Jackson v. Pruett
Federal Civil Lawsuit Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:95-cv-00022-CMH

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo William Warren Jackson, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Samuel Pruett, Defendant
Office Alexandria
Filed 1/3/1995
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Powhatan
Terminated 4/14/1995
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 5 Filed: 4/14/1995, Entered: 4/17/1995 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER that this action is dismissed without prejudice for pltf.'s failure to comply with court order re: partial filing fee. Ent & filed. ( signed by Judge Claude M. Hilton ) Copies Mailed: y (clerk)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 4/14/1995, Entered: 4/17/1995 Terminated Case
    Case closed (clerk)
      LREF
      Blank 4 Filed: 2/23/1995, Entered: 2/24/1995 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER: pltf is ordered to pay a partial filing fee of $83.17 -- ent-filed ( signed by Judge Claude M. Hilton ) Copies Mailed: y (lbac)
        LREF
        Blank 3 Filed: 1/13/1995, Entered: 1/13/1995 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement
        Inmate account report form filed. (lbac)
          LREF
          Blank 2 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/5/1995 Complaint
          COMPLAINT filed in forma pauperis (psid)
            LREF
            Blank 1 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/5/1995 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER The complaint is CONDITIONALLY FILED pending payment of any assessed filing fee. The court will process plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis by requesting the James River Correctional Center to supply the Court with an Inmate Account Report Form on the plaintiff. The court will not accept any other motion, pleading, or request until any assessed filing fee has been paid. Plaintiff is advised that he should seek review of his claims through Level III of the state administrative grievance procedure immediately. (See Order for more details) ( signed by Judge Claude M. Hilton ) Copies Mailed: y (psid)
              LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 52 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?