Hogan v. Prince William-Manas, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:95-cv-00016-CMH

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Anthony G. Hogan, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Prince William-Manassas Adult Detention Center, Defendant
Office Alexandria
Filed 1/3/1995
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Manassas City
Terminated 3/25/1995
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 96-6128[]
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 16 Filed: 7/2/1996, Entered: 7/3/1996 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER denying pltf's motion to reopen his case. - ent & filed. ( signed by Judge Claude M. Hilton ) Copies Mailed: yes (mcke)
    LREF
    Blank 15 Filed: 6/17/1996, Entered: 6/19/1996 Docket Annotation
    REQUEST by pltf to refile new motions, due to the fact pltf has been transferred to Haynesville Correctional Center - filed (mcke)
      LREF
      Blank 14 Filed: 4/15/1996, Entered: 4/16/1996 USCA Judgment
      JUDGMENT OF USCA (certified copy) toghether with opinion decided 3/19/96 Re: dissmissing the appeal (mcke)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 4/12/1996, Entered: 4/15/1996 Appeal Record Returned
        Record on Appeal returned from U.S. Court of Appeals: [10-1] (clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 13 Filed: 3/26/1996, Entered: 3/28/1996 USCA Mandate
          COPY of Opinion of USCA re decided 3/19/96 : [10-1] appeal by Anthony G. Hogan, dismissing the appeal (record not returned) (mcke)
            LREF
            Blank 12 Filed: 3/12/1996, Entered: 3/13/1996 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER denying [11-1] motion by Anthony G. Hogan for Reconsideration of [9-1] order ent. & filed ( signed by Judge Claude M. Hilton ) Copies Mailed: y (clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 11 Filed: 2/10/1996, Entered: 3/13/1996, Terminated: 3/12/1996 Motion for Reconsideration
              MOTION by Anthony G. Hogan for Reconsideration of [9-1] order (clerk)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 2/6/1996, Entered: 2/6/1996 USCA Case Number
                USCA Case Number Re: [10-1] appeal by Anthony G. Hogan CASE MANAGER: Mike Radday USCA NUMBER: 96-6128 (clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 1/23/1996, Entered: 1/23/1996 Initial Paper Record Transmitted to 4CCA
                  Certified and transmitted Record on Appeal to U.S. Court of Appeals: 1 volume (clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank 10 Filed: 12/5/1995, Entered: 1/23/1996 Notice of Appeal
                    NOTICE OF APPEAL to the USCA by Anthony G. Hogan of 3/25/95 Order. Copies of notice, transmittal, order and docket sheet sent to parties. (clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank 9 Filed: 3/25/1995, Entered: 3/29/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDERED that this action be dismissed without prejudice. ( signed by Judge Claude M. Hilton ) Copies Mailed: y (clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 3/25/1995, Entered: 3/29/1995 Terminated Case
                        Case closed (clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank 8 Filed: 2/10/1995, Entered: 2/13/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDERED that: Pltf's Motion to Amend his complaint is GRANTED and the amended complaint is FILED. Dft Prince William-Manassas Regional Adult Detention Center is DISMISSED. Dfts Medical Assistant Cheryl Trautman, the Jail physician and other unnamed members of the Jail medical staff are CONDITIONALLY DISMISSED. Pltf, within (20) days of the date of this Order, show cause why this conditional dismissal should not become final. Pltf has filed a motion for the appointment of counsel to assist him in this action, pltf's request is DENIED. Pltf is advised that failure to comply, will result in the conditional dismissal becoming final. ( signed by Judge Claude M. Hilton ) Copies Mailed: y (clerk)
                            LREF
                            Blank 7 Filed: 2/10/1995, Entered: 2/13/1995 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                            MEMORANDUM OPINION ( signed by Judge Claude M. Hilton ) Copies Mailed: y (clerk)
                              LREF
                              Blank 6 Filed: 1/17/1995, Entered: 1/23/1995 Docket AnnotationCourt Filing
                              Letter to Judge Hilton from Anthony Hogan (clerk)
                                LREF
                                Blank 5 Filed: 1/17/1995, Entered: 1/23/1995 Affidavit
                                AFFIDAVIT by Anthony G. Hogan Re: In support of U.S.C. 1983 Civil Rights Action (clerk)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 4 Filed: 1/17/1995, Entered: 1/23/1995 Memorandum in Support
                                  BRIEF in support of [3-1] motion by Anthony G. Hogan for Appointment of Counsel (clerk)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 3 Filed: 1/17/1995, Entered: 1/23/1995 Motion to Appoint Counsel
                                    MOTION by Anthony G. Hogan for Appointment of Counsel (clerk)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 2 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/6/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDERED that pltf is GRANTED (20) days from the date of this Order within which to particularize and amend his complaint. (see order for details) ( signed by Judge Claude M. Hilton ) Copies Mailed: y (clerk)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 1 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/6/1995 Complaint
                                        COMPLAINT filed in forma pauperis (clerk)
                                          LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 56 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?