Caron v. Pillor, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:95-cv-00001

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Margaret Caron, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John P. Burns, Jr. +1 703 476 3895 jackburns321@hotmail.com
v.
No Logo Anthony B. Roberts, Defendant
No Logo Jane Doe, Defendant
No Logo John Doe, Defendant
No Logo Mark H. Pillor, Defendant
No Logo Peggy J. Pillor, Defendant
No Logo Potomac Financial Corp., Defendant
No Logo Roe Bank and Trust, Defendant
Office Alexandria
Filed 1/3/1995
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $1500000
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Fairfax
Terminated 11/21/1995
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 8 Filed: 11/21/1995, Entered: 11/27/1995 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER upon consideration of the Magistrate's Report and Recommendation of 11/3/95, it is ordered that the court adopts as its own and accepts the report and reccomendation and this action is dismissed without prejudice-ent.& filed ( signed by Judge Albert V. Bryan Jr. ) Copies Mailed: y (clerk)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 11/21/1995, Entered: 11/27/1995 Terminated Case
    Case closed (clerk)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 11/21/1995, Entered: 11/27/1995 Case Assigned/Reassigned
      CASE assigned to Judge Albert V. Bryan Jr. (clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 7 Filed: 11/3/1995, Entered: 11/7/1995 Miscellaneous DocumentCourt Filing
        REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Magistrate Judge W. C. Sewell Re: Determination as to the Validity of the Service on the deft. Anthony B. Roberts and for the taking of Ex parte proof; Motion no longer referred Objections to R and R due by 11/17/95 (Case file sent to JCC) Copies Mailed: yes (ltun) Modified on 11/07/1995
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 11/3/1995, Entered: 11/3/1995 Minutes-Miscellaneous
          Minute entry: (WCS). Reporter: Rudiger & Green. Appearance: none. Matter came on for ex parte proof of damages for entry of judgment: Report and Recommendation to be filed. (lbac)
            LREF
            Blank 6 Filed: 10/5/1995, Entered: 10/6/1995 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER, no cause being shown as to why this action should not be dismissed as to all defts. except Anthony B. Roberts, and after considering counsel's letter of 8/14/95 is is hereby ORDERED that this action is dismissed without prejudice as to all defts. except Anthony B. Roberts, pursuant to F. R. Civ. P. 4(m). , The action will be referred to a magistrate judge for a determination as to the validity of the service on the deft., Anthony B. Roberts, and for the taking of ex parte proof set Hearing Deadline for 10:00 11/3/95 - ent. & filed ( signed by Judge Albert V. Bryan Jr. ) Copies Mailed: yes (ltun)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 8/15/1995, Entered: 8/15/1995 Docket Annotation
              Note: Alias summons issued at the request the counsel for pltf because he felt prior service may have been improper. Pltf's counsel contacted Clerk's Office per Judge Bryan's order of 8/3/95; during the conversation it was suggested that counsel respond to the 8/3/95 order. Attempted to reach counsel re: outstanding alias summons and was unable to do so. Question as to proper service. Default Status. (ltun)
                LREF
                Blank 5 Filed: 8/3/1995, Entered: 8/4/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDERED, that the pltfs. Show Cause, if any they can, why the action should not be dismissed pursuant to F. R. Civ. P. 4(m) - ent. & filed. ( signed by Judge Albert V. Bryan Jr. ) Copies Mailed: yes (ltun)
                  LREF
                  Blank 4 Filed: 5/2/1995, Entered: 8/9/1995 Summons Returned Executed
                  SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Peggy J. Pillor 5/1/95 Answer due on 5/22/95 for Peggy J. Pillor (ltun)
                    LREF
                    Blank 3 Filed: 5/2/1995, Entered: 8/9/1995 Summons Returned Executed
                    SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Anthony B. Roberts 5/1/95 Answer due on 5/22/95 for Anthony B. Roberts (ltun)
                      LREF
                      Blank 2 Filed: 5/2/1995, Entered: 8/9/1995 Summons Returned Executed
                      SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Potomac Financial 5/1/95 Answer due on 5/22/95 for Potomac Financial (ltun)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 5/2/1995, Entered: 5/3/1995 Summons Reissued
                        ALIAS SUMMONS (4) issued and given to atty. for service by the Sec. of the Comm. for Peggy J. Pillor, Mark H. Pillor, Anthony B. Roberts, Potomac Financial (ltun) Modified on 08/15/1995
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 4/28/1995, Entered: 4/28/1995 Summons Issued
                          SUMMONS(ES) (orig. & 4) issued and given to atty. for service by SPS Bellovic for Peggy J. Pillor, Mark H. Pillor, Anthony B. Roberts, Potomac Financial (ltun)
                            LREF
                            Blank 1 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/4/1995 Complaint
                            COMPLAINT Filing Fee $ 120.00 Receipt # 103256; jury demand (ltun)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/4/1995 Notice
                              NOTICE of Lawsuit and Waiver of Service Forms given to atty. for pltf. for service by mail as to the defts. (ltun)
                                LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 96 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?