Comprehensive Addict, et al v. Healthcare America, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:95-cv-00011

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo BGI of Brandywine, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tamara Lee Preiss +1 202 736 8000
No Logo BGI of St. Tammany, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tamara Lee Preiss +1 202 736 8000
No Logo Comprehensive Addiction Programs Inc, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tamara Lee Preiss +1 202 736 8000
No Logo Galax Treatment Center, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tamara Lee Preiss +1 202 736 8000
No Logo Wilmington Treatment Center, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tamara Lee Preiss +1 202 736 8000
No Logo Brandywine Behavioral Health Systems, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space W. Wade Porter

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen Michael Colangelo +1 202 887 1500 +1 202 887 0763 scolangelo@mofo.com
No Logo Healthcare America, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space W. Wade Porter

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen Michael Colangelo +1 202 887 1500 +1 202 887 0763 scolangelo@mofo.com
No Logo Healthvest, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space W. Wade Porter

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen Michael Colangelo +1 202 887 1500 +1 202 887 0763 scolangelo@mofo.com
v.
No Logo Brandywine Behavioral Health Systems, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space W. Wade Porter

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen Michael Colangelo +1 202 887 1500 +1 202 887 0763 scolangelo@mofo.com
No Logo Healthcare America, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space W. Wade Porter

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen Michael Colangelo +1 202 887 1500 +1 202 887 0763 scolangelo@mofo.com
No Logo Healthvest, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space W. Wade Porter

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen Michael Colangelo +1 202 887 1500 +1 202 887 0763 scolangelo@mofo.com
No Logo Kevin P. Sheehan, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Bernard Krakow +1 214 698 3124 +1 214 698 3400 rkrakow@gibsondunn.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Isler Dare Ray Radcliffe and Connolly PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michelle Bodley Radcliffe +1 703 748 2690 +1 703 748 2695 mradcliffe@rayandisler.com
No Logo Comprehensive Addiction Programs Inc, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tamara Lee Preiss +1 202 736 8000
No Logo BGI of Brandywine, Inc., Third Party Defendant
No Logo BGI of St. Tammany, Inc., Third Party Defendant
No Logo Galax Treatment Center, Inc., Third Party Defendant
No Logo Wilmington Treatment Center, Inc., Third Party Defendant
No Logo Brandywine Behavioral Health Systems, Inc., Third Party Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space W. Wade Porter

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen Michael Colangelo +1 202 887 1500 +1 202 887 0763 scolangelo@mofo.com
No Logo Healthcare America, Inc., Third Party Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space W. Wade Porter

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen Michael Colangelo +1 202 887 1500 +1 202 887 0763 scolangelo@mofo.com
No Logo Healthvest, Inc., Third Party Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space W. Wade Porter

