USA v. Summers
Federal Court Proceeding Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:95-mj-00001-WCS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"
Office Alexandria
Filed 1/3/1995
County Arlington
Terminated 3/28/1995
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Citation
Offense Level
Count 1
Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 844A=CP.M
Offense Level 3
21844A=CP.M CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE-POSSESSION of Cocaine (sch II)
Count 2
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 13-7220.P
Offense Level 1
Count 3
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 13-7220.P
Offense Level 1
Count 4
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 13-7220.P
Offense Level 1
Def Custody Status Released
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 9 Filed: 3/5/1998, Entered: 3/6/1998 Summons Issued
Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Edward Kevin Summers per order dated 3/2/98 WCS (rtra)
    LREF
    Blank 8 Filed: 3/2/1998, Entered: 3/3/1998 Miscellaneous DocumentCourt Filing
    PETITION AND ORDER on Probation/Supervised Release as to Edward Kevin Summers the petition presented on 02/17/98 be WITHDRAWN as the defendant has paid his fine and special assessment in full. Edward Kevin Summers (1) count(s) 3, 4, 2 signed by Magistrate Judge W. C. Sewell ) (rtra)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 2/26/1998, Entered: 2/26/1998 Summons Issued
      SUMMONS(ES) issued for Edward Kevin Summers (rtra)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 2/26/1998, Entered: 2/26/1998 Set/Reset Deadlines:
        Probation Violation Hearing as to Edward Kevin Summers set 10:00 3/17/98 for Edward Kevin Summers (rtra)
          LREF
          Blank 7 Filed: 2/23/1998, Entered: 2/26/1998 Miscellaneous DocumentCourt Filing
          PETITION AND ORDER on Probation/Supervised Release as to Edward Kevin Summers a Summons is to be issued for 3/17/98 at 10:00 a.m. Edward Kevin Summers (1) count(s) 3, 4, 2 signed by Magistrate Judge W. C. Sewell ) (rtra)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 8/4/1995, Entered: 8/7/1995 Miscellaneous Document
            FINE payment in the amt of $105.00 by Edward Kevin Summers (kbar)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 7/10/1995, Entered: 7/13/1995 Miscellaneous Document
              PARTIAL fine payment in the amount of $45 and asmt payments in the amount of $30 - rect. #27882 by Edward Kevin Summers (kbar)
                LREF
                Blank 6 Filed: 3/28/1995, Entered: 3/31/1995 Judgment*Court Filing
                JUDGMENT Edward Kevin Summers (1) count(s) 2. deft placed on 3 yrs probation w. conditions- $50 plus $10 s/a , Edward Kevin Summers (1) count(s) 3. fined $50 plus $10.00 s/a , Edward Kevin Summers (1) count(s) 4. fined $50 plus $10 s/a ( Signed by Magistrate Judge W. C. Sewell ) (dana)
                  LREF
                  Blank 5 Filed: 3/28/1995, Entered: 3/31/1995 Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge
                  CONSENT to Trial by Magistrate by Edward Kevin Summers (dana)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 3/28/1995, Entered: 3/31/1995 Dismissal of Counts on Government Motion
                    DISMISSAL of Count(s) on Government Motion as to Edward Kevin Summers (dana)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 3/28/1995, Entered: 3/31/1995 Set/Reset Hearings
                      Sentencing held before Magistrate Judge W. C. Sewell ( tape 89) USA appeared through: Flippen Dft(s) appeared through: Rand Edward Kevin Summers (1) count(s) 2, 3, 4. Deft placed on unsupervised probation for a period of three yrs. w/conditions: deft not to drive w/o valid permit; pay all fines imposed by court. Deft to pay $50 fined plus $10 s/a to each count. (for jdil) (dana)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 3/28/1995, Entered: 3/31/1995 Plea - Miscellaneous
                        PLEA entered by Edward Kevin Summers . Court accepts plea. by Edward Kevin Summers Guilty of Lesser Included Offense: Edward Kevin Summers (1) count(s) 2 (amended to NOL) , and by Edward Kevin Summers Guilty: Edward Kevin Summers (1) count(s) 3, 4 (dana)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 3/28/1995, Entered: 3/31/1995 Plea Agreement
                          Plea Agreement Hearing as to Edward Kevin Summers held before Magistrate Judge W. C. Sewell ( tape 89) USA appeared through: Flippen Dft(s) appeared through: Rand. Deft remanded to USMS pending outstanding warrant investigation by PT. Deft discharged from custody of USMS after no warrants found. Deft plead guilty and found guilty as to Cts. III, IV and amended Ct. II. Ct. I dismissed. (dana)
                            LREF
                            Blank 4 Filed: 1/17/1995, Entered: 3/31/1995 Information - Misdemeanor
                            INFORMATION as to Edward Kevin Summers (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4 , Edward Kevin Summers (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4 (dana)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 1/10/1995, Entered: 3/31/1995 Set/Reset Hearings
                              Bench Trial as to Edward Kevin Summers set at 10:00 3/28/95 for Edward Kevin Summers (dana)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 1/10/1995, Entered: 3/31/1995 Status Conference
                                Status conference as to Edward Kevin Summers held before Magistrate Judge W. C. Sewell ( tape 25) USA appeared through: Bowling Dft(s) appeared through: Rand. Case set for trial on 3/28/95 at 10:00. Motions to be filed by 2/3/95. Bond continued and deft released. (for jdil) (dana)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/9/1995, Entered: 4/5/1995 CJA 20 Appointment
                                  CJA 20 as to Edward Kevin Summers : Appointment of Attorney John C. Rand Voucher # 0716176 ( Signed by Magistrate Judge W. C. Sewell ) (clerk)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 3 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 3/31/1995 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                    ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Edward Kevin Summers ( Signed by Magistrate Judge W. C. Sewell ) (dana)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 2 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 3/31/1995 Affidavit
                                      AFFIDAVIT by USA as to Edward Kevin Summers Re: [1-1] complaint (dana)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 1 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 3/31/1995 Complaint
                                        COMPLAINT as to Edward Kevin Summers (dana)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 3/31/1995 Bond
                                          DEFT brought to Clerk's Office and admitted to PR bond. Conditions of Release- executed. Copies sent. Deft released. (dana)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 3/31/1995 Status Conference
                                            Status conference as to Edward Kevin Summers set at 10:00 1/10/95 for Edward Kevin Summers (dana)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 3/31/1995 Initial Appearance
                                              Initial appearance as to Edward Kevin Summers held before Magistrate Judge W. C. Sewell ( tape 11) USA appeared through: Liebeskind Dft(s) appeared through: w.o counsel (Defendant informed of rights.) Deft placed on PR bond w/ conditions: PTS, substance abuse testing/treatment and travel restrictions. Case continued to 1/10/95 at 10:00 am for status. Deft remanded until conditions are met. (for jdil) (dana)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 3/31/1995 Arrest
                                                ARREST of Edward Kevin Summers (dana)
                                                  LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 58 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?