Equal Employment Opp v. The Falmouth Institu
Federal Civil Lawsuit Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:95-cv-00013

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States Equal Employment Opportunity Commission United States Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Equal Employment Opportunity Commission"

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard G. Parker +1 202 383 5380 +1 202 383 5414 rparker@omm.com
v.
No Logo The Falmouth Institute, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Surovell Isaacs Petersen & Levy PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David John Fudala +1 703 251 5400 +1 703 591 2149 dfudala@smillaw.com
Office Alexandria
Filed 1/3/1995
Jury Demand Defendant
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Plaintiff
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Fairfax City
Terminated 3/15/1995
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 3/16/1995, Entered: 3/16/1995 Docket Annotation
All Pleadings Accounted for (clerk)
    LREF
    Blank 10 Filed: 3/15/1995, Entered: 3/16/1995 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER The stipulation of dismissal is approved. The action is dismissed with prejudice. Entered and Filed ( signed by Judge Albert V. Bryan Jr. ) Copies Mailed: yes (clerk)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 3/15/1995, Entered: 3/16/1995 Terminated Case
      Case closed on 3/15/95 (clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 9 Filed: 2/1/1995, Entered: 2/1/1995 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
        SCHEDULING ORDER setting Discovery cutoff 4/14/95 ; Pretrial Conference for 12:35 4/20/95 ; ( signed by Judge Albert V. Bryan Jr. ) Copies Mailed: yes (psid)
          LREF
          Blank 8 Filed: 1/24/1995, Entered: 1/24/1995 Docket Annotation
          RESPONSE to first request for admisssions of fact and genuineness of documents -filed by deft (lbac)
            LREF
            Blank 7 Filed: 1/24/1995, Entered: 1/24/1995, Terminated: 3/15/1995 Answer
            ANSWER to Complaint by The Falmouth Institu (Attorney David J. Fudala),; jury demand (lbac)
              LREF
              Blank 6 Filed: 1/18/1995, Entered: 1/23/1995 Objection
              OBJECTION by defendant The Falmouth Institution to [4-1] interrogatory(s) requested by Equal Employment Opp (lbac)
                LREF
                Blank 5 Filed: 1/18/1995, Entered: 1/23/1995 Objection
                OBJECTION by defendant The Falmouth Institution to [2-1] production of document and copying of documents requested by Equal Employment Opp (lbac)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 1/4/1995, Entered: 1/5/1995 Summons Issued
                  SUMMONS(ES) (orig. & 1) issued and given to SPS, Stan Soaper for service as to defendant, The Falmouth Institute (psid)
                    LREF
                    Blank 4 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/5/1995 Interrogatories Propounded
                    INTERROGATORIES propounded by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission to The Falmouth Institute (psid)
                      LREF
                      Blank 3 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/5/1995 Request for Admissions
                      REQUEST for Admissions of fact and genuineness of documents by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (psid)
                        LREF
                        Blank 2 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/5/1995 Request for Production of Documents
                        REQUEST for Production of Documents by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (psid)
                          LREF
                          Blank 1 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/5/1995 Complaint
                          COMPLAINT (psid)
                            LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 55 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?