Keyes v. Virginia Parole Boar
Federal Civil Lawsuit Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:95-cv-00018-CMH

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Randall Jack Keyes, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Virginia Parole Board, Defendant
Office Alexandria
Filed 1/3/1995
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Out of State
Terminated 5/5/1995
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 5 Filed: 5/5/1995, Entered: 5/5/1995 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER that this action is dismissed without prejudice for pltf.'s failure to respond to order of 3/29/95. Should pltf. wish to appeal, written notice must be filed with the clerk of this court within 30 days of the date of this order. Ent & filed. ( signed by Judge Claude M. Hilton ) Copies Mailed: y (clerk)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 5/5/1995, Entered: 5/5/1995 Terminated Case
    Case closed (clerk)
      LREF
      Blank 4 Filed: 3/29/1995, Entered: 3/29/1995 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER pltf submit facts demonstrating that he has exhausted his state court remedies by presenting these claims to the Supreme Court of Virginia; or, (2) submit additional facts showing that these claims, if valid, would not affect the duration of his confinement. Failure to comply fully with this order will result in the dismissal of this action without prejudice. ent-filed ( signed by Judge Claude M. Hilton ) Copies Mailed: yes (psid)
        LREF
        Blank 3 Filed: 2/2/1995, Entered: 2/2/1995 Amended Complaint
        AMENDED COMPLAINT by Randall Jack Keyes amending [2-1] complaint (clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 2 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/12/1995 Complaint
          COMPLAINT filed in forma pauperis. (psid)
            LREF
            Blank 1 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/12/1995 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER Let this action be filed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff is granted 20 days from the date of this order in which to particularize and amend his complaint. ( signed by Judge Claude M. Hilton ) Copies Mailed: yes (psid)
              LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 44 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?