USA v. Staples
Federal Court Proceeding Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:95-mj-00003-TRJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott Lawson +1 703 299 3700
Office Alexandria
Filed 1/3/1995
County Fairfax
Terminated 3/27/1995
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 13-7210.M
Offense Level 3
Count 2
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 13-7210.M
Offense Level 3
Count 3
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 13-7220.P
Offense Level 1
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 3/5/1996, Entered: 3/5/1996 Miscellaneous Document
FINE Payment in the amount of $380; receipt# 108182 as to Suzanne N. Staples (clerk) Modified on 03/11/1996
    LREF
    Blank 7 Filed: 12/27/1995, Entered: 12/27/1995 ~Notice (other)
    NOTICE of Return of Property (Video) pursuant to Local Court Rule by USA as to Suzanne N. Staples (clerk)
      LREF
      Blank 6 Filed: 3/27/1995, Entered: 3/28/1995 Judgment*Court Filing
      JUDGMENT Suzanne N. Staples (1) count(s) 1. 1 yr probation w/conditions: $300 plus $10 s/a , Suzanne N. Staples (1) count(s) 2. Ct. II Concurrent w/ Ct. I ($10 s/a) , Suzanne N. Staples (1) count(s) 3. fined $50 plus $10 s/a ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas R. Jones Jr. ) (dana)
        LREF
        Blank 5 Filed: 3/27/1995, Entered: 3/28/1995 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
        NOTICE of Appearance for Suzanne N. Staples by Attorney Carleton Penn III (dana)
          LREF
          Blank 4 Filed: 3/27/1995, Entered: 3/28/1995 Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge
          CONSENT to Trial by Magistrate by Suzanne N. Staples (dana)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 3/27/1995, Entered: 3/28/1995 Set/Reset Hearings
            Sentencing held before Magistrate Judge Thomas R. Jones Jr. ( tape 102/103) USA appeared through: Lawson Dft(s) appeared through: Penn Suzanne N. Staples (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3. Count I- Deft placed on one yr super. probation w/conditions that the deft enter in alcohol program, substance abuse testing/treatment, deft may not operate a motor vehicle except to and from, during employment, to and from job interviews, to and from USPO, alcohol program, court. fined $300 plus $10 s/a. Ct. II is concurrent w/Ct.I ($10 s/a). Ct. III Deft fined $50 plus $10 s/a. (dana)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 3/27/1995, Entered: 3/28/1995 Court Verdict
              COURT VERDICT Guilty: Suzanne N. Staples (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3 (dana)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 3/27/1995, Entered: 3/28/1995 Plea - Miscellaneous
                PLEA entered by Suzanne N. Staples . Court accepts plea. by Suzanne N. Staples Not Guilty: , Suzanne N. Staples (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3 (dana)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 3/27/1995, Entered: 3/28/1995 Set/Reset Hearings
                  Bench Trial as to Suzanne N. Staples held before Magistrate Judge Thomas R. Jones Jr. ( tape 102/103) USA appeared through: Lawson Dft(s) appeared through: Penn Gov't present evidence: rested. Deft presented evidence: rested. Deft found guilty as to Cts. I, II, and III. (dana)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 3/27/1995, Entered: 3/28/1995 Bench Trial - Begun
                    Bench trial begun as to Suzanne N. Staples (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3 Terminated motions: (dana)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 3/27/1995, Entered: 3/28/1995 Initial Appearance
                      Initial appearance as to Suzanne N. Staples held before Magistrate Judge Thomas R. Jones Jr. ( tape 102/103) USA appeared through: Lawson Dft(s) appeared through: Penn (Defendant informed of rights.) (dana)
                        LREF
                        Blank 3 Filed: 2/23/1995, Entered: 2/23/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER as to Suzanne N. Staples granting [2-1] motion by USA to Continue from 2/27/95 to 3/27/95 at 10:00 a.m. (Signed by Magistrate Judge T.R. Jones Jr.) Copies Mailed on 2/23/95 (clerk) Modified on 02/23/1995
                          LREF
                          Blank 2 Filed: 2/23/1995, Entered: 2/23/1995, Terminated: 2/23/1995 Motion to Continue
                          MOTION as to Suzanne N. Staples by USA to Continue (clerk)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 2/9/1995, Entered: 2/9/1995 Set/Reset Hearings
                            Bench Trial as to Suzanne N. Staples set at 10:00 2/27/95 for Suzanne N. Staples (dana)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 2/6/1995, Entered: 2/9/1995 Miscellaneous Document
                              Case continued to 2/27/95 at 10:00 am for trial as to Suzanne N. Staples. Govt informed court that case was continued. Court could not find motion/order to confirm continuance. (dana)
                                LREF
                                Blank 1 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/17/1995 Information - Misdemeanor
                                CRIMINAL INFORMATION as to Suzanne N. Staples(1) count(s) 1, 2, & 3 (clerk)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/17/1995 Initial Appearance
                                  Initial appearance as to Suzanne N. Staples set for 10:00 a.m. on 1/23/95 (clerk)
                                    LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 50 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?