Hopper v. Acacia Reality Advis, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:95-cv-01218

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Richard E. Hopper, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Edward B MacMahon Jr.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward B. MacMahon +1 540 687 3902 +1 540 687 6366 ebmjr@macmahon-law.com
v.
No Logo Acacia Reality Advisors, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Littler Mendelson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Roger D Meade +1 410 992 5424 rmeade@littler.com
No Logo Dennis J. Dubois, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Littler Mendelson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Roger D Meade +1 410 992 5424 rmeade@littler.com
No Logo Prentiss Properties Limited, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Littler Mendelson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Roger D Meade +1 410 992 5424 rmeade@littler.com
Office Alexandria
Filed 8/31/1995
Jury Demand Both
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Notice of Removal-Breach of Contract
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Fairfax
Terminated 12/21/1995
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 143740[Cir Crt Fairfax Cty]
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 11 Filed: 12/21/1995, Entered: 12/26/1995 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER, as evidenced by the signature of counsel for the parties, the above referenced case has been settled. It is therefore ORDERED that this case be Dismissed with prejudice - ent. & filed ( signed by Judge Albert V. Bryan Jr. ) Copies Mailed: yes (ltun)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 12/21/1995, Entered: 12/26/1995 Terminated Case
    Case closed (ltun)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 12/21/1995, Entered: 12/26/1995 Case Assigned/Reassigned
      CASE assigned to Judge Albert V. Bryan Jr. (ltun)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 12/20/1995, Entered: 12/20/1995 Docket Annotation
        case settled per AVB's chambers (mcke)
          LREF
          Blank 10 Filed: 11/2/1995, Entered: 11/2/1995 Memorandum in Opposition
          MEMORANDUM by Richard E. Hopper in opposition to [4-1] motion by Prentiss Properties, Acacia Reality Advis for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings (psid)
            LREF
            Blank 9 Filed: 10/26/1995, Entered: 10/26/1995 Objection
            OBJECTION by defendant Dennis J. Dubois to pltf's first set of interrogatories and first set of requests for the production of documents (psid)
              LREF
              Blank 8 Filed: 10/26/1995, Entered: 10/26/1995 Objection
              OBJECTION by defendant Prentiss Properties to the pltf's first set of interrogatories and first set of requets for the production of documents (psid)
                LREF
                Blank 7 Filed: 10/26/1995, Entered: 10/26/1995 Objection
                OBJECTION by defendant Acacia Reality Advis to pltf's first set of interrogatoris and first requests for the production of documents (psid)
                  LREF
                  Blank 6 Filed: 10/20/1995, Entered: 10/23/1995 Notice of Hearing.
                  NOTICE of Hearing: Motion Hearing set for 10:00 11/9/95 for [4-1] motion by Prentiss Properties, Acacia Reality Advis for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings (psid)
                    LREF
                    Blank 5 Filed: 10/20/1995, Entered: 10/23/1995 Memorandum in Support
                    MEMORANDUM by Acacia Reality Advis, Prentiss Properties in support of [4-1] motion by Prentiss Properties, Acacia Reality Advis for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings (psid)
                      LREF
                      Blank 4 Filed: 10/20/1995, Entered: 10/23/1995 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
                      MOTION by Prentiss Properties, Acacia Reality Advis for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings (psid)
                        LREF
                        Blank 3 Filed: 10/2/1995, Entered: 10/3/1995 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                        SCHEDULING ORDER setting Discovery cutoff 12/15/95 ; Pretrial Conference for 10:50 12/21/95 ; ( signed by Judge Albert V. Bryan Jr. ) Copies Mailed: yes (psid)
                          LREF
                          Blank 2 Filed: 8/31/1995, Entered: 9/6/1995 Answer
                          ANSWER to plaintiff's motion for judgment by Acacia Reality Advis, Prentiss Properties, Dennis J. Dubois (clerk)
                            LREF
                            Blank 1 Filed: 8/31/1995, Entered: 9/6/1995 Notice of Removal
                            NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Cir Crt Fairfax Cnty by Acacia Reality Advis, Prentiss Properties, Dennis J. Dubois ; (together with state court pleadings) FILING FEE $ 120 RECEIPT # 106064; jury demand (clerk)
                              LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 74 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?