USA, et al v. Byland
Federal Civil Lawsuit Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:95-cv-00002

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo United States of America for the benefit of Douglas Anderson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark Anthony Exley +1 757 441 6331 mark.exley@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Timothy J. Byland, Defendant
Office Alexandria
Filed 1/3/1995
Jury Demand None
Demand $106000
Nature of Suit 690 - Forfeiture/Penalty: Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1345 Recovery of Debt to US
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Plaintiff
Disposition Judgment - Judgment on Default
County Out of State
Terminated 6/20/1995
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 7 Filed: 6/20/1995, Entered: 6/20/1995 Set Deadlines
CLERK'S ENTRY of DEFAULT & JUDGMENT against Timothy J. Byland in the amount of $105,802.50. Copies Mailed: y (clerk) Modified on 07/11/1995
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 6/20/1995, Entered: 6/20/1995 Terminated Case
    Case closed (clerk) Modified on 07/11/1995
      LREF
      Blank 6 Filed: 6/19/1995, Entered: 6/20/1995 Docket Annotation
      Declaration of Mark Exley in Support of Motion for Default and Judgment (clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 5 Filed: 6/19/1995, Entered: 6/20/1995 Request for Entry of Default
        MOTION by United States of Am for Entry of Default and Judgment as to Timothy J. Byland (clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 4 Filed: 6/19/1995, Entered: 6/19/1995, Terminated: 6/20/1995 Response
          RESPONSE by United States of America to [3-1] 6/1/95 order (clerk)
            LREF
            Blank 3 Filed: 6/1/1995, Entered: 6/2/1995 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER no service having been effected within 120 days of the filing of this complaint, it is ordered that pltfs within 20 days show cause why this action should not be dismissed pursuant to Rule 4(m)-ent.& filed ( signed by Judge James C. Cacheris ) Copies Mailed: y (clerk) Modified on 06/15/1995
              LREF
              Blank 2 Filed: 2/21/1995, Entered: 6/15/1995 Waiver of Service Executed
              WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Timothy J. Byland 1/9/95 Answer due on 3/10/95 for Timothy J. Byland (ltun)
                LREF
                Blank 1 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/5/1995 Complaint
                COMPLAINT (psid)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/5/1995 Docket Annotation
                  NOTICE of Lawsuit and Waiver of Service Form given to attorney for service as to defendant (psid)
                    LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 63 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?