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen Michael Colangelo +1 202 887 1500 +1 202 887 0763 scolangelo@mofo.com
Office Alexandria
Filed 1/3/1995
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County Fairfax
Terminated 5/9/1995
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (60) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 53 Filed: 5/9/1995, Entered: 5/10/1995 Stipulation
STIPULATION of dismissal as to all parties pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) with out prejudice. Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (clerk)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 5/9/1995, Entered: 5/10/1995 Terminated Case
    Case closed (clerk)
      LREF
      Blank 52 Filed: 5/4/1995, Entered: 5/8/1995 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER granting [51-1] motion by Wilmington Treatment, Galax Treatment Ctr, BGI of St. Tammany, BGI of Brandywine, Comprehensive Addict to place documents under Seal. The Clerk shall place under seal page 4 of the memorandum in support of deft. Kevin P. Sheehan's motion to compel; No person shall be given access to page 4 of the memorandum in support of Deft. Sheehan's motion to compel except upon order of the Court.- ent. & filed. ( signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas R. Jones Jr. ) Copies Mailed: yes (ltun)
        LREF
        Blank 51 Filed: 5/2/1995, Entered: 5/3/1995, Terminated: 5/4/1995 Motion to Seal
        CONSENT MOTION by Wilmington Treatment, Galax Treatment Ctr, BGI of St. Tammany, BGI of Brandywine, Comprehensive Addict to place documents under Seal (ltun)
          LREF
          Blank 50 Filed: 5/1/1995, Entered: 5/2/1995 Notice of Hearing.
          NOTICE of Hearing: Motion Hearing set for 10:00 5/5/95 for [47-1] motion by Kevin P. Sheehan for an order to Compel production of documents by Comprehensive Addiction Programs, Inc. (clerk)
            LREF
            Blank 49 Filed: 5/1/1995, Entered: 5/2/1995 Affidavit
            AFFIDAVIT of Howard C. Landis (original signature) by Comprehensive Addict Re: [42-1] opposition memorandum to deft. Sheehan's motion for summary judgment. (ltun)
              LREF
              Blank 48 Filed: 5/1/1995, Entered: 5/1/1995 Memorandum in Support
              MEMORANDUM by Kevin P. Sheehan in support of [47-1] motion by Kevin P. Sheehan for an order to Compel production of documents by Comprehensive Addiction Programs, Inc. (ltun)
                LREF
                Blank 47 Filed: 5/1/1995, Entered: 5/1/1995, Terminated: 5/9/1995 Motion to Compel
                MOTION by Kevin P. Sheehan for an order to Compel production of documents by Comprehensive Addiction Programs, Inc. (ltun)
                  LREF
                  Blank 46 Filed: 4/28/1995, Entered: 5/1/1995 Affidavit
                  AFFIDAVIT of Kurt H. Jacobs by Comprehensive Addict Re: [42-1] opposition memorandum to summary judgment. (large pleading) (ltun) Modified on 05/01/1995
                    LREF
                    Blank 45 Filed: 4/28/1995, Entered: 5/1/1995 Affidavit
                    AFFIDAVIT of Steven M. Levine by Comprehensive Addict Re: [42-1] opposition memorandum to motion for summary judgment. (ltun)
                      LREF
                      Blank 44 Filed: 4/28/1995, Entered: 5/1/1995 Affidavit
                      AFFIDAVIT of Jerome E. Rhodes by Comprehensive Addict Re: [42-1] opposition memorandum to summary judgment motion. (ltun)
                        LREF
                        Blank 43 Filed: 4/28/1995, Entered: 5/1/1995 Affidavit
                        AFFIDAVIT of Howard C. Landis by Comprehensive Addict Re: [42-1] opposition memorandum to summary judgment motion. (ltun)
                          LREF
                          Blank 42 Filed: 4/28/1995, Entered: 5/1/1995 Memorandum in Opposition
                          MEMORANDUM by Comprehensive Addict in opposition to [34-1] motion by Kevin P. Sheehan for Summary Judgment (bound pleading) (ltun)
                            LREF
                            Blank 41 Filed: 4/25/1995, Entered: 4/26/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER granting [40-1] motion by Kevin P. Sheehan, Brandywine Behavior, Healthvest, Inc., Healthcare America, Comprehensive Addict to Extend Time to respond to deft Kevin Sheehan's motion for summary judgment. The Court orders that the parties adhere to the following schedule: 1. Pltfs. shall file their reply brief to deft. Sheehan's motion for summary judgment on 4/28/95. 2. Pltfs. may supplement their reply brief, and deft. Sheehan may file a response to the reply brief, by 5/10/95 to include any relevant information arising out of the deposition testimony. 3. The hearing on deft. Sheehan's motion for summary judgment, originally scheduled for 4/28/95, is hereby continued to 5/12/95 at 10:00 a.m. - ent. & filed. ( signed by Judge T. S. Ellis III ) Copies Mailed: yes (ltun)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 4/25/1995, Entered: 4/26/1995 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                              Deadline updated; Motion Hearing set for 10:00 5/12/95 for [34-1] motion by Kevin P. Sheehan for Summary Judgment (ltun)
                                LREF
                                Blank 40 Filed: 4/24/1995, Entered: 4/24/1995, Terminated: 4/25/1995 Motion for Extension
                                CONSENT MOTION by Kevin P. Sheehan, Brandywine Behavior, Healthvest, Inc., Healthcare America, Comprehensive Addict to Extend Time to respond to deft Kevin Sheehan's motion for summary judgment (mcke)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 39 Filed: 4/18/1995, Entered: 4/18/1995 Witness List
                                  Expert Witness list by Comprehensive Addict, BGI of Brandywine, BGI of St. Tammany, Galax Treatment Ctr, Wilmington Treatment (clerk)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 38 Filed: 4/14/1995, Entered: 4/14/1995 Notice of Hearing.
                                    NOTICE of Hearing: Motion Hearing set for 10:00 4/28/95 for [34-1] motion by Kevin P. Sheehan for Summary Judgment (ltun)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 37 Filed: 4/14/1995, Entered: 4/14/1995 Affidavit
