court finds that deft. violated the conditions of her sup. rel. and deft's sup. rel. is revoked and deft. is remanded to the custody of the BOP for a period of 15 days, to be served in a community confinement or work release facility. Deft. may voluntarily surrender. Further, the Court imposes two (2) years of additional sup. rel. on Count II and reimposes deft's restitution obligation. At the end of deft's sup. rel., if she has not yet fulfilled her restitution obligation, the Probation Office may determine whether to continue that specific condition, ent - filed ( Signed by Judge T. S. Ellis III ) Copies Mailed: yes (clerk)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 6/19/1997, Entered: 6/19/1997 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                            Supervised Release Violation Hearing as to Nikita S. Bradley held before Judge T. S. Ellis III ( Reporter: Rodriquez) USA appeared through: Haling. Deft. appeared w/ counsel Hutcheson. Deft. admitted violations. Court found deft in violation of conds. of sup. rel. Term of sup. rel. revoked. Deft. is to serve 15 days in comm. confin. w/ work release; Deft. is also to serve 2 add'l years of sup. rel. as to Count II. Restitution is re-imposed on original terms of judgment. Deft. allowed vol. surrender. (clerk)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 27 Filed: 6/17/1997, Entered: 6/17/1997 Miscellaneous Document
                                              MEMORANDUM in support of Revocation of Deft.'s Supervised Release filed by USA (clerk)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 6/4/1997, Entered: 6/17/1997 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                Probation Violation Hearing before TSE set for 9:30a.m. on 6/19/97 for Nikita S. Bradley (clerk)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 6/4/1997, Entered: 6/4/1997 Summons Issued
                                                  SUMMONS(ES) returnable 06/19/97 before TSE at 9:30 issued & given to USMS for service for Nikita S. Bradley (clerk)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 26 Filed: 6/2/1997, Entered: 6/4/1997 Miscellaneous DocumentCourt Filing
                                                    PETITION AND ORDER on Probation Action & ordering that the deft. Nikita S. Bradley be summoned to court for violations of supervised release - entered & filed ( signed by Judge T. S. Ellis III ) (clerk)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 25 Filed: 12/8/1995, Entered: 1/3/1996 Judgment Returned Executed
                                                      Judgment Returned Executed as to Nikita S. Bradley ; on 9-6-95 (clerk)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 24 Filed: 12/8/1995, Entered: 12/14/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER as to Nikita S. Bradley granting [22-1] motion by Nikita S. Bradley. The Probation officer, together with the B.O.P. is directed to make appropriate arrangments for deft. to serve her term of community confinement at the center in Prince William Co. or in Washington, D.C., whichever is more appropriate. She is to begin her sentence of community confinement as soon as practicable after 1-1-96, (1) ( Signed by Judge T. S. Ellis III ) Copies Mailed: y (clerk)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 12/8/1995, Entered: 12/14/1995 Motion Hearing
                                                          Motion hearing held as to Nikita S. Bradley re: [22-1] motion by Nikita S. Bradley for modification of sentence before Judge T. S. Ellis III Reporter: Rodriquez) USA appeared through: T. Cullly Dft(s) appeared with: C. Convisser. Motion argued and denied. Deft. shall be required to serve 4 mos comm. confinement. Deft. shall not be required to report to Comm. confinement facility until after 1/1/96. (clerk)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 23 Filed: 11/28/1995, Entered: 12/5/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER as to Nikita S. Bradley scheduling a hearing on deft's motion for modification of sentence for 12/8/95 @ 1:30pm; further directing the govt. to ensure that the director of the BOP or her designate appear on that date ( Signed by Judge T. S. Ellis III ) Copies Mailed: y (including the BOP/Wallace Cheney, 320 1st St, NW, Wash, DC; AUSA, PO, USM and deft. counsel). (clerk)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 22 Filed: 11/28/1995, Entered: 12/5/1995, Terminated: 12/8/1995 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                              LETTER treated as a motion for modification of sentence by Nikita S. Bradley (clerk)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 20 Filed: 4/28/1995, Entered: 5/15/1995 Sentencing Memorandum
                                                                SENTENCING MEMORANDUM - filed (TSE) Copies sent. (clerk)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 19 Filed: 4/28/1995, Entered: 5/2/1995 Judgment*Court Filing
