Modderno v. Blue Cr. & Blue Shie, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:95-cv-00006-LMB

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Marsha Francine Modderno, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Venable LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William David Dolan, III +1 703 760 1684 +1 703 821 8949 wddolan@venable.com
v.
No Logo Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mary Atchley Jester +1 757 336 6418
No Logo Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mary Atchley Jester +1 757 336 6418
Office Alexandria
Filed 1/3/1995
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 110 - Contract - Insurance
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Prince William
Terminated 6/21/1995
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (31) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 24 Filed: 6/21/1995, Entered: 6/22/1995 OrderCourt Filing
CONSENT ORDER It appearing to the Court that this matter has been settled it is therefore adjudged, ordered and decreed that any and all claims in this action are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Entered and Filed ( signed by Judge Leonie M. Brinkema ) Copies Mailed: yes (clerk)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 6/21/1995, Entered: 6/22/1995 Docket Annotation
    All pleadings accounted for (clerk)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 6/21/1995, Entered: 6/22/1995 Terminated Case
      Case closed (clerk)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 6/21/1995, Entered: 6/22/1995 Case Assigned/Reassigned
        CASE a to Judge Leonie M. Brinkema (clerk)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 6/13/1995, Entered: 6/13/1995 Docket Annotation
          Settled per plaintiff's counsel (clerk)
            LREF
            Blank 23 Filed: 5/25/1995, Entered: 5/26/1995 Objection
            OBJECTIONS by defendant Blue Cross and Blue, defendant Blue Cross and Blue to Plaintiff's Discovery Requests (clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 22 Filed: 5/5/1995, Entered: 5/8/1995 Answer to Amended Complaint
              ANSWER by Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts (Attorney Mary Atchley Jester) to amended complaint (clerk)
                LREF
                Blank 21 Filed: 4/24/1995, Entered: 4/25/1995 Amended Complaint
                AMENDED COMPLAINT by Marsha Francine Modderno amending [1-1] complaintagainst Blue Cross and Blue Shield ; jury demand (clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 4/24/1995, Entered: 4/25/1995 Docket Annotation
                  Notice of Lawsuit and Waiver of Service Form given to atty. for service as to dft for Amended Complaint (clerk) Modified on 04/25/1995
                    LREF
                    Blank 20 Filed: 4/11/1995, Entered: 4/11/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                    CONSENT ORDER that counsels' request for enlargement of time is granted and pltf Marsha Francine Modderno shall have until 4/28/95, to file an Amended Complaint ( signed by Judge James C. Cacheris ) Copies Mailed: y (clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank 19 Filed: 4/3/1995, Entered: 4/4/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER for reasons stated in open court, that Dft's motion for the appointment of a guardian ad litem is withdrawn; Pltf is granted seven days from the date of this Order within which to file her amended complaint, and the dft shall have ten days from that date to file its responsive pleadings, that William L. Dolan, Esquire, be appointed to represent the pltf in this matter. ( signed by Judge James C. Cacheris ) Copies Mailed: y (clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank 18 Filed: 4/3/1995, Entered: 4/3/1995 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                        SCHEDULING ORDER setting Discovery cutoff 6/9/95 ; Pretrial Conference for 11:35 6/15/95 ; ( signed by Judge James C. Cacheris ) Copies Mailed: y (clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 3/31/1995, Entered: 3/31/1995 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                          Minute entry: (JCC) r: Farmer. Appearances: Counsel. On for hearing on motions - Pltf's motion to amend - granted & Amended Complaint is to be filed w/i 1 week; Defts are to answer w/i 10 days thereafter. Deft's motion for appointment of guardian ad litem - argued & then w/d. Court to appoint pro bono atty. (jsol)
                            LREF
                            Blank 17 Filed: 3/29/1995, Entered: 3/29/1995, Terminated: 6/21/1995 Response to Motion
                            RESPONSE by Blue Cr. & Blue Shie to [11-1] motion by Marsha Francine Modderno to Amend complaint by Marsha Francine Modderno (clerk)
                              LREF
                              Blank 16 Filed: 3/28/1995, Entered: 3/28/1995 Memorandum in Opposition
                              MEMORANDUM by Blue Cr. & Blue Shie in opposition to [8-1] motion by Marsha Francine Modderno to Strike deft.'s motion for appointment of guardian ad litem or, in the alternative, motion for a continuance of hearing and to extend time to respond by Marsha Francine Modderno (clerk)