                                      DECLARATION by Kevin P. Sheehan Re: [34-1] motion by Kevin P. Sheehan for Summary Judgment (ltun)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 36 Filed: 4/14/1995, Entered: 4/14/1995 Docket Annotation
                                        APPENDIX in support of deft. Kevin P. Sheehan's motion for summary judgment. (ltun)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 35 Filed: 4/14/1995, Entered: 4/14/1995 Memorandum in Support
                                          BRIEF by Kevin P. Sheehan in support of [34-1] motion by Kevin P. Sheehan for Summary Judgment (ltun)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 34 Filed: 4/14/1995, Entered: 4/14/1995, Terminated: 5/9/1995 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                            MOTION by Kevin P. Sheehan for Summary Judgment (ltun)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 33 Filed: 4/3/1995, Entered: 4/4/1995 Answer to Counterclaim
                                              ANSWER by Comprehensive Addict to [19-1] counter claim and third-party complaint by Brandywine Behavior, Healthvest, Inc., Healthcare America (psid)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 32 Filed: 3/29/1995, Entered: 3/30/1995 Notice
                                                NOTICE by Comprehensive Addict to take deposition of Kevin P. Sheehan (ltun)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 31 Filed: 3/29/1995, Entered: 3/30/1995 Notice
                                                  NOTICE by Comprehensive Addict to take deposition of HealthCare America, Inc. (ltun)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 30 Filed: 3/29/1995, Entered: 3/30/1995 Notice
                                                    NOTICE by Comprehensive Addict to take deposition of Brandywine Behavioral Health Systems, Inc. (ltun)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 29 Filed: 3/27/1995, Entered: 3/28/1995 Answer
                                                      AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Kevin P. Sheehan : amends [16-1] answer by Kevin P. Sheehan (ltun)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 28 Filed: 3/27/1995, Entered: 3/28/1995 Objection
                                                        OBJECTIONS and RESPONSES by defendant Healthcare America to [14-1] produce requested by Comprehensive Addict (ltun)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 26 Filed: 3/24/1995, Entered: 3/27/1995 Answer
                                                          AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Healthcare America, Healthvest, Inc., Brandywine Behavior : amends [18-1] answer by Brandywine Behavior, Healthvest, Inc., Healthcare America (ltun)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 25 Filed: 3/24/1995, Entered: 3/24/1995 Summons Returned Executed
                                                            THIRD PARTY SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Wilmington Treatment 3/20/95 (Answer due 4/10/95 for Wilmington Treatment ) (ltun)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 24 Filed: 3/24/1995, Entered: 3/24/1995 Summons Returned Executed
                                                              THIRD PARTY SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Galax Treatment Ctr 3/20/95 (Answer due 4/10/95 for Galax Treatment Ctr ) (ltun)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 23 Filed: 3/24/1995, Entered: 3/24/1995 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                THIRD PARTY SUMMONS Returned Executed as to BGI of Brandywine 3/20/95 (Answer due 4/10/95 for BGI of Brandywine ) (ltun)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 22 Filed: 3/24/1995, Entered: 3/24/1995 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                  THIRD PARTY SUMMONS Returned Executed as to BGI of St. Tammany 3/20/95 (Answer due 4/10/95 for BGI of St. Tammany ) (ltun)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 27 Filed: 3/17/1995, Entered: 3/28/1995 Objection
                                                                    OBJECTIONS and RESPONSES by defendant Brandywine Behavior to [12-1] produce requested by Comprehensive Addict (ltun)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 21 Filed: 3/15/1995, Entered: 3/16/1995 Amended Complaint
                                                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT by Comprehensive Addict, BGI of Brandywine, BGI of St. Tammany, Galax Treatment Ctr, Wilmington Treatment amending [1-1] complaint; jury demand (ltun)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 20 Filed: 3/15/1995, Entered: 3/15/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER granting [17-1] motion by Comprehensive Addict for Leave to File First Amended Complaint ( signed by Judge James C. Cacheris ) Copies Mailed: yes (ltun)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 3/14/1995, Entered: 3/14/1995 Summons Issued
                                                                          THIRD PARTY SUMMONS(ES) (orig. & 4) issued and given to SPS MMS for service for Wilmington Treatment, BGI of St. Tammany, BGI of Brandywine, Galax Treatment Ctr (ltun)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 19 Filed: 3/13/1995, Entered: 3/14/1995 Third-Party Complaint
                                                                            THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT by Healthcare America, Healthvest, Inc., Brandywine Behavior against Wilmington Treatment, BGI of St. Tammany, BGI of Brandywine, Galax Treatment Ctr (ltun)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 19 Filed: 3/13/1995, Entered: 3/14/1995 Counterclaim
                                                                              COUNTERCLAIM by defendant Healthcare America, defendant Healthvest, Inc., defendant Brandywine Behavior against plaintiff Comprehensive Addict (ltun)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 18 Filed: 3/13/1995, Entered: 3/14/1995 Answer