                                                                  JUDGMENT in a criminal case as to Nikita S. Bradley (1) ( Signed by Judge T. S. Ellis III ) Copies to AUSA, PO, PTS, AUSA and counsel. (clerk)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 4/28/1995, Entered: 4/28/1995 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                    Sentencing held before Judge T. S. Ellis III ( Ikenberry.) USA appeared through: Nassikas/Corcoran. Dft(s) appeared w/counsel (Convisser). Nikita S. Bradley (1) US objection to failure to increase offense level total - argued and over ruled. Deft's objections to PSIR - denied as moot. Deft. committed to the custody of the BOP for 2 mons. as to ct. 1 and 2 mons. as to ct. 2, concurrent; 2 yrs. supervised release w/special condition deft. serve 4 mons. communtiy confinement; $50 s/a ea. ct. ($100); $21,382.35 restitution as noted in PSIR. Deft. permitted vol. surrender as notified after the end of the school year. (clerk)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 21 Filed: 4/27/1995, Entered: 6/27/1995 Response in Support
                                                                      RESPONSE by USA as to Nikita S. Bradley in support of [17-1] position sentencing (clerk)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 18 Filed: 4/25/1995, Entered: 4/26/1995 Position on Sentencing
                                                                        POSITION with Respect to Sentencing Factors by Nikita S. Bradley (clerk)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 17 Filed: 3/24/1995, Entered: 3/27/1995 Position on Sentencing
                                                                          POSITION with Respect to Sentencing Factors by USA as to Nikita S. Bradley (clerk)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 16 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/5/1995 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER Modifying Conditions of Release as to Nikita S. Bradley to include PR in the amt. of $25,000 & all other conditions remain as in previous order. ( Signed by Judge T. S. Ellis III ) (jsol)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 15 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/3/1995 Description not available
                                                                              STATEMENT OF FACTS as to Nikita S. Bradley - filed in open court (jsol)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 14 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/3/1995 Plea Agreement
                                                                                PLEA AGREEMENT as to Nikita S. Bradley - filed in open court. (jsol)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 13 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/3/1995 Waiver of Indictment
                                                                                  WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Nikita S. Bradley - filed in open court (jsol)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 12 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/3/1995 Information - Felony
                                                                                    INFORMATION as to Nikita S. Bradley (1) count(s) 1, 2 - filed in open court (jsol)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/5/1995 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                      Sentencing set for 9:00 3/31/95 for Nikita S. Bradley Nikita S. Bradley (1) count(s) 1, 2 (jsol)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/3/1995 Plea - Miscellaneous
                                                                                        PLEA entered by Nikita S. Bradley . Court accepts plea. by Nikita S. Bradley Guilty: Nikita S. Bradley (1) count(s) 1, 2 (jsol)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/3/1995 Plea Agreement
                                                                                          Plea Agreement Hearing as to Nikita S. Bradley held before Judge T. S. Ellis III ( Wilson) USA appeared through: John Nassikas/Larry Corcoran. Dft(s) appeared w/counsel, Claude Convisser. Deft FA & plea of guilty ent. & accepted to 2 Count Cr. Info. filed. Release order amended to include PR in amt of $25,000. New Release Order ent & filed in open court. Case referred to PO for psi & report & cont to 3/31/95 @ 9 Am for g/l sentencing. Deft released on bond as amended & filed. (jsol)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 11 Filed: 12/21/1994, Entered: 12/21/1994 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER granting [10-1] motion to Extend Time to Indict from 12/23/94 to 01/06/95 as to S. Bradley (1) - entered & filed ( Signed by Judge James C. Cacheris ) Mailed: Yes [ 1:94-m -1037 ] (clerk)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 10 Filed: 12/21/1994, Entered: 12/21/1994, Terminated: 12/21/1994 Motion for Extension of Time to Indict
                                                                                              JOINT MOTION to Extend Time to Indict from 12/23/94 to 01/06/95 [ 1:94-m -1037 ] (clerk)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 9 Filed: 12/6/1994, Entered: 12/7/1994 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                ORDER as to Nikita S. Bradley granting [8-1] joint motion to Extend Time to Indict as to Nikita S. Bradley (1), extended from 12-9-94 to 12-23-94 ( Signed by Judge James C. Cacheris ) Copies Mailed: yes [ 1:94-m -1037 ] (clerk)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 12/6/1994, Entered: 12/7/1994, Terminated: 12/6/1994 Motion for Extension of Time to Indict
