USA v. Hughes
Federal Court Proceeding Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:95-mj-00002-WCS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"
Office Alexandria
Filed 1/3/1995
County Arlington
Terminated 2/16/1995
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Citation
Offense Level
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 13-7990.P
Offense Level 1
Def Custody Status Released
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 5 Filed: 2/16/1995, Entered: 2/17/1995 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to Timothy Gene Hughes granting [4-1] motion by USA to Dismiss as to Timothy Gene Hughes (1) ( Signed by Magistrate Judge W. C. Sewell ) Copies Mailed: y (clerk)
    LREF
    Blank 4 Filed: 2/16/1995, Entered: 2/17/1995, Terminated: 2/16/1995 Motion to Dismiss
    MOTION as to Timothy Gene Hughes by USA to Dismiss (clerk)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 2/16/1995, Entered: 2/17/1995 Dismissal of Counts on Government Motion
      DISMISSAL of Count(s) on Government Motion as to Timothy Gene Hughes Complaint dismissed. (clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 3 Filed: 1/6/1995, Entered: 1/24/1995 Information - Misdemeanor
        SUPERSEDING INFORMATION as to Timothy Gene Hughes (1) count(s) 1 - filed (clerk)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 1/6/1995, Entered: 1/24/1995 Initial Appearance
          Initial appearance as to Timothy Gene Hughes set for 10:00 2/16/95 (clerk)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 1/6/1995, Entered: 1/24/1995 Dismissal of Counts on Defendant/Other Motion
            DISMISSAL of Count(s) on Court or Defendant Motion as to Timothy Gene Hughes Complaint dismissed. (clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 2 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/4/1995 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
              ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Timothy Gene Hughes ( Signed by Magistrate Judge W. C. Sewell ) (clerk)
                LREF
                Blank 1 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/4/1995 Complaint
                COMPLAINT as to Timothy Gene Hughes (clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/4/1995 Bond
                  DEFT. appeared in Clerk's Office. Admitted to PR Bond and released. ORDER setting conditions - executed & filed. Copies sent. (clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/4/1995 Initial Appearance
                    Initial appearance as to Timothy Gene Hughes held before Magistrate Judge W. C. Sewell ( Tape 11 (4700-5163)) USA appeared through: R. Liebskind Dft(s) appeared w/o counsel (Defendant informed of rights.). Deft. placed on PR Bond. Case set for traffic docket on 2/16/95 at 10:00 a.m. (clerk)
                      LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 48 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?