                                                                                ANSWER to Complaint by Healthcare America, Healthvest, Inc., Brandywine Behavior (Attorney Stephen M. Colangelo), (ltun)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 17 Filed: 3/10/1995, Entered: 3/13/1995, Terminated: 3/15/1995 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                  CONSENT MOTION by Comprehensive Addict for Leave to File First Amended Complaint (ltun)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 16 Filed: 3/6/1995, Entered: 3/7/1995 Answer
                                                                                    ANSWER to Complaint by Kevin P. Sheehan (Attorney Michelle Louise Bodley) (lbac)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 15 Filed: 3/1/1995, Entered: 3/2/1995 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER setting Discovery cutoff 5/12/95; Pretrial Conference for 12:05 5/18/95; ( signed by Judge James C. Cacheris ) Copies Mailed: y (lbac)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 14 Filed: 2/23/1995, Entered: 2/24/1995 Request for Production of Documents
                                                                                        REQUEST for Production of Documents by Comprehensive Addict to HealthCare America, Inc. (lbac)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 13 Filed: 2/23/1995, Entered: 2/24/1995 Request for Production of Documents
                                                                                          REQUEST for Production of Documents by Comprehensive Addict to HealthVest Inc. (lbac)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 12 Filed: 2/23/1995, Entered: 2/24/1995 Request for Production of Documents
                                                                                            REQUEST for Production of Documents by Comprehensive Addict to Brandywine Behavioral Health Systems, Inc. (lbac)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 11 Filed: 2/23/1995, Entered: 2/24/1995 Request for Production of Documents
                                                                                              REQUEST for Production of Documents by Comprehensive Addict to Kevin P. Sheehan (lbac)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 10 Filed: 2/21/1995, Entered: 2/21/1995 Notice
                                                                                                NOTICE by Comprehensive Addict to take deposition of Donald Evans (lbac)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 2/21/1995, Entered: 2/21/1995 Notice
                                                                                                  NOTICE by Comprehensive Addict to take deposition of Gregory Powers (lbac)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 2/14/1995, Entered: 2/14/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER granting [7-1] motion by Comprehensive Addict to Place the last 3 pages of Exhibit 3 of the Complaint Under Seal. No person shall be given access to the sealed portions of Exhibit 3 except upon order of the Court.( signed by Judge Albert V. Bryan Jr. ) Copies Mailed: yes (ltun)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 2/14/1995, Entered: 2/14/1995 Docket Annotation
                                                                                                      Exhibit 3 (last three pages to the complaint) UNDER SEAL in the vault. (ltun)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 2/13/1995, Entered: 2/13/1995, Terminated: 2/14/1995 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                        MOTION by Comprehensive Addict to Place Documents Under Seal (ltun)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 1/24/1995, Entered: 1/24/1995 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                          WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Healthcare America 1/3/95 Answer due on 3/6/95 for Healthcare America (ltun)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 1/24/1995, Entered: 1/24/1995 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                            WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Kevin P. Sheehan 1/3/95 Answer due on 3/6/95 for Kevin P. Sheehan (ltun)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 1/24/1995, Entered: 1/24/1995 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                              WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Brandywine Behavior 1/3/95 Answer due on 3/6/95 for Brandywine Behavior (ltun)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 1/24/1995, Entered: 1/24/1995 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Healthvest, Inc. 1/3/95 Answer due on 3/6/95 for Healthvest, Inc. (ltun)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 1/20/1995, Entered: 1/20/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER, Appointing Special Process Server Constable Bruce Elfant ( signed by Judge Albert V. Bryan Jr. ) Copies Mailed: yes (mcke)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/20/1995, Entered: 1/20/1995 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                    SUMMONS(ES) (Org. & 4) issued & given to attorney for service by SPS Constable Bruce Elfant as to defts' Healthcare America, Healthvest, Inc., Brandywine Behavior, Kevin P. Sheehan (mcke)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/4/1995 Complaint
                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT Filing Fee $ 120.00 Receipt # 103271; jury demand (ltun)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/4/1995 Notice
                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Lawsuit and Waiver of Service of Summons forms given to pltf's counsel for service by mail as to defts. (ltun)
                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 183 times.

                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?