                                                                                                  JOINT MOTION to Extend Time to Indict - filed [ 1:94-m -1037 ] (clerk)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 11/23/1994, Entered: 11/28/1994 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Extend Time to Indict from 11/25/94 to 12/09/94 as to S. Bradley - entered & filed ( Signed by Judge James C. Cacheris ) Mailed: Yes [ 1:94-m -1037 ] (clerk)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 11/22/1994, Entered: 11/28/1994, Terminated: 11/23/1994 Motion for Extension of Time to Indict
                                                                                                      JOINT MOTION to Extend Time to Indict from 11/25/94 to 12/09/94 [ 1:94-m -1037 ] (clerk)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 11/18/1994, Entered: 12/7/1994 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER as to Nikita S. Bradley granting [6-1] motion by Nikita S. Bradley to Amend [3-1] order to allow deft. to travel to Birmingham , VA for regular weekend visits w/her children's father as to Nikita S. Bradley (1) wout prior approval of Court ( Signed by Magistrate Judge W. C. Sewell ) Copies Mailed: yes [ 1:94-m -1037 ] (clerk)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 11/18/1994, Entered: 12/7/1994, Terminated: 11/18/1994 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                          MOTION by Nikita S. Bradley to Amend [3-1] order to allow deft. to travel to Birmingham , VA for regular weekend visits w/her children's father [ 1:94-m -1037 ] (clerk)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 11/8/1994, Entered: 11/9/1994 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                            File sent to 200 S. Washington St, Alex., Va. [ 1:94-m -1037 ] (clerk)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 11/8/1994, Entered: 11/9/1994 Preliminary Examination
                                                                                                              Preliminary Examination as to Nikita S. Bradley held before Magistrate Judge W. C. Sewell ( Tape 1026) USA appeared through: Larry Corcoran Dft(s) appeared through: Claude Convisser. Probable Cause found; deft held for action of Grand Jury. Deft cont'd on bond. [ 1:94-m -1037 ] (clerk)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 10/28/1994, Entered: 10/28/1994 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Nikita S. Bradley (Signed by Magistrate Judge W. C. Sewell - ent., filed) [ 1:94-m -1037 ] (clerk)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 10/28/1994, Entered: 10/28/1994 Bond
                                                                                                                  Deft brought to Clerk's Office and admitted to PR bond. CONDITIONS of Release executed - copies sent. Deft released. [ 1:94-m -1037 ] (clerk)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 10/28/1994, Entered: 10/28/1994 Initial Appearance
                                                                                                                    Initial appearance as to Nikita S. Bradley held: Preliminary Examination set for 3:00 11/8/94 for Nikita S. Bradley; Detention Hearing set for 3:00 11/8/94 for Nikita S. Bradley before Magistrate Judge W. C. Sewell ( Tape 998) USA appeared through: John Nassikas (Defendant informed of rights, charges and penalties.) PR Bond set w/standard conditions and restriction on travel to Wash. D.C. area without prior approval of the court. Deft remanded until conditions met. [ 1:94-m -1037 ] (clerk)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 10/28/1994, Entered: 10/28/1994 CJA 20 Appointment
                                                                                                                      CJA 20 as to Nikita S. Bradley : Appointment of Attorney Claude David Convisser Voucher # 0677017 ( Signed by Magistrate Judge W. C. Sewell ) [ 1:94-m -1037 ] (djoh)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 10/26/1994, Entered: 10/28/1994 Affidavit
                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT in support of Criminal Complaint - filed. [ 1:94-m -1037 ] (djoh)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 10/26/1994, Entered: 10/28/1994 Complaint
                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT as to Nikita S. Bradley [ 1:94-m -1037 ] (djoh)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 10/26/1994, Entered: 10/28/1994 Arrest
                                                                                                                            ARREST of Nikita S. Bradley on Complaint [ 1:94-m -1037 ] (clerk)
                                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 81 times.

                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?