Story v. Drew
Federal Civil Lawsuit Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:95-cv-00020-CMH

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Christopher Donnell Story, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Frank Drew, Defendant
Office Alexandria
Filed 1/3/1995
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 530 - Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Virginia Beach City
Terminated 2/23/1995
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 3 Filed: 2/23/1995, Entered: 2/24/1995 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER that because petitioner failed to respond to the court's order of 1/3/95, this action is dismissed without prejudice to the petitioner's right to resubmit his claims after he has presented them to the state courts. Should the petitioner wish to appeal, written notice must be filed within thirty days of the date of this order, ent- filed ( signed by Judge Claude M. Hilton ) Copies Mailed: yes (clerk)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 2/23/1995, Entered: 2/24/1995 Terminated Case
    Case closed (clerk)
      LREF
      Blank 2 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/17/1995 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
      PETITION for writ of habeas corpus filed in forma pauperis; (psid)
        LREF
        Blank 1 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/12/1995 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER Let this petition be conditinally filed n forma pauperis. The petition is conditionally dismissed. This dismissal will become final within 20 days of the date of this order unless petitioner submits facts demonstrating that he has exhausted his state court remedies with respect to the claims presented here ( signed by Judge Claude M. Hilton ) Copies Mailed: yes (psid)
          LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 63 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?