White v. Housecall Health Car, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:95-cv-00012-TSE

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Timothy W White, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patricia Ann Smith +1 703 548 3774 +1 703 518 5545 pasmithaty@aol.com
v.
No Logo Appalachian Health Care Services, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Benjamin Sorrells Boyd +1 202 861 3900 +1 202 223 2085 benjamin.boyd@dlapiper.com
No Logo Brett Wilder, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Benjamin Sorrells Boyd +1 202 861 3900 +1 202 223 2085 benjamin.boyd@dlapiper.com
No Logo City of Alexandria, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Virginia Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amy Lynn Marschean +1 804 786 2071 amarschean@oag.state.va.us
No Logo Housecall Health Care, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Benjamin Sorrells Boyd +1 202 861 3900 +1 202 223 2085 benjamin.boyd@dlapiper.com
No Logo Housecall Support Services, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Benjamin Sorrells Boyd +1 202 861 3900 +1 202 223 2085 benjamin.boyd@dlapiper.com
No Logo Nurse Call, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Benjamin Sorrells Boyd +1 202 861 3900 +1 202 223 2085 benjamin.boyd@dlapiper.com
Office Alexandria
Filed 1/3/1995
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $95000
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 29 U.S.C. § 791 Job Discrimination (Rehabilitation Act)
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Out of State
Terminated 8/10/1995
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (40) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 28 Filed: 9/1/1995, Entered: 9/5/1995 Motion to Withdraw
MOTION by Timothy W. White to Withdraw [27-1] motion by Timothy W. White for Reconsideration of [26-1] 8/10/95 order (clerk)
    LREF
    Blank 27 Filed: 8/24/1995, Entered: 8/25/1995 Motion for Reconsideration
    MOTION by Timothy W. White for Reconsideration of [26-1] 8/10/95 order (clerk)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 8/15/1995, Entered: 8/15/1995 Docket Annotation
      Exhibit Letter sent to Counsel (clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 26 Filed: 8/10/1995, Entered: 8/15/1995 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER the parties having represented to the Court that this matter has been settled, the case is dismissed "agreed", with prejudice-ent.& filed ( signed by Judge T. S. Ellis III ) Copies Mailed: y (clerk)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 8/10/1995, Entered: 8/15/1995 Terminated Case
          Case closed (clerk)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 8/10/1995, Entered: 8/15/1995 Case Assigned/Reassigned
            CASE assigned to Judge T. S. Ellis III (clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 25 Filed: 7/24/1995, Entered: 7/25/1995 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER directs the parties to notify the Court by 5:00 p.m. on 7/26/95 as to whether the matter has been resolved by settlement and compromise. If not, the Court will promptly decide the motions pending before it without further oral argument-ent.& filed ( signed by Judge T. S. Ellis III ) Copies Mailed: y (clerk)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 7/24/1995, Entered: 7/24/1995 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                Minute entry: Judge Ellis. Reporter: Rodriquez. Appearances: Counsel. Motion by Appalachian Health, Nursecall, Inc., Housecall Support Se, Housecall Health Car for summary judgment on Counts I,II, & III and Pltf's cross motion for summary judgment -argued and ruling taken under advisement pending discussions between parties. Parties to advise the Court by 7-26-95 as to settlement status. (clerk) Modified on 07/25/1995
                  LREF
                  Blank 24 Filed: 7/20/1995, Entered: 7/20/1995 Exhibit
                  Exhibit list by Timothy W. White (clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank 24 Filed: 7/20/1995, Entered: 7/20/1995 Witness List
                    Witness list by Timothy W. White (clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank 23 Filed: 7/20/1995, Entered: 7/20/1995 Exhibit
                      Exhibit list by City of Alexandria (clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank 22 Filed: 7/20/1995, Entered: 7/20/1995 Witness List
                        Witness list by City of Alexandria (clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank 21 Filed: 7/20/1995, Entered: 7/20/1995 Exhibit
                          Exhibit list by Housecall Health Car, Housecall Support Se, Nursecall, Inc., Appalachian Health (clerk)
                            LREF
                            Blank 21 Filed: 7/20/1995, Entered: 7/20/1995 Witness List
                            Witness list by Housecall Health Car, Housecall Support Se, Nursecall, Inc., Appalachian Health (clerk)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 7/20/1995, Entered: 7/20/1995 Pretrial Conference - Final
                              Pre-Trial Conference(AVB) held. Appearances: counsel for pltf and deft City of Alexandria. Case set for trial by Jury on 9/26/95. Pltf's exhibits filed (1 black folder on exhibit row) (Deft City of Alex. exhibits in 1 black binder on exhibit row) (Deft Housecall's exhibits in 3 black binders filed on exhibit row). Objections to be filed within 10 days. (clerk) Modified on 07/21/1995
                                LREF
                                Blank 20 Filed: 7/14/1995, Entered: 7/17/1995 Memorandum in Support
                                MEMORANDUM by Timothy W. White in support of [19-1] motion by Timothy W. White for partial Summary Judgment by Timothy W. White and pltf.'s response to defts' motion for summary judgment (clerk)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 19 Filed: 7/14/1995, Entered: 7/17/1995 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                  CROSS MOTION by Timothy W. White for partial Summary Judgment (clerk)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 18 Filed: 7/7/1995, Entered: 7/7/1995 Docket Annotation
                                    Attachment 1 to Defts' Memorandum in Support their Motion for Summary Judgment-filed (clerk)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 7/7/1995, Entered: 7/7/1995 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                      Deadline updated; Motion Hearing set for 10:00 7/21/95 for [15-1] motion by Appalachian Health, Nursecall, Inc., Housecall Support Se, Housecall Health Car for Summary Judgment (clerk)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 17 Filed: 7/3/1995, Entered: 7/3/1995 Notice of Hearing.
