Hariston v. Lawson, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:95-cv-00009-LMB

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Stacey D'Wayne Hariston, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo D. L. Baylor, Defendant
No Logo D. R. Lawson, Defendant
No Logo Lt. H. Akera, Defendant
No Logo R. Coker, Defendant
No Logo T. E. Clark, Defendant
Office Alexandria
Filed 1/3/1995
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Sussex
Terminated 5/15/1995
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 6 Filed: 5/15/1995, Entered: 5/16/1995 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER that because pltf. failed to respond to the court orders of 2/21/95 and 4/3/95, this action is dismissed without prejudice to pltf's right to resubmit the case. Pltf. is cautioned that the statute of limitations continues to run. Should the pltf. wish to appeal, written notice must be filed within thirty days of the date of this order, ent - filed ( signed by Judge Leonie M. Brinkema ) Copies Mailed: yes (clerk)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 5/15/1995, Entered: 5/16/1995 Terminated Case
    Case closed (clerk)
      LREF
      Blank 5 Filed: 4/3/1995, Entered: 4/3/1995 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER that pltf's motion for enlargement of time is granted and pltf. is directed to comply with the order dated 2/21/95 within thirty days of the date of this order, ent - filed ( signed by Judge Leonie M. Brinkema ) Copies Mailed: yes (clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 4 Filed: 2/21/1995, Entered: 2/21/1995 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER that pltf. pay a partial filing fee of $10.50. Failure to pay the fee or to file explanation excusing payment within thirty days of the date of this order will result in dismissal of this case, ent - filed ( signed by Judge Leonie M. Brinkema ) Copies Mailed: yes (clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 3 Filed: 1/23/1995, Entered: 1/24/1995 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement
          Inmate account report form filed. (psid)
            LREF
            Blank 2 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/11/1995 Complaint
            COMPLAINT conditionally filed (psid) Modified on 01/20/1995
              LREF
              Blank 1 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/11/1995 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER The complaint is conditionally filed pending payment of any assessed filing fee. The court will inquire into plaintiff's financial resourses by requesting the Greensville Correctiuonal Center to supply the Court with an Inmate Account Report Form on the plaintiff. (See Order for more details.( signed by Judge Leonie M. Brinkema ) Copies Mailed: yes (psid)
                LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 46 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?