                                LREF
                                Blank 15 Filed: 3/28/1995, Entered: 3/28/1995 Memorandum in Opposition
                                MEMORANDUM by Marsha Francine Modderno in opposition to [4-1] motion by Blue Cr. & Blue Shield for appointment of guardian AD LITEM for pltf. by Blue Cr. & Blue Shie (clerk)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 14 Filed: 3/27/1995, Entered: 3/27/1995, Terminated: 6/21/1995 Response to Motion
                                  RESPONSE by Marsha Francine Modderno to deft.'s answer to complaint (clerk)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 13 Filed: 3/27/1995, Entered: 3/27/1995 Docket Annotation
                                    Notice of withdrawal of pltf.'s motion for sanctions against deft's attorneys (clerk)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 12 Filed: 3/27/1995, Entered: 3/27/1995 Notice of Hearing.
                                      NOTICE of Hearing: Motion Hearing set for 10:00 3/31/95 for [11-1] motion by Marsha Francine Modderno to Amend complaint, set for 10:00 3/31/95 for [10-1] motion by Marsha Francine Modderno for Leave to File motion to amended complaint (clerk)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 11 Filed: 3/27/1995, Entered: 3/27/1995, Terminated: 6/21/1995 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                        MOTION by Marsha Francine Modderno to Amend complaint (clerk)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 10 Filed: 3/27/1995, Entered: 3/27/1995, Terminated: 6/21/1995 Motion for Leave to File
                                          MOTION by Marsha Francine Modderno for Leave to File motion to amended complaint (clerk)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 9 Filed: 3/24/1995, Entered: 3/24/1995, Terminated: 6/21/1995 Answer
                                            AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Blue Cr. & Blue Shie : amends [3-1] answer (clerk)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 8 Filed: 3/22/1995, Entered: 3/22/1995, Terminated: 6/21/1995 Motion to Strike
                                              MOTION by Marsha Francine Modderno to Strike deft.'s motion for appointment of guardian ad litem or, in the alternative, motion for a continuance of hearing and to extend time to respond (clerk)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 7 Filed: 3/22/1995, Entered: 3/22/1995, Terminated: 6/21/1995 Motion for Sanctions
                                                MOTION by Marsha Francine Modderno for Sanctions (clerk)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 3/13/1995, Entered: 3/14/1995 Notice of Hearing.
                                                  NOTICE of Hearing: Motion Hearing set for 10:00 3/24/95 for [4-1] motion by Blue Cr. & Blue Shield for appointment of guardian AD LITEM for pltf. (clerk)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 3/13/1995, Entered: 3/14/1995 Memorandum in Support
                                                    MEMORANDUM in support of [4-1] motion by Blue Cr. & Blue Shield for appointment of guardian AD LITEM for pltf. (clerk)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 3/13/1995, Entered: 3/14/1995 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                      MOTION by Blue Cr. & Blue Shield for appointment of guardian AD LITEM for pltf. (clerk)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 3/6/1995, Entered: 3/7/1995 Answer
                                                        ANSWER to Complaint by Blue Cr. & Blue Shie (Attorney Mary Atchley Jester), (clerk)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 2/21/1995, Entered: 3/3/1995 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                          WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Blue Cr. & Blue Shie 1/3/95 Answer due on 3/4/95 (clerk)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/4/1995 Complaint
                                                            COMPLAINT Filing Fee $ 120.00 Receipt # 103268; jury demand (psid)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank -- Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/4/1995 Docket Annotation
                                                              NOTICE of Lawsuit and Waiver of Service Form given to plaintiff for service as to defendant (psid) Modified on 01/05/1995
                                                                LREF

                                                                Statistics

                                                                This case has been viewed 107 times.

                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                Space
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                 
                                                                PlainSite
                                                                Sign Up
                                                                Need Password Help?