Sherod v. Motley, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:95-cv-00019-CMH

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Joey Torino Sherod, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Cassandra Taylor, Defendant
No Logo Ms. Motley, Defendant
No Logo Ron Angelone, Defendant
Office Alexandria
Filed 1/3/1995
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Mecklenburg
Terminated 4/5/1995
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 4 Filed: 4/5/1995, Entered: 4/6/1995 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER that this action is dismissed without prejudice. Should pltf. wish to appeal, written notice of appeal must be filed with the clerk of this court within 30 days of the date of this order. Ent & filed. ( signed by Judge Claude M. Hilton ) Copies Mailed: y (clerk)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 4/5/1995, Entered: 4/6/1995 Terminated Case
    Case closed (clerk)
      LREF
      Blank 3 Filed: 2/23/1995, Entered: 2/24/1995 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER that pltf's motion for enlargement of time is granted. Pltf. is directed to comply with the order of 1/3/95 within twenty days of the date of this order, ent - filed ( signed by Judge Claude M. Hilton ) Copies Mailed: yes (clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 2 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/12/1995 Complaint
        COMPLAINT filed in forma pauperis (psid)
          LREF
          Blank 1 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/12/1995 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER Let this action be filed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff is granted 20 days from the date of this order in which to particularize and amend his complaint. ( signed by Judge Claude M. Hilton ) Copies Mailed: yes (psid)
            LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 49 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?