USA v. Svanikier
Federal Court Proceeding Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:95-mj-00171-WCS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"
v.
No Logo Svanikier, Thomas, Defendant
Officially listed as "Thomas Svanikier"
Office Alexandria
Filed 3/10/1995
County Fairfax
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Citation
Offense Level
Def Custody Status Custody This Court
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 4/12/1995, Entered: 4/12/1995 Miscellaneous Document
File as to Thomas Svanikier transfered to USDC - 200 S. Washington St. Alexandria, VA 22314 (clerk)
    LREF
    Blank 9 Filed: 3/31/1995, Entered: 5/23/1995 Miscellaneous Document
    Receipt for SURRENDER of Passport received from PTS Officer on 3/10/95 by USA as to Thomas Svanikier (clerk)
      LREF
      Blank 8 Filed: 3/31/1995, Entered: 4/3/1995 Receipt for Passport
      NOTICE of Receipt for SURRENDER of Passport as to Thomas Svanikier, Passport #609919, Country:Ghana from the USDC for the District of MA (Passport not Received) (clerk) Modified on 04/03/1995
        LREF
        Blank 6 Filed: 3/30/1995, Entered: 3/31/1995 Response in Opposition
        RESPONSE by USA as to Thomas Svanikier in opposition to [4-1] motion by Thomas Svanikier to Amend [3-1] order setting conditions of release (clerk)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 3/30/1995, Entered: 3/31/1995 Minutes-Miscellaneous
          Minute entry as to Thomas Svanikier : before Magistrate Judge W. C. Sewell ( Tape #90) USA appeared through: J. Shemitz Dft(s) appeared not (counsel D. Hucheson). Deft. motion to amend conditions of release - denied. Deft. objection to no PH scheduled w/i 20 days - withdrawn; deft. may request PH rescheduled to comply w/ 20 day requirement. Deft. cont. on bond. (clerk)
            LREF
            Blank 5 Filed: 3/29/1995, Entered: 3/31/1995 Notice of Hearing.
            NOTICE of Hearing as to Thomas Svanikier :, Motion Hearing set for 10:00 3/30/95 for Thomas Svanikier for [4-1] motion by Thomas Svanikier to Amend [3-1] order setting conditions of release (clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 4 Filed: 3/29/1995, Entered: 3/31/1995 Motion to Amend/Correct
              MOTION by Thomas Svanikier to Amend [3-1] order setting conditions of release (clerk)
                LREF
                Blank 7 Filed: 3/28/1995, Entered: 3/31/1995 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                NOTICE of Appearance for Thomas Svanikier by Attorney Drewry B. Hutcheson Jr. (clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 3/27/1995, Entered: 3/27/1995 Status Conference
                  Status conference as to Thomas Svanikier set at 10:00 4/28/95 for Thomas Svanikier (dana)
                    LREF
                    Blank 3 Filed: 3/10/1995, Entered: 3/13/1995 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                    ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Thomas Svanikier ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas R. Jones Jr. ) (dana)
                      LREF
                      Blank 2 Filed: 3/10/1995, Entered: 3/13/1995 Affidavit
                      AFFIDAVIT by USA as to Thomas Svanikier Re: [1-1] complaint (dana)
                        LREF
                        Blank 1 Filed: 3/10/1995, Entered: 3/13/1995 Complaint
                        COMPLAINT as to Thomas Svanikier (dana)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 3/10/1995, Entered: 3/13/1995 Status Conference
                          Status conference as to Thomas Svanikier set at 10:00 3/21/95 for Thomas Svanikier (dana)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 3/10/1995, Entered: 3/13/1995 Initial Appearance
                            Initial appearance as to Thomas Svanikier held before Magistrate Judge Thomas R. Jones Jr. ( tape 85) USA appeared through: Erling Dft(s) appeared through: w/o counsel (Defendant informed of rights.). Deft. informed court that he would obtain counsel. Deft placed on PR w/ conditions: 3rd party custodian (wife, Johanna Svanikier), deft. may not leave the Boston area except for travel to EDVA for court, deft. may not move from present address w/o proior approval of PTS, deft. is to report to PTS as directed, refrain from possessing a firearm, destructive device or other dangerous weapon, surrender any passport to Clerk's Office and substance abuse testing and/or treatment. Case continued until 3/21/95 at 10:00 am for status hearing. Deft. doesn't have to appear for status hearing if counsel has been retain and will appear to set PH. Deft remanded until conditions are met. (dana)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 3/10/1995, Entered: 3/13/1995 Arrest
                              ARREST of Thomas Svanikier (dana)
                                LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 24,288 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?