Cravens, et al v. Guardsmark, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:97-cv-00810-JCC

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 30, 2016 at 7:01 PM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Charles Cravens, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by McGuireWoods LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles Torrence Armstrong +1 703 712 5000
No Logo Lisa Moore, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by McGuireWoods LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles Torrence Armstrong +1 703 712 5000
No Logo Michael C. Cravens, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by McGuireWoods LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles Torrence Armstrong +1 703 712 5000
v.
No Logo Guardsmark, Inc., Defendant
Office Alexandria
Filed 5/27/1997
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2201 Declaratory Judgment
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Prince William
Terminated 5/30/1997
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 6/2/1997, Entered: 6/2/1997 Case Assigned/Reassigned
CASE assigned to Judge James C. Cacheris (clerk)
    LREF
    Blank 11 Filed: 5/30/1997, Entered: 6/2/1997 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the FRCP. (clerk)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 5/30/1997, Entered: 6/2/1997 Terminated Case
      Case closed (clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 13 Filed: 5/29/1997, Entered: 6/2/1997 Summons Returned Executed
        SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Guardsmark, Inc. 5/27/97 Answer due on 6/16/97 for Guardsmark, Inc. (clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 12 Filed: 5/29/1997, Entered: 6/2/1997 Notice
          NOTICE of Motion for 5/27/97, (heard by phone conf. 5/27/97) by Charles Cravens, Michael C. Cravens, Lisa Moore (clerk)
            LREF
            Blank 10 Filed: 5/27/1997, Entered: 5/27/1997 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDERED in light of the Court's phone conference with C. Torrence Armstrong on behalf of plaintiffs and Jonathan D. Schiller on behalf of plaintiffs and Jonathan D. Schiller on behalf of defendant, mooting [3-1] motion by Lisa Moore, Michael C. Cravens, Charles Cravens for Temporary Restraining Order ( signed by Judge Leonie M. Brinkema ) Copies Mailed: yes (clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 9 Filed: 5/27/1997, Entered: 5/27/1997 Memorandum in Opposition
              MEMORANDUM by Guardsmark, Inc. in opposition to [3-1] motion by Lisa Moore, Michael C. Cravens, Charles Cravens for Temporary Restraining Order by Lisa Moore, Michael C. Cravens, Charles Cravens (clerk)
                LREF
                Blank 8 Filed: 5/23/1997, Entered: 5/27/1997 Memorandum in Support
                MEMORANDUM by Charles Cravens, Michael C. Cravens, Lisa Moore in support of [3-1] motion by Lisa Moore, Michael C. Cravens, Charles Cravens for Temporary Restraining Order by Lisa Moore, Michael C. Cravens, Charles Cravens (clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank 7 Filed: 5/23/1997, Entered: 5/27/1997 Affidavit
                  AFFIDAVIT by Lisa Moore Re: (clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank 6 Filed: 5/23/1997, Entered: 5/27/1997 Affidavit
                    AFFIDAVIT by Michael C. Cravens Re: (clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank 5 Filed: 5/23/1997, Entered: 5/27/1997 Affidavit
                      AFFIDAVIT by Charles Cravens Re: (clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank 4 Filed: 5/23/1997, Entered: 5/27/1997 Notice
                        NOTICE of Motion by Charles Cravens, Michael C. Cravens, Lisa Moore (clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank 3 Filed: 5/23/1997, Entered: 5/27/1997 Motion for TRO
                          MOTION by Lisa Moore, Michael C. Cravens, Charles Cravens for Temporary Restraining Order (clerk)
                            LREF
                            Blank 2 Filed: 5/23/1997, Entered: 5/27/1997 Affidavit
                            AFFIDAVIT of C. Torrence Armstrong Pursuant to Rule 65(B) of the FRCP Re: [1-1] complaint (clerk)
                              LREF
                              Blank 1 Filed: 5/23/1997, Entered: 5/27/1997 Complaint
                              COMPLAINT Filing Fee $ 150.00 Reciept #: 114511 (clerk) Modified on 05/30/1997
                                LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 46 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?