                                        NOTICE of Hearing: Motion Hearing set for 10:00 7/14/95 for [15-1] motion by Appalachian Health, Nursecall, Inc., Housecall Support Se, Housecall Health Car for Summary Judgment (clerk)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 16 Filed: 6/30/1995, Entered: 7/3/1995 Memorandum in Support
                                          MEMORANDUM by Housecall Health Car, Housecall Support Se, Nursecall, Inc., Appalachian Health in support of [15-1] motion by Appalachian Health, Nursecall, Inc., Housecall Support Se, Housecall Health Car for Summary Judgment (clerk)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 15 Filed: 6/30/1995, Entered: 7/3/1995 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                            MOTION by Appalachian Health, Nursecall, Inc., Housecall Support Se, Housecall Health Car for Summary Judgment (told counsel to notice) (clerk)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 14 Filed: 6/8/1995, Entered: 6/9/1995 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                              ANSWER by Housecall Health Car, Housecall Support Se, Nursecall, Inc., Appalachian Health (Attorney Benjamin S. Boyd) to amended complaint (clerk)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 13 Filed: 6/6/1995, Entered: 6/6/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER-ent.& filed ( signed by Judge Claude M. Hilton ) Copies Mailed: y (clerk)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 12 Filed: 5/23/1995, Entered: 5/25/1995 Amended Complaint
                                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT by Timothy W. White amending [1-1] complaint against Nursecall, Inc., Appalachian Health, City of Alexandria; jury demand (clerk)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 11 Filed: 5/23/1995, Entered: 5/24/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER that pltf's motion for leave to amend and file second amended complaint is granted; parties joint motion for continuance of Discovery is granted. Discovery is extended until 7/14/95, and pretrial conference shall take place on 7/20/95; leave is granted to depose Karen Bralley after the close of discovery if necessary-ent.& filed ( signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas R. Jones Jr. ) Copies Mailed: y (clerk)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 5/23/1995, Entered: 5/25/1995 Notice
                                                      NOTICE of Lawsuit and Waiver of Service Forms for service as to Nursecall, Appalachian Health, City of Alexandria (clerk)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 5/23/1995, Entered: 5/24/1995 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                        Deadline updated; reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Discovery cutoff to 7/14/95 ; Trial date 7/20/95 ; (clerk)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/19/1995, Entered: 5/24/1995 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                          Minute entry: Mag. Judge Jones. Reporter: Rudiger and Green. Appearance of counsel. Matter heard and Pltf's. Motion to amend complaint- Granted and Motion for continuance of discovery- Granted. Order to be filed. (dana) Modified on 05/24/1995
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 10 Filed: 5/17/1995, Entered: 5/17/1995 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                            MEMORANDUM in opposition to [5-1] motion by Timothy W. White for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Timothy W. White filed by City of Alexandria (clerk)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 9 Filed: 5/5/1995, Entered: 5/5/1995 Notice of Hearing.
                                                              NOTICE of Hearing: Motion Hearing set for 10:00 5/19/95 for [7-1] joint motion by all parties for Continuance of Discovery (clerk)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 8 Filed: 5/5/1995, Entered: 5/5/1995 Memorandum in Support
                                                                MEMORANDUM by all parties in support of [7-1] joint motion by all parties for Continuance of Discovery (clerk)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 5/5/1995, Entered: 5/5/1995, Terminated: 5/23/1995 Motion to Continue
                                                                  JOINT MOTION by all parties for Continuance of Discovery (clerk)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 5/4/1995, Entered: 5/5/1995 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                    NOTICE of Hearing: Motion Hearing set for 10:00 5/19/95 for [5-1] motion by Timothy W. White for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint (clerk)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 5/4/1995, Entered: 5/5/1995 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                      MOTION by Timothy W. White for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint (clerk)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 4/3/1995, Entered: 4/3/1995 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER setting Discovery cutoff 6/9/95; Pretrial Conference for 11:40 6/15/95; ( signed by Judge James C. Cacheris ) Copies Mailed: y (lbac)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 3/13/1995, Entered: 3/14/1995 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                          MOTION by Timothy W. White for Leave to File Amended Complaint , and by Timothy W. White to Join The City of Alexandria, Office of Human Rights (will notice) (ltun) Modified on 03/14/1995
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 3/6/1995, Entered: 3/7/1995 Answer
                                                                            ANSWER to Complaint by Housecall Health Car, Housecall Support Se, Brett Wilder (Attorney Benjamin Sorrells Boyd) (lbac)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/5/1995 Complaint
                                                                              COMPLAINT Filing Fee $ 120.00 Receipt # 103274 (psid)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/5/1995 Docket Annotation
                                                                                NOTICE of Lawsuit and Waiver of Service Form given to attorney for service as to defendants (psid) Modified on 01/05/1995
                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                  This case has been viewed 77 times.

                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                  Space
                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                   
                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                  Need Password Help?