Parker v. Pied. Reg. Jail Medi, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:95-cv-00004-LMB

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Kenneth Allen Parker, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Nurse Wright, Defendant
No Logo Piedmont Regional Jail Medical Department, Defendant
Office Alexandria
Filed 1/3/1995
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Prince Edward
Terminated 3/17/1995
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 4 Filed: 3/17/1995, Entered: 3/17/1995 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER By Order dated 2/2/95 the Court conditionally dismissed this action for failure to state a claim upon which releif can be granted and directed plaintiff to show cause why this conditional dismissal should not become final. Plaintiff failed to respond. This action dismissed with prejudice for the reasons stated in the Court's Order dated 2/2/95. Entered and Filed ( signed by Judge Leonie M. Brinkema ) Copies Mailed: yes (clerk)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 3/17/1995, Entered: 3/17/1995 Terminated Case
    Case closed (clerk)
      LREF
      Blank 3 Filed: 2/2/1995, Entered: 2/6/1995 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER: action is conditionally dismissed; pltf w/in 20 days of date of this order show cause why conditional dismissal should not become final -- ent-filed ( signed by Judge Leonie M. Brinkema ) Copies Mailed: y (lbac)
        LREF
        Blank 2 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/4/1995 Complaint
        COMPLAINT filed in forma pauperis (psid)
          LREF
          Blank 1 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/4/1995 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER Let this action be provisionally filed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff is granted 20 days from the date of this Order to particularize and amend his complaint. Plaintiff is to submit a short, particularized statement of background facts and conduct that allegedly violated his constitutional rights. Failure to comply with this Order may result in the dismissal of his complaint( signed by Judge Leonie M. Brinkema ) Copies Mailed: y (psid)
            LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 43 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?